FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
73 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "ECUADOR" sorted by Registration_Number
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_2, Zip, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Fenton Communications 5
- Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders 4
- BLJ Worldwide LTD 2
- Blue Star Strategies, LLC 2
- Davidson, I. Irving 2
- Lever, Michael 2
- Pan-American Coffee Bureau 2
- Tew Cardenas, LLP 2
- ABD Communications, Inc. 1
- Alpaytac, Inc. 1
- Armour, Herrick, Kneipple & Allen 1
- Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 1
- BKSH & Associates 1
- Balsera Communications 1
- Benitez Strategies 1
- Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey 1
- CLS Strategies 1
- Cannon Advertising Associates, Inc. 1
- Conover & Company Communications, Inc. 1
- Covington & Burling 1
- DLA Piper US LLP 1
- DTB Associates, LLP 1
- Delahunt Group, LLC 1
- Development Counsellors International 1
- Dyer, Ellis & Joseph, P.C. 1
- FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) 1
- Felipe Carlos Benitez Rojas 1
- Ferox Strategies LLC 1
- Finn Partners, Inc. 1
- FitzGibbon Media, Inc. 1
- …
Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date >30 ✖
- 1971-04-14 2
- 2006-10-25 2
- 2010-06-10 2
- 1944-08-04 1
- 1952-11-21 1
- 1955-05-03 1
- 1958-08-07 1
- 1958-12-08 1
- 1960-02-11 1
- 1960-07-13 1
- 1960-09-12 1
- 1960-11-18 1
- 1961-02-07 1
- 1962-07-05 1
- 1962-07-18 1
- 1964-02-04 1
- 1964-06-24 1
- 1965-08-16 1
- 1965-12-14 1
- 1966-10-03 1
- 1978-04-25 1
- 1978-10-10 1
- 1985-07-12 1
- 1986-01-14 1
- 1986-01-22 1
- 1986-10-30 1
- 1989-08-21 1
- 1992-08-27 1
- 1994-10-20 1
- 1994-12-08 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Embassy of Ecuador 8
- Government of Ecuador 6
- Republic of Ecuador 5
- Embassy of the Republic of Ecuador 2
- Government of Ecuador, Embassy 2
- Ministry of Tourism of Ecuador through EKOS Corp. 2
- Republic of Ecuador, Embassy 2
- Alvaro Noboa 1
- Ambassador Jose' R. Chiriboga, V, Embassy of Ecuador 1
- Americana, Azucarera Tropical 1
- Attorney General of the Republic of Ecuador 1
- Banco Central ac/Ecuador 1
- Camilo Ponce Enriquez, President of the Republic of Ecuador 1
- Central Bank of Ecuador 1
- Centro de Inteligencia Estrategica - Gobierno de Ecuador 1
- City of Quito 1
- Compania Azucarera Tababuela 1
- Compania Azucarera Valdez, S.A. 1
- Consul General of the Republic of Ecuador 1
- Coordinamos Cia Ltda., on behalf of Koenig & Partners - Ministry of Tourism of Ecuador 1
- Corporacion de Promocion de Exportacion e Inverciones (CORPEI) through Foley Hoag, LLP 1
- Corporacion de Promocion de Exportacion e Inversiones (CORPEI) 1
- Corporation for the Promotion of Exports and Investments of Ecuador 1
- Direccion de la Marina Mercante y del Litoral (DIMERC), Ecuadorian Merchant Marine 1
- Dr. Alfredo Borrero Vega 1
- Dr. Carlos Julio Emanuel Ministry of Economy and Finance Republic of Ecuador 1
- Ecuador Ministry of Tourism 1
- Ecuadorian Sugar Producers 1
- Ecuatoriana de Aviacion 1
- Embassy of Ecuador in the United States 1
- …
Country/Location_Represented 1
- ECUADOR · 73 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number ▼ | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1144 | 1144 | 1946-01-08 | Guayaquil & Quito Railway Company | 1944-08-04 | ECUADOR | Garcia & Diaz 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Quito | ||||
11930 | 11930 | 1973-09-30 | Government of Ecuador | 1965-08-16 | ECUADOR | Pan-American Coffee Bureau 406 | 1946-12-06 | Pan-American Coffee Bureau | Quito | ||||
15777 | 15777 | 1976-12-31 | Ministerio de Economia | 1952-11-21 | ECUADOR | Pan-American Coffee Bureau 406 | 1946-12-06 | Pan-American Coffee Bureau | Quito | ||||
14014 | 14014 | 1977-11-16 | Government of Ecuador | 1960-07-13 | ECUADOR | Covington & Burling 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
1202 | 1202 | 1956-01-11 | Ambassador Jose' R. Chiriboga, V, Embassy of Ecuador | 1955-05-03 | ECUADOR | Margold, Stella K. 864 | 1955-01-04 | Margold, Stella K. | Washington | DC | |||
7910 | 7910 | 1973-06-18 | Ecuadorian Sugar Producers | 1962-07-05 | ECUADOR | Davidson, I. Irving 886 | 1955-04-18 | Davidson, I. Irving | Guayaquil | ||||
7911 | 7911 | 1973-06-18 | Government of Ecuador | 1960-11-18 | ECUADOR | Davidson, I. Irving 886 | 1955-04-18 | Davidson, I. Irving | Quito | ||||
8235 | 8235 | 1959-06-30 | Camilo Ponce Enriquez, President of the Republic of Ecuador | 1958-08-07 | ECUADOR | Smith, Harold T. 1159 | 1958-08-07 | Smith, Harold T. | Quito | ||||
10656 | 10656 | 1958-08-22 | Mission of Ecuador to the U.S. | 1958-12-08 | ECUADOR | Martial & Company, Inc. 1182 | 1958-10-22 | Martial & Company, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
7523 | 7523 | 1961-06-03 | Government of Ecuador | 1960-02-11 | ECUADOR | Klein & Saks 1234 | 1959-06-03 | Klein & Saks | Quito | ||||
3649 | 3649 | 1961-03-12 | City of Quito | 1960-09-12 | ECUADOR | Armour, Herrick, Kneipple & Allen 1390 | 1960-09-12 | Armour, Herrick, Kneipple & Allen | Quito | ||||
2545 | 2545 | 1978-02-15 | Americana, Azucarera Tropical | 1971-04-14 | ECUADOR | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders 1425 | 1961-02-07 | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders | |||||
2546 | 2546 | 1978-02-15 | Compania Azucarera Tababuela | 1971-04-14 | ECUADOR | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders 1425 | 1961-02-07 | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders | |||||
2547 | 2547 | 1978-02-15 | Compania Azucarera Valdez, S.A. | 1961-02-07 | ECUADOR | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders 1425 | 1961-02-07 | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders | |||||
2548 | 2548 | 1978-02-15 | Sociedad Agricola Industrial | 1966-10-03 | ECUADOR | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders 1425 | 1961-02-07 | Hamel, Park, McCabe & Saunders | |||||
9581 | 9581 | 1962-07-29 | Embassy of Ecuador | 1962-07-18 | ECUADOR | Lever, Michael 1559 | 1962-07-18 | Lever, Michael | Washington | DC | |||
1485 | 1485 | 1964-01-24 | Embassy of Ecuador | 1964-02-04 | ECUADOR | Lever, Michael 1592 | 1963-01-25 | Lever, Michael | Washington | DC | |||
5668 | 5668 | 2022-04-28 | Ministry of Production, Foreign Trade, Investments and Fisheries of the Republic of Ecuador | 2020-11-20 | ECUADOR | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 1750 | 1964-06-04 | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP | Plataforma Gubernamental Financiera | Amazonas entre Union Nacional de Periodistas y Alfonso Pereira | Quito | ||
9175 | 9175 | 1966-07-11 | Consul General of the Republic of Ecuador | 1964-06-24 | ECUADOR | Sulzberger & Sulzberger 1764 | 1964-06-24 | Sulzberger & Sulzberger | 30 Rockefeller Plaza | New York | NY | 10020 | |
3863 | 3863 | 1985-03-18 | Ecuatoriana de Aviacion | 1965-12-14 | ECUADOR | Cannon Advertising Associates, Inc. 1945 | 1965-12-14 | Cannon Advertising Associates, Inc. | Quito | ||||
8149 | 8149 | 2013-06-28 | Embassy of Ecuador | 2009-09-29 | ECUADOR | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
11172 | 11172 | 2018-08-31 | Unidad de Analisis Financiero y Economico | 2017-06-19 | ECUADOR | Hogan Lovells US LLP 2244 | 1971-02-18 | Hogan Lovells US LLP | Avenida Republica de Salvador N36-161 y | Avenida Naciones Unidades | Quito | ||
10131 | 10131 | 1980-08-04 | Galapagos Tourist Corp., S.A. | 1978-04-25 | ECUADOR | Richard Weiner, Inc. 2892 | 1978-04-25 | Richard Weiner, Inc. | |||||
14655 | 14655 | 1978-12-01 | Direccion de la Marina Mercante y del Litoral (DIMERC), Ecuadorian Merchant Marine | 1978-10-10 | ECUADOR | Ober, Grimes & Shriver 2965 | 1978-10-10 | Ober, Grimes & Shriver | Guayaquil | ||||
4909 | 4909 | 1987-04-01 | Government of Ecuador | 1985-07-12 | ECUADOR | O'Connor & Hannan, L.L.P. 2972 | 1978-10-25 | O'Connor & Hannan, L.L.P. | Washington | DC | |||
4223 | 4223 | 1995-03-30 | Embassy of Ecuador | 1995-02-16 | ECUADOR | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey 3600 | 1984-06-14 | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey | Washington | DC | |||
1032 | 1032 | 2017-01-01 | Republic of Ecuador, Embassy | 2016-08-26 | ECUADOR | DLA Piper US LLP 3712 | 1985-08-05 | DLA Piper US LLP | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
15221 | 15221 | 1985-12-19 | Central Bank of Ecuador | 1986-01-14 | ECUADOR | Jurdem Associates, Inc. 3768 | 1986-01-14 | Jurdem Associates, Inc. | |||||
1325 | 1325 | 1986-01-15 | Embassy of Ecuador | 1986-01-22 | ECUADOR | Palumbo & Cerrell, Inc. 3771 | 1986-01-22 | Palumbo & Cerrell, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
5235 | 5235 | 2000-04-12 | Superintendencia de Bancos del Ecuador | 2000-03-10 | ECUADOR | Fleishman-Hillard, Inc. 3774 | 1986-02-05 | Fleishman-Hillard, Inc. | c/o Opinion & Imagen Urb. Sta. Leonor Mz.11 Edif. Veritas, via terminal terrestre Guayaquil, | ||||
5143 | 5143 | 1992-04-10 | Government of Ecuador | 1989-08-21 | ECUADOR | Sawyer Miller Group 3777 | 1986-02-12 | Sawyer Miller Group | Quito | ||||
5828 | 5828 | 1987-04-30 | Republic of Ecuador | 1986-10-30 | ECUADOR | Goodwin Procter, LLP 3901 | 1986-10-30 | Goodwin Procter, LLP | Washington | DC | |||
5432 | 5432 | 1994-04-20 | Naviera del Pacifico, C.A. | 1992-08-27 | ECUADOR | Dyer, Ellis & Joseph, P.C. 4121 | 1988-03-21 | Dyer, Ellis & Joseph, P.C. | Guayaquil | ||||
4729 | 4729 | 2013-03-31 | Corporation for the Promotion of Exports and Investments of Ecuador | 2007-04-02 | ECUADOR | Foley Hoag, LLP 4776 | 1993-03-02 | Foley Hoag, LLP | Cdla. Kennedy Norte, Avda. Francisco de Orellana y Miguel H. Alcivar | Edificio Centro Empresarial Las Camaras, Torre de Oficinas, 2 do piso | Guayaquil | ||
4739 | 4739 | 2014-03-31 | Ecuador Ministry of Tourism | 2013-07-02 | ECUADOR | Development Counsellors International 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | |||||
4544 | 4544 | 1995-03-31 | Republic of Ecuador | 1994-10-20 | ECUADOR | Williams & Jensen, P.C. 4858 | 1993-10-07 | Williams & Jensen, P.C. | Washington | DC | |||
7155 | 7155 | 1996-05-31 | Government of Ecuador, Embassy | 1994-12-08 | ECUADOR | Petito, Margaret L. 4979 | 1994-12-08 | Petito, Margaret L. | Washington | DC | |||
6219 | 6219 | 1997-05-01 | Banco Central ac/Ecuador | 1997-03-03 | ECUADOR | Conover & Company Communications, Inc. 5160 | 1997-03-03 | Conover & Company Communications, Inc. | Quito | ||||
9382 | 9382 | 1998-07-20 | Empresa Estatal de Telecomunicaciones (Emetel) | 1997-07-31 | ECUADOR | Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP 5198 | 1997-07-31 | Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman, LLP | Quito | ||||
11899 | 11899 | 1998-09-29 | President-Elect of Ecuador, Jamil Mahuad | 1998-09-29 | ECUADOR | ABD Communications, Inc. 5277 | 1998-09-29 | ABD Communications, Inc. | Quito | ||||
14548 | 14548 | 2013-11-30 | Embassy of Ecuador | 2013-07-12 | ECUADOR | Van Scoyoc Associates, Inc. 5401 | 2000-12-14 | Van Scoyoc Associates, Inc. | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
14719 | 14719 | 2001-12-01 | Government of Ecuador, Embassy | 2001-06-28 | ECUADOR | BKSH & Associates 5402 | 2000-12-14 | BKSH & Associates | 2535 15th Street, N.W. 20009 | DC | |||
7435 | 7435 | 2002-06-01 | Dr. Carlos Julio Emanuel Ministry of Economy and Finance Republic of Ecuador | 2002-02-19 | ECUADOR | Livingston/Moffett Global Consultants, LLC (LMG) 5474 | 2002-02-19 | Livingston/Moffett Global Consultants, LLC (LMG) | Av 10 de AGosto y JORGE Washington Quito | ||||
1864 | 1864 | 2007-01-31 | Corporacion de Promocion de Exportacion e Inversiones (CORPEI) | 2006-10-25 | ECUADOR | Tew Cardenas, LLP 5562 | 2003-06-10 | Tew Cardenas, LLP | Direccion: Av. Amazonas 4430 y Villalengua, Edificio Amazonas 100, Piso 8 | Quito | |||
9868 | 9868 | 2006-07-31 | Republic of Ecuador | 2006-01-20 | ECUADOR | Tew Cardenas, LLP 5562 | 2003-06-10 | Tew Cardenas, LLP | Ministry of Foreign Trade, Industry , Fishing and Competitiveness | Ave. Eloy Alfaro y Amazonas, Edif, MAG-MICIP, 1er Piso, | Quito | ||
16928 | 16928 | 2022-12-31 | Ministry of Production, Foreign Trade, Investments and Fisheries, Republic of Ecuador (on behalf of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP) | 2020-11-30 | ECUADOR | FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) 5666 | 2005-01-31 | FGS Global (US) LLC (FKA FGH Holdings LLC) | Plataforma Gubernamental Financiera | ||||
4750 | 4750 | 2015-03-31 | Republic of Ecuador, Embassy | 2014-04-01 | ECUADOR | Ketchum Inc. NY 5758 | 2006-05-09 | Ketchum Inc. NY | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
16606 | 16606 | 2006-12-31 | Republic of Ecuador through Tew Cardenas LLP | 2006-10-25 | ECUADOR | CLS Strategies 5774 | 2006-10-06 | CLS Strategies | Quito | ||||
1356 | 1356 | 2009-01-15 | Embassy of Ecuador | 2008-08-25 | ECUADOR | Fenton Communications 5803 | 2007-04-30 | Fenton Communications | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
3085 | 3085 | 2008-02-28 | Corporacion de Promocion de Exportacion e Inverciones (CORPEI) through Foley Hoag, LLP | 2007-04-30 | ECUADOR | Fenton Communications 5803 | 2007-04-30 | Fenton Communications | Cdla. Kennedy Norte, Avda. Francisco de Orellana y Miguel H. Alcivar, Edificio Centro Empresarial | Las Camaras, Torre de Oficinas, 2do piso. Telefono (593-4) 2681550 | Guayaquil | ||
1026 | 1026 | 2016-01-01 | Republic of Ecuador | 2012-06-25 | ECUADOR | BLJ Worldwide LTD 5875 | 2008-06-17 | BLJ Worldwide LTD | |||||
16741 | 16741 | 2013-12-31 | Yasuni-ITT Commission (via the UNDP) | 2011-09-12 | ECUADOR | BLJ Worldwide LTD 5875 | 2008-06-17 | BLJ Worldwide LTD | Equipo Negociador de la Iniciativa Yasuni-ITT | Edificio Titanium, 7 mo piso Ave. 6 de Diciembre N33-42 e Ignacio Bossano | Quito | ||
6048 | 6048 | 2009-04-30 | Embassy of Ecuador | 2008-10-28 | ECUADOR | DTB Associates, LLP 5890 | 2008-10-28 | DTB Associates, LLP | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
3089 | 3089 | 2010-02-28 | Embassy of the Republic of Ecuador | 2009-06-26 | ECUADOR | Fenton Communications 5945 | 2009-06-26 | Fenton Communications | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
6068 | 6068 | 2012-04-30 | Embassy of the Republic of Ecuador | 2011-01-31 | ECUADOR | Fenton Communications 5945 | 2009-06-26 | Fenton Communications | |||||
16694 | 16694 | 2011-12-31 | Government of Ecuador, Ministry for the Coordination of Production, Employment and Competitiveness | 2010-06-10 | ECUADOR | Fenton Communications 5945 | 2009-06-26 | Fenton Communications | Av. Coruna y 12 de Octubre, Edificio altana Paza 4to piso. | Quito | |||
1886 | 1886 | 2011-01-31 | Ministry of Coordination of Production, Employment and Competitiveness; Republic of Ecuador | 2010-06-10 | ECUADOR | Blue Star Strategies, LLC 5980 | 2010-03-16 | Blue Star Strategies, LLC | Av. Coruna y 12 de Octubre, | Edificio Altana Plaza 4o piso. | Quito | ||
12897 | 12897 | 2014-10-21 | Republic of Ecuador | 2011-07-08 | ECUADOR | International Remediation Services, LLC 6048 | 2011-07-08 | International Remediation Services, LLC | Av. Amazonas y Juan Jose de Villalengua (Esq.) Edificio IAEN | ||||
8706 | 8706 | 2012-06-30 | Ministry of Coordination of Production, Employment, and Competitiveness; Republic of Ecuador | 2011-12-22 | ECUADOR | Blue Star Strategies, LLC 6083 | 2011-12-22 | Blue Star Strategies, LLC | Coruna E25-58 y San Ignacio | Edificio Altana Plaza, piso #4 | |||
13999 | 13999 | 2012-11-15 | Office of the President of Ecuador (Yasuni-ITT) | 2012-08-21 | ECUADOR | Humanitas Global Development 6126 | 2012-08-21 | Humanitas Global Development | Avenida 6 de Diciembre N33-42 e Ignacio Bossano | Edif Titanium Piso 7 | |||
16752 | 16752 | 2014-12-31 | Ministry of Tourism of Ecuador through EKOS Corp. | 2014-10-28 | ECUADOR | Finn Partners, Inc. 6212 | 2014-03-10 | Finn Partners, Inc. | |||||
16743 | 16743 | 2014-12-31 | Embassy of Ecuador in the United States | 2014-07-11 | ECUADOR | Delahunt Group, LLC 6215 | 2014-04-16 | Delahunt Group, LLC | 2535 15th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20009 | |
6590 | 6590 | 2015-05-15 | Ministry of Tourism of Ecuador through EKOS Corp. | 2015-06-30 | ECUADOR | Alpaytac, Inc. 6224 | 2014-05-23 | Alpaytac, Inc. | NNUU 1014 Yama Zonas edf. La Previsora Torre A, Piso 8 Oficina 802 | Quito | |||
6079 | 6079 | 2014-04-30 | Government of the Republic of Ecuador | 2014-07-03 | ECUADOR | mcSQUARED PR Inc. 6231 | 2014-07-03 | mcSQUARED PR Inc. | San Salvador E6-49 | Elay Alfaro Edificio Medios Publicas 4to Piso, Quito | |||
1414 | 1414 | 2014-01-19 | Government of the Republic of Ecuador (Through MCSquared Group, Inc.) | 2014-07-07 | ECUADOR | FitzGibbon Media, Inc. 6233 | 2014-07-07 | FitzGibbon Media, Inc. | 649 Morgan Avenue | Suite 2G | Brooklyn | NY | 11222 |
5151 | 5151 | 2015-04-10 | Alvaro Noboa | 2014-07-20 | ECUADOR | Glover, Michael Patrick 6234 | 2014-07-20 | Glover, Michael Patrick | Calle El Oro 101 | Guayaquil | |||
13465 | 13465 | 2014-10-31 | Attorney General of the Republic of Ecuador | 2014-10-22 | ECUADOR | Felipe Carlos Benitez Rojas 6258 | 2014-10-22 | Felipe Carlos Benitez Rojas | |||||
5084 | 5084 | 2013-04-07 | Coordinamos Cia Ltda., on behalf of Koenig & Partners - Ministry of Tourism of Ecuador | 2015-07-29 | ECUADOR | Porter Novelli, Inc. 6308 | 2015-07-29 | Porter Novelli, Inc. | Av. Colo' n E4 105 y de Octubre Edificio olarnar Oficina 102 Quinto | ||||
1928 | 1928 | 2021-01-31 | Centro de Inteligencia Estrategica - Gobierno de Ecuador | 2020-06-13 | ECUADOR | Balsera Communications 6835 | 2020-06-13 | Balsera Communications | Av. Eloy Alfaro y Rio Santiago | Quito, Lumbisi | |||
583 | 583 | Republic of Ecuador on behalf of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP | 2021-01-23 | ECUADOR | Benitez Strategies 6914 | 2021-01-23 | Benitez Strategies | Amazonas entre Union Nacional de Periodistas, y Alfaro | Quito, Pichincha | ||||
7471 | 7471 | 2021-06-01 | Ministry of Production, Foreign Trade, Investments and Fisheries of the Republic of Ecuador (on behalf of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP) | 2021-02-03 | ECUADOR | Ferox Strategies LLC 6922 | 2021-02-03 | Ferox Strategies LLC | Plataforma Gubernamental Financiera, Amazonas entr, | Union Nacional de Periodistas y Alfonso Pereira Quito | |||
152 | 152 | Dr. Alfredo Borrero Vega | 2021-03-22 | ECUADOR | Moonlight International LLC 6941 | 2021-03-22 | Moonlight International LLC | AV. Atahualpa, Diagonal Banco del Estado, Sector de | la Rumipamba Quito 02 5112121 | ||||
629 | 629 | Secretaria General de Comunicacion del Gobierno, Republica de Ecuador (via Global Research and Asset Management LLC) | 2023-04-26 | ECUADOR | Perceptual Advisors LLC 7263 | 2023-04-26 | Perceptual Advisors LLC | Chile OE6-21 and Benalcazar Quito |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );