FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
1,305 rows where City = "" and State = "NY" sorted by Registration_Number
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- North American Precis Syndicate 136
- Association Films, Inc. 36
- Keating Group, Inc. 31
- Perry, Marilyn Edith 25
- Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 24
- International Council of Cruise Lines 22
- Tribune Films, Inc. 22
- Public Service Audience Planners 18
- West Glen Communications 16
- Association of Japanese Textile Imports, Inc. 15
- Billig, Sher & Jones, P.C. 15
- Sterling Movies 12
- Development Counsellors International, Ltd. 11
- Films of the Nations, Inc. 11
- Frontaura, Pablo 10
- M. Silver Associates, Inc. 10
- Bossowick, Irving 9
- Caples Company 9
- Cosmo Public Relations 9
- Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 9
- Derso & Kelen 8
- GCI Group, Inc. 8
- Modern Education Services, Inc. 8
- Ruder Finn, Inc. 8
- Donald N. Martin & Company, Inc. 7
- J. Sutherland Gould Associates 7
- Samuel E. Stavisky & Associates, Inc. 7
- Burson-Marsteller 6
- Cannon Advertising Associates, Inc. 6
- Development Counsellors International 6
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- French Government Tourist Office 13
- Japan Trade Center 13
- German Information Center 10
- Israel Government Tourist Office 10
- Swiss National Tourist Office 10
- French National Railroads 9
- European Travel Commission 7
- Israel Ministry of Tourism 7
- German National Tourist Office 6
- Government of India Tourist Office 6
- Irish Tourist Board 6
- Italian Trade Commission 6
- Spanish Library of Information 6
- Alpine Tourist Commission 5
- Austrian Press & Information Service 5
- Caribbean Tourism Association 5
- Consulate General of Israel 5
- French Information Center, Inc. 5
- Hong Kong Tourist Organization 5
- Institute of International Bankers 5
- Lufthansa German Airlines 5
- Netherlands Information Bureau 5
- Romanian National Tourist Office 5
- Tourism Authority of Thailand 5
- Air France 4
- Australian Tourist Commission 4
- Austrian National Tourist Office 4
- British Tourist Authority 4
- Consulate General of Japan 4
- Eurailpass 4
- …
Country/Location_Represented >30
- JAPAN 140
- INTERNATIONAL 90
- FRANCE 78
- ISRAEL 71
- ITALY 38
- NETHERLANDS 32
- SOUTH AFRICA 31
- GERMANY, FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF 30
- SWITZERLAND 30
- CANADA 29
- SPAIN 28
- INDIA 23
- SWEDEN 22
- AUSTRIA 20
- GREAT BRITAIN 20
- YUGOSLAVIA 20
- DENMARK 19
- GERMANY 19
- BRAZIL 18
- IRELAND 18
- COLOMBIA 16
- POLAND 16
- KOREA, SOUTH 15
- EGYPT 14
- ROMANIA 14
- CHINA 13
- HONG KONG 13
- USSR 13
- CZECHOSLOVAKIA 12
- GREECE 12
- …
State 1
- NY · 1,305 ✖
City 1
- - · 1,305 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number ▼ | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11503 | 11503 | 1951-09-11 | Polish Research & Information Service | 1950-11-16 | POLAND | Black, Helen 6 | 1942-07-06 | Black, Helen | New York | NY | |||
9028 | 9028 | 1942-07-06 | Danish Travel Information Bureau | 1942-07-06 | DENMARK | Christensen, Valdemar Emil 7 | 1942-07-06 | Christensen, Valdemar Emil | New York | NY | |||
9087 | 9087 | 1942-07-08 | Consulate General of Switzerland | 1942-07-08 | SWITZERLAND | Marx, Karl T. 18 | 1942-07-08 | Marx, Karl T. | New York | NY | |||
9114 | 9114 | 1943-07-09 | Finnish-American Trading Corporation | 1942-07-09 | FINLAND | Jarvinen, Vilho Olavi 24 | 1942-07-09 | Jarvinen, Vilho Olavi | New York | NY | |||
9473 | 9473 | 1943-07-26 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-07-09 | SPAIN | Carpenter, Charles M. 29 | 1942-07-09 | Carpenter, Charles M. | New York | NY | |||
780 | 780 | 1959-01-01 | Arab Information Center | 1956-02-03 | EGYPT | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
1956 | 1956 | 1954-02-01 | Swiss National Travel Office | 1954-02-12 | SWITZERLAND | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
2129 | 2129 | 1961-02-03 | Japan Tourist Association | 1958-08-04 | JAPAN | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
2132 | 2132 | 1961-02-03 | Scandinavian Travel Commission (Members are: Danish, Finnish, Norwegian & Swedish National Travel Offices) | 1957-08-13 | DENMARK | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
2133 | 2133 | 1961-02-03 | South Africa Tourist Corporation | 1951-01-31 | SOUTH AFRICA | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
2135 | 2135 | 1961-02-03 | Swiss National Travel Office | 1955-04-04 | SWITZERLAND | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
2138 | 2138 | 1961-02-03 | Yugoslav State Tourist Office | 1953-02-10 | YUGOSLAVIA | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
4834 | 4834 | 1960-04-01 | Government of the Union of South Africa (South Africa Railways) | 1954-07-22 | SOUTH AFRICA | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
9652 | 9652 | 1959-07-31 | European Travel Commission | 1953-07-20 | INTERNATIONAL | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | New York | NY | |||
15516 | 15516 | 1942-12-31 | Netherlands Information Bureau | 1942-07-15 | NETHERLANDS | Van Den Berge, Petrus Jacobus 48 | 1942-07-15 | Van Den Berge, Petrus Jacobus | New York | NY | |||
1295 | 1295 | 1946-01-15 | Dutch Central Transport Workers' Union | 1942-07-15 | NETHERLANDS | Dutch Central Transport Workers' Union 49 | 1942-07-15 | Dutch Central Transport Workers' Union | New York | NY | |||
1296 | 1296 | 1946-01-15 | Netherlands Information Bureau | 1942-07-15 | NETHERLANDS | Dutch Central Transport Workers' Union 49 | 1942-07-15 | Dutch Central Transport Workers' Union | New York | NY | |||
9505 | 9505 | 1946-07-27 | French Line, Inc. | 1943-10-15 | FRANCE | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 56 | 1942-07-20 | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner | New York | NY | |||
9506 | 9506 | 1946-07-27 | Gdynia America Line, Inc. | 1944-03-24 | CANADA | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 56 | 1942-07-20 | Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner | New York | NY | |||
9389 | 9389 | 1943-07-21 | International Mercantile Marine Officers' Association | 1942-07-21 | INTERNATIONAL | Olaussen, Alf M. 58 | 1942-07-21 | Olaussen, Alf M. | Manhattan | NY | |||
9527 | 9527 | 1960-07-27 | French Colonial Supply Mission (for the Account of the Governor of Martinique) (F.W.I.) | 1944-07-29 | FRANCE | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 62 | 1942-07-27 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) | New York | NY | |||
9676 | 9676 | 1964-07-31 | Italian Airlines | 1953-09-18 | ITALY | Kelly, Nason, Inc. 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
9677 | 9677 | 1964-07-31 | Italian National Tourist Office | 1950-03-24 | ITALY | Kelly, Nason, Inc. 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
9679 | 9679 | 1964-07-31 | Japan Tourist Association | 1960-03-03 | JAPAN | Kelly, Nason, Inc. 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
9680 | 9680 | 1964-07-31 | Japan Trade Center/Japan Camera Information & Service Center | 1956-04-13 | JAPAN | Kelly, Nason, Inc. 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
9681 | 9681 | 1964-07-31 | Japan Travel Information Office/Japan Travel Bureau | 1953-09-18 | JAPAN | Kelly, Nason, Inc. 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
9693 | 9693 | 1964-07-31 | Spanish State Tourist Department | 1950-03-24 | SPAIN | Kelly, Nason, Inc. 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
9644 | 9644 | 1943-07-31 | J. Zoltowski, Financial Counselor of the Embassy of Poland in Washington | 1942-08-01 | POLAND | Nagorski, Bohdan 76 | 1942-08-01 | Nagorski, Bohdan | New York | NY | |||
10084 | 10084 | 1942-08-03 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-08-03 | SPAIN | Larcegui, Francisco de S. 80 | 1942-08-03 | Larcegui, Francisco de S. | New York | NY | |||
10578 | 10578 | 1972-08-17 | Alfred Falter | 1942-08-03 | CANADA | Gdynia American Line, Inc. 81 | 1942-08-03 | Gdynia American Line, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
4275 | 4275 | 1944-03-31 | American Friends of Polish Democracy | 1942-08-07 | POLAND | Lazell, Reverend J. Arthur 85 | 1942-08-07 | Lazell, Reverend J. Arthur | New York | NY | |||
4276 | 4276 | 1944-03-31 | New Europe | 1942-08-07 | POLAND | Lazell, Reverend J. Arthur 85 | 1942-08-07 | Lazell, Reverend J. Arthur | New York | NY | |||
4277 | 4277 | 1944-03-31 | Polish Labor Group (Poland Fights")" | 1942-12-21 | POLAND | Lazell, Reverend J. Arthur 85 | 1942-08-07 | Lazell, Reverend J. Arthur | New York | NY | |||
2390 | 2390 | 1947-02-12 | Republic of Estonia | 1942-08-12 | ESTONIA | Markus, Johannes Ernst 90 | 1942-08-12 | Markus, Johannes Ernst | New York | NY | |||
2391 | 2391 | 1947-02-12 | Republic of Estonia | 1942-08-12 | USSR | Jaakson, Ernst Rudolf 91 | 1942-08-12 | Jaakson, Ernst Rudolf | New York | NY | |||
4130 | 4130 | 1944-03-29 | People of Latvia | 1942-08-25 | LATVIA | Latvian World Alliance 107 | 1942-08-25 | Latvian World Alliance | New York | NY | |||
2797 | 2797 | 1947-02-26 | Amtorg Trading Corporation | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | New York | NY | |||
2799 | 2799 | 1947-02-26 | Artkino Pictures, Inc. | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | New York | NY | |||
11446 | 11446 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | Mendez, Cristina 115 | 1942-09-09 | Mendez, Cristina | New York | NY | |||
11447 | 11447 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | Mezquita, Teresa 116 | 1942-09-09 | Mezquita, Teresa | New York | NY | |||
11448 | 11448 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | Orta, Pilar 117 | 1942-09-09 | Orta, Pilar | New York | NY | |||
11449 | 11449 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | Mezquita, Manuel 118 | 1942-09-09 | Mezquita, Manuel | New York | NY | |||
3463 | 3463 | 1943-03-06 | Byk, Inc. | 1942-09-10 | GERMANY | Goepel, C.P. 120 | 1942-09-10 | Goepel, C.P. | New York | NY | |||
11478 | 11478 | 1942-09-10 | G.H. Mumm Champagne (Societe Vinicole de Champagne Successors) & Associates, Inc. | 1942-09-10 | GERMANY | Goepel, C.P. 120 | 1942-09-10 | Goepel, C.P. | New York | NY | |||
8950 | 8950 | 1945-07-02 | E.C. Zimmerman (Trade Commissioner for the Netherlands Indies) | 1942-09-21 | NETHERLANDS | American Spice Trade Association, Inc. 126 | 1942-09-21 | American Spice Trade Association, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
15058 | 15058 | 1944-12-13 | Barclay's Bank, Ltd. | 1942-10-05 | CANADA | Doremus & Company 134 | 1942-10-05 | Doremus & Company | New York | NY | |||
15061 | 15061 | 1944-12-13 | Central News, Ltd. | 1944-12-13 | CANADA | Doremus & Company 134 | 1942-10-05 | Doremus & Company | New York | NY | |||
15062 | 15062 | 1944-12-13 | Dominion of Canada | 1943-05-11 | CANADA | Doremus & Company 134 | 1942-10-05 | Doremus & Company | New York | NY | |||
15064 | 15064 | 1944-12-13 | Hudson Bay Mining & Smelting Company, Ltd. | 1942-10-05 | CANADA | Doremus & Company 134 | 1942-10-05 | Doremus & Company | New York | NY | |||
12691 | 12691 | 1942-10-15 | Teleradio News Agency | 1942-10-15 | FRANCE | D'Aumale, Claude 141 | 1942-10-15 | D'Aumale, Claude | New York | NY | |||
12884 | 12884 | 1942-10-21 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-10-21 | FRANCE | Finley, Blanche 145 | 1942-10-21 | Finley, Blanche | New York | NY | |||
12941 | 12941 | 1942-10-23 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-10-23 | FRANCE | Le Branchu, Jean-Yves 148 | 1942-10-23 | Le Branchu, Jean-Yves | New York | NY | |||
12433 | 12433 | 1942-10-02 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-10-29 | FRANCE | Cartier, Pierre C. 150 | 1942-10-29 | Cartier, Pierre C. | New York | NY | |||
6493 | 6493 | 1945-05-13 | Morimura Brothers Employees' Benefit Fund | 1942-11-13 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6494 | 6494 | 1945-05-13 | Hango Sumii | 1942-11-13 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6495 | 6495 | 1945-05-13 | Itsuyo Nakayama | 1943-05-21 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6496 | 6496 | 1945-05-13 | J. Tomohiko Midzuno | 1942-11-13 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6497 | 6497 | 1945-05-13 | Kazue Sumii | 1942-11-13 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6498 | 6498 | 1945-05-13 | Kohji Katoh | 1942-11-13 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6499 | 6499 | 1945-05-13 | Morimura Brothers, Inc. | 1942-11-13 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6500 | 6500 | 1945-05-13 | Takeo Nakayama | 1943-05-21 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
6501 | 6501 | 1945-05-13 | Yonosuke Maenami | 1942-11-13 | JAPAN | Bossowick, Irving 157 | 1942-11-13 | Bossowick, Irving | New York | NY | |||
4025 | 4025 | 1943-03-25 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-12-09 | FRANCE | Maurois, Andre' 162 | 1942-12-09 | Maurois, Andre' | New York | NY | |||
15002 | 15002 | 1942-12-11 | French Information Center, Inc. | 1942-12-11 | FRANCE | Polk, Frank L. 163 | 1942-12-11 | Polk, Frank L. | New York | NY | |||
15647 | 15647 | 1966-12-31 | Chambre de Commerce Francaise de New York | 1943-01-01 | FRANCE | French Chamber of Commerce of the U.S., Inc. 167 | 1943-01-01 | French Chamber of Commerce of the U.S., Inc. | New York | NY | |||
9353 | 9353 | 1944-07-19 | Swedish Industries Fund | 1943-01-19 | SWEDEN | Franzen, Knut Gosta 174 | 1943-01-19 | Franzen, Knut Gosta | New York | NY | |||
6518 | 6518 | 1943-05-14 | Johannes Kaiv, Consul General of Estonia | 1943-05-14 | USSR | Beck, P.A. 191 | 1943-05-14 | Beck, P.A. | New York | NY | |||
10748 | 10748 | 1945-08-26 | No foreign principal listed | 1943-08-26 | NORWAY | Norwegian Masters' Association Overseas Branch 204 | 1943-08-26 | Norwegian Masters' Association Overseas Branch | New York | NY | |||
6124 | 6124 | 1946-05-01 | Comite Francais de Liberation Nationale | 1943-10-25 | FRANCE | France Amerique Corporation 218 | 1943-10-25 | France Amerique Corporation | New York | NY | |||
7304 | 7304 | 1944-06-01 | Co-ordinator of Inter-American Affairs | 1943-12-01 | UNKNOWN | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
7306 | 7306 | 1944-06-01 | Knickerbocker Weekly (Dutch) | 1943-12-01 | NETHERLANDS | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
7307 | 7307 | 1944-06-01 | Norte (Latin-American Monthly) | 1943-12-01 | UNKNOWN | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
7308 | 7308 | 1944-06-01 | Office of War Information | 1943-12-01 | HUNGARY | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
7309 | 7309 | 1944-06-01 | Polish Information Center | 1943-12-01 | POLAND | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
7310 | 7310 | 1944-06-01 | Pour la Victoire (Free French Weekly) | 1943-12-01 | FRANCE | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
7311 | 7311 | 1944-06-01 | United Nations Information Office | 1943-12-01 | UNKNOWN | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
7312 | 7312 | 1944-06-01 | Yugoslav Information Center | 1943-12-01 | YUGOSLAVIA | Derso & Kelen 222 | 1943-12-01 | Derso & Kelen | New York | NY | |||
9578 | 9578 | 1949-07-29 | Dr. Jose A. de Aguirre | 1944-01-29 | MEXICO | De Irala, Antonio 232 | 1944-01-29 | De Irala, Antonio | New York | NY | |||
11316 | 11316 | 1944-09-02 | No foreign principal listed (Works on own behalf by the permission from the French Commander in Chief) | 1944-03-02 | FRANCE | Maurois, Andre' 238 | 1944-03-02 | Maurois, Andre' | New York | NY | |||
11391 | 11391 | 1945-09-06 | Moslem People of the World | 1944-03-06 | INDIA | Ahmed, Shaikh Muzaffar 240 | 1944-03-06 | Ahmed, Shaikh Muzaffar | New York | NY | |||
8184 | 8184 | 1945-06-30 | Netherland-America Foundation, Inc. | 1944-04-29 | NETHERLANDS | Cecil & Presbrey, Inc. 249 | 1944-04-29 | Cecil & Presbrey, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
14142 | 14142 | 1945-11-22 | Czechoslovak Arms Manufacturing Corporation Czechoslovak Zbrojovka, A.S. | 1944-05-22 | CZECHOSLOVAKIA | North American Machine Tool Manufacturing Corporation 255 | 1944-05-22 | North American Machine Tool Manufacturing Corporation | New York | NY | |||
14255 | 14255 | 1953-11-26 | Republic of Estonia | 1944-05-26 | ESTONIA | Pusta, Kaarel Robert 256 | 1944-05-26 | Pusta, Kaarel Robert | New York | NY | |||
7313 | 7313 | 1947-06-01 | Republic of Lithuania | 1944-06-01 | LITHUANIA | Grinius, Kazys Vincent 258 | 1944-06-01 | Grinius, Kazys Vincent | New York | NY | |||
9166 | 9166 | 1947-07-11 | Jose Antonio de Aguiree (Only name listed as foreign principal/regarding the Basque Government) | 1944-07-11 | SPAIN | De Aguirre, Jose Antonio 270 | 1944-07-11 | De Aguirre, Jose Antonio | New York | NY | |||
1618 | 1618 | 1952-01-30 | Espana Libre | 1947-01-31 | MEXICO | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | New York | NY | |||
1624 | 1624 | 1952-01-30 | Spanish Confederated Societies of New York | 1947-01-31 | SPAIN | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | NY | ||||
1063 | 1063 | 1945-01-04 | No Foreign Principal Listed (Cuba mentioned on initial statement as country) | 1945-01-04 | CUBA | Cuban Chamber of Commerce in the U.S., Inc. 287 | 1945-01-04 | Cuban Chamber of Commerce in the U.S., Inc. | New York | NY | |||
7663 | 7663 | 1945-06-08 | Polish Government Information Center | 1945-02-21 | POLAND | Gantkowski, Romuald 292 | 1945-02-21 | Gantkowski, Romuald | New York | NY | |||
5153 | 5153 | 1946-04-11 | C.H.W. Hasselriis | 1945-04-11 | DENMARK | Friends of Denmark, Inc. 300 | 1945-04-11 | Friends of Denmark, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
13148 | 13148 | 1946-10-30 | Swedish Travel Information Bureau, Inc. | 1945-04-30 | SWEDEN | Film Preview 303 | 1945-04-30 | Film Preview | New York | NY | |||
7618 | 7618 | 1946-06-06 | Swedish Travel Information Bureau | 1945-06-08 | SWEDEN | College Film Center 304 | 1945-06-08 | College Film Center | New York | NY | |||
14886 | 14886 | 1945-12-08 | Syndicat Des Marins De France | 1945-06-08 | FRANCE | Syndicat Des Marins De France 305 | 1945-06-08 | Syndicat Des Marins De France | New York | NY | |||
9314 | 9314 | 1947-07-17 | French Press & Information Service | 1945-07-17 | FRANCE | L'Echo de l'Quest, Inc. 309 | 1945-07-17 | L'Echo de l'Quest, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
8796 | 8796 | 1945-07-01 | London-Polish Governments Information Center | 1945-10-08 | INTERNATIONAL | New Europe, Inc. 323 | 1945-10-08 | New Europe, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
12748 | 12748 | 1945-10-16 | Polish Government Information Center | 1945-10-16 | POLAND | Rathaus, Rudolf 326 | 1945-10-16 | Rathaus, Rudolf | New York | NY | |||
6416 | 6416 | 1946-05-09 | Swiss Federal Railroads | 1945-11-09 | SWITZERLAND | Maxwell Dane, Inc. 330 | 1945-11-09 | Maxwell Dane, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
13193 | 13193 | 1945-10-31 | Various individuals abroad who have received contributions from the Party | 1945-12-13 | INTERNATIONAL | Socialist Workers' Party 332 | 1945-12-13 | Socialist Workers' Party | New York | NY | |||
15548 | 15548 | 1955-12-31 | Francisco Sugar Company | 1946-03-07 | CUBA | U.S.-Cuban Sugar Council 347 | 1946-03-07 | U.S.-Cuban Sugar Council | New York | NY | |||
15550 | 15550 | 1955-12-31 | Manati Sugar Company | 1946-03-07 | CUBA | U.S.-Cuban Sugar Council 347 | 1946-03-07 | U.S.-Cuban Sugar Council | New York | NY |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );