FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
251 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "TAIWAN" sorted by Registrant_Date
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_2, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Solter, Myron W. 13
- United Friends, Inc. 9
- Hannaford Company, Inc. 7
- Commerce International China, Inc. 6
- Gowran International, Ltd. 4
- Hugh C. Newton & Associates 4
- Kearns International 4
- Cassidy & Associates, Inc. 3
- GCI Group, Inc. 3
- Garrett & Company 3
- IPG DXTRA, Inc 3
- Modern Education Services, Inc. 3
- North American Precis Syndicate 3
- Richard V. Allen Company 3
- Severance International, Inc. 3
- Willkie, Farr & Gallagher 3
- Ablondi, Foster, Sobin & Davidow, P.C. 2
- Alcalde & Fay 2
- Anderson & Pendleton, C.A. 2
- Brock Group 2
- Burson-Marsteller 2
- C&M Capitolink, LLC 2
- Central News Agency of China, San Francisco Bureau 2
- Crowell & Moring International, LLC 2
- Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 2
- Downen, Robert L. 2
- Fonte, Michael Joseph 2
- Halpern Associates 2
- Hogan Lovells US LLP 2
- Hu, Tsu-Wang 2
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- China External Trade Development Council 8
- Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office 7
- Taiwan Power Company 7
- Republic of China 6
- Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office (TECRO) 6
- Board of Foreign Trade, Ministry of Economic Affairs 5
- Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office in the United States 5
- Taiwan Textile Federation 5
- Coordination Council for North American Affairs 4
- Taiwan Research Institute 4
- Jovian Publishing Group 3
- Taipei Economic & Cultural Representative Office (TECRO) 3
- Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office in the U.S. 3
- Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office in the United States (TECRO) 3
- Taiwan Mushroom Packers' United Export Corporation 3
- Taiwan Studies Institute 3
- Board of Foreign Trade (BOFT) 2
- Central News Agency of China 2
- China Airlines 2
- China External Trade Development Council (CETRA) 2
- China Steel Corporation 2
- Coordination Council for North American Activities 2
- Democratic Progressive Party 2
- Directorate General of Telecommunications 2
- Government Information Office 2
- Government of Taiwan 2
- Government of the Republic of China 2
- Institute of International Relations 2
- Republic of China (Taiwan) 2
- Taipei Economic & Cultural Representative Office 2
- …
City 9
- - 224
- Washington 19
- Taipai 2
- Boston 1
- Denver 1
- Taipei 1
- Taipei City 1
- Taipei City 10694 1
- Taoyuan City 1
Country/Location_Represented 1
- TAIWAN · 251 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date ▼ | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
909 | 909 | 1988-01-01 | Kuomintang of China | 1967-01-01 | TAIWAN | Kuomintang of China 282 | 1945-01-01 | Kuomintang of China | |||||
6316 | 6316 | 1973-05-04 | Central News Agency of China | 1950-03-21 | TAIWAN | Central News Agency of China, Washington Bureau 621 | 1950-03-29 | Central News Agency of China, Washington Bureau | Taipei | ||||
4147 | 4147 | 1952-03-30 | Chinese Air Force | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | Commerce International China, Inc. 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
4148 | 4148 | 1952-03-30 | Chinese Navy | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | Commerce International China, Inc. 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
8102 | 8102 | 1954-06-26 | Board of Supplies, Executive Yuan | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | Commerce International China, Inc. 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
8103 | 8103 | 1954-06-26 | Republic of China (The following agencies are listed under this foreign principal.) | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | Commerce International China, Inc. 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
8215 | 8215 | 1952-06-30 | Chinese Armored Force Command | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | Commerce International China, Inc. 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
11907 | 11907 | 1951-09-30 | Central Trust of China | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | Commerce International China, Inc. 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
14235 | 14235 | 1961-11-25 | Board of Trustees for Rehabilitation Affairs | 1951-11-20 | TAIWAN | Lamberton, Harry C. 696 | 1951-11-20 | Lamberton, Harry C. | |||||
4153 | 4153 | 1962-03-30 | Central Trust of China (U.S. Representative Dr. W.S. Kung) | 1956-03-30 | TAIWAN | Luboshez, S.N. Ferris 937 | 1956-03-30 | Luboshez, S.N. Ferris | Taipeh | ||||
6708 | 6708 | 1973-05-22 | Central News Agency of China | 1971-03-19 | TAIWAN | Central News Agency of China, San Francisco Bureau 1025 | 1957-05-13 | Central News Agency of China, San Francisco Bureau | Taipei | ||||
6709 | 6709 | 1973-05-22 | Hsu-pai Tseng, Director | 1957-05-13 | TAIWAN | Central News Agency of China, San Francisco Bureau 1025 | 1957-05-13 | Central News Agency of China, San Francisco Bureau | Taipei | ||||
1700 | 1700 | 1975-01-31 | Taiwan Sugar Company | 1970-12-08 | TAIWAN | Pendleton & McLaughlin 1743 | 1964-05-28 | Pendleton & McLaughlin | Taipei | ||||
14285 | 14285 | 1975-11-28 | Chinese Government Procurement & Services Mission Division for Taiwan Sugar Corporation | 1974-02-12 | TAIWAN | Pendleton & McLaughlin 1743 | 1964-05-28 | Pendleton & McLaughlin | Taipei | ||||
7875 | 7875 | 1988-06-16 | Tourism Bureau Republic of China (Thru Taiwan Visitors' Association) | 1982-08-17 | TAIWAN | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
9065 | 9065 | 1976-07-07 | Chinese Government Information Service | 1975-08-01 | TAIWAN | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
12862 | 12862 | 1995-10-19 | Taiwan Visitors Association | 1982-08-17 | TAIWAN | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | P.O. Box 1490 Taipei | ||||
15836 | 15836 | 1980-12-31 | Government Information Office | 1966-03-18 | TAIWAN | Chinese Information Service, Pacific Coast Bureau 1969 | 1966-03-18 | Chinese Information Service, Pacific Coast Bureau | Taipei | ||||
9606 | 9606 | 1969-07-30 | Taiwan Mushroom Packers' United Export Corporation | 1966-03-22 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11327 | 11327 | 1988-09-02 | Taiwan Asparagus Canners' Export Corporation | 1972-10-25 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11328 | 11328 | 1988-09-02 | Taiwan Electric Appliance Manufacturers' Association | 1977-04-08 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11329 | 11329 | 1988-09-02 | Taiwan Fireworks Manufacturers' Association | 1973-10-12 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11330 | 11330 | 1988-09-02 | Taiwan Footwear Exporters' Association | 1976-04-15 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11331 | 11331 | 1988-09-02 | Taiwan Plywood Manufacturers' & Exporters' Association | 1969-01-09 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11332 | 11332 | 1988-09-02 | Board of Foreign Trade, Ministry of Economic Affairs | 1976-11-17 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11336 | 11336 | 1988-09-02 | Taiwan Tableware Manufacturing & Export Association | 1971-06-11 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11337 | 11337 | 1988-09-02 | Taiwan Textile Federation | 1985-07-25 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
11338 | 11338 | 1988-09-02 | Tong Hsing Electronics Company | 1975-10-30 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
15684 | 15684 | 1971-12-31 | Special Comm. Re. Exportation of Textiles from ROC to U.S. | 1970-09-28 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
15993 | 15993 | 1987-12-31 | Taiwan Mushroom Packers' United Export Corporation | 1972-06-05 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
16028 | 16028 | 1987-12-31 | Taiwan Regional Association of Rubber Industries | 1987-09-29 | TAIWAN | Solter, Myron W. 1970 | 1966-03-22 | Solter, Myron W. | Taipei | ||||
4155 | 4155 | 1971-03-30 | Central Broadcasting Station, Broadcasting Corporation of China | 1969-05-20 | TAIWAN | Central Broadcasting Station Trust 2138 | 1969-05-20 | Central Broadcasting Station Trust | Taipei | ||||
16282 | 16282 | 1995-12-31 | Taiwanese Reichbanknote Creditors' Association | 1994-03-22 | TAIWAN | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | Taoyen City | ||||
11466 | 11466 | 1977-09-09 | Taiwan Power Company | 1975-08-25 | TAIWAN | LeBoeuf, Lamb, Leiby & MacRae 2169 | 1969-11-10 | LeBoeuf, Lamb, Leiby & MacRae | Taipei | ||||
3878 | 3878 | 1993-03-18 | United Microelectronics Corporation (UMC")" | 1992-05-20 | TAIWAN | Hogan Lovells US LLP 2244 | 1971-02-18 | Hogan Lovells US LLP | Hsin-Chu City | ||||
7786 | 7786 | 1996-06-13 | Taipei Economic & Cultural Representative Office (Formerly: China External Trade Development Council) | 1990-02-12 | TAIWAN | Hogan Lovells US LLP 2244 | 1971-02-18 | Hogan Lovells US LLP | Taipei | ||||
6321 | 6321 | 1985-05-04 | Republic of China | 1976-05-13 | TAIWAN | Baron/Canning & Company, Inc. 2270 | 1971-07-23 | Baron/Canning & Company, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
1208 | 1208 | 1987-01-11 | Coordination Council for North American Affairs, ROC | 1982-02-26 | TAIWAN | Hugh C. Newton & Associates 2357 | 1972-07-17 | Hugh C. Newton & Associates | New York | NY | |||
1443 | 1443 | 1977-01-21 | Republic of China | 1972-07-17 | TAIWAN | Hugh C. Newton & Associates 2357 | 1972-07-17 | Hugh C. Newton & Associates | New York | NY | |||
7046 | 7046 | 1978-05-31 | Chinese Information Service, Republic of China | 1978-05-08 | TAIWAN | Hugh C. Newton & Associates 2357 | 1972-07-17 | Hugh C. Newton & Associates | New York | NY | |||
8338 | 8338 | 1981-06-30 | Chinese Information Service, ROC | 1978-12-16 | TAIWAN | Hugh C. Newton & Associates 2357 | 1972-07-17 | Hugh C. Newton & Associates | New York | NY | |||
14753 | 14753 | 1980-12-02 | Taiwan Power Company | 1979-02-09 | TAIWAN | Doub & Muntzing, Charterd 2458 | 1973-09-10 | Doub & Muntzing, Charterd | Taipei | ||||
9068 | 9068 | 1978-07-07 | Republic of China Economic Council | 1978-06-23 | TAIWAN | Burson-Marsteller 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | Taipei | ||||
13977 | 13977 | 1987-11-15 | U.S.-Taiwan, ROC Fair Trade Council | 1987-10-02 | TAIWAN | Burson-Marsteller 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | Taipei | ||||
13271 | 13271 | 1990-10-31 | Coordination Council for North American Affairs, Taiwan | 1974-02-25 | TAIWAN | Alan Prigge, Inc. 2497 | 1974-02-25 | Alan Prigge, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
12790 | 12790 | 1974-10-17 | China Steel Corporation | 1974-08-27 | TAIWAN | Kearns International 2531 | 1974-08-27 | Kearns International | Taipei | ||||
10835 | 10835 | 1984-08-30 | China External Trade Development Council | 1978-11-01 | TAIWAN | International Marketing Group 2540 | 1974-10-22 | International Marketing Group | Taipei | ||||
1985 | 1985 | 1977-02-01 | Central Bank of China | 1976-07-08 | TAIWAN | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | Taipei | ||||
8297 | 8297 | 1975-06-30 | China Steel Corporation | 1974-10-24 | TAIWAN | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | Taipei | ||||
11946 | 11946 | 1979-09-30 | Export-Import Bank of Taiwan | 1979-06-04 | TAIWAN | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | Taipei | ||||
2053 | 2053 | 1995-02-01 | Taiwan Power Company | 1986-09-23 | TAIWAN | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge 2580 | 1975-02-21 | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge | |||||
14356 | 14356 | 1979-11-30 | Taiwan Power Company | 1979-02-09 | TAIWAN | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge 2580 | 1975-02-21 | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge | |||||
846 | 846 | 1982-01-01 | Hsinchu Science Based Industrial Park Administration | 1980-12-30 | TAIWAN | Graydon Associates, Inc. 2639 | 1975-12-10 | Graydon Associates, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
904 | 904 | 1988-01-01 | China Airlines | 1985-08-27 | TAIWAN | Anderson & Pendleton, C.A. 2696 | 1976-06-09 | Anderson & Pendleton, C.A. | |||||
13566 | 13566 | 1986-11-01 | Coordination Council for North America Affairs | 1983-11-28 | TAIWAN | Anderson & Pendleton, C.A. 2696 | 1976-06-09 | Anderson & Pendleton, C.A. | Washington | DC | |||
1998 | 1998 | 1980-02-01 | Republic of China Olympic Committee | 1980-02-05 | TAIWAN | Martin Ryan Haley & Associates, Inc. 2727 | 1976-10-18 | Martin Ryan Haley & Associates, Inc. | |||||
7763 | 7763 | 1980-06-12 | Decca Affiliated, Inc. | 1977-09-16 | TAIWAN | Cinque, A.P. 2831 | 1977-09-16 | Cinque, A.P. | Taipei | ||||
12617 | 12617 | 1985-10-12 | Coordination Council for North American Activities | 1985-04-18 | TAIWAN | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | MD | ||||
12625 | 12625 | 1987-10-12 | Chinese Cultural Center (Taiwan) | 1987-04-30 | TAIWAN | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | NY | ||||
12957 | 12957 | 1986-10-23 | Coordination Council for North American Activities | 1986-03-18 | TAIWAN | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | MD | ||||
2947 | 2947 | 1988-02-28 | China External Trade Development Council | 1981-03-27 | TAIWAN | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
6571 | 6571 | 1993-05-15 | Coordination Council for North American Affairs | 1991-06-28 | TAIWAN | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | DC | ||||
6572 | 6572 | 1995-05-15 | China External Trade Development Council | 1992-10-23 | TAIWAN | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
8437 | 8437 | 1989-06-30 | Chinese Association for Human Rights; Chinese Press Institute; Chinese National Assn. of Industry & Commerce | 1989-06-02 | TAIWAN | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
9140 | 9140 | 1993-07-09 | Government Information Office | 1977-11-29 | TAIWAN | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | NY | ||||
12675 | 12675 | 1993-10-14 | Brand International Promotion Association (BIPA) | 1991-07-15 | TAIWAN | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
12681 | 12681 | 1993-10-14 | Tou Tien Metal (Taiwan) Company, Ltd. | 1986-07-02 | TAIWAN | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Taipei, TAIWAN ROC | ||||
11364 | 11364 | 1981-09-04 | Taiwan Ming Tai Company, Ltd. | 1982-05-24 | TAIWAN | Hastings, Jay Donald 2867 | 1978-03-14 | Hastings, Jay Donald | Taipei, Taiwan | ||||
4085 | 4085 | 1989-03-27 | Taiwan Visitors' Association | 1979-05-17 | TAIWAN | Liu, Henry H.C. 2889 | 1978-04-20 | Liu, Henry H.C. | |||||
4086 | 4086 | 1989-03-27 | Tourism Bureau of the Republic of China | 1978-04-20 | TAIWAN | Liu, Henry H.C. 2889 | 1978-04-20 | Liu, Henry H.C. | Taipei | ||||
6911 | 6911 | 2002-05-29 | Far East Trade Service, Inc. | 1978-06-08 | TAIWAN | Far East Trade Service, Inc., Chicago 2911 | 1978-06-08 | Far East Trade Service, Inc., Chicago | Taipai | ||||
2342 | 2342 | 2002-02-09 | Taiwan Textile Federation | 1998-03-16 | TAIWAN | Fasturn, Inc. 2944 | 1978-08-09 | Fasturn, Inc. | 22 Ai Kuo Road, Taipei | ||||
5998 | 5998 | 2001-04-30 | Taipei Economic & Cultural Representative Office (TECRO) | 1987-06-17 | TAIWAN | O'Connor & Hannan, L.L.P. 2972 | 1978-10-25 | O'Connor & Hannan, L.L.P. | |||||
1370 | 1370 | 1981-01-16 | Republic of China, Ministry of Communications, Tourism Bur. | 1978-11-07 | TAIWAN | Thadd Garrett & Associates, Inc. 2973 | 1978-11-07 | Thadd Garrett & Associates, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
673 | 673 | Taiwan External Trade Development Council | 1978-12-06 | TAIWAN | Far East Trade Services, Inc. 2985 | 1978-12-06 | Far East Trade Services, Inc. | Taipei | |||||
10911 | 10911 | 1981-08-31 | Chinese Information Service, Pacific Coast Bureau | 1973-08-23 | TAIWAN | Public Service Audience Planners 2452 | 1979-08-23 | Public Service Audience Planners | Los Angeles | CA | |||
15067 | 15067 | 1982-12-13 | China Chapter - World Anti-Communist League - Republic of China | 1980-08-04 | TAIWAN | Lee Edwards & Associates, Inc. 3064 | 1979-10-02 | Lee Edwards & Associates, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
4883 | 4883 | 1984-04-01 | Taiwan Asparagus Canners' Export Corporation | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
4884 | 4884 | 1984-04-01 | Taiwan Electric Appliance Manufacturers' Association | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
4885 | 4885 | 1984-04-01 | Taiwan Maize Importers' Joint Committee | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
4886 | 4886 | 1984-04-01 | Taiwan Mushroom Packers' United Export Corporation | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
4887 | 4887 | 1984-04-01 | Taiwan Soyabean Importers' Joint Committee | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
4888 | 4888 | 1984-04-01 | Tatung Company | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
15926 | 15926 | 1985-12-31 | Taiwan Flour Mills' Association | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
15927 | 15927 | 1985-12-31 | Taiwan Footwear Exporters' Association | 1981-01-08 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
16081 | 16081 | 1988-12-31 | Taiwan Textile Federation | 1980-01-21 | TAIWAN | United Friends, Inc. 3083 | 1980-01-21 | United Friends, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
7922 | 7922 | 1981-06-18 | Directorate General of Telecommunications | 1980-08-05 | TAIWAN | Waldman, Raymond J. 3132 | 1980-08-05 | Waldman, Raymond J. | |||||
5091 | 5091 | 1981-04-08 | Taiwan Provincial Assembly | 1980-10-01 | TAIWAN | Manchin, A. James 3153 | 1980-10-01 | Manchin, A. James | |||||
11962 | 11962 | 1982-09-30 | Republic of China | 1981-05-28 | TAIWAN | Proskauer Rose Goetz & Mendelsohn 3206 | 1981-03-02 | Proskauer Rose Goetz & Mendelsohn | |||||
14116 | 14116 | 1984-11-21 | Ministry of Communications, Tourism Bureau | 1981-04-17 | TAIWAN | Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler 3234 | 1981-04-17 | Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler | |||||
9280 | 9280 | 2001-07-15 | Board of Foreign Trade (BOFT) | 1981-05-04 | TAIWAN | Ablondi, Foster, Sobin & Davidow, P.C. 3235 | 1981-05-04 | Ablondi, Foster, Sobin & Davidow, P.C. | Taipei | ||||
13252 | 13252 | 1988-10-31 | Taiwan Textile Federation | 1985-09-11 | TAIWAN | Ablondi, Foster, Sobin & Davidow, P.C. 3235 | 1981-05-04 | Ablondi, Foster, Sobin & Davidow, P.C. | Taipei | ||||
10099 | 10099 | 1983-08-03 | Government of the Republic of China | 1983-09-30 | TAIWAN | Whitman & Ransom 3296 | 1981-10-23 | Whitman & Ransom | Taipei | ||||
3523 | 3523 | 1991-03-08 | Jovian Publishing Group | 1990-11-08 | TAIWAN | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Taipei | ||||
7982 | 7982 | 1988-06-21 | Intercontinental Communications Corporation (United Americorp) | 1981-12-03 | TAIWAN | Intercontinental Communications Corporation 3313 | 1981-12-03 | Intercontinental Communications Corporation | Taipei | ||||
3406 | 3406 | 1995-03-03 | China External Trade Development Council (CETRA) | 1989-11-08 | TAIWAN | Washington International Group, Inc. 3320 | 1982-01-05 | Washington International Group, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
1160 | 1160 | 1996-01-08 | Directorate General of Telecommunications Ministry of Communications | 1982-07-08 | TAIWAN | Schiff, Hardin & Waite 3387 | 1982-07-08 | Schiff, Hardin & Waite | Taipei | ||||
1264 | 1264 | 1986-01-13 | Ming Tai Marine Products Company, Ltd. | 1982-08-09 | TAIWAN | Nordquist, Myron Harry 3400 | 1982-08-09 | Nordquist, Myron Harry | |||||
6854 | 6854 | 1983-05-26 | Republic of China | 1982-10-05 | TAIWAN | Stone, Richard B. 3414 | 1982-10-05 | Stone, Richard B. | |||||
8093 | 8093 | 1987-06-25 | Coordination Council for North American Affairs | 1982-11-29 | TAIWAN | Corcoran Jr., Thomas G. 3422 | 1982-11-29 | Corcoran Jr., Thomas G. | Bethesda | MD |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );