FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
51 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "NEW ZEALAND" sorted by Registrant_Date
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_1, Address_2, Zip, Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Blank Rome, LLP 3
- Bronz & Farrell 3
- New Zealand Milk Products, Inc. 3
- Association Films, Inc. 2
- Auten, Harold 2
- Dailey & Associates 2
- Ruder Finn, Inc. 2
- Witeck-Combs Communications 2
- Basham, M.R. 1
- Beef + Lamb New Zealand, Ltd. 1
- Bogle & Gates 1
- Covington & Burling, LLP 1
- Creative Food Service, Inc. 1
- Crowell & Moring International, LLC 1
- Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 1
- Davis, Polk & Wardell 1
- Douglas, Harry Charles McPherson 1
- Fratelli Group 1
- Grebey III, Clarence R. 1
- Hannegan Landau Poersch & Rosenbaum Advocacy 1
- Hillenby, LLC 1
- Karen Weiner Escalera Associates, Inc. 1
- Keating Group, Inc. 1
- Leffingwell Associates, Inc. 1
- Levine & Company 1
- Lowe Marschalk, Inc. 1
- Lynn, Robert P. 1
- Modern Education Services, Inc. 1
- New Zealand Central Reservations Office 1
- New Zealand Government Tourist Office 1
- …
Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date) >30 ✖
- 1989-01-26 3
- 2009-04-06 3
- 1943-07-03 2
- 1981-08-31 2
- 1994-07-22 2
- 1944-06-26 1
- 1966-01-01 1
- 1967-07-10 1
- 1972-06-27 1
- 1974-04-26 1
- 1975-06-30 1
- 1977-04-01 1
- 1977-06-14 1
- 1978-07-25 1
- 1979-01-30 1
- 1979-09-27 1
- 1980-06-22 1
- 1984-12-31 1
- 1987-03-20 1
- 1987-12-31 1
- 1989-06-30 1
- 1989-08-11 1
- 1989-09-26 1
- 1990-05-01 1
- 1990-10-29 1
- 1991-01-06 1
- 1991-10-31 1
- 1991-12-31 1
- 1992-06-30 1
- 1993-04-05 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Embassy of New Zealand 5
- New Zealand Embassy 4
- New Zealand Meat Producers' Board 4
- Air New Zealand, Ltd. 3
- New Zealand Dairy Board 3
- New Zealand Government Tourist Office 3
- New Zealand Government Tourist & Publicity Department 2
- New Zealand Tourism Board 2
- New Zealand Wool Board 2
- British Empire Films (N.Z.), Ltd. 1
- Fonterra Co-operative Group Limited 1
- Government of New Zealand 1
- Government of New Zealand, Embassy 1
- Helicopter Line, Tourist & Publicity Department Formerly The New Zealand Govt. - Tourist & Publicity Dept. 1
- Industrial Equity (Pacific), Ltd. (IEP) 1
- Meat & Wool New Zealand, Ltd. 1
- Meat Industry Association of New Zealand 1
- New Zealand Co-operative Rennet Company, Ltd. 1
- New Zealand Dairy Production & Marketing Board 1
- New Zealand Fishing Industry Board/ Fishing Industry Inspection & Certification Council 1
- New Zealand Fruit Marketing, Inc. 1
- New Zealand Government Tourist Board 1
- New Zealand Government Travel Commissioner 1
- New Zealand Meat Board, Washington Office 1
- New Zealand Meat Producers Board 1
- New Zealand Processed Meats 1
- New Zealand Steel, Ltd. 1
- New Zealand Tourist Office 1
- Radio Features, Ltd. 1
- Theatre Management, Ltd. 1
- …
City 5
- - 42
- Washington 6
- Santa Monica 1
- Wellington 1
- Wellington 6140 1
Country/Location_Represented 1
- NEW ZEALAND · 51 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date ▼ | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8969 | 8969 | 1943-07-03 | British Empire Films (N.Z.), Ltd. | 1942-07-03 | NEW ZEALAND | Auten, Harold 4 | 1942-07-03 | Auten, Harold | Wellington | ||||
8974 | 8974 | 1943-07-03 | Theatre Management, Ltd. | 1942-07-03 | NEW ZEALAND | Auten, Harold 4 | 1942-07-03 | Auten, Harold | Wellington | ||||
8101 | 8101 | 1944-06-26 | Radio Features, Ltd. | 1944-06-26 | NEW ZEALAND | Basham, M.R. 269 | 1944-06-26 | Basham, M.R. | Wellington | ||||
8502 | 8502 | 1992-06-30 | Helicopter Line, Tourist & Publicity Department Formerly The New Zealand Govt. - Tourist & Publicity Dept. | 1951-04-23 | NEW ZEALAND | New Zealand Central Reservations Office 672 | 1951-04-23 | New Zealand Central Reservations Office | Dunedin | ||||
799 | 799 | 1966-01-01 | Government of New Zealand | 1966-03-25 | NEW ZEALAND | Davis, Polk & Wardell 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | Wellington | ||||
8296 | 8296 | 1975-06-30 | New Zealand Meat Producers' Board | 1968-10-31 | NEW ZEALAND | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | |||||
11852 | 11852 | 1979-09-27 | Embassy of New Zealand | 1979-09-05 | NEW ZEALAND | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | |||||
9152 | 9152 | 1967-07-10 | New Zealand Dairy Production & Marketing Board | 1966-04-28 | NEW ZEALAND | Bronz & Farrell 1740 | 1964-05-22 | Bronz & Farrell | Wellington | ||||
9430 | 9430 | 1994-07-22 | New Zealand Meat Producers' Board | 1964-05-22 | NEW ZEALAND | Bronz & Farrell 1740 | 1964-05-22 | Bronz & Farrell | Wellington | ||||
9431 | 9431 | 1994-07-22 | New Zealand Dairy Board | 1968-07-03 | NEW ZEALAND | Bronz & Farrell 1740 | 1964-05-22 | Bronz & Farrell | |||||
10273 | 10273 | 1989-08-11 | New Zealand Embassy | 1981-07-30 | NEW ZEALAND | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
10944 | 10944 | 1981-08-31 | New Zealand Embassy | 1970-04-23 | NEW ZEALAND | Association Films, Inc. 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | 19 Observatory Circle, N.W. | DC | |||
10945 | 10945 | 1981-08-31 | New Zealand Government Travel Commissioner | 1964-11-06 | NEW ZEALAND | Association Films, Inc. 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | Wellington | ||||
7796 | 7796 | 1977-06-14 | New Zealand Government Tourist Office | 1973-01-09 | NEW ZEALAND | Policano/Rothholz, Inc. 2255 | 1971-05-06 | Policano/Rothholz, Inc. | Wellington | ||||
8124 | 8124 | 1972-06-27 | Air New Zealand, Ltd. | 1972-01-17 | NEW ZEALAND | Dailey & Associates 2299 | 1971-12-27 | Dailey & Associates | Aukland | ||||
15919 | 15919 | 1984-12-31 | New Zealand Government Tourist & Publicity Department | 1972-01-17 | NEW ZEALAND | Dailey & Associates 2299 | 1971-12-27 | Dailey & Associates | Wellington | ||||
13310 | 13310 | 1991-10-31 | New Zealand Government Tourist & Publicity Department | 1972-01-17 | NEW ZEALAND | New Zealand Government Tourist Office 2307 | 1972-01-17 | New Zealand Government Tourist Office | Wellington | ||||
16212 | 16212 | 1991-12-31 | New Zealand Government Tourist Office | 1972-03-27 | NEW ZEALAND | New Zealand Tourist & Publicity Office 2328 | 1972-03-27 | New Zealand Tourist & Publicity Office | Wellington | ||||
5597 | 5597 | 1974-04-26 | New Zealand Meat Producers' Board | 1972-12-27 | NEW ZEALAND | Douglas, Harry Charles McPherson 2399 | 1972-12-27 | Douglas, Harry Charles McPherson | |||||
1634 | 1634 | 1979-01-30 | New Zealand Meat Producers' Board | 1973-06-12 | NEW ZEALAND | Creative Food Service, Inc. 2432 | 1973-06-12 | Creative Food Service, Inc. | |||||
1536 | 1536 | 1989-01-26 | New Zealand Co-operative Rennet Company, Ltd. | 1985-08-26 | NEW ZEALAND | New Zealand Milk Products, Inc. 2463 | 1973-10-01 | New Zealand Milk Products, Inc. | Eltham | ||||
1537 | 1537 | 1989-01-26 | New Zealand Dairy Board | 1973-10-01 | NEW ZEALAND | New Zealand Milk Products, Inc. 2463 | 1973-10-01 | New Zealand Milk Products, Inc. | Wellington | ||||
1538 | 1538 | 1989-01-26 | New Zealand Processed Meats | 1985-12-04 | NEW ZEALAND | New Zealand Milk Products, Inc. 2463 | 1973-10-01 | New Zealand Milk Products, Inc. | Auckland | ||||
6205 | 6205 | 1990-05-01 | New Zealand Tourist Office | 1982-11-15 | NEW ZEALAND | Keating Group, Inc. 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
528 | 528 | New Zealand Meat Producers Board | 1974-07-08 | NEW ZEALAND | Beef + Lamb New Zealand, Ltd. 2526 | 1974-07-08 | Beef + Lamb New Zealand, Ltd. | PO Box 121 | Wellington 6140 | ||||
9461 | 9461 | 1978-07-25 | New Zealand Wool Board | 1976-01-08 | NEW ZEALAND | Lynn, Robert P. 2650 | 1976-01-08 | Lynn, Robert P. | Wellington | ||||
4861 | 4861 | 1977-04-01 | Air New Zealand, Ltd. | 1976-03-23 | NEW ZEALAND | Leffingwell Associates, Inc. 2671 | 1976-03-23 | Leffingwell Associates, Inc. | Auckland | ||||
16017 | 16017 | 1987-12-31 | New Zealand Government Tourist Office | 1977-09-16 | NEW ZEALAND | Peter Rothholz Associates, Inc. 2830 | 1977-09-16 | Peter Rothholz Associates, Inc. | Wellington | ||||
8003 | 8003 | 1980-06-22 | New Zealand Wool Board | 1978-12-22 | NEW ZEALAND | Shea & Gould 2986 | 1978-12-22 | Shea & Gould | Wellington | ||||
11838 | 11838 | 1989-09-26 | Air New Zealand, Ltd. | 1988-05-25 | NEW ZEALAND | Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering 3355 | 1982-04-08 | Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering | Auckland | ||||
7612 | 7612 | 1995-06-05 | New Zealand Tourism Board | 1993-05-25 | NEW ZEALAND | Karen Weiner Escalera Associates, Inc. 3405 | 1982-08-27 | Karen Weiner Escalera Associates, Inc. | Santa Monica | CA | |||
5037 | 5037 | 1993-04-05 | Wright Schuchart, Inc. | 1989-06-26 | NEW ZEALAND | Bogle & Gates 3474 | 1983-05-24 | Bogle & Gates | Seattle | WA | |||
3912 | 3912 | 1987-03-20 | New Zealand Steel, Ltd. | 1987-03-20 | NEW ZEALAND | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | Auckland | ||||
8445 | 8445 | 1989-06-30 | New Zealand Government Tourist Board | 1985-03-29 | NEW ZEALAND | Lowe Marschalk, Inc. 3670 | 1985-03-29 | Lowe Marschalk, Inc. | CA | ||||
13123 | 13123 | 1990-10-29 | Industrial Equity (Pacific), Ltd. (IEP) | 1990-02-06 | NEW ZEALAND | Levine & Company 3971 | 1987-04-29 | Levine & Company | La Jolla | CA | |||
5979 | 5979 | 1999-04-30 | New Zealand Fishing Industry Board/ Fishing Industry Inspection & Certification Council | 1993-04-08 | NEW ZEALAND | Crowell & Moring International, LLC 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | Wellington | ||||
3026 | 3026 | 1998-02-28 | New Zealand Tourism Board | 1998-07-13 | NEW ZEALAND | West Glen Communications 4191 | 1988-11-23 | West Glen Communications | Santa Monica | CA | |||
1095 | 1095 | 1991-01-06 | Embassy of New Zealand | 1989-01-09 | NEW ZEALAND | Van Dyk Associates, Inc. 4201 | 1989-01-09 | Van Dyk Associates, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
11567 | 11567 | 1993-09-13 | New Zealand Fruit Marketing, Inc. | 1992-06-01 | NEW ZEALAND | Grebey III, Clarence R. 4677 | 1992-06-01 | Grebey III, Clarence R. | British Columbia | ||||
5066 | 5066 | 2009-04-06 | Fonterra Co-operative Group Limited | 1994-07-22 | NEW ZEALAND | Blank Rome, LLP 4929 | 1994-07-22 | Blank Rome, LLP | Wellington | ||||
5067 | 5067 | 2009-04-06 | Meat & Wool New Zealand, Ltd. | 1994-07-22 | NEW ZEALAND | Blank Rome, LLP 4929 | 1994-07-22 | Blank Rome, LLP | Wellington | ||||
5068 | 5068 | 2009-04-06 | Meat Industry Association of New Zealand | 2007-11-16 | NEW ZEALAND | Blank Rome, LLP 4929 | 1994-07-22 | Blank Rome, LLP | Level 13, Pricewaterhouse Coopers Building | 113-119 The Terrace, P.O. Box 345 | Wellington | ||
12087 | 12087 | 1997-09-30 | New Zealand Dairy Board | 1995-10-12 | NEW ZEALAND | Witeck-Combs Communications 5058 | 1995-10-12 | Witeck-Combs Communications | Wellington | ||||
3034 | 3034 | 1999-02-28 | New Zealand Meat Board, Washington Office | 1998-11-18 | NEW ZEALAND | Witeck-Combs Communications 5289 | 1998-11-18 | Witeck-Combs Communications | 8000 Towers Crescent Drive, Suite 240, Vienna | VA | |||
3112 | 3112 | 2015-02-28 | Embassy of New Zealand | 2013-06-10 | NEW ZEALAND | Covington & Burling, LLP 5852 | 2008-02-05 | Covington & Burling, LLP | 37 Observatory Circle, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 | |
9110 | 9110 | 2016-07-08 | New Zealand Embassy | 2015-03-27 | NEW ZEALAND | Fratelli Group 5867 | 2008-06-03 | Fratelli Group | 37 Observatory Circle, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 | |
8688 | 8688 | 2009-06-30 | Tourism New Zealand | 2008-06-30 | NEW ZEALAND | Spring O'Brien & Company, Inc. 5872 | 2008-06-30 | Spring O'Brien & Company, Inc. | 501 Santa Monica Blvd. | Santa Monica | CA | 90401 | |
10048 | 10048 | 2013-08-01 | Government of New Zealand, Embassy | 2012-12-20 | NEW ZEALAND | Hillenby, LLC 6146 | 2012-12-20 | Hillenby, LLC | 37 Observatory Circle, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 | |
3119 | 3119 | 2017-02-28 | Embassy of New Zealand | 2013-06-10 | NEW ZEALAND | Peck, Madigan, Jones & Stewart, Inc. 6172 | 2013-06-10 | Peck, Madigan, Jones & Stewart, Inc. | 37 Observatory Circle, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 | |
12236 | 12236 | 2016-09-30 | Embassy of New Zealand | 2016-06-08 | NEW ZEALAND | Hannegan Landau Poersch & Rosenbaum Advocacy 6357 | 2016-06-08 | Hannegan Landau Poersch & Rosenbaum Advocacy | 37 Conservatory Circle, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 | |
9164 | 9164 | 2017-07-10 | New Zealand Embassy | 2016-12-11 | NEW ZEALAND | Sonoran Policy Group, LLC D/B/A Stryk Global Diplomacy 6399 | 2016-12-11 | Sonoran Policy Group, LLC D/B/A Stryk Global Diplomacy | 37 Observatory Circle, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );