FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
95 rows where City = "" and Country/Location_Represented = "UKRAINE" sorted by Registrant_Date
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_2, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Yorktown Solutions, LLC 7
- APCO Worldwide, Inc. 5
- Wiley Rein, LLP 4
- Federal Advocates, Inc. 3
- Law Office of Stewart & Stewart 3
- BGR Government Affairs, LLC 2
- Bonner, J. Tedrowe 2
- Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 2
- FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) 2
- Foundation in Support of Diplomatic Missions of Ukraine, Inc 2
- Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 2
- Livingston Group, LLC 2
- MKW Group, LLC 2
- Redex Packaging Corporation 2
- Your Global Strategy, Inc. 2
- Aitken Irvin Lewin Berlin Vrooman & Cohn 1
- Aitken, Irvin, Lewin, Berlin, Vrooman & Cohn 1
- ArentFox Schiff LLP 1
- Armstrong & Associates, LLC 1
- Arnall Golden Gregory, LLP 1
- BKSH & Associates 1
- Ben Barnes Group 1
- Cohen, Marcus 1
- Covington & Burling LLP 1
- Crossworld of Indiana, Inc. 1
- DB Communications, LLC 1
- DC International Advisory, LLC 1
- DCI Group AZ, LLC 1
- Davis Goldberg & Galper PLLC 1
- Davis Goldberg & Galper, PLLC 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Government of Ukraine 8
- Agency for Humanitarian Technologies 2
- Aveiro LP 2
- Dmitry Shpenov 2
- Oleksandr Tymoshenko 2
- SCM Consulting Limited 2
- Trident Foundation 2
- Volodymyr Zelensky 2
- AS Prima Societas Limited 1
- All-Ukrainian Industry Association Federation of Employers of the Oil and Gas Industry"" 1
- Andrii Artemenko 1
- Antonov Aircraft Corporation 1
- Association of Enterprises UKRMETALURGPROM 1
- Association of Enterprises UKRMETALURGROM 1
- Bloc - Yulia Tymoshenko (BYuT) 1
- Bloc - Yulia Tymoshenko (BYuT) through TD International LLC 1
- Bloc-Yulia Tymoshenko (BYuT) (through TD International, LLC) 1
- Civil Movement For a Just Ukraine"(Hromadska Orhanizatsiia Rukh Spravedlyva Ukrayina)" 1
- Civil Organization, Citizen 1
- Delegation of Ukrainian Officials via contract with Ukrainian Guild of Activities via contract with Tricuro, LLC 1
- Democratic Transformation Foundation 1
- Dmytro Firtash 1
- Eduard Prutnik (represented in the U.S. by Alex Kiselev) 1
- Elekronmarsh 1
- Embassy of Ukraine to the U.S.A. 1
- European Centre for a Modern Ukraine 1
- Firtash, Dmytro 1
- Fund for Development of Foreign Economic Activity of Ukraine 1
- GloBee International Agency for Regional Development 1
- Government of Ukraine (through the Agency of Humanitarian Technologies) 1
- …
Country/Location_Represented 1
- UKRAINE · 95 ✖
City 1
- - · 95 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date ▼ | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4667 | 4667 | 2006-03-31 | Republic of Ukraine | 1999-12-16 | UKRAINE | White & Case, LLP 2759 | 1977-03-09 | White & Case, LLP | Head of External Debt Department Ministry of Finance Klev | ||||
691 | 691 | The Government of Ukraine, The Ministry of Culture and Information Policy through GroupM Sp z.o.o. | 2022-08-19 | UKRAINE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | ||||||
14496 | 14496 | 2001-11-30 | Government of Ukraine (through the Agency of Humanitarian Technologies) | 2001-05-03 | UKRAINE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Kiev | ||||
4232 | 4232 | 2001-03-30 | Ukraine through UKR Investments, Inc. | 2001-02-07 | UKRAINE | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | |||||
11053 | 11053 | 1997-08-31 | Ukrainian United Energy Systems | 1997-02-20 | UKRAINE | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | Alexandria | VA | |||
16749 | 16749 | 2014-12-31 | Ivaniuschenko, Yuriy | 2013-01-31 | UKRAINE | Sidley Austin LLP 3731 | 1985-09-13 | Sidley Austin LLP | 5 Hrushevskoho str. | Kyiv, 01021 | |||
11733 | 11733 | 1996-09-20 | Government of Ukraine | 1994-10-11 | UKRAINE | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips 3736 | 1985-09-20 | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips | Washington | DC | |||
7144 | 7144 | 1995-05-31 | Government of Ukraine, Office of the President | 1992-04-27 | UKRAINE | IPG DXTRA, Inc 3911 | 1986-12-01 | IPG DXTRA, Inc | Kiev | ||||
4071 | 4071 | 2002-03-26 | UKRINVEST INC. | 1999-12-06 | UKRAINE | APCO Worldwide, Inc. 4561 | 1991-09-03 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | Pasea Estate Road Town, Tortola | ||||
12107 | 12107 | 1999-09-30 | Nowanda Commercial Corporation | 1999-04-26 | UKRAINE | APCO Worldwide, Inc. 4561 | 1991-09-03 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | Pasea Estate Road Town, Tortola | ||||
16242 | 16242 | 1992-12-31 | Ukrainian Branch of the World Laboratory (& Ministries) | 1992-04-24 | UKRAINE | Kleban & Samor, P.C. 4653 | 1992-04-24 | Kleban & Samor, P.C. | Kiev | ||||
7133 | 7133 | 1992-05-31 | Elekronmarsh | 1992-05-20 | UKRAINE | Redex Packaging Corporation 4670 | 1992-05-20 | Redex Packaging Corporation | Kiev, Ukraine | ||||
7134 | 7134 | 1992-05-31 | Government of Ukraine | 1992-05-20 | UKRAINE | Redex Packaging Corporation 4670 | 1992-05-20 | Redex Packaging Corporation | Kiev | ||||
7751 | 7751 | 1993-06-11 | Republic of Crimea | 1994-08-24 | UKRAINE | NewCastle International, Ltd. 4676 | 1992-06-01 | NewCastle International, Ltd. | Simferopol | ||||
8580 | 8580 | 1999-06-30 | Embassy of Ukraine to the U.S.A. | 1992-06-08 | UKRAINE | Foundation in Support of Diplomatic Missions of Ukraine, Inc 4683 | 1992-06-08 | Foundation in Support of Diplomatic Missions of Ukraine, Inc | Washington | DC | |||
8584 | 8584 | 1999-06-30 | Permanent Mission of Ukraine to the United Nations | 1992-06-08 | UKRAINE | Foundation in Support of Diplomatic Missions of Ukraine, Inc 4683 | 1992-06-08 | Foundation in Support of Diplomatic Missions of Ukraine, Inc | New York | NY | |||
5752 | 5752 | 1994-04-29 | International Organization Open Economy of Eastern Europe | 1993-10-29 | UKRAINE | Law Office of Stewart & Stewart 4709 | 1992-09-21 | Law Office of Stewart & Stewart | Kiev | ||||
12106 | 12106 | 1999-09-30 | Kiev International Expansion Venture - K.I.E.V. | 1992-12-15 | UKRAINE | Law Office of Stewart & Stewart 4709 | 1992-09-21 | Law Office of Stewart & Stewart | Kiev, Ukraine | ||||
14230 | 14230 | 1993-11-24 | Seven, Ltd. | 1992-09-21 | UKRAINE | Law Office of Stewart & Stewart 4709 | 1992-09-21 | Law Office of Stewart & Stewart | Kiev, Ukraine | ||||
6326 | 6326 | 1993-05-04 | Fund for Development of Foreign Economic Activity of Ukraine | 1992-10-23 | UKRAINE | Reichert, E. Karl 4727 | 1992-10-23 | Reichert, E. Karl | Kiev | ||||
11027 | 11027 | 1993-08-31 | Ukrainian State Committee on Geology & Utilization of Mineral Resources | 1993-01-14 | UKRAINE | Ukrainian Technical Assistance Foundation 4752 | 1993-01-14 | Ukrainian Technical Assistance Foundation | Kiev, Ukraine | ||||
7143 | 7143 | 1995-05-31 | Government of Ukraine | 1993-05-17 | UKRAINE | Morin, Robert E. 4803 | 1993-05-17 | Morin, Robert E. | Washington | DC | |||
14446 | 14446 | 1993-11-30 | Office of the President of Ukraine | 1993-05-21 | UKRAINE | P/C Advisors, Inc. 4806 | 1993-05-21 | P/C Advisors, Inc. | Kiev | ||||
1449 | 1449 | 1994-01-21 | Office of the President of Ukraine through P/C Advisors, Inc. | 1993-06-11 | UKRAINE | Williams, Mullen, Christian & Dobbins, P.C. 4815 | 1993-06-11 | Williams, Mullen, Christian & Dobbins, P.C. | Kiev | ||||
2995 | 2995 | 1994-02-28 | Office of the President of Ukraine (Through P/C Advisors, Inc.) | 1993-06-11 | UKRAINE | Raftis Associates 4816 | 1993-06-11 | Raftis Associates | Kiev | ||||
12381 | 12381 | 1996-10-01 | Government of Ukraine | 1994-10-28 | UKRAINE | Heller & Rosenblatt 4870 | 1993-11-26 | Heller & Rosenblatt | Kiev | ||||
4088 | 4088 | 1995-03-27 | President of Crimea, Yuri Alexandrovich Meshkov | 1994-08-02 | UKRAINE | Crossworld of Indiana, Inc. 4935 | 1994-08-02 | Crossworld of Indiana, Inc. | Simferopol, Crimea | ||||
8535 | 8535 | 1995-06-30 | Government of Ukraine, Embassy | 1994-12-02 | UKRAINE | Ronald S. Winton & Associates 4978 | 1994-12-02 | Ronald S. Winton & Associates | Washington | DC | |||
15152 | 15152 | 2004-12-15 | Eduard Prutnik (represented in the U.S. by Alex Kiselev) | 2004-08-27 | UKRAINE | JWI, LLC 4990 | 1995-02-06 | JWI, LLC | 10 Muzeini Street Suite 900 Kiev | ||||
12119 | 12119 | 2001-09-30 | Agency for Humanitarian Technologies | 2002-01-25 | UKRAINE | Washington World Group, Ltd. 5016 | 1995-04-20 | Washington World Group, Ltd. | 7 Leontovicha Street, #6 Kiev 01030 | ||||
11048 | 11048 | 1997-08-31 | Government of Ukraine | 1997-08-18 | UKRAINE | Aitken, Irvin, Lewin, Berlin, Vrooman & Cohn 5049 | 1995-09-15 | Aitken, Irvin, Lewin, Berlin, Vrooman & Cohn | Kiev, Khreschatik Street, 34 | ||||
10607 | 10607 | 1997-08-18 | Government of Ukraine | 1997-08-18 | UKRAINE | Aitken Irvin Lewin Berlin Vrooman & Cohn 5235 | 1997-08-18 | Aitken Irvin Lewin Berlin Vrooman & Cohn | Kiev | ||||
1274 | 1274 | 1998-01-13 | Ukroboron Service | 1998-01-13 | UKRAINE | MIS United Enterprises, Inc. 5225 | 1998-01-13 | MIS United Enterprises, Inc. | Kiev | ||||
16512 | 16512 | 2002-12-31 | Agency for Humanitarian Technologies | 2001-06-28 | UKRAINE | BKSH & Associates 5402 | 2000-12-14 | BKSH & Associates | 7 Leontovicha, Apt. 6 Kyiv 01030 | ||||
1849 | 1849 | 2004-01-31 | Antonov Aircraft Corporation | 2003-11-24 | UKRAINE | BGR Government Affairs, LLC 5430 | 2001-05-10 | BGR Government Affairs, LLC | 1100 Lee Wagener Boulevard #208 FLL International Airport Ft. Lauderdale 33315 | FL | |||
6249 | 6249 | 2019-05-01 | National Reforms Council of Ukraine | 2017-01-01 | UKRAINE | BGR Government Affairs, LLC 5430 | 2001-05-10 | BGR Government Affairs, LLC | 11 Bankova Str. 01220, Kyiv | ||||
14520 | 14520 | 2005-11-30 | Viktor Yanukovych, Prime Minister of Ukraine - Eduard Prutnik, Advisor to the Prime Minister | 2003-08-01 | UKRAINE | Venable, LLP 5435 | 2001-05-29 | Venable, LLP | 123 Independence Avenue, Kiev | ||||
16560 | 16560 | 2004-12-31 | Mr. Viktor Yanukovych, Prime Minister of Ukraine, Mr. Eduard Prutnik, Advisor to the Prime Minister | 2003-08-01 | UKRAINE | Kiselev, Aleksei 5572 | 2003-08-01 | Kiselev, Aleksei | Prime Minister Viktor Yanukovych, Grushevskogo Street, 12/2 Kiev, Ukraine 01008 | ||||
14099 | 14099 | 2003-11-20 | Prime Minister Viktor Yanukovych | 2003-11-20 | UKRAINE | Potomac Communications Strategies, Inc. 5588 | 2003-11-20 | Potomac Communications Strategies, Inc. | Grushevskogo St. 12/2, Kiev, Ukraine 01008 | ||||
16565 | 16565 | 2004-12-31 | Victor Yanukovych, Alex Kiselev | 2004-07-22 | UKRAINE | DB Communications, LLC 5634 | 2004-07-22 | DB Communications, LLC | bud. 12/2 vul. M. Grushevskogo m. Kyiv, 01008 | ||||
4234 | 4234 | 2007-03-30 | Bloc-Yulia Tymoshenko (BYuT) (through TD International, LLC) | 2007-02-07 | UKRAINE | FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) 5666 | 2005-01-31 | FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) | Post Office Box 81, Kyiv, 01133 | ||||
16913 | 16913 | 2021-12-31 | Transatlantic Dialogue and Engagement Center | 2021-02-12 | UKRAINE | FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) 5666 | 2005-01-31 | FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) | 01021, Ukraine, Kiev, Park Road, 16A | Kyiv International Convention Center Parkovy"" | |||
14522 | 14522 | 2006-11-30 | Democratic Transformation Foundation | 2007-04-03 | UKRAINE | Dutko Worldwide, LLC 5693 | 2005-07-01 | Dutko Worldwide, LLC | Lettstrasse 10 | POB 1105 FL-9490 Vaduz | |||
11125 | 11125 | 2009-08-31 | Bloc - Yulia Tymoshenko (BYuT) | 2006-11-07 | UKRAINE | TD International, LLC 5775 | 2006-11-07 | TD International, LLC | P.O. Box 81, Kyiv, 01133 | ||||
5503 | 5503 | 2008-04-23 | Bloc - Yulia Tymoshenko (BYuT) through TD International LLC | 2007-02-26 | UKRAINE | Dezenhall Resources, Ltd. 5795 | 2007-02-26 | Dezenhall Resources, Ltd. | |||||
6077 | 6077 | 2014-04-30 | European Centre for a Modern Ukraine | 2017-04-12 | UKRAINE | Podesta Group, Inc. 5926 | 2009-04-01 | Podesta Group, Inc. | 14 Rue de la Science | 1040 Brussels | |||
1922 | 1922 | 2019-01-31 | Irina Vyshinsky | 2018-12-11 | UKRAINE | Friedlander Group 6097 | 2012-04-25 | Friedlander Group | 117593 Russia, Moscow, Litovsky Boulevard | 3, build. 2, flat 380 | |||
3729 | 3729 | 2016-03-14 | Trident Foundation | 2014-07-30 | UKRAINE | Wiley Rein, LLP 6108 | 2012-06-11 | Wiley Rein, LLP | 124 Baker Street | London W1U 6TY United Kingdom | |||
8757 | 8757 | 2019-06-30 | Aveiro LP | 2016-03-30 | UKRAINE | Wiley Rein, LLP 6108 | 2012-06-11 | Wiley Rein, LLP | Suite 1, 54 Lisburn Road | Belfast, BT9 6AF | |||
8766 | 8766 | 2019-06-30 | Oleksandr Tymoshenko | 2019-03-05 | UKRAINE | Wiley Rein, LLP 6108 | 2012-06-11 | Wiley Rein, LLP | 29 Karl Marks Avenue | Apt. 39 Dnipropetrovsky, 49600 | |||
16753 | 16753 | 2014-12-31 | Oleksandr Tymoshenko | 2012-06-11 | UKRAINE | Wiley Rein, LLP 6108 | 2012-06-11 | Wiley Rein, LLP | 29 Karl Marks Avenue Apt. 39 Dnipropetrovsky, 49600 | ||||
11725 | 11725 | 2013-09-19 | Dmitry Shpenov | 2013-01-14 | UKRAINE | Tauzin Consultants 6149 | 2013-01-14 | Tauzin Consultants | 29 Dovatura Street Krivy Rig | ||||
15232 | 15232 | 2013-12-19 | Dmitry Shpenov | 2013-01-14 | UKRAINE | Arnall Golden Gregory, LLP 6150 | 2013-01-14 | Arnall Golden Gregory, LLP | 29 Dovatora Str. Kriviy Rig | ||||
1911 | 1911 | 2017-01-31 | International Agency for Regional Development (Globee) | 2016-12-13 | UKRAINE | Mercury Public Affairs, LLC 6170 | 2013-05-14 | Mercury Public Affairs, LLC | 5 Geroev Nebesnoy Sontni Square, Suite 23 | Kharkov 61001 | |||
3788 | 3788 | 2014-03-15 | Government of Ukraine through JAI Holdings, LLC | 2014-03-26 | UKRAINE | Prime Policy Group 6192 | 2013-11-04 | Prime Policy Group | 12/2 Hrushevskoho str. Kyiv 01008 | ||||
1405 | 1405 | 2017-01-18 | GloBee International Agency for Regional Development | 2016-05-25 | UKRAINE | Your Global Strategy, Inc. 6201 | 2013-12-05 | Your Global Strategy, Inc. | |||||
2204 | 2204 | 2015-02-04 | Ukrainian Jewish Committee | 2013-12-05 | UKRAINE | Your Global Strategy, Inc. 6201 | 2013-12-05 | Your Global Strategy, Inc. | 1b Darvina Street | 01004 Kyiv | |||
4823 | 4823 | 2023-03-31 | SCM Consulting Limited | 2022-06-27 | UKRAINE | DCI Group AZ, LLC 6278 | 2015-03-03 | DCI Group AZ, LLC | Trident Chambers, PO Box 146 | Road Town, Tortola VIRGIN ISLANDS VG | |||
3117 | 3117 | 2016-02-28 | Ministry of Finance of Ukraine | 2015-06-22 | UKRAINE | APCO Worldwide, Inc. 6291 | 2015-04-28 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | 12/2 M. Hrushevskoho str., Kyiv, 01008 | ||||
6084 | 6084 | 2016-04-30 | Government of Ukraine | 2016-04-12 | UKRAINE | APCO Worldwide, Inc. 6291 | 2015-04-28 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | 12/2 M. Hrushevskoho str. Kyiv, 01008 | ||||
9905 | 9905 | 2015-07-31 | Government of Ukraine | 2015-06-22 | UKRAINE | APCO Worldwide, Inc. 6291 | 2015-04-28 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | 12/2 M. Hrushevskoho str., Kyiv 01008 | ||||
3182 | 3182 | 2016-02-29 | Trident Foundation | 2015-09-03 | UKRAINE | MKW Group, LLC 6318 | 2015-09-03 | MKW Group, LLC | 124 Baker St. Westminister, London | ||||
3354 | 3354 | 2017-03-01 | Aveiro LP | 2016-03-31 | UKRAINE | MKW Group, LLC 6318 | 2015-09-03 | MKW Group, LLC | Suite 1 54 Lisburn Road | Belfast, BT9 6AF | |||
14906 | 14906 | 2015-12-08 | AS Prima Societas Limited | 2015-10-08 | UKRAINE | Ben Barnes Group 6322 | 2015-10-08 | Ben Barnes Group | First Floor, Mandar House, Johnson's Ghut | PO Box 3257, Road Town, Tortola, BVI | |||
9111 | 9111 | 2018-07-08 | Association of Enterprises UKRMETALURGROM | 2018-04-12 | UKRAINE | Livingston Group, LLC 6344 | 2016-03-25 | Livingston Group, LLC | Volodymyrska str. 4 office 9 | 01025 Kyiv | |||
11182 | 11182 | 2020-08-31 | Association of Enterprises UKRMETALURGPROM | 2019-08-29 | UKRAINE | Livingston Group, LLC 6344 | 2016-03-25 | Livingston Group, LLC | Svyatoslav Horobriy str. 11 | 49000 Dnipro, Dnipropetrovsk | |||
9388 | 9388 | 2019-07-20 | Firtash, Dmytro | 2016-11-23 | UKRAINE | Davis Goldberg & Galper, PLLC 6394 | 2016-11-23 | Davis Goldberg & Galper, PLLC | c/o Mr. Robert Shelter Jones, Deputy Chairman, Group DF, | Parus Business Center, 2 Mechnikova Street, Kiev 01601 | |||
3826 | 3826 | 2017-03-16 | Naftogaz and its subsidiaries through CabinetDN | 2017-02-27 | UKRAINE | ValueBridge, Inc. dba ValueBridge International 6404 | 2017-02-27 | ValueBridge, Inc. dba ValueBridge International | |||||
7264 | 7264 | 2017-05-31 | Andrii Artemenko | 2017-04-06 | UKRAINE | Armstrong & Associates, LLC 6416 | 2017-04-06 | Armstrong & Associates, LLC | 23-25 Klinichaya Street Apartment 80 Kiev 03110 | ||||
9084 | 9084 | 2017-07-07 | Oleksandr Chalyi | 2017-07-07 | UKRAINE | Bonner, J. Tedrowe 6443 | 2017-07-07 | Bonner, J. Tedrowe | Grant Thornton | Sichovykh Striltsiv Street, 60 Kiev | |||
9085 | 9085 | 2017-07-07 | Sergey Taruta | 2017-07-07 | UKRAINE | Bonner, J. Tedrowe 6443 | 2017-07-07 | Bonner, J. Tedrowe | Yaroslaviv Val Street, 3b | Kiev | |||
8117 | 8117 | 2018-06-26 | Mr. Valerii Babych | 2018-03-19 | UKRAINE | Medowood Management, LLC 6474 | 2017-10-07 | Medowood Management, LLC | 34/1Grushevskogo Str | Kyiv, Ukraine 01021 | |||
45 | 45 | All-Ukrainian Industry Association Federation of Employers of the Oil and Gas Industry"" | 2020-01-05 | UKRAINE | Yorktown Solutions, LLC 6491 | 2017-11-19 | Yorktown Solutions, LLC | ||||||
1034 | 1034 | 2019-01-01 | Public Joint-Stock Company National Joint-Stock Company (Naftogaz of Ukraine) | 2017-11-19 | UKRAINE | Yorktown Solutions, LLC 6491 | 2017-11-19 | Yorktown Solutions, LLC | B. Khmelnitskogo st., 6, | Kyiv, 01001 | |||
1037 | 1037 | 2019-01-01 | State Foreign Trade Enterprise SpetsTechnoExport | 2018-03-31 | UKRAINE | Yorktown Solutions, LLC 6491 | 2017-11-19 | Yorktown Solutions, LLC | |||||
1038 | 1038 | 2019-01-01 | Ukrinmash | 2018-03-21 | UKRAINE | Yorktown Solutions, LLC 6491 | 2017-11-19 | Yorktown Solutions, LLC | Ukraine, 04119, Kyiv, 36, Dehtyarivska str. | ||||
14599 | 14599 | 2022-11-30 | Civil Movement For a Just Ukraine"(Hromadska Orhanizatsiia Rukh Spravedlyva Ukrayina)" | 2021-08-17 | UKRAINE | Yorktown Solutions, LLC 6491 | 2017-11-19 | Yorktown Solutions, LLC | |||||
15080 | 15080 | 2019-12-13 | PJSC AGRARIAN FUND | 2019-08-08 | UKRAINE | Yorktown Solutions, LLC 6491 | 2017-11-19 | Yorktown Solutions, LLC | 1 Grinchenko Street | Kyiv 01001 | |||
16852 | 16852 | 2019-12-31 | Kyiv City Organization of Employers of the Oil and Gas Industry | 2018-03-03 | UKRAINE | Yorktown Solutions, LLC 6491 | 2017-11-19 | Yorktown Solutions, LLC | B. Khmelnitskogo st., 6, Kyiv 01601 | ||||
9204 | 9204 | 2019-07-12 | Government of Ukraine, Office of Prosecutor General (OPG)" | 2019-07-12 | UKRAINE | FTI Consulting LLP 6569 | 2018-07-09 | FTI Consulting LLP | |||||
12426 | 12426 | 2018-10-01 | Sergei Krasnitski Innovative Technology & Business Consulting | 2018-09-17 | UKRAINE | Munson, Naomi Decter 6593 | 2018-09-17 | Munson, Naomi Decter | |||||
16848 | 16848 | 2019-12-31 | Civil Organization, Citizen | 2018-12-21 | UKRAINE | Federal Advocates, Inc. 6623 | 2018-12-21 | Federal Advocates, Inc. | |||||
16858 | 16858 | 2019-12-31 | Political Party Justice"" | 2018-12-21 | UKRAINE | Federal Advocates, Inc. 6623 | 2018-12-21 | Federal Advocates, Inc. | |||||
16866 | 16866 | 2019-12-31 | ZESET | 2018-12-21 | UKRAINE | Federal Advocates, Inc. 6623 | 2018-12-21 | Federal Advocates, Inc. | |||||
8713 | 8713 | 2013-06-30 | Ministry of Justice of Ukraine ( MOJ")" | 2019-01-18 | UKRAINE | Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom 6617 | 2019-01-18 | Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom | |||||
6700 | 6700 | 2019-05-21 | Volodymyr Zelensky - Servant of the People through Marcus Cohen | 2019-04-12 | UKRAINE | Signal Group Consulting, LLC 6661 | 2019-04-12 | Signal Group Consulting, LLC | Velyka Vasylkivska, 72 | Olympic Shopping Center, 2nd Floor Kiev | |||
7644 | 7644 | 2019-06-06 | Volodymyr Zelensky | 2019-10-02 | UKRAINE | Cohen, Marcus 6732 | 2019-10-02 | Cohen, Marcus | |||||
755 | 755 | Volodymyr Zelensky | 2019-11-14 | UKRAINE | Mac, Andrew 6750 | 2019-11-14 | Mac, Andrew | Inquiry office of the Presidential Office, 11 Bankova St. | Kyiv 01220 | ||||
9933 | 9933 | 2019-07-31 | Sokolov, Michael | 2019-12-03 | UKRAINE | ITBC LLC 6762 | 2019-12-03 | ITBC LLC | |||||
11739 | 11739 | 2020-09-20 | Delegation of Ukrainian Officials via contract with Ukrainian Guild of Activities via contract with Tricuro, LLC | 2020-09-03 | UKRAINE | DC International Advisory, LLC 6865 | 2020-09-03 | DC International Advisory, LLC | |||||
617 | 617 | SCM Consulting Limited | 2022-06-03 | UKRAINE | Covington & Burling LLP 6876 | 2020-10-13 | Covington & Burling LLP | Trident Chambers, P.O. Box 146 | Road Town, Tortola, British Virgin Islands | ||||
737 | 737 | Ukraine Government | 2021-03-03 | UKRAINE | Diplomatic Trade Ltd. 6932 | 2021-03-03 | Diplomatic Trade Ltd. | 123 Kiev | |||||
148 | 148 | Dmytro Firtash | 2021-04-18 | UKRAINE | Davis Goldberg & Galper PLLC 6949 | 2021-04-18 | Davis Goldberg & Galper PLLC | c/o Group DF Holdings Limited, 6th Floor, | Flat/Office 3&4 3035, Limassol | ||||
12744 | 12744 | 2021-10-15 | Ukranian Federation of Employers of the Oil and Gas Industry (UFEOGI) | 2021-07-26 | UKRAINE | ArentFox Schiff LLP 6952 | 2021-04-30 | ArentFox Schiff LLP | 97/37 Volodymyrska str | Kyiv 01033 | |||
690 | 690 | The Government of Ukraine | 2022-10-04 | UKRAINE | Liscovich, Andrey 7174 | 2022-10-04 | Liscovich, Andrey | 12/2 Hrushevsky Str., Secretariat of the Cabinet of Ministers of Ukraine Kyiv, Kyiv Oblast |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );