FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
548 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "GREAT BRITAIN" sorted by Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_2, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Jones Day 46
- Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 12
- Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 12
- Rainbolt II, John Vernon 9
- Larson & Taylor 7
- Lipsen, Whitten & Diamond 7
- Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP 6
- Robison International, Inc. 6
- Baker & Hostetler 5
- Chadbourne & Parke 5
- Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 5
- GCI Group, Inc. 5
- Hyjek & Fix, Inc. 5
- O'Connor & Hannan, L.L.P. 5
- Caples Company 4
- Capone, Ronald A. 4
- Government Research Corporation 4
- Hyman Fine & Associates, Ltd. 4
- Imported Publications, Inc. 4
- Keating Group, Inc. 4
- Miller & Chevalier 4
- Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P. 4
- Ruder Finn, Inc. 4
- Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge 4
- Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering 4
- Birch, Horton, Bittner, Inc. 3
- Hopkins & Sutter 3
- LeBoeuf, Lamb, Greene & MacRae, L.L.P. 3
- Levine & Company 3
- Lipsen & Hamberger 3
- …
Registrant_Date >30 ✖
- 1982-12-10 47
- 1964-06-04 12
- 1981-11-10 12
- 1983-06-24 11
- 1985-03-19 8
- 1965-04-19 7
- 1984-05-10 7
- 1987-03-20 6
- 1978-10-25 5
- 1986-03-18 5
- 1986-07-11 5
- 1990-04-30 5
- 1943-03-03 4
- 1963-04-19 4
- 1973-09-12 4
- 1973-11-23 4
- 1975-02-21 4
- 1978-03-24 4
- 1981-09-02 4
- 1982-03-05 4
- 1982-04-08 4
- 1986-02-28 4
- 1986-03-12 4
- 1988-08-18 4
- 1961-09-27 3
- 1975-12-10 3
- 1978-03-17 3
- 1984-11-15 3
- 1987-04-29 3
- 1987-05-08 3
- …
Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date) >30 ✖
- 1988-02-17 43
- 1965-04-19 7
- 1986-02-28 5
- 1986-03-18 5
- 1988-08-18 4
- 1989-05-31 4
- 1990-06-04 4
- 1978-03-24 3
- 1982-03-18 3
- 1982-04-08 3
- 1984-01-23 3
- 1987-09-25 3
- 1987-12-10 3
- 1988-12-09 3
- 1989-04-19 3
- 1992-12-23 3
- 1993-07-12 3
- 1996-01-19 3
- 1942-07-08 2
- 1942-08-03 2
- 1942-08-07 2
- 1942-10-05 2
- 1943-12-11 2
- 1944-06-12 2
- 1947-07-25 2
- 1950-06-12 2
- 1967-11-01 2
- 1973-09-12 2
- 1975-12-10 2
- 1975-12-24 2
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- British Tourist Authority 7
- Grand Metropolitan, PLC 7
- Underwriters at Lloyd's 7
- British Consulate General 6
- Corporation of Lloyd's 6
- London Chamber of Commerce & Industry 6
- Welsh Development Agency 6
- London Insurance & Reinsurance Market Association 5
- Underwriters at Lloyd's, London 5
- Yorkshire & Humberside Development Association 5
- British Broadcasting Corporation 4
- Metal Market & Exchange Company, Ltd. 4
- Vickers Shipbuilding & Engineering, Ltd. 4
- Association of British Insurers 3
- British Aerospace, Inc. 3
- British Airways 3
- Cable & Wireless, PLC 3
- Colebrand, Ltd. 3
- Confederation of British Industry 3
- Conservatives Abroad 3
- International Group of P&I Clubs 3
- Laker Airways, Ltd. 3
- London Commodity Exchange Company, Ltd. 3
- London International Financial Futures Exchange, Ltd. 3
- Morgan Grenfell & Company, Ltd. 3
- National Wool Textile Export Corporation 3
- AEA Industrial Technology 2
- AEA Technology 2
- Agha Hasan Abedi 2
- Airship Industries, Ltd. 2
- …
City 5
- - 544
- London 1
- Manchester 1
- Washington 1
- West Sussex 1
Country/Location_Represented 1
- GREAT BRITAIN · 548 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date ▼ | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8971 | 8971 | 1943-07-03 | British Empire Films Party, Ltd., England | 1942-07-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Auten, Harold 4 | 1942-07-03 | Auten, Harold | London, England | ||||
9029 | 9029 | 1946-07-06 | Exiled Autonomous Basque Government/Jose' A. de Aguirre | 1942-07-06 | GREAT BRITAIN | De La Sota y Aburto, Manuel 5 | 1942-07-06 | De La Sota y Aburto, Manuel | Londong, England | ||||
9051 | 9051 | 1942-07-07 | Exiled Autonomous Basque Government | 1942-07-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | De La Sota y Macmahon, Ramon 12 | 1942-07-07 | De La Sota y Macmahon, Ramon | London, England | ||||
1151 | 1151 | 1946-01-08 | West Hartlepool Steam Navigation Company | 1942-07-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | Garcia & Diaz 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | London, England | ||||
15010 | 15010 | 1950-12-11 | William P. Harley, Ltd. | 1942-07-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | Gotham Advertising Company 17 | 1942-07-08 | Gotham Advertising Company | Liverpool | ||||
10579 | 10579 | 1972-08-17 | Baltic Union Shipbrokers, Ltd. | 1942-08-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Gdynia American Line, Inc. 81 | 1942-08-03 | Gdynia American Line, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10580 | 10580 | 1972-08-17 | Gdynia America Shipping Lines, Ltd. | 1942-08-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Gdynia American Line, Inc. 81 | 1942-08-03 | Gdynia American Line, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10183 | 10183 | 1946-08-07 | Federation of British Industries | 1942-08-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | British Empire Chamber of Commerce in the U.S.A., Inc. 84 | 1942-08-07 | British Empire Chamber of Commerce in the U.S.A., Inc. | London | ||||
11597 | 11597 | 1945-09-15 | Catalan National Council | 1942-08-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | Catalan National Council (U.S. Delegation) 83 | 1942-08-07 | Catalan National Council (U.S. Delegation) | London, England | ||||
11492 | 11492 | 1942-09-11 | British Security Coordination | 1942-09-11 | GREAT BRITAIN | Braik, Douglas Gordon 121 | 1942-09-11 | Braik, Douglas Gordon | Philadelphia | PA | |||
11766 | 11766 | 1942-09-23 | Alexander Korda Film Productions, Ltd. | 1942-09-23 | GREAT BRITAIN | Pallos, Steven 127 | 1942-09-23 | Pallos, Steven | |||||
13720 | 13720 | 1945-11-05 | Zygmunt Kaczynski | 1942-10-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Polish Catholic Press Agency 135 | 1942-10-05 | Polish Catholic Press Agency | London, England | ||||
15063 | 15063 | 1944-12-13 | Doremus & Company, Ltd. | 1942-10-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Doremus & Company 134 | 1942-10-05 | Doremus & Company | London, England | ||||
13716 | 13716 | 1942-11-05 | British Embassy | 1942-11-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Minor, Gatley & Drury 153 | 1942-11-05 | Minor, Gatley & Drury | Washington | DC | |||
2123 | 2123 | 1961-02-03 | Associated British & Irish Railway | 1943-03-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | London, England | ||||
9030 | 9030 | 1946-07-06 | Basque Delegation in the U.S.A. | 1943-03-10 | GREAT BRITAIN | De La Sota y Aburto, Manuel 5 | 1942-07-06 | De La Sota y Aburto, Manuel | London, England | ||||
10315 | 10315 | 1947-08-13 | Rt. Hon. Lord Phillimore, M.C. Coppid Hall | 1943-03-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | J.M. Dent & Sons (Canada), Ltd. 179 | 1943-02-12 | J.M. Dent & Sons (Canada), Ltd. | |||||
12522 | 12522 | 1943-10-07 | Chief Rabbi's Religious Emergency Council | 1943-05-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | American Chapter of the Religious Emergency Council 111 | 1942-09-01 | American Chapter of the Religious Emergency Council | London, England | ||||
2114 | 2114 | 1944-02-03 | Conseil de Gerance de l'Alliance Francaise | 1943-08-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Barres, Philippe 202 | 1943-08-03 | Barres, Philippe | London | ||||
3201 | 3201 | 1948-03-01 | Gdynia America Shipping Lines, Ltd. | 1943-08-30 | GREAT BRITAIN | Kutylowski, Roman Marius 206 | 1943-08-30 | Kutylowski, Roman Marius | London, England | ||||
10314 | 10314 | 1947-08-13 | Mr. de Courcy | 1943-09-20 | GREAT BRITAIN | J.M. Dent & Sons (Canada), Ltd. 179 | 1943-02-12 | J.M. Dent & Sons (Canada), Ltd. | London, England | ||||
12291 | 12291 | 1945-10-01 | International Mercantile Marine Officers' Association | 1943-12-11 | GREAT BRITAIN | Baker, Harold G. 224 | 1943-12-11 | Baker, Harold G. | London, England | ||||
12292 | 12292 | 1945-10-01 | Officers' Federation of Great Britain | 1943-12-11 | GREAT BRITAIN | Baker, Harold G. 224 | 1943-12-11 | Baker, Harold G. | London, Englas | ||||
2676 | 2676 | 1950-02-20 | Empire Parliamentary Association | 1944-02-29 | GREAT BRITAIN | Ryan, Edwin 237 | 1944-02-29 | Ryan, Edwin | London | ||||
7752 | 7752 | 1944-06-12 | Royal Anthropological Institute | 1944-06-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Lindgren, Ethel John 262 | 1944-06-12 | Lindgren, Ethel John | London, England | ||||
7753 | 7753 | 1944-06-12 | Royal Institute of International Affairs | 1944-06-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Lindgren, Ethel John 262 | 1944-06-12 | Lindgren, Ethel John | London, England | ||||
2273 | 2273 | 1946-02-08 | London Bureau of the Austrian Socialists | 1944-12-18 | GREAT BRITAIN | Austrian Labor Committee 129 | 1942-09-29 | Austrian Labor Committee | London, England | ||||
11198 | 11198 | 1948-09-01 | British Information Services | 1944-12-21 | GREAT BRITAIN | Rogers, Budd 426 | 1944-12-21 | Rogers, Budd | New York | NY | |||
9459 | 9459 | 1945-07-25 | World Youth Council | 1945-07-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | Beyer-Pedersen, Svend-Aage 311 | 1945-07-25 | Beyer-Pedersen, Svend-Aage | London, England | ||||
5395 | 5395 | 1946-04-19 | Charles Jarman | 1945-10-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Scott, James 328 | 1945-10-19 | Scott, James | London | ||||
6502 | 6502 | 1946-05-13 | British Council | 1946-05-13 | GREAT BRITAIN | Franklin Spier, Inc. 358 | 1946-05-13 | Franklin Spier, Inc. | London, England | ||||
925 | 925 | 1990-01-01 | Foreign & Commonwealth Office | 1947-07-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | British Information Services 481 | 1947-07-25 | British Information Services | London | ||||
9960 | 9960 | 1973-08-01 | His Majesty's Stationery Office | 1947-07-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | British Information Services 481 | 1947-07-25 | British Information Services | London | ||||
15486 | 15486 | 1988-12-30 | British Broadcasting Corporation | 1947-12-01 | GREAT BRITAIN | U.S. Office of the British Broadcasting Corporation 505 | 1947-12-01 | U.S. Office of the British Broadcasting Corporation | |||||
1971 | 1971 | 1967-02-01 | Broadcasting House | 1948-02-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | British Broadcasting Corporation 514 | 1948-02-25 | British Broadcasting Corporation | London, England | ||||
5035 | 5035 | 1991-04-05 | Laszlo Bekeffi | 1948-10-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Goerl, Albert 541 | 1948-10-05 | Goerl, Albert | London, England | ||||
2131 | 2131 | 1961-02-03 | Punch | 1949-06-27 | GREAT BRITAIN | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | London, England | ||||
82 | 82 | British Tourist Authority | 1949-07-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | VisitBritain 579 | 1949-07-07 | VisitBritain | London | |||||
9230 | 9230 | 1950-07-14 | Francis Williams, British Delegate to the Commission on Human Rights of the United Nations | 1949-08-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | National Lecture Management 463 | 1947-05-26 | National Lecture Management | Washington | DC | |||
9172 | 9172 | 1951-07-11 | Till Company - Continental, Ltd. | 1950-01-11 | GREAT BRITAIN | Family Export & Shipping Company, Inc. 605 | 1950-01-11 | Family Export & Shipping Company, Inc. | London, England | ||||
3491 | 3491 | 1950-03-07 | Council for the Protection of Foreign Claims | 1950-03-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | Gantt, Paul H. 617 | 1950-03-07 | Gantt, Paul H. | London, England | ||||
2124 | 2124 | 1961-02-03 | British Railways | 1950-06-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | London | ||||
3205 | 3205 | 1953-03-01 | Hotels Executive (British Transport) | 1950-06-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | Londgon | ||||
12575 | 12575 | 1953-10-10 | Slovak National Council Abroad | 1951-04-10 | GREAT BRITAIN | Slovak National Council Abroad, U.S. Branch 667 | 1951-04-10 | Slovak National Council Abroad, U.S. Branch | London, England | ||||
8243 | 8243 | 1962-06-30 | W.F.T.U. Publications, Ltd. | 1952-05-09 | GREAT BRITAIN | Four Continent Book Corporation 94 | 1942-08-12 | Four Continent Book Corporation | London | ||||
13693 | 13693 | 1952-11-04 | Josef Josten (Geraldine Kracik)? | 1952-11-04 | GREAT BRITAIN | Kulka, Ervin 745 | 1952-11-04 | Kulka, Ervin | London, England | ||||
9511 | 9511 | 1959-07-27 | Charles H. Campbell | 1954-07-27 | GREAT BRITAIN | John C. Metcalfe & Associates, Inc. 838 | 1954-07-27 | John C. Metcalfe & Associates, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
10789 | 10789 | 1964-08-28 | British Industries Fair, Ltd. | 1955-01-31 | GREAT BRITAIN | Charles W. Hoyt Company, Inc. 361 | 1946-06-10 | Charles W. Hoyt Company, Inc. | London, England | ||||
4135 | 4135 | 1960-03-29 | W. Green Pharmacy | 1958-04-28 | GREAT BRITAIN | Polonia International, Inc. 1054 | 1957-07-30 | Polonia International, Inc. | London, England | ||||
8252 | 8252 | 1966-06-30 | National Wool Textile Export Corporation | 1958-05-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | Bennett Associates, Inc. 1140 | 1958-05-08 | Bennett Associates, Inc. | Bradford, England | ||||
10639 | 10639 | 1972-08-21 | Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain & Northern Ireland | 1959-10-23 | GREAT BRITAIN | Davis, Polk & Wardell 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | London, England | ||||
2210 | 2210 | 1969-02-05 | Union-Castle Steamship Line of London, England | 1959-11-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | Bennett Associates, Inc. 1140 | 1958-05-08 | Bennett Associates, Inc. | London, England | ||||
5570 | 5570 | 1960-04-25 | Travel Associaiton (Tourist Division of the British Tourist & Holidays Board) | 1960-04-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | Cecil & Presbrey, Inc. 622 | 1950-04-25 | Cecil & Presbrey, Inc. | London, England | ||||
8978 | 8978 | 1968-07-03 | British Cycle & Motor Industries Association, Ltd. | 1961-06-13 | GREAT BRITAIN | Covington & Burling 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Coventry, England | ||||
10160 | 10160 | 1963-08-06 | H.D. Davies & Company, Ltd. | 1963-02-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | Charles von Loewenfeldt, Inc. 810 | 1954-01-05 | Charles von Loewenfeldt, Inc. | London | ||||
6135 | 6135 | 1963-05-01 | General Council of British Shipping | 1963-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Capone, Ronald A. 1620 | 1963-04-19 | Capone, Ronald A. | London | ||||
8831 | 8831 | 1967-07-01 | Western Hemisphere Exports Council | 1963-05-14 | GREAT BRITAIN | Arent, Fox, Kintner, Plotkin & Kahn 1628 | 1963-05-14 | Arent, Fox, Kintner, Plotkin & Kahn | London England | ||||
1315 | 1315 | 1971-01-15 | Voice & Vision, Ltd. | 1963-05-28 | GREAT BRITAIN | EG&A International, Inc. 1584 | 1962-11-28 | EG&A International, Inc. | London, England | ||||
15698 | 15698 | 1973-12-31 | Committee of European Shipowners | 1963-07-02 | GREAT BRITAIN | Capone, Ronald A. 1620 | 1963-04-19 | Capone, Ronald A. | London | ||||
12947 | 12947 | 1963-10-23 | Alfred Pemberton, Ltd. | 1963-10-23 | GREAT BRITAIN | John Moynahan & Associates 1033 | 1957-06-06 | John Moynahan & Associates | London, England | ||||
10883 | 10883 | 1971-08-31 | British Travel Association | 1964-12-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Ogilvy & Mather, Inc. 1826 | 1964-12-03 | Ogilvy & Mather, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10640 | 10640 | 1972-08-21 | Imperial Chemical Industries, Ltd. | 1965-03-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Davis, Polk & Wardell 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | London, England | ||||
14150 | 14150 | 1967-11-22 | C.E. Bell, Esquire (Ministry of Technology) | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14152 | 14152 | 1967-11-22 | Director Research & Development, Ministry of Defense | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14154 | 14154 | 1967-11-22 | Ministry of Aviation | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14155 | 14155 | 1967-11-22 | National Coal Board | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14156 | 14156 | 1967-11-22 | National Research Development Corporation | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14158 | 14158 | 1967-11-22 | Power Jets (Ministry of Technology) | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14160 | 14160 | 1967-11-22 | United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
3537 | 3537 | 1966-03-09 | British Aircraft Corporation (Operating), Ltd. | 1966-02-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | Prather, Seeger, Doolittle & Farmer 1815 | 1964-11-13 | Prather, Seeger, Doolittle & Farmer | London | ||||
1168 | 1168 | 1974-01-09 | Committee of European Shipowners | 1966-11-23 | GREAT BRITAIN | Barnett, Vincent Gerrard 1992 | 1966-10-31 | Barnett, Vincent Gerrard | London | ||||
12314 | 12314 | 1972-10-01 | Central Office of Information | 1967-10-16 | GREAT BRITAIN | Schoenfeld Film Distribution Corporation 2056 | 1967-10-16 | Schoenfeld Film Distribution Corporation | |||||
6153 | 6153 | 1972-05-01 | British National Export Council | 1967-11-01 | GREAT BRITAIN | British-American Chamber of Commerce 2062 | 1967-11-01 | British-American Chamber of Commerce | London | ||||
14768 | 14768 | 1984-12-03 | Confederation of British Industry | 1967-11-01 | GREAT BRITAIN | British-American Chamber of Commerce 2062 | 1967-11-01 | British-American Chamber of Commerce | London | ||||
3991 | 3991 | 1968-03-23 | National Wool Textile Export Corporation | 1968-03-22 | GREAT BRITAIN | Bennett, Newbery & Cowan 2017 | 1967-03-22 | Bennett, Newbery & Cowan | England | ||||
4343 | 4343 | 1971-03-31 | United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority | 1968-08-06 | GREAT BRITAIN | Edlow International Company 1683 | 1964-01-20 | Edlow International Company | Lancs | ||||
4338 | 4338 | 1971-03-31 | CENSA/CES Joint Container Committee (Committee of European Nat'l. Shipowner Associations/Comm. of European Shipowners) | 1968-11-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Capone, Ronald A. 1620 | 1963-04-19 | Capone, Ronald A. | London | ||||
5802 | 5802 | 1974-04-30 | National Wool Textile Export Corporation | 1968-12-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Courtney & McCamant 2116 | 1968-12-03 | Courtney & McCamant | Bradford | ||||
2938 | 2938 | 1983-02-28 | Tate & Lyle, Ltd. | 1969-05-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders 1425 | 1961-02-07 | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders | |||||
6603 | 6603 | 1973-05-16 | Central Office of Information | 1969-10-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | McGraw-Hill Book Company 2164 | 1969-10-08 | McGraw-Hill Book Company | London, England | ||||
1186 | 1186 | 1974-01-10 | Federation of British Carpet Manufacturers | 1970-04-02 | GREAT BRITAIN | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 1750 | 1964-06-04 | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP | London | ||||
15675 | 15675 | 1970-12-31 | British Travel Association | 1970-05-18 | GREAT BRITAIN | Association Films, Inc. 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
9182 | 9182 | 1985-07-11 | British Petroleum Company, Ltd. | 1971-08-13 | GREAT BRITAIN | Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy 1839 | 1965-01-11 | Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy | London | ||||
8286 | 8286 | 1972-06-30 | British Tourist Authority | 1971-10-01 | GREAT BRITAIN | DDB Worldwide Communications Group, Inc. 1066 | 1957-09-16 | DDB Worldwide Communications Group, Inc. | London | ||||
837 | 837 | 1981-01-01 | British Nuclear Fuels, Ltd. | 1971-10-21 | GREAT BRITAIN | Edlow International Company 1683 | 1964-01-20 | Edlow International Company | Lancs | ||||
9612 | 9612 | 1976-07-30 | Laurence French Publications, Ltd. | 1972-09-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Probe International, Inc. 2379 | 1972-09-19 | Probe International, Inc. | London, England | ||||
9341 | 9341 | 1973-07-18 | Tricorp | 1973-01-02 | GREAT BRITAIN | Moss International 2401 | 1973-01-02 | Moss International | London, England | ||||
2255 | 2255 | 1973-02-07 | Pressure for Economic & Social Toryism | 1973-01-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Rogers, Cowan & Brenner, Inc. 2402 | 1973-01-05 | Rogers, Cowan & Brenner, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10678 | 10678 | 1992-08-23 | British Tourist Authority | 1973-08-23 | GREAT BRITAIN | Public Service Audience Planners 2452 | 1979-08-23 | Public Service Audience Planners | New York | NY | |||
11526 | 11526 | 1986-09-12 | Inkululeko Publications | 1973-09-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Imported Publications, Inc. 2459 | 1973-09-12 | Imported Publications, Inc. | London | ||||
11532 | 11532 | 1986-09-12 | Politkino | 1973-09-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Imported Publications, Inc. 2459 | 1973-09-12 | Imported Publications, Inc. | London | ||||
14289 | 14289 | 1976-11-28 | Royal Mint of Great Britain | 1973-12-28 | GREAT BRITAIN | Mailing List Systems, Ltd. 2484 | 1973-12-28 | Mailing List Systems, Ltd. | London, England | ||||
10919 | 10919 | 1981-08-31 | Gazelle Film Productions, Limited | 1974-03-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | Association Films, Inc. 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | Bristol | ||||
5092 | 5092 | 1982-04-08 | Committee of European & Japanese National Shipowners' Associations | 1974-05-22 | GREAT BRITAIN | Capone, Ronald A. 1620 | 1963-04-19 | Capone, Ronald A. | London | ||||
964 | 964 | 1996-01-01 | British Tourist Authority | 1974-08-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Ogilvy & Mather U.S., a Division of The Ogilvy Group, Inc. 2530 | 1974-08-12 | Ogilvy & Mather U.S., a Division of The Ogilvy Group, Inc. | |||||
6529 | 6529 | 1987-05-14 | British Post Office | 1974-10-30 | GREAT BRITAIN | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
13218 | 13218 | 1978-10-31 | Britrail Travel International, Inc. | 1974-12-16 | GREAT BRITAIN | Public Service Audience Planners 2452 | 1979-08-23 | Public Service Audience Planners | New York | NY | |||
842 | 842 | 1982-01-01 | British-American Chamber of Commerce | 1974-12-31 | GREAT BRITAIN | Keating Group, Inc. 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
5575 | 5575 | 1977-04-25 | Wasey Campbell-Ewald, Ltd. | 1975-05-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Campbell-Ewald Company 2583 | 1975-05-12 | Campbell-Ewald Company | London, England | ||||
11536 | 11536 | 1986-09-12 | Unity Publications (Finchley), Ltd. | 1975-05-14 | GREAT BRITAIN | Imported Publications, Inc. 2459 | 1973-09-12 | Imported Publications, Inc. | Londgon |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );