FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
508 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "FRANCE" sorted by State
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_2, Zip, Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 26
- Compagnie Generale Transatlantique (French Line) 24
- Government Research Corporation 15
- DGA International, Inc. 12
- French Line, Inc. 10
- Ruder Finn, Inc. 10
- Association Films, Inc. 9
- Modern Education Services, Inc. 8
- North American Precis Syndicate 8
- Euroconsultants, Inc. 7
- Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP 6
- Foley & Statt 6
- Cassidy & Associates, Inc. 5
- Coudert Brothers 5
- Haight, Griffin, Deming & Gardner 5
- Keating Group, Inc. 5
- Rogers & Wells, LLP 5
- Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP 4
- Berry, Max N. 4
- Crowell & Moring International, LLC 4
- Edelman International Corporation 4
- French National Railroads, New York 4
- Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman 4
- Junta de Cultura Espanola 4
- Levy, Joseph M. 4
- Robert W. Schofield & Associates, Inc. 4
- Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 3
- Fleishman-Hillard, Inc. 3
- French Government Tourist Office 3
- Gold & Liebengood, Inc. 3
- …
Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date >30 ✖
- 1960-07-27 22
- 1989-05-30 15
- 1948-03-28 10
- 1989-11-30 8
- 1995-12-31 8
- 1947-08-31 6
- 1946-07-27 5
- 1967-11-30 5
- 1981-08-31 5
- 1993-03-11 5
- - 4
- 1960-06-30 4
- 1989-02-28 4
- 1989-12-31 4
- 1992-02-13 4
- 1993-11-08 4
- 1942-10-15 3
- 1952-01-30 3
- 1963-05-31 3
- 1968-02-02 3
- 1982-11-01 3
- 1984-12-31 3
- 1985-01-22 3
- 1992-04-08 3
- 1942-10-07 2
- 1943-03-15 2
- 1947-03-14 2
- 1947-07-17 2
- 1966-12-31 2
- 1967-11-22 2
- …
Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date) >30 ✖
- 1960-07-27 22
- 1989-05-30 15
- 1948-03-28 10
- 1989-11-30 8
- 1995-12-31 8
- 1947-08-31 6
- 1946-07-27 5
- 1967-11-30 5
- 1981-08-31 5
- 1993-03-11 5
- 1960-06-30 4
- 1989-02-28 4
- 1989-12-31 4
- 1992-02-13 4
- 1993-11-08 4
- 1942-10-15 3
- 1952-01-30 3
- 1963-05-31 3
- 1968-02-02 3
- 1982-11-01 3
- 1984-12-31 3
- 1985-01-22 3
- 1992-04-08 3
- 1942-10-07 2
- 1943-03-15 2
- 1947-03-14 2
- 1947-07-17 2
- 1966-12-31 2
- 1967-11-22 2
- 1968-12-13 2
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- French Government Tourist Office 16
- French National Railroads 11
- Air France 8
- Government of France 8
- Aerospatiale 6
- French Embassy 6
- Aeroport de Paris 5
- Agence Teleradio 5
- Airbus Industrie 5
- French Information Center, Inc. 5
- Thomson-CSF, Inc. 5
- Altus Finance 4
- Euromissile 4
- French Industrial Development Agency 4
- Matra Aerospace, Inc. 4
- Societe Nationale d'Etude et de Construction de Moteurs d'Aviation 4
- New California Life Holdings, Inc. 3
- Nord-Aviation, S.A. 3
- Paribas Corporation 3
- Airbus Industrie, G.I.E. 2
- Arianespace, S.A. 2
- Axa Reassurance 2
- Banque Nationale de Paris 2
- Caisse des Depots et Consignations 2
- Cartier International Cie 2
- Casino 2
- Centre National d'Etudes Spatiales 2
- Chanel Parfums 2
- Comite Franc-Dollar 2
- Comite France Actuelle 2
- …
Country/Location_Represented 1
- FRANCE · 508 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State ▼ | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 24 | AXA | 2021-03-03 | FRANCE | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 25 Avenue Matignon 75008 Paris | |||||
34 | 34 | Agence Francaise de Developpement | 2021-02-22 | FRANCE | Portland PR Inc. 6064 | 2011-09-19 | Portland PR Inc. | 5 Rue Roland Barthes, 75 598 | Paris Cedex 12 | ||||
89 | 89 | Business France | 2020-09-04 | FRANCE | Dozier, Daniel P. 6866 | 2020-09-04 | Dozier, Daniel P. | ||||||
771 | 771 | 1944-01-01 | La France Libre | 1944-01-01 | FRANCE | Auersperg, Hilda Heriot 228 | 1944-01-01 | Auersperg, Hilda Heriot | London, England | ||||
803 | 803 | 1967-01-01 | Government of France | 1952-12-05 | FRANCE | Squire, Sanders & Dempsey, L.L.P. 746 | 1952-12-02 | Squire, Sanders & Dempsey, L.L.P. | Paris | ||||
829 | 829 | 1979-01-01 | French Bank Association | 1977-07-27 | FRANCE | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 1750 | 1964-06-04 | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP | Paris | ||||
857 | 857 | 1983-01-01 | Compagnie Financiere de Paribas | 1982-12-10 | FRANCE | Rogers & Wells, LLP 3428 | 1982-12-10 | Rogers & Wells, LLP | Paris | ||||
881 | 881 | 1987-01-01 | Aeroport de Paris | 1980-03-25 | FRANCE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | |||||
911 | 911 | 1988-01-01 | Perrier Group | 1985-05-29 | FRANCE | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC 2661 | 1976-02-18 | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC | |||||
961 | 961 | 1996-01-01 | Avions de Transport Regional, Groupement d'Interet Economique | 1994-11-30 | FRANCE | Hogan Lovells US LLP 2244 | 1971-02-18 | Hogan Lovells US LLP | Blagnac Cedex | ||||
1054 | 1054 | 1998-01-02 | Societe de Publicite SDP | 1995-12-26 | FRANCE | Crystal Group, Inc. 5051 | 1995-09-18 | Crystal Group, Inc. | Paris | ||||
1084 | 1084 | 1943-01-06 | General Henri Giraud, of the French Armed Forces | 1943-01-06 | FRANCE | Longin-Spindler, Emanuel Mary Paul 171 | 1943-01-06 | Longin-Spindler, Emanuel Mary Paul | |||||
1210 | 1210 | 1988-01-11 | Airbus Industrie | 1978-06-27 | FRANCE | Busby, Rehm & Leonard, P.C. 2923 | 1978-06-27 | Busby, Rehm & Leonard, P.C. | Toulouse | ||||
1310 | 1310 | 1968-01-15 | Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique, a Branch of the Ministry of Education of France | 1964-12-10 | FRANCE | Burgess, Dinklage & Sprung 1829 | 1964-12-10 | Burgess, Dinklage & Sprung | Paris | ||||
1371 | 1371 | 1990-01-16 | Societe Nationale des Poudres et Explosifs | 1989-07-03 | FRANCE | DGA International, Inc. 2621 | 1975-10-28 | DGA International, Inc. | Paris | ||||
1407 | 1407 | 2019-01-18 | Droit de Naitre | 2019-12-02 | FRANCE | Foundation for a Christian Civilization, Inc. 6759 | 2019-12-02 | Foundation for a Christian Civilization, Inc. | |||||
1462 | 1462 | 1985-01-22 | French Government - Ministere de l'Amenagement du Territoire de l'Equipement, du Logement et du Tourisme | 1973-06-12 | FRANCE | French Government Tourist Office 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1463 | 1463 | 1985-01-22 | Commissariat General au Tourisme (General Commissariat of Tourism) French Ministry of Public Works and Transportation | 1946-07-25 | FRANCE | French Government Tourist Office 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1464 | 1464 | 1985-01-22 | Secretary of State for Tourisme (French Government) | 1964-12-07 | FRANCE | French Government Tourist Office 364 | 1946-07-25 | French Government Tourist Office | Paris | ||||
1481 | 1481 | 2000-01-23 | Credit Lyonnais | 1998-05-07 | FRANCE | Shearman & Sterling 4208 | 1989-01-23 | Shearman & Sterling | 5 rue Gretry 75002 Paris | ||||
1549 | 1549 | 1943-01-27 | Societe l' Alfa, le Pontet | 1943-01-27 | FRANCE | Gauthier, Donat A. 176 | 1943-01-27 | Gauthier, Donat A. | Vancluse | ||||
1558 | 1558 | 1987-01-27 | Roussel UCLAF (Thru Inforfilm International) | 1986-04-16 | FRANCE | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
1620 | 1620 | 1952-01-30 | Juan Aja | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | |||||
1621 | 1621 | 1952-01-30 | Lorenzo Gascon | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | |||||
1625 | 1625 | 1952-01-30 | Trifon Gomez | 1947-01-31 | FRANCE | Junta de Cultura Espanola 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | Paris | ||||
1686 | 1686 | 1967-01-31 | VINCO | 1966-02-10 | FRANCE | George Peabody & Associates, Inc. 1682 | 1964-01-20 | George Peabody & Associates, Inc. | |||||
1721 | 1721 | 1987-01-31 | Free Trade Defense Association | 1987-02-06 | FRANCE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Cognac | ||||
1745 | 1745 | 1990-01-31 | Hachette, S.A. | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Paris | ||||
1895 | 1895 | 2013-01-31 | Unifrance Film International (formerly: National Center for the Cinema, French Ministry of Culture) | 1972-07-20 | FRANCE | French Film Office/Unifrance USA 2358 | 1972-07-20 | French Film Office/Unifrance USA | |||||
2089 | 2089 | 1945-02-02 | Banque de Paris et des Pays-Bas | 1943-02-02 | FRANCE | Boyer, Maurice 177 | 1943-02-02 | Boyer, Maurice | Paris | ||||
2096 | 2096 | 1968-02-02 | Conseil National du Patronat Francais | 1952-02-20 | FRANCE | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | Paris | ||||
2100 | 2100 | 1968-02-02 | Government of the French Republic | 1948-01-19 | FRANCE | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | Paris | ||||
2206 | 2206 | 1947-02-05 | Government of France | 1946-10-14 | FRANCE | Pehle, John William 377 | 1946-10-14 | Pehle, John William | Paris | ||||
2240 | 2240 | 1988-02-06 | Deambinox, S.A. | 1987-12-11 | FRANCE | DLA Piper US LLP 3712 | 1985-08-05 | DLA Piper US LLP | Nantes | ||||
2244 | 2244 | 1992-02-06 | Thomson-CSF, S.A. (France) | 1990-11-29 | FRANCE | Thomson-CSF, Inc. 4447 | 1990-11-29 | Thomson-CSF, Inc. | Paris | ||||
2312 | 2312 | 1963-02-09 | Basque Government (In Exile) | 1949-08-09 | FRANCE | Basque Delegation in the U.S.A. 586 | 1949-08-09 | Basque Delegation in the U.S.A. | Paris | ||||
2427 | 2427 | 1996-02-12 | SEMA | 1995-06-23 | FRANCE | McMillan Group, L.L.C. 5028 | 1995-06-23 | McMillan Group, L.L.C. | Montruge | ||||
2440 | 2440 | 1992-02-13 | Dassault Industries, Parent Corporation of Falcon Jet | 1991-06-28 | FRANCE | Crowell & Moring International, LLC 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | |||||
2450 | 2450 | 1996-02-13 | Rhone-Poulenc, S.A. | 1991-05-01 | FRANCE | Baker Botts L.L.P. 4293 | 1989-09-15 | Baker Botts L.L.P. | Courbevoie | ||||
2539 | 2539 | 1966-02-15 | Monsieur le Directeur General du Centre National du Commerce Exterieur | 1965-02-02 | FRANCE | Kennedy, King 1849 | 1965-02-02 | Kennedy, King | Paris | ||||
2550 | 2550 | 1980-02-15 | French Government (Delegation a l Amenagement du Territoire et a l Action Regionale | 1972-08-15 | FRANCE | French Industrial Development Agency 2368 | 1972-08-15 | French Industrial Development Agency | Paris | ||||
2590 | 2590 | 1983-02-16 | Port of Le Havre | 1981-09-23 | FRANCE | Sommers/Rosen, Inc. 3276 | 1981-09-23 | Sommers/Rosen, Inc. | |||||
2614 | 2614 | 1967-02-17 | Government of France | 1947-02-17 | FRANCE | Pehle, Riemer, Luxford & Naiden 439 | 1947-02-17 | Pehle, Riemer, Luxford & Naiden | Paris | ||||
2641 | 2641 | 1985-02-18 | Creusot-Loire, S.A. | 1981-02-13 | FRANCE | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon 3200 | 1981-02-18 | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon | Paris | ||||
2642 | 2642 | 1985-02-18 | USINOR, S.A. | 1982-03-24 | FRANCE | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon 3200 | 1981-02-18 | Mudge, Rose, Guthrie, Alexander & Ferdon | |||||
2662 | 2662 | 1958-02-19 | Regie Nationale des Usines Renault | 1957-08-19 | FRANCE | Dye, Joseph W. 1059 | 1957-08-19 | Dye, Joseph W. | |||||
2666 | 2666 | 1991-02-19 | L'Association Communautaire de l'Estuaire de la Loire/ Atlantic International Zone (ACEL/AIZ) | 1988-04-04 | FRANCE | Souham & Associates, Inc. 4114 | 1988-04-04 | Souham & Associates, Inc. | Cedex | ||||
2690 | 2690 | 1959-02-21 | Compagnie Universelle du Canal Maritime de Suez (Suez Canal Company) | 1953-08-21 | FRANCE | Davis, Polk & Wardell 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | Paris | ||||
2875 | 2875 | 1977-02-27 | Mission Interministerielle Pour l'Amenagement du Littoral Touristique de la Cote Aquitaine | 1976-03-25 | FRANCE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Paris | ||||
2926 | 2926 | 1979-02-28 | Societe Nationale de l'Industrie Aerospatiale | 1975-09-18 | FRANCE | International Public Relations Company, Ltd. 1967 | 1966-03-14 | International Public Relations Company, Ltd. | |||||
2949 | 2949 | 1988-02-28 | Manurhin, S.A. | 1982-09-28 | FRANCE | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge 2580 | 1975-02-21 | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge | |||||
2952 | 2952 | 1989-02-28 | Havas | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Neuilly Sur Seine | ||||
2954 | 2954 | 1989-02-28 | Office de Vulgarisation Pharma Ceutique | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Paris | ||||
2956 | 2956 | 1989-02-28 | Promodes | 1989-05-31 | FRANCE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Mondeville | ||||
3030 | 3030 | 1999-02-28 | GIAT Industries, S.A. | 1993-08-18 | FRANCE | FN Manufacturing, Inc. 4864 | 1993-08-18 | FN Manufacturing, Inc. | Versailles | ||||
3240 | 3240 | 1972-03-01 | Union des Producteurs, Cooperatives et Industriels Laitiers | 1967-06-07 | FRANCE | Surrey, Karasik, Gould and Efron 1178 | 1958-10-09 | Surrey, Karasik, Gould and Efron | |||||
3268 | 3268 | 1984-03-01 | Reassemblement Pour la Republique | 1983-02-18 | FRANCE | Rassemblement Pour la Republique U.S.A., Inc. 3447 | 1983-02-18 | Rassemblement Pour la Republique U.S.A., Inc. | |||||
3302 | 3302 | 1991-03-01 | Syndicat Mixte de Protecion et de Conservation du Littoral du Nord-Ouest de la Bretagne | 1991-03-07 | FRANCE | Fleishman-Hillard, Inc. 3774 | 1986-02-05 | Fleishman-Hillard, Inc. | Ploudalmezeau | ||||
3361 | 3361 | 2022-03-01 | PSE - Ecole D'Economie de Paris | 2021-08-10 | FRANCE | Top of Mind Public Relations 6989 | 2021-08-10 | Top of Mind Public Relations | 48 Bd Jourdan | 75014 | PARIS | ||
3386 | 3386 | 1945-03-03 | La France Libre Publishing Company, Ltd. | 1944-03-03 | FRANCE | Labarthe, Andre 239 | 1944-03-03 | Labarthe, Andre | London, England | ||||
3602 | 3602 | 1987-03-11 | Soule' | 1986-06-19 | FRANCE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | |||||
3667 | 3667 | 1993-03-12 | Comite Francais des Manifestations Economiques a L'Etranger | 1965-03-12 | FRANCE | French Expositions in the U.S., Inc. 1867 | 1965-03-12 | French Expositions in the U.S., Inc. | |||||
3670 | 3670 | 1993-03-12 | District of Montpellier | 1987-06-26 | FRANCE | J. Woodman Associates, Inc. 3590 | 1984-05-31 | J. Woodman Associates, Inc. | |||||
3702 | 3702 | 1947-03-14 | France-Amerique | 1946-10-02 | FRANCE | Comite France Amerique 131 | 1942-09-14 | Comite France Amerique | Paris | ||||
3722 | 3722 | 1994-03-14 | People Sari | 1991-09-09 | FRANCE | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | Paris | ||||
3735 | 3735 | 1943-03-15 | French Ambassador Gaston Henry-Haye | 1943-03-15 | FRANCE | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine 51 | 1942-07-16 | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine | |||||
3736 | 3736 | 1943-03-15 | French Embassy | 1942-07-16 | FRANCE | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine 51 | 1942-07-16 | Jules-Bois, Henri Antoine | |||||
3767 | 3767 | 1985-03-15 | A.D.E.C. | 1984-09-11 | FRANCE | Busz-Cabal, Aline I.Z. 3611 | 1984-09-11 | Busz-Cabal, Aline I.Z. | Orleans | ||||
3837 | 3837 | 1981-03-17 | Framatome | 1981-02-18 | FRANCE | Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman 3199 | 1981-02-18 | Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman | Paris | ||||
3838 | 3838 | 1981-03-17 | Societe Internationale de Technologie | 1981-02-18 | FRANCE | Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman 3199 | 1981-02-18 | Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Kampelman | Paris | ||||
4026 | 4026 | 1945-03-25 | French Embassy | 1942-08-28 | FRANCE | De Bisschop, Eric 109 | 1942-08-28 | De Bisschop, Eric | |||||
4039 | 4039 | 1977-03-25 | Inter-African Coffee Organization | 1962-08-07 | FRANCE | Albert M. Prosterman & Associates, Inc. 1566 | 1962-08-07 | Albert M. Prosterman & Associates, Inc. | Paris | ||||
4079 | 4079 | 1974-03-27 | Mission Interministerielle Pour l'Amenagement du Littoral Languedoc-Roussillon | 1974-05-30 | FRANCE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Paris | ||||
4080 | 4080 | 1974-03-27 | French Industrial Development Agency | 1973-12-03 | FRANCE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | |||||
4096 | 4096 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Generale d'Armements Martimes | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4097 | 4097 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie d'Orbigny | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4098 | 4098 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Delmas Vyieljeux | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4099 | 4099 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Generale Transatlantique | 1943-09-28 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4100 | 4100 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Havraise Peninsolaire | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4101 | 4101 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie Paquet | 1945-05-21 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4102 | 4102 | 1948-03-28 | Compagnie des Bateaux a Vapeur du Nord | 1945-05-21 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4103 | 4103 | 1948-03-28 | Messageries Maritimes | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4104 | 4104 | 1948-03-28 | Societe Navale Caennaise | 1947-07-24 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4105 | 4105 | 1948-03-28 | Worms & Cie | 1945-05-21 | FRANCE | French Line, Inc. 211 | 1943-09-28 | French Line, Inc. | |||||
4116 | 4116 | 1983-03-28 | Airbus Industrie Groupement d'Interet Economique | 1977-08-02 | FRANCE | Airbus Industrie of North America, Inc. 2817 | 1977-08-02 | Airbus Industrie of North America, Inc. | Paris | ||||
4363 | 4363 | 1977-03-31 | Service of Press & Information Ministry of Foreign Affairs | 1966-06-12 | FRANCE | Robert W. Schofield & Associates, Inc. 1757 | 1964-06-12 | Robert W. Schofield & Associates, Inc. | Paris | ||||
4472 | 4472 | 1990-03-31 | CAPEM (Comite d'Amenagement de Promotion et d'Expansion de la Moselle) | 1988-08-04 | FRANCE | Graydon Associates, Inc. 2639 | 1975-12-10 | Graydon Associates, Inc. | Metz | ||||
4475 | 4475 | 1990-03-31 | Bureau National Interprofessional de Cognac | 1987-01-01 | FRANCE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | |||||
4533 | 4533 | 1994-03-31 | Hennessy | 1990-06-22 | FRANCE | Euroconsultants, Inc. 4347 | 1990-03-01 | Euroconsultants, Inc. | Cedex | ||||
4624 | 4624 | 2003-03-31 | Port Autonome du Havre | 1991-12-06 | FRANCE | Barbara Burns & Associates, Inc. 4600 | 1991-12-06 | Barbara Burns & Associates, Inc. | Le Havre | ||||
4898 | 4898 | 1986-04-01 | French Government Tourist Office | 1980-11-28 | FRANCE | Van Brunt & Company Advertising-Marketing, Inc. 1704 | 1964-04-02 | Van Brunt & Company Advertising-Marketing, Inc. | Paris | ||||
4941 | 4941 | 1997-04-01 | SEMA | 1995-05-31 | FRANCE | Rogers & Wells, LLP 3428 | 1982-12-10 | Rogers & Wells, LLP | Montruge | ||||
4986 | 4986 | 1974-04-02 | Comite France Actuelle | 1953-03-02 | FRANCE | France Actuelle 759 | 1953-03-02 | France Actuelle | Paris | ||||
5019 | 5019 | 1994-04-04 | L'Union des Industries Textiles (1'UIT) | 1993-03-03 | FRANCE | David E. Morey 4688 | 1992-07-09 | David E. Morey | Paris | ||||
5083 | 5083 | 2000-04-07 | Airbus Industrie, G.I.E. | 1991-01-25 | FRANCE | Hamilton, Charles A. 4467 | 1991-01-25 | Hamilton, Charles A. | Blagnac | ||||
5100 | 5100 | 1992-04-08 | Altus Finance | 1991-10-30 | FRANCE | Barrett Jr., Michael F. 4582 | 1991-10-30 | Barrett Jr., Michael F. | Paris | ||||
5103 | 5103 | 1992-04-08 | Institut de la Vie | 1988-07-22 | FRANCE | Washington, Perito & Dubuc 4107 | 1988-03-21 | Washington, Perito & Dubuc | Paris | ||||
5251 | 5251 | 1945-04-14 | Syndicat du Commerce d'Exportation des Vins, Cidres, Spirituex et Ligueurs de France | 1945-04-14 | FRANCE | French Wine & Spirits Association in the U.S., Inc. 301 | 1945-04-14 | French Wine & Spirits Association in the U.S., Inc. | Paris | ||||
5295 | 5295 | 1994-04-15 | French-American Chamber of Commerce in the U.S., Inc. | 1983-09-21 | FRANCE | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge 2580 | 1975-02-21 | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge | |||||
5475 | 5475 | 1988-04-22 | World Magazine Communication, Inc. | 1978-07-27 | FRANCE | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );