FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
96 rows where Address_1 = "London, England" sorted by rowid descending
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Registrant_Name >30
- Larson & Taylor 7
- Adamczyk, Alojzy 3
- Gdynia American Line, Inc. 3
- Polish Labor Group 3
- Austrian Labor Committee 2
- Caples Company 2
- Davis, Polk & Wardell 2
- Gantkowski, Romuald 2
- Golembe Associates, Inc. 2
- James F. Fox, Inc. 2
- Lindgren, Ethel John 2
- Malinowski, Wladyslaw R. 2
- Miller & Chevalier 2
- African Research & Development Company, Inc. 1
- American Chapter of the Religious Emergency Council 1
- Auersperg, Hilda Heriot 1
- Austrian Action, Inc. - Free Austrian Movement 1
- Auten, Harold 1
- Baczynski, Wlodzimierz Jan 1
- Baker, Harold G. 1
- Beckman, Robert M. 1
- Bennett Associates, Inc. 1
- Beyer-Pedersen, Svend-Aage 1
- British Broadcasting Corporation 1
- Campbell-Ewald Company 1
- Catalan National Council (U.S. Delegation) 1
- Cecil & Presbrey, Inc. 1
- Charles W. Hoyt Company, Inc. 1
- Combat Org. Free Poland/Organizacja Bojowa Wolana Polska 1
- De La Sota y Aburto, Manuel 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Central Leadership of the Underground Movement of the Working Masses of Poland 2
- Gdynia America Shipping Lines, Ltd. 2
- Government of Libya 2
- Laker Air Travel, Ltd. 2
- Slovak National Council Abroad 2
- Africa 1963 1
- Agha Hasan Abedi 1
- Alfred Pemberton, Ltd. 1
- Associated British & Irish Railway 1
- Baltic Union Shipbrokers, Ltd. 1
- Bank of Credit & Commerce International, S.A. 1
- Basque Delegation in the U.S.A. 1
- Black Sea & Baltic General Insurance Company 1
- British Council 1
- British Empire Films Party, Ltd., England 1
- British Industries Fair, Ltd. 1
- British National Committee of the International Chamber of Commerce 1
- British Travel Association 1
- Broadcasting House 1
- C.E. Bell, Esquire (Ministry of Technology) 1
- Catalan National Council 1
- Central Office of Information 1
- Central Polish Committee for Relief to Victims of the War 1
- Chief Rabbi's Religious Emergency Council 1
- Confederation of British Industry 1
- Consolidated Iron Resources, Ltd. 1
- Council for the Protection of Foreign Claims 1
- Delegation Abroad of the Austrian Trade Unions (Auslandsvertretung der Freien Gewerkschaften Ocsterreichs) 1
- Director Research & Development, Ministry of Defense 1
- Doremus & Company, Ltd. 1
- …
Country/Location_Represented 14
- GREAT BRITAIN 58
- POLAND 19
- INTERNATIONAL 3
- NORWAY 3
- AUSTRIA 2
- FRANCE 2
- LIBYA 2
- ALBANIA 1
- CZECHOSLOVAKIA 1
- INDIA 1
- NETHERLANDS 1
- SLOVAKIA 1
- TUNISIA 1
- USSR 1
State 1
- - 96
City 1
- - 96
Link | rowid ▲ | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15553 | 15553 | 1955-12-31 | Polish Government in Exhile | 1952-07-02 | POLAND | Lipski, Jozef 733 | 1952-07-02 | Lipski, Jozef | London, England | ||||
15063 | 15063 | 1944-12-13 | Doremus & Company, Ltd. | 1942-10-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Doremus & Company 134 | 1942-10-05 | Doremus & Company | London, England | ||||
14766 | 14766 | 1979-12-03 | Polish Government In Exile | 1977-01-26 | POLAND | Szygowski, Julius 2749 | 1977-01-26 | Szygowski, Julius | London, England | ||||
14289 | 14289 | 1976-11-28 | Royal Mint of Great Britain | 1973-12-28 | GREAT BRITAIN | Mailing List Systems, Ltd. 2484 | 1973-12-28 | Mailing List Systems, Ltd. | London, England | ||||
14206 | 14206 | 1978-11-24 | Bank of Credit & Commerce International, S.A. | 1978-06-06 | GREAT BRITAIN | Golembe Associates, Inc. 2908 | 1978-06-06 | Golembe Associates, Inc. | London, England | ||||
14205 | 14205 | 1978-11-24 | Agha Hasan Abedi | 1978-06-06 | GREAT BRITAIN | Golembe Associates, Inc. 2908 | 1978-06-06 | Golembe Associates, Inc. | London, England | ||||
14160 | 14160 | 1967-11-22 | United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14158 | 14158 | 1967-11-22 | Power Jets (Ministry of Technology) | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14156 | 14156 | 1967-11-22 | National Research Development Corporation | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14155 | 14155 | 1967-11-22 | National Coal Board | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14154 | 14154 | 1967-11-22 | Ministry of Aviation | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14152 | 14152 | 1967-11-22 | Director Research & Development, Ministry of Defense | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14150 | 14150 | 1967-11-22 | C.E. Bell, Esquire (Ministry of Technology) | 1965-04-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Larson & Taylor 1885 | 1965-04-19 | Larson & Taylor | London, England | ||||
14047 | 14047 | 1993-11-17 | Tunisian Association for Freedom | 1992-08-11 | TUNISIA | Pagonis & Donnelly Group, Inc. 3692 | 1985-06-20 | Pagonis & Donnelly Group, Inc. | London, England | ||||
13811 | 13811 | 1953-11-08 | Polish Freedom Movement/Independence & Democracy | 1950-07-10 | POLAND | Polish Freedom Movement 630 | 1950-07-10 | Polish Freedom Movement | London, England | ||||
13720 | 13720 | 1945-11-05 | Zygmunt Kaczynski | 1942-10-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Polish Catholic Press Agency 135 | 1942-10-05 | Polish Catholic Press Agency | London, England | ||||
13693 | 13693 | 1952-11-04 | Josef Josten (Geraldine Kracik)? | 1952-11-04 | GREAT BRITAIN | Kulka, Ervin 745 | 1952-11-04 | Kulka, Ervin | London, England | ||||
13515 | 13515 | 1945-11-01 | Delegation Abroad of the Austrian Trade Unions (Auslandsvertretung der Freien Gewerkschaften Ocsterreichs) | 1944-12-18 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Labor Committee 129 | 1942-09-29 | Austrian Labor Committee | London, England | ||||
13197 | 13197 | 1948-10-31 | Government of Hyderabad (Nawab Moin Nawaz Jung, Agent General) | 1948-09-08 | INDIA | Montgomery, Edward Poor 537 | 1948-09-08 | Montgomery, Edward Poor | London, England | ||||
13196 | 13196 | 1946-10-31 | Polish Trade Union Council | 1943-10-23 | POLAND | Adamczyk, Alojzy 217 | 1943-10-23 | Adamczyk, Alojzy | London, England | ||||
13195 | 13195 | 1946-10-31 | Central Polish Committee for Relief to Victims of the War | 1943-10-23 | POLAND | Adamczyk, Alojzy 217 | 1943-10-23 | Adamczyk, Alojzy | London, England | ||||
13194 | 13194 | 1946-10-31 | Central Leadership of the Underground Movement of the Working Masses of Poland | 1943-10-23 | POLAND | Adamczyk, Alojzy 217 | 1943-10-23 | Adamczyk, Alojzy | London, England | ||||
12947 | 12947 | 1963-10-23 | Alfred Pemberton, Ltd. | 1963-10-23 | GREAT BRITAIN | John Moynahan & Associates 1033 | 1957-06-06 | John Moynahan & Associates | London, England | ||||
12747 | 12747 | 1945-10-16 | Polish Army | 1945-10-16 | POLAND | Rathaus, Rudolf 326 | 1945-10-16 | Rathaus, Rudolf | London, England | ||||
12746 | 12746 | 1945-10-16 | Free Austrian World Movement | 1945-03-08 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Action, Inc. - Free Austrian Movement 295 | 1945-03-08 | Austrian Action, Inc. - Free Austrian Movement | London, England | ||||
12575 | 12575 | 1953-10-10 | Slovak National Council Abroad | 1951-04-10 | GREAT BRITAIN | Slovak National Council Abroad, U.S. Branch 667 | 1951-04-10 | Slovak National Council Abroad, U.S. Branch | London, England | ||||
12522 | 12522 | 1943-10-07 | Chief Rabbi's Religious Emergency Council | 1943-05-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | American Chapter of the Religious Emergency Council 111 | 1942-09-01 | American Chapter of the Religious Emergency Council | London, England | ||||
12481 | 12481 | 1945-10-05 | Government of the Republic of Poland | 1945-10-05 | POLAND | Baczynski, Wlodzimierz Jan 324 | 1945-10-05 | Baczynski, Wlodzimierz Jan | London, England | ||||
12291 | 12291 | 1945-10-01 | International Mercantile Marine Officers' Association | 1943-12-11 | GREAT BRITAIN | Baker, Harold G. 224 | 1943-12-11 | Baker, Harold G. | London, England | ||||
11926 | 11926 | 1970-09-30 | World Coffee Promotion Committee of the International Coffee Organization | 1966-01-04 | INTERNATIONAL | McCann-Erickson, Inc. 1746 | 1964-06-02 | McCann-Erickson, Inc. | London, England | ||||
11597 | 11597 | 1945-09-15 | Catalan National Council | 1942-08-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | Catalan National Council (U.S. Delegation) 83 | 1942-08-07 | Catalan National Council (U.S. Delegation) | London, England | ||||
10883 | 10883 | 1971-08-31 | British Travel Association | 1964-12-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Ogilvy & Mather, Inc. 1826 | 1964-12-03 | Ogilvy & Mather, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10789 | 10789 | 1964-08-28 | British Industries Fair, Ltd. | 1955-01-31 | GREAT BRITAIN | Charles W. Hoyt Company, Inc. 361 | 1946-06-10 | Charles W. Hoyt Company, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10640 | 10640 | 1972-08-21 | Imperial Chemical Industries, Ltd. | 1965-03-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Davis, Polk & Wardell 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | London, England | ||||
10639 | 10639 | 1972-08-21 | Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain & Northern Ireland | 1959-10-23 | GREAT BRITAIN | Davis, Polk & Wardell 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | London, England | ||||
10581 | 10581 | 1972-08-17 | Polish Steamship Agency, Ltd. | 1942-08-03 | POLAND | Gdynia American Line, Inc. 81 | 1942-08-03 | Gdynia American Line, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10580 | 10580 | 1972-08-17 | Gdynia America Shipping Lines, Ltd. | 1942-08-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Gdynia American Line, Inc. 81 | 1942-08-03 | Gdynia American Line, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10579 | 10579 | 1972-08-17 | Baltic Union Shipbrokers, Ltd. | 1942-08-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Gdynia American Line, Inc. 81 | 1942-08-03 | Gdynia American Line, Inc. | London, England | ||||
10314 | 10314 | 1947-08-13 | Mr. de Courcy | 1943-09-20 | GREAT BRITAIN | J.M. Dent & Sons (Canada), Ltd. 179 | 1943-02-12 | J.M. Dent & Sons (Canada), Ltd. | London, England | ||||
9646 | 9646 | 1945-07-31 | Emigrant Representation, Polish Trade Union Council | 1943-10-15 | POLAND | Malinowski, Wladyslaw R. 216 | 1943-10-15 | Malinowski, Wladyslaw R. | London, England | ||||
9612 | 9612 | 1976-07-30 | Laurence French Publications, Ltd. | 1972-09-19 | GREAT BRITAIN | Probe International, Inc. 2379 | 1972-09-19 | Probe International, Inc. | London, England | ||||
9459 | 9459 | 1945-07-25 | World Youth Council | 1945-07-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | Beyer-Pedersen, Svend-Aage 311 | 1945-07-25 | Beyer-Pedersen, Svend-Aage | London, England | ||||
9341 | 9341 | 1973-07-18 | Tricorp | 1973-01-02 | GREAT BRITAIN | Moss International 2401 | 1973-01-02 | Moss International | London, England | ||||
9200 | 9200 | 1991-07-12 | International Primary Market Association | 1990-07-11 | INTERNATIONAL | Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy 1839 | 1965-01-11 | Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy | London, England | ||||
9193 | 9193 | 1945-07-12 | Foreign Committee, Polish Socialist Party | 1943-10-15 | POLAND | Malinowski, Wladyslaw R. 216 | 1943-10-15 | Malinowski, Wladyslaw R. | London, England | ||||
9172 | 9172 | 1951-07-11 | Till Company - Continental, Ltd. | 1950-01-11 | GREAT BRITAIN | Family Export & Shipping Company, Inc. 605 | 1950-01-11 | Family Export & Shipping Company, Inc. | London, England | ||||
9051 | 9051 | 1942-07-07 | Exiled Autonomous Basque Government | 1942-07-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | De La Sota y Macmahon, Ramon 12 | 1942-07-07 | De La Sota y Macmahon, Ramon | London, England | ||||
9030 | 9030 | 1946-07-06 | Basque Delegation in the U.S.A. | 1943-03-10 | GREAT BRITAIN | De La Sota y Aburto, Manuel 5 | 1942-07-06 | De La Sota y Aburto, Manuel | London, England | ||||
8971 | 8971 | 1943-07-03 | British Empire Films Party, Ltd., England | 1942-07-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Auten, Harold 4 | 1942-07-03 | Auten, Harold | London, England | ||||
8230 | 8230 | 1957-06-30 | Royal Norwegian Government | 1944-09-06 | NORWAY | Norwegian-American Chamber of Commerce, Inc. 277 | 1944-09-06 | Norwegian-American Chamber of Commerce, Inc. | London, England | ||||
8208 | 8208 | 1947-06-30 | Foreign Representation, Polish Trade Union Council C/O Jan Kwapinski | 1943-10-14 | POLAND | Polish Labor Group 215 | 1943-10-14 | Polish Labor Group | London, England | ||||
8207 | 8207 | 1947-06-30 | Foreign Committee, Polish Socialist Party C/O Jan Kwapinski | 1943-10-14 | POLAND | Polish Labor Group 215 | 1943-10-14 | Polish Labor Group | London, England | ||||
8206 | 8206 | 1947-06-30 | Central Leadership of the Underground Movement of the Working Masses of Poland | 1943-10-14 | POLAND | Polish Labor Group 215 | 1943-10-14 | Polish Labor Group | London, England | ||||
8175 | 8175 | 1994-06-29 | Lloyd's of London | 1992-10-13 | GREAT BRITAIN | Middleton, Peter J. 4720 | 1992-10-13 | Middleton, Peter J. | London, England | ||||
8087 | 8087 | 1980-06-25 | British National Committee of the International Chamber of Commerce | 1980-03-17 | GREAT BRITAIN | Miller & Chevalier 3094 | 1980-03-17 | Miller & Chevalier | London, England | ||||
7905 | 7905 | 1945-06-18 | King Zog I of Albania | 1943-12-18 | ALBANIA | Kolonia, Peter V. 226 | 1943-12-18 | Kolonia, Peter V. | London, England | ||||
7753 | 7753 | 1944-06-12 | Royal Institute of International Affairs | 1944-06-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Lindgren, Ethel John 262 | 1944-06-12 | Lindgren, Ethel John | London, England | ||||
7752 | 7752 | 1944-06-12 | Royal Anthropological Institute | 1944-06-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Lindgren, Ethel John 262 | 1944-06-12 | Lindgren, Ethel John | London, England | ||||
7665 | 7665 | 1945-06-08 | Tadeusz Bielecki | 1945-02-21 | POLAND | Gantkowski, Romuald 292 | 1945-02-21 | Gantkowski, Romuald | London, England | ||||
7664 | 7664 | 1945-06-08 | Polish National Party | 1945-02-21 | POLAND | Gantkowski, Romuald 292 | 1945-02-21 | Gantkowski, Romuald | London, England | ||||
6879 | 6879 | 1955-05-28 | Polish Political Council | 1950-07-20 | POLAND | Polish Political Council, Working Committee in the U.S. 633 | 1950-07-20 | Polish Political Council, Working Committee in the U.S. | London, England | ||||
6603 | 6603 | 1973-05-16 | Central Office of Information | 1969-10-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | McGraw-Hill Book Company 2164 | 1969-10-08 | McGraw-Hill Book Company | London, England | ||||
6520 | 6520 | 1946-05-14 | Norwegian Seamens' Union | 1942-11-14 | NORWAY | Norwegian Seamens' Assocation 158 | 1942-11-14 | Norwegian Seamens' Assocation | London, England | ||||
6519 | 6519 | 1943-05-14 | Norwegian Federation of Labour | 1943-05-14 | NORWAY | Lie, Haakon Steen 192 | 1943-05-14 | Lie, Haakon Steen | London, England | ||||
6502 | 6502 | 1946-05-13 | British Council | 1946-05-13 | GREAT BRITAIN | Franklin Spier, Inc. 358 | 1946-05-13 | Franklin Spier, Inc. | London, England | ||||
6467 | 6467 | 1958-05-12 | Joseph Josten, Information Service of Free Czechoslovakia | 1952-05-12 | CZECHOSLOVAKIA | Kracik, Jarmila 725 | 1952-05-12 | Kracik, Jarmila | London, England | ||||
6438 | 6438 | 1991-05-10 | Consolidated Iron Resources, Ltd. | 1991-03-15 | GREAT BRITAIN | Swidler Berlin Shereff Friedman, LLP 4079 | 1988-01-07 | Swidler Berlin Shereff Friedman, LLP | London, England | ||||
5766 | 5766 | 1944-04-30 | Netherland Publishing Company, Ltd. | 1943-10-30 | NETHERLANDS | Haagens, Gerard E. 221 | 1943-10-30 | Haagens, Gerard E. | London, England | ||||
5615 | 5615 | 1979-04-27 | Laker Air Travel, Ltd. | 1979-03-24 | GREAT BRITAIN | Laker, Freddie A. 2872 | 1978-03-24 | Laker, Freddie A. | London, England | ||||
5575 | 5575 | 1977-04-25 | Wasey Campbell-Ewald, Ltd. | 1975-05-12 | GREAT BRITAIN | Campbell-Ewald Company 2583 | 1975-05-12 | Campbell-Ewald Company | London, England | ||||
5570 | 5570 | 1960-04-25 | Travel Associaiton (Tourist Division of the British Tourist & Holidays Board) | 1960-04-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | Cecil & Presbrey, Inc. 622 | 1950-04-25 | Cecil & Presbrey, Inc. | London, England | ||||
5035 | 5035 | 1991-04-05 | Laszlo Bekeffi | 1948-10-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Goerl, Albert 541 | 1948-10-05 | Goerl, Albert | London, England | ||||
5028 | 5028 | 1951-04-05 | Slovak National Council Abroad | 1951-04-05 | SLOVAKIA | Pridavok, Peter P. 666 | 1951-04-05 | Pridavok, Peter P. | London, England | ||||
4868 | 4868 | 1980-04-01 | Confederation of British Industry | 1980-03-17 | GREAT BRITAIN | Miller & Chevalier 3094 | 1980-03-17 | Miller & Chevalier | London, England | ||||
4135 | 4135 | 1960-03-29 | W. Green Pharmacy | 1958-04-28 | GREAT BRITAIN | Polonia International, Inc. 1054 | 1957-07-30 | Polonia International, Inc. | London, England | ||||
4114 | 4114 | 1978-03-28 | Laker Air Travel, Ltd. | 1978-03-24 | GREAT BRITAIN | Beckman, Robert M. 2871 | 1978-03-24 | Beckman, Robert M. | London, England | ||||
3859 | 3859 | 1968-03-18 | Government of Libya | 1967-08-15 | LIBYA | James F. Fox, Inc. 2038 | 1967-08-15 | James F. Fox, Inc. | London, England | ||||
3858 | 3858 | 1958-03-18 | Polish Council of National Unity | 1956-06-29 | POLAND | Polish Council of National Unity, American Division 958 | 1956-06-29 | Polish Council of National Unity, American Division | London, England | ||||
3708 | 3708 | 1979-03-14 | President & Government of the Republic of Poland in Exile | 1976-07-20 | POLAND | Combat Org. Free Poland/Organizacja Bojowa Wolana Polska 2712 | 1976-07-20 | Combat Org. Free Poland/Organizacja Bojowa Wolana Polska | London, England | ||||
3491 | 3491 | 1950-03-07 | Council for the Protection of Foreign Claims | 1950-03-07 | GREAT BRITAIN | Gantt, Paul H. 617 | 1950-03-07 | Gantt, Paul H. | London, England | ||||
3386 | 3386 | 1945-03-03 | La France Libre Publishing Company, Ltd. | 1944-03-03 | FRANCE | Labarthe, Andre 239 | 1944-03-03 | Labarthe, Andre | London, England | ||||
3201 | 3201 | 1948-03-01 | Gdynia America Shipping Lines, Ltd. | 1943-08-30 | GREAT BRITAIN | Kutylowski, Roman Marius 206 | 1943-08-30 | Kutylowski, Roman Marius | London, England | ||||
2801 | 2801 | 1947-02-26 | Black Sea & Baltic General Insurance Company | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | London, England | ||||
2273 | 2273 | 1946-02-08 | London Bureau of the Austrian Socialists | 1944-12-18 | GREAT BRITAIN | Austrian Labor Committee 129 | 1942-09-29 | Austrian Labor Committee | London, England | ||||
2255 | 2255 | 1973-02-07 | Pressure for Economic & Social Toryism | 1973-01-05 | GREAT BRITAIN | Rogers, Cowan & Brenner, Inc. 2402 | 1973-01-05 | Rogers, Cowan & Brenner, Inc. | London, England | ||||
2210 | 2210 | 1969-02-05 | Union-Castle Steamship Line of London, England | 1959-11-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | Bennett Associates, Inc. 1140 | 1958-05-08 | Bennett Associates, Inc. | London, England | ||||
2181 | 2181 | 1966-02-04 | Government of Libya | 1966-02-04 | LIBYA | James F. Fox, Inc. 1960 | 1966-02-04 | James F. Fox, Inc. | London, England | ||||
2131 | 2131 | 1961-02-03 | Punch | 1949-06-27 | GREAT BRITAIN | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | London, England | ||||
2123 | 2123 | 1961-02-03 | Associated British & Irish Railway | 1943-03-03 | GREAT BRITAIN | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | London, England | ||||
1971 | 1971 | 1967-02-01 | Broadcasting House | 1948-02-25 | GREAT BRITAIN | British Broadcasting Corporation 514 | 1948-02-25 | British Broadcasting Corporation | London, England | ||||
1703 | 1703 | 1978-01-31 | Standard Chartered Bank, Ltd. - Chartered Bank | 1977-07-20 | GREAT BRITAIN | Denebeim, James Evert & Bruce K. 2814 | 1977-07-20 | Denebeim, James Evert & Bruce K. | London, England | ||||
1629 | 1629 | 1968-01-30 | Africa 1963 | 1963-08-06 | INTERNATIONAL | African Research & Development Company, Inc. 1414 | 1960-12-22 | African Research & Development Company, Inc. | London, England | ||||
1315 | 1315 | 1971-01-15 | Voice & Vision, Ltd. | 1963-05-28 | GREAT BRITAIN | EG&A International, Inc. 1584 | 1962-11-28 | EG&A International, Inc. | London, England | ||||
1151 | 1151 | 1946-01-08 | West Hartlepool Steam Navigation Company | 1942-07-08 | GREAT BRITAIN | Garcia & Diaz 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | London, England | ||||
832 | 832 | 1980-01-01 | Grant H. Webb & Company, Ltd. | 1978-12-06 | GREAT BRITAIN | Patrick & Associates 2984 | 1978-12-06 | Patrick & Associates | London, England | ||||
771 | 771 | 1944-01-01 | La France Libre | 1944-01-01 | FRANCE | Auersperg, Hilda Heriot 228 | 1944-01-01 | Auersperg, Hilda Heriot | London, England |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );