fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
24 | AXA | 2021-03-03 | FRANCE | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 25 Avenue Matignon 75008 Paris | |||||
34 | Agence Francaise de Developpement | 2021-02-22 | FRANCE | 6064 | 2011-09-19 | Portland PR Inc. | 5 Rue Roland Barthes, 75 598 | Paris Cedex 12 | ||||
89 | Business France | 2020-09-04 | FRANCE | 6866 | 2020-09-04 | Dozier, Daniel P. | ||||||
260 | Genfit | 2018-01-22 | FRANCE | 6510 | 2018-01-22 | Meliora Strategy | 1813 13th Street, NW | Suite 2 | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
771 | 1944-01-01 | La France Libre | 1944-01-01 | FRANCE | 228 | 1944-01-01 | Auersperg, Hilda Heriot | London, England | ||||
803 | 1967-01-01 | Government of France | 1952-12-05 | FRANCE | 746 | 1952-12-02 | Squire, Sanders & Dempsey, L.L.P. | Paris | ||||
829 | 1979-01-01 | French Bank Association | 1977-07-27 | FRANCE | 1750 | 1964-06-04 | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP | Paris | ||||
857 | 1983-01-01 | Compagnie Financiere de Paribas | 1982-12-10 | FRANCE | 3428 | 1982-12-10 | Rogers & Wells, LLP | Paris | ||||
881 | 1987-01-01 | Aeroport de Paris | 1980-03-25 | FRANCE | 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | |||||
911 | 1988-01-01 | Perrier Group | 1985-05-29 | FRANCE | 2661 | 1976-02-18 | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC | |||||
912 | 1988-01-01 | Republic of France | 1984-10-31 | FRANCE | 3626 | 1984-10-31 | Miller & Chevalier, Chartered | DC | ||||
961 | 1996-01-01 | Avions de Transport Regional, Groupement d'Interet Economique | 1994-11-30 | FRANCE | 2244 | 1971-02-18 | Hogan Lovells US LLP | Blagnac Cedex | ||||
1054 | 1998-01-02 | Societe de Publicite SDP | 1995-12-26 | FRANCE | 5051 | 1995-09-18 | Crystal Group, Inc. | Paris | ||||
1084 | 1943-01-06 | General Henri Giraud, of the French Armed Forces | 1943-01-06 | FRANCE | 171 | 1943-01-06 | Longin-Spindler, Emanuel Mary Paul | |||||
1210 | 1988-01-11 | Airbus Industrie | 1978-06-27 | FRANCE | 2923 | 1978-06-27 | Busby, Rehm & Leonard, P.C. | Toulouse | ||||
1310 | 1968-01-15 | Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique, a Branch of the Ministry of Education of France | 1964-12-10 | FRANCE | 1829 | 1964-12-10 | Burgess, Dinklage & Sprung | Paris | ||||
1371 | 1990-01-16 | Societe Nationale des Poudres et Explosifs | 1989-07-03 | FRANCE | 2621 | 1975-10-28 | DGA International, Inc. | Paris | ||||
1407 | 2019-01-18 | Droit de Naitre | 2019-12-02 | FRANCE | 6759 | 2019-12-02 | Foundation for a Christian Civilization, Inc. | |||||
1462 | 1985-01-22 | French Government - Ministere de l'Amenagement du Territoire de l'Equipement, du Logement et du Tourisme | 1973-06-12 | FRANCE | 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1463 | 1985-01-22 | Commissariat General au Tourisme (General Commissariat of Tourism) French Ministry of Public Works and Transportation | 1946-07-25 | FRANCE | 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1464 | 1985-01-22 | Secretary of State for Tourisme (French Government) | 1964-12-07 | FRANCE | 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1481 | 2000-01-23 | Credit Lyonnais | 1998-05-07 | FRANCE | 4208 | 1989-01-23 | Shearman & Sterling | 5 rue Gretry 75002 Paris | ||||
1549 | 1943-01-27 | Societe l' Alfa, le Pontet | 1943-01-27 | FRANCE | 176 | 1943-01-27 | Gauthier, Donat A. | Vancluse | ||||
1558 | 1987-01-27 | Roussel UCLAF (Thru Inforfilm International) | 1986-04-16 | FRANCE | 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
1620 | 1952-01-30 | Juan Aja | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | |||||
1621 | 1952-01-30 | Lorenzo Gascon | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | |||||
1625 | 1952-01-30 | Trifon Gomez | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | Paris | ||||
1686 | 1967-01-31 | VINCO | 1966-02-10 | FRANCE | 1682 | 1964-01-20 | George Peabody & Associates, Inc. | |||||
1692 | 1971-01-31 | Air France | 1970-05-18 | FRANCE | 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | Dallas | TX | |||
1711 | 1983-01-31 | Falcon Jet Corporation | 1983-01-10 | FRANCE | 3435 | 1983-01-10 | Davis, Christopher L. | Teterboro | NJ | |||
1721 | 1987-01-31 | Free Trade Defense Association | 1987-02-06 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Cognac | ||||
1745 | 1990-01-31 | Hachette, S.A. | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Paris | ||||
1840 | 2002-01-31 | Nice Convention and Visitors Bureau (through Mondotels, Inc.) | 1998-06-18 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | New York | NY | |||
1895 | 2013-01-31 | Unifrance Film International (formerly: National Center for the Cinema, French Ministry of Culture) | 1972-07-20 | FRANCE | 2358 | 1972-07-20 | French Film Office/Unifrance USA | |||||
2089 | 1945-02-02 | Banque de Paris et des Pays-Bas | 1943-02-02 | FRANCE | 177 | 1943-02-02 | Boyer, Maurice | Paris | ||||
2095 | 1968-02-02 | Aquitaine Oil Corporation | 1966-02-21 | FRANCE | 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | New Orleans | LA | |||
2096 | 1968-02-02 | Conseil National du Patronat Francais | 1952-02-20 | FRANCE | 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | Paris | ||||
2100 | 1968-02-02 | Government of the French Republic | 1948-01-19 | FRANCE | 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | Paris | ||||
2182 | 1977-02-04 | Air France | 1975-08-04 | FRANCE | 2598 | 1975-08-04 | Rogers & Wells | New York | NY | |||
2206 | 1947-02-05 | Government of France | 1946-10-14 | FRANCE | 377 | 1946-10-14 | Pehle, John William | Paris | ||||
2240 | 1988-02-06 | Deambinox, S.A. | 1987-12-11 | FRANCE | 3712 | 1985-08-05 | DLA Piper US LLP | Nantes | ||||
2244 | 1992-02-06 | Thomson-CSF, S.A. (France) | 1990-11-29 | FRANCE | 4447 | 1990-11-29 | Thomson-CSF, Inc. | Paris | ||||
2312 | 1963-02-09 | Basque Government (In Exile) | 1949-08-09 | FRANCE | 586 | 1949-08-09 | Basque Delegation in the U.S.A. | Paris | ||||
2373 | 1965-02-11 | French National Railroads | 1964-05-05 | FRANCE | 1722 | 1964-05-05 | Byrde, Richard & Pound | New York | NY | |||
2374 | 1974-02-11 | French National Railroads | 1971-08-06 | FRANCE | 2273 | 1971-08-06 | Baker & Hartel, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
2408 | 1991-02-12 | Embassy of France | 1989-06-22 | FRANCE | 3427 | 1982-12-10 | Jones Day | Washington | DC | |||
2427 | 1996-02-12 | SEMA | 1995-06-23 | FRANCE | 5028 | 1995-06-23 | McMillan Group, L.L.C. | Montruge | ||||
2439 | 1992-02-13 | Aerospatiale Helicopter Corporation | 1990-03-15 | FRANCE | 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | Grand Prairie | TX | |||
2440 | 1992-02-13 | Dassault Industries, Parent Corporation of Falcon Jet | 1991-06-28 | FRANCE | 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | |||||
2441 | 1992-02-13 | Falcon Jet Corporation, a Subsidiary of Dassault Industries | 1992-03-18 | FRANCE | 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | Paramus | NJ | |||
2444 | 1992-02-13 | Turbomeca Engine Corporation | 1990-03-15 | FRANCE | 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | Grand Prairie | TX | |||
2450 | 1996-02-13 | Rhone-Poulenc, S.A. | 1991-05-01 | FRANCE | 4293 | 1989-09-15 | Baker Botts L.L.P. | Courbevoie | ||||
2467 | 1971-02-14 | French National Railroads | 1964-06-25 | FRANCE | 1597 | 1963-02-12 | Sterling Movies | New York | NY | |||
2474 | 1971-02-14 | R.W. Schofield Associates, Inc. | 1964-06-25 | FRANCE | 1597 | 1963-02-12 | Sterling Movies | New York | NY | |||
2539 | 1966-02-15 | Monsieur le Directeur General du Centre National du Commerce Exterieur | 1965-02-02 | FRANCE | 1849 | 1965-02-02 | Kennedy, King | Paris | ||||
2550 | 1980-02-15 | French Government (Delegation a l Amenagement du Territoire et a l Action Regionale | 1972-08-15 | FRANCE | 2368 | 1972-08-15 | French Industrial Development Agency | Paris | ||||
2590 | 1983-02-16 | Port of Le Havre | 1981-09-23 | FRANCE | 3276 | 1981-09-23 | Sommers/Rosen, Inc. | |||||
2608 | 1996-02-16 | Thomson-CSF, Inc. | 1995-06-08 | FRANCE | 3700 | 1985-07-09 | Gold & Liebengood, Inc. | Alexandria | VA | |||
2614 | 1967-02-17 | Government of France | 1947-02-17 | FRANCE | 439 | 1947-02-17 | Pehle, Riemer, Luxford & Naiden | Paris | ||||
2641 | 1985-02-18 | Creusot-Loire, S.A. | 1981-02-13 | FRANCE | 3200 | 1981-02-18 | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon | Paris | ||||
2642 | 1985-02-18 | USINOR, S.A. | 1982-03-24 | FRANCE | 3200 | 1981-02-18 | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon | |||||
2662 | 1958-02-19 | Regie Nationale des Usines Renault | 1957-08-19 | FRANCE | 1059 | 1957-08-19 | Dye, Joseph W. | |||||
2666 | 1991-02-19 | L'Association Communautaire de l'Estuaire de la Loire/ Atlantic International Zone (ACEL/AIZ) | 1988-04-04 | FRANCE | 4114 | 1988-04-04 | Souham & Associates, Inc. | Cedex | ||||
2690 | 1959-02-21 | Compagnie Universelle du Canal Maritime de Suez (Suez Canal Company) | 1953-08-21 | FRANCE | 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | Paris | ||||
2875 | 1977-02-27 | Mission Interministerielle Pour l'Amenagement du Littoral Touristique de la Cote Aquitaine | 1976-03-25 | FRANCE | 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Paris | ||||
2926 | 1979-02-28 | Societe Nationale de l'Industrie Aerospatiale | 1975-09-18 | FRANCE | 1967 | 1966-03-14 | International Public Relations Company, Ltd. | |||||
2949 | 1988-02-28 | Manurhin, S.A. | 1982-09-28 | FRANCE | 2580 | 1975-02-21 | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge | |||||
2950 | 1989-02-28 | General Biscuit Brands, Inc. | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Elizabeth | NJ | |||
2952 | 1989-02-28 | Havas | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Neuilly Sur Seine | ||||
2954 | 1989-02-28 | Office de Vulgarisation Pharma Ceutique | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Paris | ||||
2956 | 1989-02-28 | Promodes | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Mondeville | ||||
3006 | 1995-02-28 | Thomson-CSF, Inc. | 1989-02-27 | FRANCE | 3700 | 1985-07-09 | Gold & Liebengood, Inc. | Arlington | VA | |||
3030 | 1999-02-28 | GIAT Industries, S.A. | 1993-08-18 | FRANCE | 4864 | 1993-08-18 | FN Manufacturing, Inc. | Versailles | ||||
3204 | 1950-03-01 | French Consulate | 1950-06-05 | FRANCE | 27 | 1942-07-09 | LeRoy & Denslow | Washington | DC | |||
3240 | 1972-03-01 | Union des Producteurs, Cooperatives et Industriels Laitiers | 1967-06-07 | FRANCE | 1178 | 1958-10-09 | Surrey, Karasik, Gould and Efron | |||||
3268 | 1984-03-01 | Reassemblement Pour la Republique | 1983-02-18 | FRANCE | 3447 | 1983-02-18 | Rassemblement Pour la Republique U.S.A., Inc. | |||||
3302 | 1991-03-01 | Syndicat Mixte de Protecion et de Conservation du Littoral du Nord-Ouest de la Bretagne | 1991-03-07 | FRANCE | 3774 | 1986-02-05 | Fleishman-Hillard, Inc. | Ploudalmezeau | ||||
3361 | 2022-03-01 | PSE - Ecole D'Economie de Paris | 2021-08-10 | FRANCE | 6989 | 2021-08-10 | Top of Mind Public Relations | 48 Bd Jourdan | 75014 | PARIS | ||
3386 | 1945-03-03 | La France Libre Publishing Company, Ltd. | 1944-03-03 | FRANCE | 239 | 1944-03-03 | Labarthe, Andre | London, England | ||||
3602 | 1987-03-11 | Soule' | 1986-06-19 | FRANCE | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | |||||
3607 | 1993-03-11 | Air France | 1987-05-26 | FRANCE | 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | NY | ||||
3618 | 1993-03-11 | France-Tourisme | 1989-06-23 | FRANCE | 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
3619 | 1993-03-11 | French Alps Commission | 1991-09-24 | FRANCE | 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
3620 | 1993-03-11 | French Government Tourist Office | 1989-06-23 | FRANCE | 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
3631 | 1993-03-11 | UTA French Airlines | 1989-12-28 | FRANCE | 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | San Francisco | CA | |||
3651 | 1968-03-12 | French Government Tourist Office | 1967-05-04 | FRANCE | 2024 | 1967-05-04 | Savage, John | New York | NY | |||
3667 | 1993-03-12 | Comite Francais des Manifestations Economiques a L'Etranger | 1965-03-12 | FRANCE | 1867 | 1965-03-12 | French Expositions in the U.S., Inc. | |||||
3670 | 1993-03-12 | District of Montpellier | 1987-06-26 | FRANCE | 3590 | 1984-05-31 | J. Woodman Associates, Inc. | |||||
3702 | 1947-03-14 | France-Amerique | 1946-10-02 | FRANCE | 131 | 1942-09-14 | Comite France Amerique | Paris | ||||
3703 | 1947-03-14 | San Francisco Comite France Amerique | 1942-09-14 | FRANCE | 131 | 1942-09-14 | Comite France Amerique | San Francisco | CA | |||
3715 | 1994-03-14 | French Government Tourist Office | 1971-03-25 | FRANCE | 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | NY | ||||
3722 | 1994-03-14 | People Sari | 1991-09-09 | FRANCE | 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | Paris | ||||
3735 | 1943-03-15 | French Ambassador Gaston Henry-Haye | 1943-03-15 | FRANCE | 51 | 1942-07-16 | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine | |||||
3736 | 1943-03-15 | French Embassy | 1942-07-16 | FRANCE | 51 | 1942-07-16 | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine | |||||
3767 | 1985-03-15 | A.D.E.C. | 1984-09-11 | FRANCE | 3611 | 1984-09-11 | Busz-Cabal, Aline I.Z. | Orleans | ||||
3837 | 1981-03-17 | Framatome | 1981-02-18 | FRANCE | 3199 | 1981-02-18 | Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman | Paris | ||||
3838 | 1981-03-17 | Societe Internationale de Technologie | 1981-02-18 | FRANCE | 3199 | 1981-02-18 | Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman | Paris | ||||
3876 | 1993-03-18 | Perrier Group | 1990-12-03 | FRANCE | 2661 | 1976-02-18 | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC | Greenwich | CT | |||
4025 | 1943-03-25 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-12-09 | FRANCE | 162 | 1942-12-09 | Maurois, Andre' | New York | NY | |||
4026 | 1945-03-25 | French Embassy | 1942-08-28 | FRANCE | 109 | 1942-08-28 | De Bisschop, Eric | |||||
4039 | 1977-03-25 | Inter-African Coffee Organization | 1962-08-07 | FRANCE | 1566 | 1962-08-07 | Albert M. Prosterman & Associates, Inc. | Paris |