FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
508 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "FRANCE" sorted by Registration_Number
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_2, Zip, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 26
- Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 24
- Government Research Corporation 15
- DGA International, Inc. 12
- French Line, Inc. 10
- Ruder Finn, Inc. 10
- Association Films, Inc. 9
- Modern Education Services, Inc. 8
- North American Precis Syndicate 8
- Euroconsultants, Inc. 7
- Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP 6
- Foley & Statt 6
- Cassidy & Associates, Inc. 5
- Coudert Brothers 5
- Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 5
- Keating Group, Inc. 5
- Rogers & Wells, LLP 5
- Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP 4
- Berry, Max N. 4
- Crowell & Moring International, LLC 4
- Edelman International Corporation 4
- French National Railroads, New York 4
- Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman 4
- Junta de Cultura Espanola 4
- Levy, Joseph M. 4
- Robert W. Schofield & Associates, Inc. 4
- Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 3
- Fleishman-Hillard, Inc. 3
- French Government Tourist Office 3
- Gold & Liebengood, Inc. 3
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- French Government Tourist Office 16
- French National Railroads 11
- Air France 8
- Government of France 8
- Aerospatiale 6
- French Embassy 6
- Aeroport de Paris 5
- Agence Teleradio 5
- Airbus Industrie 5
- French Information Center, Inc. 5
- Thomson-CSF, Inc. 5
- Altus Finance 4
- Euromissile 4
- French Industrial Development Agency 4
- Matra Aerospace, Inc. 4
- Societe Nationale d'Etude et de Construction de Moteurs d'Aviation 4
- New California Life Holdings, Inc. 3
- Nord-Aviation, S.A. 3
- Paribas Corporation 3
- Airbus Industrie, G.I.E. 2
- Arianespace, S.A. 2
- Axa Reassurance 2
- Banque Nationale de Paris 2
- Caisse des Depots et Consignations 2
- Cartier International Cie 2
- Casino 2
- Centre National d'Etudes Spatiales 2
- Chanel Parfums 2
- Comite Franc-Dollar 2
- Comite France Actuelle 2
- …
Country/Location_Represented 1
- FRANCE · 508 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number ▼ | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
13838 | 13838 | 1942-11-09 | Agence Teleradio | 1942-09-14 | FRANCE | Estrangin, Gustave Fritsch 1 | 1942-09-14 | Estrangin, Gustave Fritsch | Vichy | ||||
9052 | 9052 | 1942-07-07 | Societe Nationale des Chemins de Fer Francais | 1942-07-07 | FRANCE | French National Railroads, New York 8 | 1942-07-07 | French National Railroads, New York | |||||
3204 | 3204 | 1950-03-01 | French Consulate | 1950-06-05 | FRANCE | LeRoy & Denslow 27 | 1942-07-09 | LeRoy & Denslow | Washington | DC | |||
9291 | 9291 | 1942-07-16 | G. Henry-Haye (French Embassy) | 1942-07-16 | FRANCE | Musa, John L. 50 | 1942-07-16 | Musa, John L. | Washington | DC | |||
3735 | 3735 | 1943-03-15 | French Ambassador Gaston Henry-Haye | 1943-03-15 | FRANCE | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine 51 | 1942-07-16 | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine | |||||
3736 | 3736 | 1943-03-15 | French Embassy | 1942-07-16 | FRANCE | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine 51 | 1942-07-16 | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine | |||||
9495 | 9495 | 1946-07-27 | French Tobacco Commissioner (Service d'Exploitation Industrielle des Tabacs et Allumettes) | 1943-10-15 | FRANCE | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 56 | 1942-07-20 | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner | Baltimore | MD | |||
9500 | 9500 | 1946-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | 1942-07-20 | FRANCE | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 56 | 1942-07-20 | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner | |||||
9504 | 9504 | 1946-07-27 | French Committee for National Liberation | 1944-02-28 | FRANCE | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 56 | 1942-07-20 | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner | Washington | DC | |||
9505 | 9505 | 1946-07-27 | French Line, Inc. | 1943-10-15 | FRANCE | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 56 | 1942-07-20 | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner | New York | NY | |||
9507 | 9507 | 1946-07-27 | Government of France | 1942-07-20 | FRANCE | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 56 | 1942-07-20 | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner | |||||
5482 | 5482 | 1945-04-23 | Chargeurs Reunis - Compagnie Sud-Atlantique | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
5483 | 5483 | 1946-04-23 | Air France | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9515 | 9515 | 1960-07-27 | Compagnie Generale d'Armement Maritime | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9516 | 9516 | 1960-07-27 | Compagnie Nantaise des Chargeurs de L'Quest | 1957-02-21 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Nantes | ||||
9517 | 9517 | 1960-07-27 | Compagnie d'Affretement et de Transport (C.A.T) | 1958-09-29 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9518 | 9518 | 1960-07-27 | Societe Nationale d'Affretement | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9519 | 9519 | 1960-07-27 | Societe Nouvelle d'Affretement et de Courtage | 1957-05-02 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Dinard | ||||
9520 | 9520 | 1960-07-27 | Societe d'Armements de Gerance et d'Etudes Techniques | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9521 | 9521 | 1960-07-27 | Air France Transatlantique | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9522 | 9522 | 1960-07-27 | Association Petroliere | 1944-03-10 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9523 | 9523 | 1960-07-27 | Compagnie Auxiliaire de Navigation | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9524 | 9524 | 1960-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9525 | 9525 | 1960-07-27 | Compagnie Havraise de Navigation a Vapeur | 1957-02-21 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9526 | 9526 | 1960-07-27 | Compagnie de Navigation Europeenne | 1957-02-21 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Marseille | ||||
9527 | 9527 | 1960-07-27 | French Colonial Supply Mission (for the Account of the Governor of Martinique) (F.W.I.) | 1944-07-29 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | New York | NY | |||
9528 | 9528 | 1960-07-27 | Maurel & Prom | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9529 | 9529 | 1960-07-27 | Messageries Maritimes | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9530 | 9530 | 1960-07-27 | Mission des Transports Maritimes (French Maritime Commission) | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9531 | 9531 | 1960-07-27 | Societe Francasie des Transports Petroliers | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9532 | 9532 | 1960-07-27 | Societe Generale des Transports Maritimes a Vapeur | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9533 | 9533 | 1960-07-27 | Societe Maritime Nationale | 1957-02-21 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9534 | 9534 | 1960-07-27 | Societe Navale Caennaise | 1957-02-21 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9535 | 9535 | 1960-07-27 | Societe des Voyages et Hotels Nord-Africains | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9536 | 9536 | 1960-07-27 | Union Industrielle et Maritime | 1957-02-21 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | Paris | ||||
9492 | 9492 | 1942-07-27 | Office Francais de Renseignements aux Etats-Unis | 1942-07-27 | FRANCE | French Information Center, Inc. 67 | 1942-07-27 | French Information Center, Inc. | |||||
4026 | 4026 | 1945-03-25 | French Embassy | 1942-08-28 | FRANCE | De Bisschop, Eric 109 | 1942-08-28 | De Bisschop, Eric | |||||
11886 | 11886 | 1942-09-29 | Teleradio News Agency (Societe Anonyme Teleradio, Avenue des Etats-Unis, Clermont-Ferrand (Puy-de-Dome)) | 1942-09-29 | FRANCE | Fernier, Rene 130 | 1942-09-29 | Fernier, Rene | |||||
3702 | 3702 | 1947-03-14 | France-Amerique | 1946-10-02 | FRANCE | Comite France Amerique 131 | 1942-09-14 | Comite France Amerique | Paris | ||||
3703 | 3703 | 1947-03-14 | San Francisco Comite France Amerique | 1942-09-14 | FRANCE | Comite France Amerique 131 | 1942-09-14 | Comite France Amerique | San Francisco | CA | |||
12520 | 12520 | 1942-10-07 | Agence Teleradio | 1942-10-07 | FRANCE | De Longfief, Henri Villieras 136 | 1942-10-07 | De Longfief, Henri Villieras | |||||
12521 | 12521 | 1942-10-07 | Agence Teleradio | 1942-10-07 | FRANCE | Sweinhart, Henry L. 137 | 1942-10-07 | Sweinhart, Henry L. | Vichy | ||||
12656 | 12656 | 1942-10-14 | Agence Teleradio | 1942-10-14 | FRANCE | Peron, Andre Antoine 140 | 1942-10-14 | Peron, Andre Antoine | |||||
12691 | 12691 | 1942-10-15 | Teleradio News Agency | 1942-10-15 | FRANCE | D'Aumale, Claude 141 | 1942-10-15 | D'Aumale, Claude | New York | NY | |||
12692 | 12692 | 1942-10-15 | Teleradio News Agency | 1942-10-15 | FRANCE | De Arrieta, Juan 142 | 1942-10-15 | De Arrieta, Juan | |||||
12690 | 12690 | 1942-10-15 | Agence Teleradio | 1942-10-15 | FRANCE | De Arrieta, Henriette Jauny 143 | 1942-10-15 | De Arrieta, Henriette Jauny | |||||
12884 | 12884 | 1942-10-21 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-10-21 | FRANCE | Finley, Blanche 145 | 1942-10-21 | Finley, Blanche | New York | NY | |||
12941 | 12941 | 1942-10-23 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-10-23 | FRANCE | Le Branchu, Jean-Yves 148 | 1942-10-23 | Le Branchu, Jean-Yves | New York | NY | |||
12433 | 12433 | 1942-10-02 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-10-29 | FRANCE | Cartier, Pierre C. 150 | 1942-10-29 | Cartier, Pierre C. | New York | NY | |||
13718 | 13718 | 1942-11-05 | French Embassy | 1942-11-05 | FRANCE | Minor, Gatley & Drury 153 | 1942-11-05 | Minor, Gatley & Drury | Washington | DC | |||
6656 | 6656 | 1945-05-20 | Dr. Pierre Astier | 1942-11-20 | FRANCE | Gallia Laboratories, Inc. 159 | 1942-11-20 | Gallia Laboratories, Inc. | Paris | ||||
4025 | 4025 | 1943-03-25 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-12-09 | FRANCE | Maurois, Andre' 162 | 1942-12-09 | Maurois, Andre' | New York | NY | |||
15002 | 15002 | 1942-12-11 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-12-11 | FRANCE | Polk, Frank L. 163 | 1942-12-11 | Polk, Frank L. | New York | NY | |||
11768 | 11768 | 1945-09-23 | Banque de France | 1942-12-23 | FRANCE | Martial, Jean 165 | 1942-12-23 | Martial, Jean | |||||
15647 | 15647 | 1966-12-31 | Chambre de Commerce Francaise de New York | 1943-01-01 | FRANCE | French Chamber of Commerce of the U.S., Inc. 167 | 1943-01-01 | French Chamber of Commerce of the U.S., Inc. | New York | NY | |||
15649 | 15649 | 1966-12-31 | French Government | 1947-02-19 | FRANCE | French Chamber of Commerce of the U.S., Inc. 167 | 1943-01-01 | French Chamber of Commerce of the U.S., Inc. | Paris | ||||
1084 | 1084 | 1943-01-06 | General Henri Giraud, of the French Armed Forces | 1943-01-06 | FRANCE | Longin-Spindler, Emanuel Mary Paul 171 | 1943-01-06 | Longin-Spindler, Emanuel Mary Paul | |||||
1549 | 1549 | 1943-01-27 | Societe l' Alfa, le Pontet | 1943-01-27 | FRANCE | Gauthier, Donat A. 176 | 1943-01-27 | Gauthier, Donat A. | Vancluse | ||||
2089 | 2089 | 1945-02-02 | Banque de Paris et des Pays-Bas | 1943-02-02 | FRANCE | Boyer, Maurice 177 | 1943-02-02 | Boyer, Maurice | Paris | ||||
4096 | 4096 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Generale d'Armements Martimes | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4097 | 4097 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie d'Orbigny | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4098 | 4098 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Delmas Vyieljeux | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4099 | 4099 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique | 1943-09-28 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4100 | 4100 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Havraise Peninsolaire | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4101 | 4101 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Paquet | 1945-05-21 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4102 | 4102 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie des Bateaux a Vapeur du Nord | 1945-05-21 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4103 | 4103 | 1948-03-28 | Messageries Maritimes | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4104 | 4104 | 1948-03-28 | Societe Navale Caennaise | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4105 | 4105 | 1948-03-28 | Worms & Cie | 1945-05-21 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
6124 | 6124 | 1946-05-01 | Comite Francais de Liberation Nationale | 1943-10-25 | FRANCE | France Amerique Corporation 218 | 1943-10-25 | France Amerique Corporation | New York | NY | |||
7310 | 7310 | 1944-06-01 | Pour la Victoire (Free French Weekly) | 1943-12-01 | FRANCE | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
771 | 771 | 1944-01-01 | La France Libre | 1944-01-01 | FRANCE | Auersperg, Hilda Heriot 228 | 1944-01-01 | Auersperg, Hilda Heriot | London, England | ||||
9577 | 9577 | 1949-07-29 | Basque Governing In Exile/President Jose Antonio de Aguirre | 1946-09-27 | FRANCE | De Irala, Antonio 232 | 1944-01-29 | De Irala, Antonio | Paris | ||||
11316 | 11316 | 1944-09-02 | No foreign principal listed (Works on own behalf by the permission from the French Commander in Chief) | 1944-03-02 | FRANCE | Maurois, Andre' 238 | 1944-03-02 | Maurois, Andre' | New York | NY | |||
3386 | 3386 | 1945-03-03 | La France Libre Publishing Company, Ltd. | 1944-03-03 | FRANCE | Labarthe, Andre 239 | 1944-03-03 | Labarthe, Andre | London, England | ||||
4994 | 4994 | 1946-04-03 | Mission de la Marine Marchande et des Transports (French Delegation) | 1944-04-03 | FRANCE | Fabre, Leon C. 244 | 1944-04-03 | Fabre, Leon C. | Washington | DC | |||
12693 | 12693 | 1944-10-15 | Institut de France | 1944-04-15 | FRANCE | American Members of the Institut de France, Inc. 245 | 1944-04-15 | American Members of the Institut de France, Inc. | Paris | ||||
14317 | 14317 | 1944-11-30 | French Committee for National Liberation | 1944-06-24 | FRANCE | Nathan, Robert R. 268 | 1944-06-24 | Nathan, Robert R. | Washington | DC | |||
1620 | 1620 | 1952-01-30 | Juan Aja | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | |||||
1621 | 1621 | 1952-01-30 | Lorenzo Gascon | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | |||||
1625 | 1625 | 1952-01-30 | Trifon Gomez | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | Paris | ||||
11349 | 11349 | 1968-09-03 | Ligue des Mutiles et Invalides de la Guerra D'espagne en Exil | 1952-01-31 | FRANCE | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | Paris | ||||
5251 | 5251 | 1945-04-14 | Syndicat du Commerce d'Exportation des Vins, Cidres, Spirituex et Ligueurs de France | 1945-04-14 | FRANCE | French Wine & Spirits Association in the U.S., Inc. 301 | 1945-04-14 | French Wine & Spirits Association in the U.S., Inc. | Paris | ||||
14886 | 14886 | 1945-12-08 | Syndicat Des Marins De France | 1945-06-08 | FRANCE | Syndicat Des Marins De France 305 | 1945-06-08 | Syndicat Des Marins De France | New York | NY | |||
9313 | 9313 | 1947-07-17 | French Consulate in San Francisco (Provisional Government of France) | 1945-07-17 | FRANCE | L'Echo de l'Quest, Inc. 309 | 1945-07-17 | L'Echo de l'Quest, Inc. | San Francisco | ||||
9314 | 9314 | 1947-07-17 | French Press & Information Service | 1945-07-17 | FRANCE | L'Echo de l'Quest, Inc. 309 | 1945-07-17 | L'Echo de l'Quest, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
10862 | 10862 | 1947-08-31 | French Tobacco Commissioner (Republic Francaise, Service d'Exploitation Industrielle des Tabacs et Allumettes) | 1946-10-17 | FRANCE | Foley & Statt 318 | 1945-08-31 | Foley & Statt | Paris | ||||
10863 | 10863 | 1947-08-31 | Air France Societe Anonyme | 1946-10-17 | FRANCE | Foley & Statt 318 | 1945-08-31 | Foley & Statt | Paris | ||||
10864 | 10864 | 1947-08-31 | Compagnie General Transatlantique | 1945-08-31 | FRANCE | Foley & Statt 318 | 1945-08-31 | Foley & Statt | |||||
10865 | 10865 | 1947-08-31 | French Line, Inc. | 1945-08-31 | FRANCE | Foley & Statt 318 | 1945-08-31 | Foley & Statt | |||||
10866 | 10866 | 1947-08-31 | French National Railroads | 1946-10-17 | FRANCE | Foley & Statt 318 | 1945-08-31 | Foley & Statt | Paris | ||||
10867 | 10867 | 1947-08-31 | Provisional Government of the Republic of France | 1945-08-31 | FRANCE | Foley & Statt 318 | 1945-08-31 | Foley & Statt | |||||
8301 | 8301 | 1976-06-30 | Office Central de Chemins de Fer d'Outre-Mer | 1956-01-24 | FRANCE | French National Railroads, New York 335 | 1945-12-26 | French National Railroads, New York | |||||
15727 | 15727 | 1974-12-31 | Compagnie Internationale des Wagons-Lits | 1971-12-21 | FRANCE | French National Railroads, New York 335 | 1945-12-26 | French National Railroads, New York | |||||
16079 | 16079 | 1988-12-31 | Societe Nationale des Chemins de fer Francais | 1945-12-26 | FRANCE | French National Railroads, New York 335 | 1945-12-26 | French National Railroads, New York | |||||
9558 | 9558 | 1952-07-28 | Government of France | 1947-09-29 | FRANCE | Cox, Oscar S. 341 | 1946-01-28 | Cox, Oscar S. | Washington | DC | |||
8211 | 8211 | 1949-06-30 | Commissariat General au Plan de la Mordenisation et de la Reconstruction | 1946-04-22 | FRANCE | Robert R. Nathan Associates, Inc. 352 | 1946-04-22 | Robert R. Nathan Associates, Inc. | |||||
1462 | 1462 | 1985-01-22 | French Government - Ministere de l'Amenagement du Territoire de l'Equipement, du Logement et du Tourisme | 1973-06-12 | FRANCE | French Government Tourist Office 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1463 | 1463 | 1985-01-22 | Commissariat General au Tourisme (General Commissariat of Tourism) French Ministry of Public Works and Transportation | 1946-07-25 | FRANCE | French Government Tourist Office 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1464 | 1464 | 1985-01-22 | Secretary of State for Tourisme (French Government) | 1964-12-07 | FRANCE | French Government Tourist Office 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );