FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
119 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "AUSTRIA" sorted by Registrant_Name
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_1, Address_2, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- North American Precis Syndicate 9
- Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 7
- Feldman, Maurice 7
- Berry, Max N. 5
- Modern Education Services, Inc. 4
- Mattesich, Rudolf F. 3
- Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC 2
- Austrian Labor Committee 2
- Dosmar, Kurt John 2
- Drost, John A. 2
- Fontayne Group, Inc. 2
- Global U.S.A., Inc. 2
- Graf Desley, Inc. 2
- Hugh C. Newton & Associates 2
- Jurgen Hartmann Agency 2
- Nemeth, Istvan B. 2
- Ruder Finn, Inc. 2
- A.H.W. Advertising, Inc. 1
- Agh, Laszlo 1
- Alcott, Roger E. 1
- Association Films, Inc. 1
- Austrian Action, Inc. - Free Austrian Movement 1
- Austrian Business Agency 1
- Austrian National Tourist Office for the Pacific Northwest 1
- Austrian National Tourist Office, Los Angeles 1
- Austrian National Tourist Office, Midwest Office 1
- Austrian Tourist Office, Inc. 1
- Austrian Trade Commission in the U.S., Houston 1
- Austrian Trade Commission in the U.S., Southern Region 1
- Austrian Trade Commission, Chicago 1
- …
Registrant_Date (date) >30 ✖
- 1977-10-12 9
- 1957-12-13 7
- 1958-01-28 7
- 1970-10-30 5
- 1964-10-19 4
- 1946-06-03 3
- 1942-07-13 2
- 1942-09-29 2
- 1954-02-23 2
- 1961-09-27 2
- 1964-10-05 2
- 1964-12-14 2
- 1972-07-17 2
- 1972-11-30 2
- 1973-09-04 2
- 1976-02-18 2
- 1980-07-01 2
- 1983-06-24 2
- 1985-10-30 2
- 1943-03-03 1
- 1943-06-09 1
- 1945-03-08 1
- 1946-01-28 1
- 1946-04-22 1
- 1946-06-10 1
- 1947-05-26 1
- 1947-10-03 1
- 1947-11-21 1
- 1949-12-08 1
- 1950-05-11 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Austrian Press & Information Service 9
- Austrian National Tourist Office 7
- Government of Austria 5
- Alpine Tourist Commission 3
- Austrian Trade Commission 3
- Austrian Trade Delegate in the U.S. 3
- Vienna Tourist Board 3
- Austrian Airlines 2
- Austrian State Tourist Department 2
- People's Party of Austria 2
- Tourist Promotion Board, City of Vienna 2
- Voest-Alpine, A.G. 2
- Advantage Austria at the Austrian Federal Economic Chamber (WKO) 1
- Andras Zako 1
- Associated Austrian Iron & Steel Works Corporation 1
- Austria 1
- Austrian Consulate General of Chicago 1
- Austrian Federal Chamber of Commerce 1
- Austrian Federal Chancellery-Federal Press & Information Service 1
- Austrian Federal Economic Chamber 1
- Austrian Federal Ministry of Finance 1
- Austrian Federal Ministry of Foreign Affairs 1
- Austrian Federal Press Office 1
- Austrian Federal Press Office (New York World's Fair) 1
- Austrian Freedom Party 1
- Austrian Government 1
- Austrian Hard Cheese Association 1
- Austrian Nation, Austrian Federal Government, Federation of Austrians (Underground Movement) 1
- Austrian National Bank 1
- Austrian National Tourist Office (Oesterreichische Fremdenverkehrswerbung) 1
- …
Country/Location_Represented 1
- AUSTRIA · 119 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name ▼ | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5016 | 5016 | 1986-04-04 | Austrian Trade Commission, New York Office | 1983-12-06 | AUSTRIA | A.H.W. Advertising, Inc. 3545 | 1984-01-05 | A.H.W. Advertising, Inc. | |||||
7666 | 7666 | 1955-06-08 | Andras Zako | 1949-12-08 | AUSTRIA | Agh, Laszlo 601 | 1949-12-08 | Agh, Laszlo | Absam bei Hall | ||||
1687 | 1687 | 1969-01-31 | Hirtenberger Patronen-Zundhutchen-u-Metallwarenfabrik, A.G. | 1966-07-08 | AUSTRIA | Alcott, Roger E. 1985 | 1966-07-08 | Alcott, Roger E. | Wien IV | ||||
915 | 915 | 1988-01-01 | Voest-Alpine, A.G. | 1985-01-14 | AUSTRIA | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC 2661 | 1976-02-18 | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC | Linz | ||||
13799 | 13799 | 1983-11-07 | Vereinigte Edelstahlwerke, A.G. | 1982-03-18 | AUSTRIA | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC 2661 | 1976-02-18 | Arent Fox Kintner Plotkin & Kahn, PLLC | Vienna | ||||
7028 | 7028 | 1964-05-31 | Alpine Tourist Commission | 1964-11-06 | AUSTRIA | Association Films, Inc. 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
12746 | 12746 | 1945-10-16 | Free Austrian World Movement | 1945-03-08 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Action, Inc. - Free Austrian Movement 295 | 1945-03-08 | Austrian Action, Inc. - Free Austrian Movement | London, England | ||||
5959 | 5959 | 1997-04-30 | ICD Gesellschaft fuer Industrieansiedlung & Industrielle Kooperation G.M.B.H. | 1984-10-16 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Business Agency 3620 | 1984-10-16 | Austrian Business Agency | Vienna | ||||
8797 | 8797 | 1945-07-01 | Sozialdemokratische Arbeiterpartei Oesterreichs (Social Democratic Labor Party of Austria) | 1942-09-29 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Labor Committee 129 | 1942-09-29 | Austrian Labor Committee | |||||
13515 | 13515 | 1945-11-01 | Delegation Abroad of the Austrian Trade Unions (Auslandsvertretung der Freien Gewerkschaften Ocsterreichs) | 1944-12-18 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Labor Committee 129 | 1942-09-29 | Austrian Labor Committee | London, England | ||||
2257 | 2257 | 1985-02-07 | Austrian National Tourist Office | 1974-01-23 | AUSTRIA | Austrian National Tourist Office for the Pacific Northwest 2454 | 1973-09-04 | Austrian National Tourist Office for the Pacific Northwest | Vienna | ||||
6173 | 6173 | 1980-05-01 | Austrian National Tourist Office (Oesterreichische Fremdenverkehrswerbung) | 1973-12-04 | AUSTRIA | Austrian National Tourist Office, Los Angeles 2481 | 1973-12-04 | Austrian National Tourist Office, Los Angeles | Vienna | ||||
12878 | 12878 | 1993-10-20 | Austrian National Tourist Office | 1973-09-04 | AUSTRIA | Austrian National Tourist Office, Midwest Office 2457 | 1973-09-04 | Austrian National Tourist Office, Midwest Office | Chicago | IL | |||
57 | 57 | Austrian National Tourist Office | 1947-10-03 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Tourist Office, Inc. 495 | 1947-10-03 | Austrian Tourist Office, Inc. | New York | NY | ||||
10586 | 10586 | 1995-08-17 | Federal Economic Chamber of Austria | 1982-09-20 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Trade Commission in the U.S., Houston 3410 | 1982-09-20 | Austrian Trade Commission in the U.S., Houston | Vienna | ||||
246 | 246 | Federal Economic Chamber of Austria (Wirtschftskammer Oesterreichs) | 1995-08-17 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Trade Commission in the U.S., Southern Region 5041 | 1995-08-17 | Austrian Trade Commission in the U.S., Southern Region | Vienna | |||||
12264 | 12264 | 2021-09-30 | Advantage Austria at the Austrian Federal Economic Chamber (WKO) | 2013-11-04 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Trade Commission, Chicago 6193 | 2013-11-04 | Austrian Trade Commission, Chicago | Wiedner Hauptstrasse 63 | 1045 Vienna | |||
12645 | 12645 | 1992-10-13 | Federal Chamber of Economics | 1953-10-21 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Trade Commission, Los Angeles 793 | 1953-10-21 | Austrian Trade Commission, Los Angeles | |||||
11702 | 11702 | 1992-09-18 | Austrian Federal Economic Chamber | 1950-05-11 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Trade Commission, New York 625 | 1950-05-11 | Austrian Trade Commission, New York | |||||
7894 | 7894 | 1992-06-17 | Austrian Federal Chamber of Commerce | 1955-02-21 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Trade Commissioner in the U.S., Chicago 874 | 1955-02-21 | Austrian Trade Commissioner in the U.S., Chicago | Chicago | IL | |||
12887 | 12887 | 1969-10-21 | Bundeskammer der Gewerblichen Wirtschaft | 1966-07-14 | AUSTRIA | Austrian Trade Delegate in the U.S., Southern Office 1986 | 1966-07-14 | Austrian Trade Delegate in the U.S., Southern Office | Vienna | ||||
1635 | 1635 | 1987-01-30 | Austrian Hard Cheese Association | 1980-06-03 | AUSTRIA | Berry, Max N. 2216 | 1970-10-30 | Berry, Max N. | |||||
1638 | 1638 | 1987-01-30 | OEHEG-Austrian Hard Cheese Association - OEMOLK-Austrian Soft Cheese Assocation | 1979-07-24 | AUSTRIA | Berry, Max N. 2216 | 1970-10-30 | Berry, Max N. | Innsbruck | ||||
10657 | 10657 | 1974-08-22 | Austrian Trade Delegate in the U.S. | 1970-10-30 | AUSTRIA | Berry, Max N. 2216 | 1970-10-30 | Berry, Max N. | New York | NY | |||
15792 | 15792 | 1977-12-31 | OEHEG | 1974-01-09 | AUSTRIA | Berry, Max N. 2216 | 1970-10-30 | Berry, Max N. | |||||
15793 | 15793 | 1977-12-31 | Oemolk | 1974-03-07 | AUSTRIA | Berry, Max N. 2216 | 1970-10-30 | Berry, Max N. | |||||
6863 | 6863 | 1959-05-27 | Oesterreichisches Seefrachtenkontor Ges, mbh | 1957-10-01 | AUSTRIA | Brookhart, Becker & Dorsey 950 | 1956-04-26 | Brookhart, Becker & Dorsey | |||||
16261 | 16261 | 1994-12-31 | IMMUNO, A.G. | 1991-07-18 | AUSTRIA | Capitol Associates, Inc. 4544 | 1991-07-18 | Capitol Associates, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
2136 | 2136 | 1961-02-03 | Tourist Promotion Board, City of Vienna | 1959-02-02 | AUSTRIA | Caples Company 34 | 1943-03-03 | Caples Company | |||||
3023 | 3023 | 1998-02-28 | Austrian Freedom Party | 1997-01-27 | AUSTRIA | Carmen Group, Inc. & Linton, Mields, Reisler & Cottone, Inc. 4855 | 1993-09-30 | Carmen Group, Inc. & Linton, Mields, Reisler & Cottone, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
15617 | 15617 | 1962-12-31 | Austrian State Tourist Department | 1951-05-31 | AUSTRIA | Charles W. Hoyt Company, Inc. 361 | 1946-06-10 | Charles W. Hoyt Company, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
12976 | 12976 | 1968-10-24 | Alpine Tourist Commission | 1964-10-12 | AUSTRIA | Clinton E. Frank, Inc., New York 1601 | 1963-02-25 | Clinton E. Frank, Inc., New York | Vienna | ||||
9555 | 9555 | 1952-07-28 | Government of Austria | 1948-08-23 | AUSTRIA | Cox, Oscar S. 341 | 1946-01-28 | Cox, Oscar S. | Washington | DC | |||
1577 | 1577 | 1976-01-28 | Austrian Federal Press Office | 1964-11-30 | AUSTRIA | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
1578 | 1578 | 1976-01-28 | Austrian National Bank | 1975-01-16 | AUSTRIA | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
1579 | 1579 | 1976-01-28 | Bundeskammer der gewerblichen Wirtschaft (Austrian Chamber of Commerce | 1969-01-02 | AUSTRIA | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
1581 | 1581 | 1976-01-28 | Government of Austria (Austrian Information Service) | 1958-01-28 | AUSTRIA | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
1583 | 1583 | 1976-01-28 | Oesterreiche National Bank | 1964-11-30 | AUSTRIA | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
10201 | 10201 | 1969-08-08 | Ministry of Commerce, Austrian Tourist Department | 1964-11-30 | AUSTRIA | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
14628 | 14628 | 1969-12-01 | Austrian Federal Press Office (New York World's Fair) | 1964-11-30 | AUSTRIA | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | |||||
8105 | 8105 | 1974-06-26 | Austrian Tourist Office | 1973-10-01 | AUSTRIA | Davis Public Relations, Inc. 2462 | 1973-10-01 | Davis Public Relations, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
10672 | 10672 | 1965-08-23 | Provisional Council of Government, Free Territory of Trieste | 1962-03-16 | AUSTRIA | De Cleve, Frank 1526 | 1962-03-16 | De Cleve, Frank | Trieste | ||||
14113 | 14113 | 1976-11-21 | Government of Austria | 1960-06-24 | AUSTRIA | Delson & Gordon 502 | 1947-11-21 | Delson & Gordon | Vienna | ||||
749 | 749 | Vienna Tourist Board | 2022-05-09 | AUSTRIA | Development Counsellors International 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | Invalidenstrasse 6 | Vienna | ||||
12336 | 12336 | 1982-10-01 | ICD Austria (Industrial Cooperation & Development, Inc.) | 1983-04-29 | AUSTRIA | Development Counsellors International, Ltd. 1421 | 1961-01-30 | Development Counsellors International, Ltd. | |||||
15086 | 15086 | 1964-12-14 | Bundeskammer der Gewerblichen Wirtschaft (Federal Chamber of Commerce) | 1964-12-14 | AUSTRIA | Dosmar, Kurt John 1832 | 1964-12-14 | Dosmar, Kurt John | |||||
15088 | 15088 | 1964-12-14 | Peter R. Fitz, Austrian Trade Delegate in the U.S. | 1965-02-18 | AUSTRIA | Dosmar, Kurt John 1832 | 1964-12-14 | Dosmar, Kurt John | New York | NY | |||
1243 | 1243 | 1991-01-12 | Austrian Tourist Board | 1985-08-09 | AUSTRIA | Doyle, Graf & Mabley, Inc. 3719 | 1985-08-09 | Doyle, Graf & Mabley, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
15363 | 15363 | 1964-12-24 | Austrian Consulate General of Chicago | 1964-10-05 | AUSTRIA | Drost, John A. 1798 | 1964-10-05 | Drost, John A. | Chicago | IL | |||
15364 | 15364 | 1964-12-24 | Austrian Trade Delegate in the U.S. | 1964-12-30 | AUSTRIA | Drost, John A. 1798 | 1964-10-05 | Drost, John A. | Chicago | IL | |||
4856 | 4856 | 1973-04-01 | City of Graz | 1973-02-07 | AUSTRIA | Feldman, Maurice 1094 | 1957-12-13 | Feldman, Maurice | |||||
6758 | 6758 | 1962-05-24 | Associated Austrian Iron & Steel Works Corporation | 1962-10-08 | AUSTRIA | Feldman, Maurice 1094 | 1957-12-13 | Feldman, Maurice | |||||
9066 | 9066 | 1976-07-07 | City of Vienna | 1969-07-14 | AUSTRIA | Feldman, Maurice 1094 | 1957-12-13 | Feldman, Maurice | Vienna | ||||
9067 | 9067 | 1976-07-07 | Government of Austria | 1969-07-14 | AUSTRIA | Feldman, Maurice 1094 | 1957-12-13 | Feldman, Maurice | Vienna | ||||
9699 | 9699 | 1965-07-31 | Fremdeverkehrs-Stelle der Stadt Wien | 1965-06-30 | AUSTRIA | Feldman, Maurice 1094 | 1957-12-13 | Feldman, Maurice | Vienna | ||||
11917 | 11917 | 1967-09-30 | Bundestheaterverwaltung | 1967-07-14 | AUSTRIA | Feldman, Maurice 1094 | 1957-12-13 | Feldman, Maurice | Vienna | ||||
14333 | 14333 | 1967-11-30 | Osterreichischer Bundes Pressedienst | 1957-12-13 | AUSTRIA | Feldman, Maurice 1094 | 1957-12-13 | Feldman, Maurice | Vienna | ||||
8434 | 8434 | 1988-06-30 | Vienna Tourist Board | 1986-10-14 | AUSTRIA | Fontayne Group, Inc. 3752 | 1985-10-30 | Fontayne Group, Inc. | Wein | ||||
11070 | 11070 | 2001-08-31 | Austrian National Tourist Office | 1986-10-14 | AUSTRIA | Fontayne Group, Inc. 3752 | 1985-10-30 | Fontayne Group, Inc. | |||||
7693 | 7693 | 1947-06-09 | Austrian People in Austria | 1943-06-09 | AUSTRIA | Free Austrian Movement 195 | 1943-06-09 | Free Austrian Movement | |||||
2038 | 2038 | 1991-02-01 | Expo '95 | 1990-02-12 | AUSTRIA | GCI Group, Inc. 3856 | 1986-07-11 | GCI Group, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
3798 | 3798 | 1943-03-16 | Dr. Willibald N. Ploechl, Chairman of Free Austrian National Council | 1942-07-13 | AUSTRIA | Gassner, Josef Hieronymus 43 | 1942-07-13 | Gassner, Josef Hieronymus | |||||
11209 | 11209 | 1961-09-01 | Tourist Promotion Board, City of Vienna | 1961-08-01 | AUSTRIA | Geyer & Oswald, Inc. 1468 | 1961-08-01 | Geyer & Oswald, Inc. | |||||
15963 | 15963 | 1986-12-31 | Industrial Cooperation & Development Company | 1985-03-26 | AUSTRIA | Global U.S.A., Inc. 3489 | 1983-06-24 | Global U.S.A., Inc. | Vienna | ||||
15992 | 15992 | 1986-12-31 | Voest-Alpine, A.G. | 1985-03-26 | AUSTRIA | Global U.S.A., Inc. 3489 | 1983-06-24 | Global U.S.A., Inc. | Linz | ||||
1708 | 1708 | 1983-01-31 | Alpine Tourist Commission | 1980-07-01 | AUSTRIA | Graf Desley, Inc. 3118 | 1980-07-01 | Graf Desley, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
1709 | 1709 | 1983-01-31 | Austrian Wine Institute or Osterreichisher Weinsirtshaftsonds | 1981-11-19 | AUSTRIA | Graf Desley, Inc. 3118 | 1980-07-01 | Graf Desley, Inc. | Wein | ||||
6716 | 6716 | 1995-05-22 | Liberal Party of Austria (Austrian Freedom Party) | 1995-05-18 | AUSTRIA | Hannaford Company, Inc. 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
16375 | 16375 | 1996-12-31 | Austrian National Tourist Office | 1989-05-31 | AUSTRIA | Herman Associates, Inc. 2578 | 1975-04-22 | Herman Associates, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
13226 | 13226 | 1982-10-31 | Austrian Trade Commission | 1981-04-22 | AUSTRIA | Hill & Knowlton, Inc. 2740 | 1976-12-17 | Hill & Knowlton, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
2217 | 2217 | 1987-02-05 | People's Party of Austria | 1987-02-05 | AUSTRIA | Hugh C. Newton & Associates 2357 | 1972-07-17 | Hugh C. Newton & Associates | Hofburg | ||||
7698 | 7698 | 1986-06-09 | People's Party of Austria | 1986-05-01 | AUSTRIA | Hugh C. Newton & Associates 2357 | 1972-07-17 | Hugh C. Newton & Associates | Vienna | ||||
12120 | 12120 | 2001-09-30 | Austrian Airlines | 2000-10-02 | AUSTRIA | InterVISTAS-ga2 Consulting, Inc. 4902 | 1994-03-14 | InterVISTAS-ga2 Consulting, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
11383 | 11383 | 1989-09-05 | Austrian Airlines | 1987-10-15 | AUSTRIA | Jon F. Ash & Associates 3943 | 1987-03-05 | Jon F. Ash & Associates | |||||
3247 | 3247 | 1975-03-01 | Austrian Travel Sales Organization | 1974-09-11 | AUSTRIA | Jurgen Hartmann Agency 2395 | 1972-11-30 | Jurgen Hartmann Agency | New York | NY | |||
8129 | 8129 | 1986-06-27 | Austrian National Tourist Office | 1972-11-30 | AUSTRIA | Jurgen Hartmann Agency 2395 | 1972-11-30 | Jurgen Hartmann Agency | New York | NY | |||
6202 | 6202 | 1990-05-01 | Dial Austria Instant Reservations, Inc. | 1987-05-26 | AUSTRIA | Keating Group, Inc. 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | NY | ||||
1048 | 1048 | 1978-01-02 | Federal Republic of Austria | 1976-07-01 | AUSTRIA | Masterman, Edward I. 2704 | 1976-07-01 | Masterman, Edward I. | Washington | DC | |||
7508 | 7508 | 1947-06-03 | Landesverkehrsamt fuer Fremdenverkehrs Salzburg | 1946-06-03 | AUSTRIA | Mattesich, Rudolf F. 360 | 1946-06-03 | Mattesich, Rudolf F. | Salzburg | ||||
7509 | 7509 | 1947-06-03 | Oesterreichisches Verkehrsbureau | 1946-06-03 | AUSTRIA | Mattesich, Rudolf F. 360 | 1946-06-03 | Mattesich, Rudolf F. | |||||
7510 | 7510 | 1947-06-03 | Salzburg Festspiele | 1946-06-03 | AUSTRIA | Mattesich, Rudolf F. 360 | 1946-06-03 | Mattesich, Rudolf F. | Salzburg | ||||
4897 | 4897 | 1986-04-01 | Austrian Federal Chancellery-Federal Press & Information Service | 1984-02-04 | AUSTRIA | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
7040 | 7040 | 1970-05-31 | Austrian Trade Delegate in the U.S. | 1969-05-19 | AUSTRIA | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
12859 | 12859 | 1995-10-19 | Austrian Press & Information Office | 1988-10-07 | AUSTRIA | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | Vienna | ||||
13660 | 13660 | 1983-11-02 | Austrian Government | 1975-06-13 | AUSTRIA | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
11030 | 11030 | 1994-08-31 | Government of Austria | 1994-02-22 | AUSTRIA | Mullenholz, Brimsek & Belair 4897 | 1994-02-22 | Mullenholz, Brimsek & Belair | Washington | DC | |||
9232 | 9232 | 1950-07-14 | Ludwig Kleinwaechter | 1947-10-16 | AUSTRIA | National Lecture Management 463 | 1947-05-26 | National Lecture Management | Washington | DC | |||
11200 | 11200 | 1952-09-01 | Hans Thalberg | 1952-09-19 | AUSTRIA | National Lecture Management, Inc. 638 | 1950-08-16 | National Lecture Management, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
2695 | 2695 | 1955-02-22 | Ferenc Nemeth | 1954-11-29 | AUSTRIA | Nemeth, Istvan B. 816 | 1954-02-23 | Nemeth, Istvan B. | |||||
8223 | 8223 | 1954-06-30 | Farkas Sreter | 1954-02-23 | AUSTRIA | Nemeth, Istvan B. 816 | 1954-02-23 | Nemeth, Istvan B. | |||||
12312 | 12312 | 1971-10-01 | Austrian State Tourist Department (Austrian National Tourist Office) (Oesterreichische Fremdenverkehrswebung) | 1969-12-19 | AUSTRIA | Niven, Alexander C. 2179 | 1969-12-19 | Niven, Alexander C. | |||||
5204 | 5204 | 1986-04-12 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1985-03-18 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | NY | ||||
5227 | 5227 | 1993-04-12 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1993-04-07 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | Washington | DC | |||
5871 | 5871 | 1992-04-30 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1992-04-03 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | New York | NY | |||
12370 | 12370 | 1991-10-01 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1991-07-11 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | |||||
12953 | 12953 | 1985-10-23 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1980-02-06 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | NY | ||||
13000 | 13000 | 1989-10-25 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1986-12-12 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | |||||
13585 | 13585 | 1991-11-01 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1991-03-29 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | New York | NY | |||
13732 | 13732 | 1990-11-05 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1990-06-21 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | New York | NY | |||
13865 | 13865 | 1992-11-10 | Austrian Press & Information Service | 1992-10-13 | AUSTRIA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | Washington | DC |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );