FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
130 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "HAITI" and State = ""
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_1, Address_2, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Sorini, Samet & Associates, LLC 6
- Haiti Government Tourist Bureau 4
- Davidson, I. Irving 3
- Loughlin, Elmer H. 3
- Berlanti, Louis J. 2
- Chapman, DiSalle & Friedman 2
- Demougeot, George 2
- Gileadi, Ian 2
- Haitian Industries, Inc. 2
- Law Offices of Robert C. McCandless 2
- Parti National Haitian (Haitian National Party) 2
- Rigaud, Roger 2
- Scanlon, Thomas J. 2
- Alexander, Raymond Pace 1
- Allied Public Relations, Inc. 1
- Alyse Lynn Booth & Associates 1
- Anfuso Jr., Victor L. 1
- Angelo Viard 1
- BKSH & Associates 1
- Barnes, James M. 1
- Bastien, Goldstein, & Blackthorne Group (BGB Group) 1
- Benford Associates, Inc. 1
- Berlanti Overseas Corporation 1
- Berle Jr., A.A. 1
- Bishopric, Green & Fielden, Inc. 1
- Bolte, Jean Antoine Max 1
- Bonhomme, Arthur 1
- Brenda Joyce & Associates, Inc. 1
- Buohl, Chauncey R. 1
- Burton V. Wides, P.C. 1
- …
Registrant_Date (date) >30 ✖
- 2007-11-12 6
- 1955-04-18 3
- 1963-12-16 3
- 1965-06-16 3
- 1955-01-21 2
- 1959-01-30 2
- 1959-09-11 2
- 1960-06-03 2
- 1960-09-22 2
- 1983-07-12 2
- 1946-12-06 1
- 1947-01-03 1
- 1947-05-21 1
- 1947-11-14 1
- 1948-03-11 1
- 1948-03-22 1
- 1951-02-20 1
- 1952-05-26 1
- 1954-03-24 1
- 1956-05-21 1
- 1956-06-15 1
- 1957-11-04 1
- 1957-11-27 1
- 1958-01-01 1
- 1958-09-26 1
- 1958-10-09 1
- 1959-01-13 1
- 1959-06-03 1
- 1959-07-08 1
- 1959-07-17 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Republic of Haiti 24
- Government of Haiti 19
- Haiti National Office of Tourism 3
- Boulos, Reginald 2
- Dr. Reginald Boulos 2
- Government of the Republic of Haiti 2
- Haitian Government 2
- Parti Agricole Industriel National 2
- Provisional Government of Haiti 2
- Republique d'Haiti 2
- A Voluntary Committee of the Parti National 1
- Agri-Supply Company, S.A. 1
- CMO-HOPE 1
- Caribbean Rice Company 1
- Center for Development & Health 1
- Center for Facilitation of Investments (through L' Association des Industries d' Haiti (ADIH) 1
- Clement S. Benoit 1
- Commission de Mise en Oeuvre de la Loi HOPE (CMO-HOPE) 1
- Conseil National du Tourisme (Haiti Tourist Board) 1
- Departement des Affaires Estrangeres et des Cultes 1
- Dove Industries, S.A. 1
- Dr. Ariel Henry 1
- Dr. Francois Duvalier 1
- Dr. Francois Duvalier (President de la Republique D'Haiti) 1
- Dr. Gaston Jumelle 1
- Francois Duvalier 1
- Gaston Jumelle 1
- Gilbert Bigio 1
- Government of Haiti (Customs) 1
- Government of Haiti (Office National du Cafe') 1
- …
City 6
State 1
- - · 130 ✖
Country/Location_Represented 1
- HAITI · 130 ✖
Link | rowid ▼ | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 6 | Center for Facilitation of Investments (through L' Association des Industries d' Haiti (ADIH) | 2021-04-22 | HAITI | Sorini, Samet & Associates, LLC 5839 | 2007-11-12 | Sorini, Samet & Associates, LLC | ||||||
153 | 153 | Dr. Ariel Henry | 2023-03-16 | HAITI | Angelo Viard 7244 | 2023-03-16 | Angelo Viard | 33 Boulevard Harry Truman | Port Au Prince, Ouest, | ||||
871 | 871 | 1985-01-01 | Departement des Affaires Estrangeres et des Cultes | 1982-10-15 | HAITI | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | Port-au-Prince | ||||
874 | 874 | 1985-01-01 | Republic of Haiti | 1983-01-20 | HAITI | Jack McDonald Associates, Inc. 3038 | 1979-07-13 | Jack McDonald Associates, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
878 | 878 | 1986-01-01 | Haiti National Office of Tourism | 1985-07-24 | HAITI | Benford Associates, Inc. 3703 | 1985-07-24 | Benford Associates, Inc. | |||||
1152 | 1152 | 1960-01-08 | Secretairerie d'Etat Republique d'Haiti | 1959-07-08 | HAITI | Osherman, Jack A. 1245 | 1959-07-08 | Osherman, Jack A. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
1254 | 1254 | 1959-01-13 | President Duvalier (Government of Haiti) | 1959-01-13 | HAITI | James, Chauncey Thomas 1193 | 1959-01-13 | James, Chauncey Thomas | Port-au-Prince | ||||
1284 | 1284 | 1986-01-14 | Republic of Haiti | 1984-08-06 | HAITI | Garrett & Company 3439 | 1983-02-03 | Garrett & Company | Port au Prince | ||||
1298 | 1298 | 1959-01-15 | Republic of Haiti | 1958-10-09 | HAITI | Allied Public Relations, Inc. 1177 | 1958-10-09 | Allied Public Relations, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
1415 | 1415 | 2018-01-19 | Ministry of Commerce and Industry of Haiti (through Association des Industries d'Haiti) (ADIH) | 2017-06-19 | HAITI | Sorini, Samet & Associates, LLC 5839 | 2007-11-12 | Sorini, Samet & Associates, LLC | |||||
1447 | 1447 | 1990-01-21 | Government of Haiti, Ministry of Finance | 1989-07-07 | HAITI | Swidler Berlin Shereff Friedman, LLP 4079 | 1988-01-07 | Swidler Berlin Shereff Friedman, LLP | Port-au-Prince | ||||
1453 | 1453 | 2014-01-21 | Government of Haiti/Republic of Haiti | 2014-01-21 | HAITI | Bastien, Goldstein, & Blackthorne Group (BGB Group) 6206 | 2014-01-21 | Bastien, Goldstein, & Blackthorne Group (BGB Group) | Primature d'Haiti 33, Boulevard Harry Truman | Port-au-Prince HT 6110 | |||
1532 | 1532 | 1970-01-26 | L'Office du Timbre, Government of Haiti | 1968-02-26 | HAITI | Fatoullah & Lazar, Inc. 2075 | 1968-02-26 | Fatoullah & Lazar, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
1628 | 1628 | 1964-01-30 | Republique d'Haiti | 1963-07-19 | HAITI | Shindler, Bernard 1646 | 1963-07-19 | Shindler, Bernard | Port-au-Prince | ||||
1701 | 1701 | 1976-01-31 | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau | 1976-04-26 | HAITI | Tromson Monroe Advertising, Inc. 2403 | 1973-01-09 | Tromson Monroe Advertising, Inc. | |||||
1784 | 1784 | 1995-01-31 | Center for Development & Health | 1993-06-21 | HAITI | Scanlon, Thomas J. 3500 | 1983-07-12 | Scanlon, Thomas J. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
1824 | 1824 | 1999-01-31 | Government of Haiti (Customs) | 1997-07-17 | HAITI | Sandler & Travis Trade Advisory Services, Inc. 4699 | 1992-07-31 | Sandler & Travis Trade Advisory Services, Inc. | Port Au Prince | ||||
2260 | 2260 | 1986-02-07 | Government of Haiti | 1982-12-16 | HAITI | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | Port-au-Prince | ||||
2307 | 2307 | 1955-02-09 | Republic of Haiti | 1955-02-11 | HAITI | Rips, Serge 500 | 1947-11-14 | Rips, Serge | Port-au-Prince | ||||
2378 | 2378 | 1981-02-11 | Republic of Haiti, West Indies ONACORA Corporation | 1980-08-06 | HAITI | Buohl, Chauncey R. 3134 | 1980-08-06 | Buohl, Chauncey R. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
2677 | 2677 | 1953-02-20 | Government of Haiti | 1951-02-20 | HAITI | Barnes, James M. 660 | 1951-02-20 | Barnes, James M. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
2722 | 2722 | 1967-02-23 | Republic of Haiti | 1958-09-02 | HAITI | Chapman, DiSalle & Friedman 867 | 1955-01-21 | Chapman, DiSalle & Friedman | Port-au-Prince | ||||
2860 | 2860 | 1986-02-26 | Republic of Haiti | 1984-10-29 | HAITI | Shea & Gould 3624 | 1984-10-29 | Shea & Gould | Port-au-Prince | ||||
3064 | 3064 | 2004-02-28 | Republic of Haiti | 2003-04-24 | HAITI | Foley Hoag, LLP 4776 | 1993-03-02 | Foley Hoag, LLP | Palais National Port-au-Prince | ||||
3065 | 3065 | 2004-02-28 | Republic of Haiti | 2003-12-30 | HAITI | Dellums & Associates 5593 | 2003-12-30 | Dellums & Associates | Port au Prince | ||||
3183 | 3183 | 2020-02-29 | Boulos, Reginald | 2020-01-27 | HAITI | Shamlin, Richard 6788 | 2020-01-27 | Shamlin, Richard | 20 Boulevard Toussaint Louverture | Port au Prince, HT6120 | |||
3283 | 3283 | 1987-03-01 | Mr. Marc Bazin | 1986-08-15 | HAITI | Alyse Lynn Booth & Associates 3870 | 1986-08-15 | Alyse Lynn Booth & Associates | Port-au-Prince | ||||
3312 | 3312 | 1994-03-01 | Usine A. Manteque de Port-Au-Prince | 1993-05-10 | HAITI | Law Offices of Robert K. Kelley 4754 | 1993-01-19 | Law Offices of Robert K. Kelley | Port-Au-Prince | ||||
3450 | 3450 | 1949-03-05 | Republic of Haiti | 1948-03-22 | HAITI | Dunbaugh, Frank Montgomery 519 | 1948-03-22 | Dunbaugh, Frank Montgomery | Port-au-Prince | ||||
3570 | 3570 | 1950-03-10 | Haitian Government | 1948-04-14 | HAITI | Haitian Travel Center, Inc. 516 | 1948-03-11 | Haitian Travel Center, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
3592 | 3592 | 1960-03-11 | Gaston Jumelle | 1959-09-11 | HAITI | Rigaud, Roger 1268 | 1959-09-11 | Rigaud, Roger | Mexico City | ||||
3593 | 3593 | 1960-03-11 | Parti National of Haiti | 1959-09-11 | HAITI | Rigaud, Roger 1268 | 1959-09-11 | Rigaud, Roger | Mexico City | ||||
3663 | 3663 | 1985-03-12 | Government of Haiti | 1982-02-12 | HAITI | Kaufman & Maraffi, Inc. 3333 | 1982-02-12 | Kaufman & Maraffi, Inc. | |||||
3732 | 3732 | 2022-03-14 | MTVAYITI | 2019-11-25 | HAITI | Llera, Allison Maria 6756 | 2019-11-25 | Llera, Allison Maria | El Rancho | Petion Ville | |||
3746 | 3746 | 1962-03-15 | Republic of Haiti | 1959-03-19 | HAITI | Chapman, DiSalle & Friedman 867 | 1955-01-21 | Chapman, DiSalle & Friedman | Port-au-Prince | ||||
3811 | 3811 | 1978-03-16 | Republique d'Haiti (Corps d'Aviation, Forces Armees d'Haiti) (Compagnie Haitienne de Transport Aeriens) | 1966-03-16 | HAITI | Rincones, Ralph Antonio 1968 | 1966-03-16 | Rincones, Ralph Antonio | |||||
3904 | 3904 | 1962-03-20 | Inter-American Regional Organization of the International Confederation of Free Trade Unions | 1962-04-04 | HAITI | L'Union Nationale des Ouvriers d'Haiti en Exil 1534 | 1962-04-04 | L'Union Nationale des Ouvriers d'Haiti en Exil | |||||
3964 | 3964 | 1961-03-22 | Republic of Haiti | 1960-09-22 | HAITI | Berlanti, Louis J. 1393 | 1960-09-22 | Berlanti, Louis J. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
3965 | 3965 | 1961-03-22 | Special Economic Commission | 1961-05-01 | HAITI | Berlanti, Louis J. 1393 | 1960-09-22 | Berlanti, Louis J. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
4036 | 4036 | 1966-03-25 | Government of Haiti | 1966-03-25 | HAITI | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau 1972 | 1966-03-25 | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau | Port-au-Prince | ||||
4465 | 4465 | 1989-03-31 | Haitian Federation of Private Sector Associations | 1989-04-11 | HAITI | Scanlon, Thomas J. 3500 | 1983-07-12 | Scanlon, Thomas J. | Port au Prince | ||||
5119 | 5119 | 1993-04-09 | Gilbert Bigio | 1992-08-05 | HAITI | Powell, Goldstein, Frazer & Murphy, L.L.P. 3274 | 1981-09-10 | Powell, Goldstein, Frazer & Murphy, L.L.P. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
5243 | 5243 | 1988-04-13 | Government of Haiti, Leslie F. Manigat, President | 1988-02-17 | HAITI | Miner, Fraser & Gabriel Public Affairs, Inc. 4022 | 1987-08-11 | Miner, Fraser & Gabriel Public Affairs, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
5256 | 5256 | 1982-04-14 | Government of Republic of Haiti | 1981-11-05 | HAITI | Gomez, Ellis Riera 3299 | 1981-11-05 | Gomez, Ellis Riera | |||||
5612 | 5612 | 1965-04-27 | Provisional Government of the Republic of Haiti (Haitian Government in Exile) | 1964-07-24 | HAITI | Bolte, Jean Antoine Max 1774 | 1964-07-24 | Bolte, Jean Antoine Max | San Juan | ||||
5806 | 5806 | 1975-04-30 | Republic of Haiti, National Office of Tourism & Propaganda | 1965-09-24 | HAITI | Newman-Schulte-Reece, Inc. 1928 | 1965-09-24 | Newman-Schulte-Reece, Inc. | |||||
6200 | 6200 | 1987-05-01 | Marc Bazin | 1986-09-21 | HAITI | Friends of Marc Bazin, Inc. 3885 | 1986-09-21 | Friends of Marc Bazin, Inc. | Port au Price | ||||
6369 | 6369 | 2013-05-06 | Societe Nationale des Parcs Industriels (SONAPI) | 2013-02-12 | HAITI | Sorini, Samet & Associates, LLC 5839 | 2007-11-12 | Sorini, Samet & Associates, LLC | Boulevard Toussaint Louvertur (route A rope e rt) | PO Box 2345 Port-au-Prince | |||
6802 | 6802 | 1983-05-25 | Haitian Textile Exporters' Association (AHATEX) | 1979-11-26 | HAITI | Fasturn, Inc. 2944 | 1978-08-09 | Fasturn, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
6840 | 6840 | 1952-05-26 | Government of Haiti | 1952-05-26 | HAITI | Haitian Dessalines Western Hemisphere Trade Corporation 726 | 1952-05-26 | Haitian Dessalines Western Hemisphere Trade Corporation | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7025 | 7025 | 1963-05-31 | Government of the Republic of Haiti | 1963-05-31 | HAITI | Anfuso Jr., Victor L. 1633 | 1963-05-31 | Anfuso Jr., Victor L. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7336 | 7336 | 1964-06-01 | Haytian (Haitian)-American Sugar Company, S.A. | 1962-02-16 | HAITI | Richard C. O'Hare & James H. Rowe, Jr. 1519 | 1962-02-16 | Richard C. O'Hare & James H. Rowe, Jr. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7628 | 7628 | 1966-06-06 | Republic of Haiti, City of Port-au-Prince | 1965-12-06 | HAITI | Kenneth G. Smith & Associates, Inc. 1943 | 1965-12-06 | Kenneth G. Smith & Associates, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7750 | 7750 | 1993-06-11 | Provisional Government of Haiti | 1992-05-20 | HAITI | Law Offices of Robert C. McCandless 4668 | 1992-05-20 | Law Offices of Robert C. McCandless | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7868 | 7868 | 1964-06-16 | Caribbean Rice Company | 1963-12-16 | HAITI | Loughlin, Elmer H. 1671 | 1963-12-16 | Loughlin, Elmer H. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7869 | 7869 | 1964-06-16 | Dove Industries, S.A. | 1963-12-16 | HAITI | Loughlin, Elmer H. 1671 | 1963-12-16 | Loughlin, Elmer H. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7870 | 7870 | 1964-06-16 | Francois Duvalier | 1963-12-16 | HAITI | Loughlin, Elmer H. 1671 | 1963-12-16 | Loughlin, Elmer H. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7880 | 7880 | 1994-06-16 | H.E. Jean Bertrand Aristide | 1992-05-19 | HAITI | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau 1901 | 1965-06-16 | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7881 | 7881 | 1994-06-16 | Jean Francois Chamblain | 1992-05-19 | HAITI | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau 1901 | 1965-06-16 | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7882 | 7882 | 1994-06-16 | Republic of Haiti, Office National du Tourisme et de la Propagande | 1965-09-20 | HAITI | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau 1901 | 1965-06-16 | Haiti Government Tourist Bureau | Port Au Prince | ||||
7908 | 7908 | 1973-06-18 | Dr. Francois Duvalier (President de la Republique D'Haiti) | 1970-06-30 | HAITI | Davidson, I. Irving 886 | 1955-04-18 | Davidson, I. Irving | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7917 | 7917 | 1973-06-18 | President Jean-Claude Duvalier | 1971-06-15 | HAITI | Davidson, I. Irving 886 | 1955-04-18 | Davidson, I. Irving | Port-au-Prince | ||||
7921 | 7921 | 1973-06-18 | Republique of Haiti | 1964-01-03 | HAITI | Davidson, I. Irving 886 | 1955-04-18 | Davidson, I. Irving | Port-au-Haiti | ||||
8607 | 8607 | 2001-06-30 | Government of the Republic of Haiti, Ministry of Foreign Affairs | 1998-10-01 | HAITI | Burton V. Wides, P.C. 5278 | 1998-10-01 | Burton V. Wides, P.C. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9035 | 9035 | 1971-07-06 | Republique d'Haiti | 1971-06-23 | HAITI | Ellison, Byron G. 2267 | 1971-06-23 | Ellison, Byron G. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9055 | 9055 | 1958-07-07 | Republic of Haiti | 1958-01-07 | HAITI | Roosevelt, Summers & Hamilton, Inc. 1099 | 1958-01-01 | Roosevelt, Summers & Hamilton, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9255 | 9255 | 1961-07-15 | Republic of Haiti | 1961-05-01 | HAITI | Berlanti Overseas Corporation 1380 | 1960-07-19 | Berlanti Overseas Corporation | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9444 | 9444 | 1963-07-23 | A Voluntary Committee of the Parti National | 1960-06-30 | HAITI | Parti National Haitian (Haitian National Party) 1365 | 1960-06-03 | Parti National Haitian (Haitian National Party) | Port-au-Haiti | ||||
9445 | 9445 | 1963-07-23 | Dr. Gaston Jumelle | 1960-06-03 | HAITI | Parti National Haitian (Haitian National Party) 1365 | 1960-06-03 | Parti National Haitian (Haitian National Party) | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9598 | 9598 | 1959-07-30 | Haitian Industries, S.A. | 1959-01-30 | HAITI | Haitian Industries, Inc. 1196 | 1959-01-30 | Haitian Industries, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9599 | 9599 | 1959-07-30 | Republic of Haiti | 1959-01-30 | HAITI | Haitian Industries, Inc. 1196 | 1959-01-30 | Haitian Industries, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9622 | 9622 | 1987-07-30 | Parti Agricole Industriel National | 1987-07-23 | HAITI | Dow, Lohnes & Albertson, L.L.P. 3452 | 1983-03-17 | Dow, Lohnes & Albertson, L.L.P. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9747 | 9747 | 1988-07-31 | Government of Haiti | 1988-03-03 | HAITI | Murphy & Demory, Ltd. 4095 | 1988-03-03 | Murphy & Demory, Ltd. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
9949 | 9949 | 1950-08-01 | Republic of Haiti | 1947-01-03 | HAITI | Berle Jr., A.A. 432 | 1947-01-03 | Berle Jr., A.A. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
10004 | 10004 | 1988-08-01 | Haitian Chapter of the Inter-American Businessmen Association | 1988-04-18 | HAITI | Law Offices of Robert C. McCandless 4126 | 1988-04-18 | Law Offices of Robert C. McCandless | Port-au-Prince | ||||
10023 | 10023 | 1994-08-01 | Prime Minister Robert Malval | 1993-12-17 | HAITI | Williams & Connolly 4225 | 1989-03-14 | Williams & Connolly | Port-au-Prince | ||||
10177 | 10177 | 2001-08-06 | Government of Haiti | 2001-03-22 | HAITI | Levy, Michael 5420 | 2001-03-22 | Levy, Michael | Port-au-Prince | ||||
10309 | 10309 | 1994-08-12 | Riviere Agro - Alimentaire, S.A. | 1993-05-19 | HAITI | Seyfarth, Shaw, Fairweather & Geraldson 3122 | 1980-07-18 | Seyfarth, Shaw, Fairweather & Geraldson | Port-au-Prince | ||||
10765 | 10765 | 1993-08-26 | Provisional Government of Haiti | 1992-06-05 | HAITI | Craig Shirley & Associates 4743 | 1992-06-05 | Craig Shirley & Associates | Port au Prince | ||||
10874 | 10874 | 1961-08-31 | Haitian Tourist Board | 1959-08-31 | HAITI | Philip M. Bottfeld, Inc. 1261 | 1959-08-31 | Philip M. Bottfeld, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
11361 | 11361 | 1964-09-04 | Provisional Government of the Republic of Haiti | 1963-06-14 | HAITI | Itkin, Herbert 1641 | 1963-06-14 | Itkin, Herbert | San Juan | ||||
11427 | 11427 | 1965-09-08 | Government of Haiti, National Tourism Office | 1965-02-12 | HAITI | Bishopric, Green & Fielden, Inc. 1855 | 1965-02-12 | Bishopric, Green & Fielden, Inc. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
11561 | 11561 | 1989-09-13 | Parti Agricole Industriel National | 1987-07-02 | HAITI | Coalition for a Democratic Haiti 4007 | 1987-07-02 | Coalition for a Democratic Haiti | Port-Au-Prince | ||||
11706 | 11706 | 1963-09-19 | Clement S. Benoit | 1963-06-03 | HAITI | Ostroff, Nathaniel C. 1635 | 1963-06-03 | Ostroff, Nathaniel C. | Nassau | ||||
11792 | 11792 | 1955-09-24 | Haiti National Office of Tourism | 1954-03-24 | HAITI | Gileadi, Ian 822 | 1954-03-24 | Gileadi, Ian | Port-au-Prince | ||||
11824 | 11824 | 1958-09-26 | Haitian Industries, Inc., S.A. | 1958-09-26 | HAITI | Clay, Henry J. 1171 | 1958-09-26 | Clay, Henry J. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
11904 | 11904 | 2021-09-29 | Boulos, Reginald | 2021-05-19 | HAITI | Miklosi, Joe 6963 | 2021-05-19 | Miklosi, Joe | 3 Rue Goulard | Petion Ville 6140 | |||
11905 | 11905 | 2021-09-29 | Dr. Reginald Boulos | 2021-07-08 | HAITI | Estopinan, Art A. 6977 | 2021-07-08 | Estopinan, Art A. | 3 Rue Goulard | Petion Ville, 6140 | Port-au-Prince | ||
11910 | 11910 | 1956-09-30 | Republic of Haiti | 1956-05-21 | HAITI | Public Relations Associates International 952 | 1956-05-21 | Public Relations Associates International | Port-au-Prince | ||||
11913 | 11913 | 1960-09-30 | President Duvalier of the Republic of Haiti | 1960-09-30 | HAITI | Morrison, Herbert J. 1397 | 1960-09-30 | Morrison, Herbert J. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
12001 | 12001 | 1988-09-30 | Republic of Haiti | 1986-08-06 | HAITI | Stroock & Stroock & Lavan 3816 | 1986-04-22 | Stroock & Stroock & Lavan | Port-au-Prince | ||||
12139 | 12139 | 2002-09-30 | Republic of Haiti | 2002-02-25 | HAITI | Global Market Solutions 5475 | 2002-02-25 | Global Market Solutions | Port-au-Prince | ||||
12207 | 12207 | 2012-09-30 | Government of the Republic of Haiti | 2012-05-31 | HAITI | Corley, Walter 6106 | 2012-05-31 | Corley, Walter | 23 Ave Lamartiniere bois Verna, PAP Haiti | ||||
12318 | 12318 | 1975-10-01 | Haitian Textile Exporters' Association | 1975-01-10 | HAITI | Daniels, Houlihan & Palmeter 2072 | 1968-01-30 | Daniels, Houlihan & Palmeter | Port-au-Prince | ||||
12361 | 12361 | 1987-10-01 | Government of Haiti | 1986-08-20 | HAITI | Demougeot, George 3874 | 1986-08-20 | Demougeot, George | |||||
12394 | 12394 | 2003-10-01 | Republic of Haiti | 2003-06-10 | HAITI | Tew Cardenas, LLP 5562 | 2003-06-10 | Tew Cardenas, LLP | c/o Ministre de 1'Economie et des Finances Palais de Ministeres Rue Mgr. Guilloux Port-au-Prince | ||||
12516 | 12516 | 1994-10-06 | Agri-Supply Company, S.A. | 1994-07-20 | HAITI | Hauge, Ann B. 4931 | 1994-07-20 | Hauge, Ann B. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
12662 | 12662 | 1970-10-14 | Haitian Development Corporation | 1969-09-26 | HAITI | Dormann, Henry O. 2157 | 1969-08-14 | Dormann, Henry O. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
12827 | 12827 | 1986-10-18 | National Council of the Government of the Republic of Haiti | 1986-06-04 | HAITI | Rosenblatt, Peter R. 3518 | 1983-09-13 | Rosenblatt, Peter R. | Port-au-Prince | ||||
12875 | 12875 | 1988-10-20 | Government of Haiti | 1988-02-04 | HAITI | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | Port-au-Prince |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );