FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
71 rows where Address_1 = "Manila"
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. 3
- Marckrey 3
- O'Donnell, John A. 3
- Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey 2
- Crowell & Moring International, LLC 2
- Galland, Kharasch, Calkins & Short, P.C. 2
- Galland, Kharasch, Morse & Garfinkle, P.C. 2
- Letitia Baldrige Enterprises, Inc. 2
- Liljenquist, L. Blaine 2
- Marias, Joseph Francis 2
- McDaniel, John Shepherd 2
- Philippine Tourist & Travel Association 2
- Romero, Jose E. 2
- APCO Worldwide, Inc. 1
- ASEAN Promotional Chapter for Tourism - North America 1
- Adams, John B. 1
- Andres, Voltaire F.T. 1
- August Group, Inc. 1
- Bannerman & Associates, Inc. 1
- Beveridge & Diamond, P.C. 1
- Braden Toureast, Inc. 1
- Burson-Marsteller 1
- Chwat/Weigend Associates 1
- Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP 1
- Coudert Brothers 1
- Dailey & Associates 1
- Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 1
- Doremus & Company 1
- Dublirer, Haydon, Straci & Victor 1
- EMB, Ltd. 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Republic of the Philippines 9
- Government of the Philippines 5
- Government of the Republic of the Philippines 3
- Bataan Export Processing Zone Authority 2
- Compania Maritima 2
- Philippine Airlines, Inc. 2
- Philippine Convention Bureau 2
- Philippine Sugar Association 2
- Philippine Sugar Institute 2
- United Coconut Association of the Philippines 2
- APEC Foundation, Philippines, Inc. 1
- ASEAN Permanent Committee on Tourism 1
- Asia Pacific Economic Cooperation of the Philippines, Inc. 1
- Baginda Sultan Haji Mohammad Julaspi Kiram 1
- Benigno P. Toda, Jr., Chairman of the Philippine Airlines 1
- Central Bank of the Philippines 1
- Chamber of Philippine Manufacturers', Exporters' & Tourism Association 1
- Commissioner Benedicto Padilla 1
- Commissioner Jose Lingad (Chairman of the Tobacco Board - Bureau of Internal Revenue 1
- Continental Manufacturing Corporation, Government of the Philippines 1
- Department of Tourism, Republic of the Philippines 1
- Eduardo M. Cojuangco, Jr. 1
- Export Processing Zone Authority 1
- Filipine Shipowners Association 1
- Garment and Textile Export Board (GTEB) 1
- Government of the Republic of the Philippines Department of Trade and Industry 1
- Honorable Carlos P. Romulo 1
- Honorable Jose D. Aspiras - Secretary - Department of Tourism - Manila, Philippines 1
- Lucio Tan Group (Through Vincent Gaughan, Attorney) 1
- Manila Hotel Corporation 1
- …
Country/Location_Represented 3
State 1
- - 71
City 1
- - 71
Link | rowid ▼ | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
808 | 808 | 1970-01-01 | National Federation of Sugarcane Planters | 1962-03-01 | PHILIPPINES | O'Donnell, John A. 1194 | 1959-01-29 | O'Donnell, John A. | Manila | ||||
809 | 809 | 1970-01-01 | Philippine Sugar Association | 1959-04-06 | PHILIPPINES | O'Donnell, John A. 1194 | 1959-01-29 | O'Donnell, John A. | Manila | ||||
948 | 948 | 1992-01-01 | Government of the Republic of the Philippines | 1988-08-04 | PHILIPPINES | Bannerman & Associates, Inc. 3964 | 1987-04-28 | Bannerman & Associates, Inc. | Manila | ||||
1224 | 1224 | 1994-01-11 | United Coconut Association of the Philippines | 1993-03-03 | PHILIPPINES | Foley Hoag, LLP 4776 | 1993-03-02 | Foley Hoag, LLP | Manila | ||||
1627 | 1627 | 1961-01-30 | Vice President Diosdado Macapagal | 1961-01-30 | PHILIPPINES | Milburn McCarty Associates, Inc. 1422 | 1961-01-30 | Milburn McCarty Associates, Inc. | Manila | ||||
1690 | 1690 | 1969-01-31 | Philippine Tourist & Travel Association | 1968-05-09 | PHILIPPINES | Braden Toureast, Inc. 2091 | 1968-05-09 | Braden Toureast, Inc. | Manila | ||||
1959 | 1959 | 1957-02-01 | Philippine Sugar Association | 1955-02-01 | PHILIPPINES | Romero, Jose E. 870 | 1955-02-01 | Romero, Jose E. | Manila | ||||
1960 | 1960 | 1957-02-01 | Philippine Sugar Institute | 1955-02-01 | PHILIPPINES | Romero, Jose E. 870 | 1955-02-01 | Romero, Jose E. | Manila | ||||
2214 | 2214 | 1979-02-05 | Bataan Export Processing Zone Authority | 1979-02-06 | PHILIPPINES | Marckrey 2631 | 1975-11-14 | Marckrey | Manila | ||||
2215 | 2215 | 1979-02-05 | Philippine Departmeent of Tourism | 1979-02-06 | PHILIPPINES | Marckrey 2631 | 1975-11-14 | Marckrey | Manila | ||||
2283 | 2283 | 1983-02-08 | Philippine Airlines, Inc. | 1974-02-06 | PHILIPPINES | Galland, Kharasch, Calkins & Short, P.C. 1051 | 1957-07-09 | Galland, Kharasch, Calkins & Short, P.C. | Manila | ||||
2377 | 2377 | 1980-02-11 | Export Processing Zone Authority | 1975-10-21 | PHILIPPINES | August Group, Inc. 2620 | 1975-10-21 | August Group, Inc. | Manila | ||||
2463 | 2463 | 1949-02-14 | Compania Maritima | 1949-02-14 | PHILIPPINES | Marias, Joseph Francis 563 | 1949-02-14 | Marias, Joseph Francis | Manila | ||||
2744 | 2744 | 1986-02-24 | Chamber of Philippine Manufacturers', Exporters' & Tourism Association | 1985-11-23 | PHILIPPINES | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey 3600 | 1984-06-14 | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey | Manila | ||||
2920 | 2920 | 1976-02-28 | Department of Tourism, Republic of the Philippines | 1974-05-15 | PHILIPPINES | Far East Express 2513 | 1974-05-15 | Far East Express | Manila | ||||
3483 | 3483 | 1992-03-06 | Philippine Coconut Authority | 1991-01-11 | PHILIPPINES | Melcher, John 4462 | 1991-01-11 | Melcher, John | Manila | ||||
3528 | 3528 | 2000-03-08 | Sergio Osmena, III, Philippine Senate | 1999-09-24 | PHILIPPINES | Troutman Sanders, LLP 5329 | 1999-09-24 | Troutman Sanders, LLP | Manila | ||||
3976 | 3976 | 1994-03-22 | Republic of the Philippines | 1993-04-09 | PHILIPPINES | APCO Worldwide, Inc. 4561 | 1991-09-03 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | Manila | ||||
4013 | 4013 | 1993-03-24 | Republic of the Philippines | 1989-09-26 | PHILIPPINES | Fidelity Pacific Group, L.P. 4300 | 1989-09-26 | Fidelity Pacific Group, L.P. | Manila | ||||
5396 | 5396 | 1958-04-19 | Republic of the Philippines | 1957-06-24 | PHILIPPINES | Furness, Robert Charles 1041 | 1957-06-24 | Furness, Robert Charles | Manila | ||||
5399 | 5399 | 1963-04-19 | Government of the Philippines | 1961-05-09 | PHILIPPINES | Adams, John B. 1451 | 1961-05-09 | Adams, John B. | Manila | ||||
5456 | 5456 | 1988-04-21 | Philippine Convention Bureau | 1987-09-09 | PHILIPPINES | Sykes, Joseph Stuart 4036 | 1987-09-09 | Sykes, Joseph Stuart | Manila | ||||
5759 | 5759 | 1998-04-29 | Asia Pacific Economic Cooperation of the Philippines, Inc. | 1996-08-09 | PHILIPPINES | Crowell & Moring International, LLC 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | Manila | ||||
5761 | 5761 | 1998-04-29 | Government of the Republic of the Philippines Department of Trade and Industry | 1996-03-14 | PHILIPPINES | Crowell & Moring International, LLC 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | Manila | ||||
6550 | 6550 | 1976-05-15 | Benigno P. Toda, Jr., Chairman of the Philippine Airlines | 1976-04-06 | PHILIPPINES | Letitia Baldrige Enterprises, Inc. 2679 | 1976-04-06 | Letitia Baldrige Enterprises, Inc. | Manila | ||||
6551 | 6551 | 1976-05-15 | Manila Hotel Corporation | 1976-05-19 | PHILIPPINES | Letitia Baldrige Enterprises, Inc. 2679 | 1976-04-06 | Letitia Baldrige Enterprises, Inc. | Manila | ||||
6661 | 6661 | 1962-05-20 | Commissioner Benedicto Padilla | 1961-10-13 | PHILIPPINES | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | Manila | ||||
6944 | 6944 | 1988-05-30 | Government of the Philippines | 1987-01-20 | PHILIPPINES | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | Manila | ||||
7031 | 7031 | 1964-05-31 | Republic of the Philippines, Department of Agriculture & Natural Resources, ABACA Development Board | 1963-06-12 | PHILIPPINES | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | Manila | ||||
7362 | 7362 | 1976-06-01 | Bataan Export Processing Zone Authority | 1976-05-14 | PHILIPPINES | Marckrey 2631 | 1975-11-14 | Marckrey | Manila | ||||
7620 | 7620 | 1947-06-06 | USAFFE Veterans of the Philippines | 1947-06-06 | PHILIPPINES | USAFFE Veterans Mission 469 | 1947-06-06 | USAFFE Veterans Mission | Manila | ||||
7848 | 7848 | 1993-06-15 | United Coconut Association of the Philippines | 1987-09-03 | PHILIPPINES | Reichler & Soble 3582 | 1984-05-09 | Reichler & Soble | Manila | ||||
8388 | 8388 | 1984-06-30 | Philippine Convention Bureau | 1982-03-03 | PHILIPPINES | Dailey & Associates 2299 | 1971-12-27 | Dailey & Associates | Manila | ||||
8417 | 8417 | 1987-06-30 | Lucio Tan Group (Through Vincent Gaughan, Attorney) | 1987-01-28 | PHILIPPINES | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Manila | ||||
8499 | 8499 | 1992-06-30 | Eduardo M. Cojuangco, Jr. | 1989-12-04 | PHILIPPINES | Chwat/Weigend Associates 4320 | 1989-12-04 | Chwat/Weigend Associates | Manila | ||||
8868 | 8868 | 1987-07-01 | Republic of the Philippines | 1986-09-26 | PHILIPPINES | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | Manila | ||||
9178 | 9178 | 1977-07-11 | Philippine Sugar Institute | 1970-05-08 | PHILIPPINES | O'Donnell, John A. 1194 | 1959-01-29 | O'Donnell, John A. | Manila | ||||
9342 | 9342 | 1974-07-18 | Honorable Jose D. Aspiras - Secretary - Department of Tourism - Manila, Philippines | 1974-04-17 | PHILIPPINES | Andres, Voltaire F.T. 2427 | 1973-05-10 | Andres, Voltaire F.T. | Manila | ||||
9653 | 9653 | 1960-07-31 | Honorable Carlos P. Romulo | 1957-11-13 | PHILIPPINES | Liljenquist, L. Blaine 1081 | 1957-11-13 | Liljenquist, L. Blaine | Manila | ||||
9654 | 9654 | 1960-07-31 | Philippine Coconut Administration | 1957-11-13 | PHILIPPINES | Liljenquist, L. Blaine 1081 | 1957-11-13 | Liljenquist, L. Blaine | Manila | ||||
9775 | 9775 | 1990-07-31 | Government of the Philippines | 1990-03-29 | PHILIPPINES | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 3657 | 1985-03-12 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | Manila | ||||
10024 | 10024 | 1994-08-01 | Republic of the Philippines | 1993-04-16 | PHILIPPINES | GCI Group, Inc. 3856 | 1986-07-11 | GCI Group, Inc. | Manila | ||||
10067 | 10067 | 1956-08-02 | Compania Maritima | 1951-04-18 | PHILIPPINES | Marias, Joseph Francis 671 | 1951-04-18 | Marias, Joseph Francis | Manila | ||||
10244 | 10244 | 2003-08-09 | Government of the Philippines | 1991-05-30 | PHILIPPINES | Fasturn, Inc. 2944 | 1978-08-09 | Fasturn, Inc. | Manila | ||||
10324 | 10324 | 1993-08-13 | Republic of the Philippines, Presidential Committee in the Battaan Nuclear Power Plant | 1993-05-28 | PHILIPPINES | Hofman, Steven I. 4810 | 1993-05-28 | Hofman, Steven I. | Manila | ||||
10576 | 10576 | 1965-08-17 | Philippine Airlines, Inc. | 1963-01-30 | PHILIPPINES | Galland, Kharasch, Calkins & Short, P.C. 1051 | 1957-07-09 | Galland, Kharasch, Calkins & Short, P.C. | Manila | ||||
10591 | 10591 | 1954-08-18 | Nacionalista Party of the Philippines | 1954-08-18 | PHILIPPINES | McDaniel, John Shepherd 841 | 1954-08-18 | McDaniel, John Shepherd | Manila | ||||
10592 | 10592 | 1954-08-18 | Republic of the Philippines | 1954-08-18 | PHILIPPINES | McDaniel, John Shepherd 841 | 1954-08-18 | McDaniel, John Shepherd | Manila | ||||
11386 | 11386 | 1997-09-05 | Garment and Textile Export Board (GTEB) | 1996-03-27 | PHILIPPINES | Graham & James, L.L.P. 3275 | 1981-09-23 | Graham & James, L.L.P. | Manila | ||||
11609 | 11609 | 1962-09-15 | Central Bank of the Philippines | 1959-09-15 | PHILIPPINES | EMB, Ltd. 1270 | 1959-09-15 | EMB, Ltd. | Manila | ||||
12529 | 12529 | 1982-10-07 | Meja Management & Development Group, Inc. | 1981-10-07 | PHILIPPINES | Coudert Brothers 3287 | 1981-10-07 | Coudert Brothers | Manila | ||||
12641 | 12641 | 1964-10-13 | Commissioner Jose Lingad (Chairman of the Tobacco Board - Bureau of Internal Revenue | 1962-11-14 | PHILIPPINES | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | Manila | ||||
12672 | 12672 | 1988-10-14 | Philippine Airlines | 1988-04-21 | PHILIPPINES | Galland, Kharasch, Morse & Garfinkle, P.C. 4006 | 1987-06-23 | Galland, Kharasch, Morse & Garfinkle, P.C. | Manila | ||||
12718 | 12718 | 1991-10-15 | Baginda Sultan Haji Mohammad Julaspi Kiram | 1987-04-15 | SULU AND NORTH BORNEO | Dublirer, Haydon, Straci & Victor 3961 | 1987-04-15 | Dublirer, Haydon, Straci & Victor | Manila | ||||
12785 | 12785 | 1949-10-17 | Republic of the Philippines | 1949-10-17 | PHILIPPINES | Pacis, Vicente Albano 592 | 1949-10-17 | Pacis, Vicente Albano | Manila | ||||
13430 | 13430 | 2006-10-31 | Government of the Republic of the Philippines | 2001-10-05 | PHILIPPINES | Burson-Marsteller 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | Manila | ||||
13767 | 13767 | 1995-11-06 | Government of the Philippines | 1991-06-03 | PHILIPPINES | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon 3200 | 1981-02-18 | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon | Manila | ||||
13846 | 13846 | 1989-11-09 | Union for National Action | 1989-02-07 | PHILIPPINES | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey 3600 | 1984-06-14 | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey | Manila | ||||
13860 | 13860 | 1978-11-10 | Republic of the Philippines | 1977-11-04 | PHILIPPINES | Doremus & Company 2319 | 1972-02-18 | Doremus & Company | Manila | ||||
14052 | 14052 | 1954-11-18 | Filipine Shipowners Association | 1953-11-18 | PHILIPPINES | Pierson, Ball & Dowd 799 | 1953-11-18 | Pierson, Ball & Dowd | Manila | ||||
14407 | 14407 | 1990-11-30 | Continental Manufacturing Corporation, Government of the Philippines | 1989-11-22 | PHILIPPINES | World Trade Link 4317 | 1989-11-22 | World Trade Link | Manila | ||||
14464 | 14464 | 1996-11-30 | APEC Foundation, Philippines, Inc. | 1996-11-12 | PHILIPPINES | Icon Group 4926 | 1994-07-08 | Icon Group | Manila | ||||
15069 | 15069 | 1989-12-13 | Philippine Food Processors' & Exporters' Organization, Inc. | 1989-07-17 | PHILIPPINES | Beveridge & Diamond, P.C. 4270 | 1989-07-17 | Beveridge & Diamond, P.C. | Manila | ||||
15328 | 15328 | 1999-12-22 | ASEAN Permanent Committee on Tourism | 1977-01-04 | INTERNATIONAL | ASEAN Promotional Chapter for Tourism - North America 2744 | 1977-01-04 | ASEAN Promotional Chapter for Tourism - North America | Manila | ||||
15358 | 15358 | 1995-12-23 | Orient Airlines Association | 1988-04-21 | PHILIPPINES | Galland, Kharasch, Morse & Garfinkle, P.C. 4006 | 1987-06-23 | Galland, Kharasch, Morse & Garfinkle, P.C. | Manila | ||||
15460 | 15460 | 1961-12-30 | President of the Philippines, Carlos P. Garcia | 1960-11-29 | PHILIPPINES | Erana, Mariano A. 1411 | 1960-11-29 | Erana, Mariano A. | Manila | ||||
15614 | 15614 | 1961-12-31 | Philippine Tourist & Travel Association, Inc. | 1961-09-08 | PHILIPPINES | George Peabody & Associates, Inc. 768 | 1953-05-26 | George Peabody & Associates, Inc. | Manila | ||||
15687 | 15687 | 1972-12-31 | Government of the Republic of the Philippines | 1959-01-29 | PHILIPPINES | Philippine Tourist & Travel Association 1195 | 1959-01-29 | Philippine Tourist & Travel Association | Manila | ||||
15691 | 15691 | 1972-12-31 | Republic of the Philippines | 1971-02-14 | PHILIPPINES | Philippine Tourist & Travel Association 1195 | 1959-01-29 | Philippine Tourist & Travel Association | Manila | ||||
15969 | 15969 | 1986-12-31 | Ministry of Information, New Republic of the Philippines | 1986-09-15 | PHILIPPINES | Sawyer Miller Group 3777 | 1986-02-12 | Sawyer Miller Group | Manila | ||||
16073 | 16073 | 1988-12-31 | Philippine Sugar Commission | 1983-01-10 | PHILIPPINES | Harding, Ralph R. 3434 | 1983-01-10 | Harding, Ralph R. | Manila |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );