FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
92 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "GREECE" sorted by Address_1
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_1, Address_2, Zip, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Hellenic Development Corporation 4
- Ruder Finn, Inc. 4
- International Council of Cruise Lines 3
- Manatos & Manatos 3
- Stevason & Dukas 3
- AC&R Advertising, Inc. 2
- Covington & Burling 2
- John Lord O'Brian & John G. Laylin 2
- Prather, Seeger, Doolittle & Farmer 2
- Schmertz Company, Inc. 2
- AC&R Public Relations 1
- American National Pan-Epirotic League 1
- Anestos, Harry P. 1
- Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 1
- Association Films, Inc. 1
- BKSH & Associates 1
- Bennett Associates, Inc. 1
- Berk, Peggy 1
- Beveridge, Fairbanks & Diamond 1
- Billig, Sher & Jones, P.C. 1
- Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey 1
- Broadcast Planning Corporation 1
- Burson-Marsteller Associates 1
- Charles, George J. 1
- Clark & Weinstock 1
- Clifton, Chester V. 1
- Communications Company, Inc. 1
- Compton Advertising, Inc. 1
- Conteas, Nicholas C. 1
- Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Government of Greece 7
- Greek National Tourist Organization 5
- National Tourist Organization of Greece 5
- Government of Greece, Embassy 3
- Union of Greek Shipowners 3
- Bank of Greece 2
- Government of the Republic of Greece 2
- Hellenic Lines, Ltd. 2
- Agricultural Bank of Greece 1
- Ambassador Menelas Alexandrakis 1
- American-Greek Industrial & Investment Company, Ltd. 1
- Basil Vitsaxis 1
- Central Committee for Northern Epizus 1
- Ceres Enterprises, Inc. 1
- Ceres Hellenic Shipping Enterprises, Ltd (See Union of Greek Shipowners - name change) 1
- Commercial Bank of Greece 1
- Consul Basil L. Tsamissis, Consul of Greece 1
- Council of Hellenes Abroad 1
- Defense Analyses Institute 1
- Dorelita Limited 1
- EAM 1
- Embassy of Greece 1
- Embassy of the Hellenic Republic 1
- Enslaved Greek People of Northern Epirus 1
- George Gavas 1
- German Information Center 1
- Government of Greece (Through its Embassy in Washington, D.C.) 1
- Government of the Republic of Greece - Subcontractor of Schmertz Company, Inc. 1
- Greek Ambassador - Permanent Representatives of Greece to the United Nations 1
- Greek Atomic Energy Commission 1
- …
City 4
- - 88
- Washington 2
- Athens 1
- Athens 1
Country/Location_Represented 1
- GREECE · 92 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 ▼ | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
830 | 830 | 1979-01-01 | Hellenic Republic of Greece | 1978-04-12 | GREECE | Verner, Liipfert, Bernhard & McPherson 2882 | 1978-04-10 | Verner, Liipfert, Bernhard & McPherson | |||||
2718 | 2718 | 1945-02-23 | Greek Government | 1944-02-23 | GREECE | Loukas, Chryst 236 | 1944-02-23 | Loukas, Chryst | |||||
7600 | 7600 | 1945-06-05 | No foreign principal listed | 1944-06-05 | GREECE | Sakellariou, Alexander E. 259 | 1944-06-05 | Sakellariou, Alexander E. | |||||
9482 | 9482 | 1985-07-26 | Hellenic Development Corporation | 1984-11-01 | GREECE | Development Counsellors International, Ltd. 1421 | 1961-01-30 | Development Counsellors International, Ltd. | NY | ||||
10511 | 10511 | 1964-08-15 | Royal Greek Embassy | 1964-07-14 | GREECE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | |||||
11801 | 11801 | 1992-09-24 | Government of the Republic of Greece | 1992-03-06 | GREECE | Schmertz Company, Inc. 4161 | 1988-07-26 | Schmertz Company, Inc. | |||||
12489 | 12489 | 1984-10-05 | Government of Greece | 1982-07-20 | GREECE | Fenton Communications, Inc. 3340 | 1982-03-03 | Fenton Communications, Inc. | |||||
12536 | 12536 | 2019-10-07 | Embassy of the Hellenic Republic | 2018-09-28 | GREECE | DLA Piper US LLP 3712 | 1985-08-05 | DLA Piper US LLP | |||||
12811 | 12811 | 1944-10-18 | Enslaved Greek People of Northern Epirus | 1943-07-21 | GREECE | American National Pan-Epirotic League 173 | 1943-01-06 | American National Pan-Epirotic League | |||||
13565 | 13565 | 1985-11-01 | Greek National Tourist Organization, New York Office | 1984-01-01 | GREECE | AC&R Advertising, Inc. 3211 | 1981-03-11 | AC&R Advertising, Inc. | |||||
15406 | 15406 | 1985-12-27 | National Tourist Organization of Greece | 1973-06-12 | GREECE | AC&R Public Relations 2431 | 1973-06-12 | AC&R Public Relations | |||||
15477 | 15477 | 1981-12-30 | Greek National Tourist Organization | 1976-06-04 | GREECE | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
325 | 325 | Hellenic Ministry of Foreign Affairs | 2019-12-05 | GREECE | Manatos & Manatos (through the National Coordinated Effort of Hellenes - CEH) 6683 | 2019-05-21 | Manatos & Manatos (through the National Coordinated Effort of Hellenes - CEH) | 1st Vas. Sofias Av. | 106 71 | Athens | |||
4776 | 4776 | 2018-03-31 | Press and Communications Office of Embassy of Greece Washington | 2018-01-24 | GREECE | Trippi & Associates 6515 | 2018-01-24 | Trippi & Associates | 2217 Massachusetts Avenue, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 | |
6052 | 6052 | 2009-04-30 | Government of Greece, Embassy | 2006-11-29 | GREECE | BKSH & Associates 5402 | 2000-12-14 | BKSH & Associates | 2217 Massachusetts Avenue, NW | Washington | DC | 20008 | |
8630 | 8630 | 2003-06-30 | Government of Greece, Embassy | 2001-09-10 | GREECE | Clark & Weinstock 5457 | 2001-09-10 | Clark & Weinstock | 2221 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. 20008 | DC | |||
8631 | 8631 | 2003-06-30 | Government of Greece, Embassy | 2001-09-20 | GREECE | Van Scoyoc Associates, Inc. 5401 | 2000-12-14 | Van Scoyoc Associates, Inc. | 2221 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. 20008 | DC | |||
6895 | 6895 | 2017-05-28 | Dorelita Limited | 2017-03-28 | GREECE | McKeon Group, Inc. 6391 | 2016-11-16 | McKeon Group, Inc. | 30, Patriarhou Loakim Street, 10675 | Athens | |||
4565 | 4565 | 1998-03-31 | Hellenic Marine Environment Protection Association (HELMEPA) | 1998-03-30 | GREECE | Sampson, Theodore James 5248 | 1998-03-30 | Sampson, Theodore James | 5 Pergamou Street, NEA SMYRNI, 171 21, Athens | ||||
1074 | 1074 | 1983-01-05 | Greek Ministry of National Economy | 1972-11-30 | GREECE | Greek Trade Center 2393 | 1972-11-30 | Greek Trade Center | Athens | ||||
1271 | 1271 | 1992-01-13 | Greek National Tourist Organization | 1970-06-09 | GREECE | Greek National Tourist Organization, Los Angeles 2199 | 1970-06-09 | Greek National Tourist Organization, Los Angeles | Athens | ||||
1643 | 1643 | 1989-01-30 | Theodoros Anagnostopoulos | 1988-11-23 | GREECE | Thompson & Company 4094 | 1988-02-25 | Thompson & Company | Athens | ||||
1698 | 1698 | 1974-01-31 | Bank of Greece | 1967-06-05 | GREECE | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. 1111 | 1958-01-28 | Curtis J. Hoxter, Inc. | Athens | ||||
1788 | 1788 | 1995-01-31 | IOLCOS Hellenic Maritime Enterprises | 1994-10-05 | GREECE | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP 1750 | 1964-06-04 | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP | Athens | ||||
2213 | 2213 | 1974-02-05 | Government of Greece | 1968-03-20 | GREECE | Anestos, Harry P. 2081 | 1968-03-20 | Anestos, Harry P. | Athens | ||||
3198 | 3198 | 1946-03-01 | Central Committee for Northern Epizus | 1946-03-01 | GREECE | Delgation of the Central Comm. for N. Epizus/Athens, Greece 346 | 1946-03-01 | Delgation of the Central Comm. for N. Epizus/Athens, Greece | Athens | ||||
3968 | 3968 | 1976-03-22 | National Tourist Organization of Greece | 1975-05-27 | GREECE | AC&R Advertising, Inc. 2585 | 1975-05-27 | AC&R Advertising, Inc. | Athens | ||||
4164 | 4164 | 1986-03-30 | Republic of Greece | 1984-11-19 | GREECE | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | Athens | ||||
4360 | 4360 | 1977-03-31 | Government of Greece | 1974-11-22 | GREECE | Beveridge, Fairbanks & Diamond 2547 | 1974-11-22 | Beveridge, Fairbanks & Diamond | Athens | ||||
5179 | 5179 | 1946-04-12 | EAM | 1946-04-12 | GREECE | EAM Delegation 350 | 1946-04-12 | EAM Delegation | Athens | ||||
5600 | 5600 | 1994-04-26 | Ministry of National Economy/Republic of Greece | 1979-06-13 | GREECE | Conteas, Nicholas C. 3030 | 1979-06-13 | Conteas, Nicholas C. | Athens | ||||
5790 | 5790 | 1968-04-30 | National Tourist Organization of Greece | 1968-01-22 | GREECE | Burson-Marsteller Associates 2070 | 1968-01-22 | Burson-Marsteller Associates | Athens | ||||
6449 | 6449 | 1977-05-11 | Naval Reserve Officers Group, Graduates of the Polytechnic | 1976-10-18 | GREECE | Doukas, Kimon A. 2725 | 1976-10-18 | Doukas, Kimon A. | Athens | ||||
7715 | 7715 | 1968-06-10 | Kingdom of Greece | 1966-12-14 | GREECE | Davis, Polk & Wardell 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | Athens | ||||
8250 | 8250 | 1965-06-30 | National Tourist Organization of Greece | 1961-10-04 | GREECE | Bennett Associates, Inc. 1140 | 1958-05-08 | Bennett Associates, Inc. | Athens | ||||
9115 | 9115 | 1945-07-09 | Journal Rizospastis - Journal Eleftheri Ellada | 1945-07-09 | GREECE | Karayorghis, Kostas 308 | 1945-07-09 | Karayorghis, Kostas | Athens | ||||
9304 | 9304 | 1989-07-16 | Hellenic Export Promotion Organization | 1988-04-08 | GREECE | GCI Group, Inc. 3856 | 1986-07-11 | GCI Group, Inc. | Athens | ||||
9476 | 9476 | 1962-07-26 | American-Greek Industrial & Investment Company, Ltd. | 1961-01-09 | GREECE | Sokitch, Miloye 635 | 1950-07-26 | Sokitch, Miloye | Athens | ||||
9682 | 9682 | 1964-07-31 | Kingdom of Greece/National Tourist Organization | 1954-10-12 | GREECE | Kelly, Nason, Inc. 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | Athens | ||||
9753 | 9753 | 1989-07-31 | Agricultural Bank of Greece | 1986-02-10 | GREECE | Hellenic Development Corporation 3776 | 1986-02-10 | Hellenic Development Corporation | Athens | ||||
9755 | 9755 | 1989-07-31 | Commercial Bank of Greece | 1986-07-30 | GREECE | Hellenic Development Corporation 3776 | 1986-02-10 | Hellenic Development Corporation | Athens | ||||
9761 | 9761 | 1989-07-31 | Hellenic Industrial Development Bank | 1986-02-10 | GREECE | Hellenic Development Corporation 3776 | 1986-02-10 | Hellenic Development Corporation | Athens | ||||
9762 | 9762 | 1989-07-31 | National Bank of Greece | 1986-07-30 | GREECE | Hellenic Development Corporation 3776 | 1986-02-10 | Hellenic Development Corporation | Athens | ||||
10317 | 10317 | 1964-08-13 | Greek Atomic Energy Commission | 1963-08-13 | GREECE | G.A. Brakeley & Company, Inc. 1652 | 1963-08-13 | G.A. Brakeley & Company, Inc. | Athens | ||||
10593 | 10593 | 1978-08-18 | National Tourist Organization of Greece (NTOG) | 1965-05-27 | GREECE | Greek National Tourist Organization, New York 1895 | 1965-05-27 | Greek National Tourist Organization, New York | Athens | ||||
11004 | 11004 | 1990-08-31 | New Democracy Party | 1990-06-20 | GREECE | Communications Company, Inc. 4387 | 1990-06-20 | Communications Company, Inc. | Athens | ||||
11603 | 11603 | 1962-09-15 | Bank of Greece | 1959-09-15 | GREECE | EMB, Ltd. 1270 | 1959-09-15 | EMB, Ltd. | Athens | ||||
13202 | 13202 | 1960-10-31 | Greek Prime Minister's Office - Information Department | 1961-02-16 | GREECE | Broadcast Planning Corporation 1371 | 1960-06-16 | Broadcast Planning Corporation | Athens | ||||
13914 | 13914 | 1964-11-13 | Government of Greece | 1964-10-26 | GREECE | Levenberg, Gerry 1806 | 1964-10-26 | Levenberg, Gerry | Athens | ||||
13933 | 13933 | 1967-11-14 | Government of Greece | 1964-11-13 | GREECE | Prather, Seeger, Doolittle & Farmer 1815 | 1964-11-13 | Prather, Seeger, Doolittle & Farmer | Athens | ||||
13962 | 13962 | 1967-11-15 | Greek Tourist Organization | 1966-02-10 | GREECE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Athens | ||||
15527 | 15527 | 1949-12-31 | Greek Government Ministry of Press & Information | 1947-04-03 | GREECE | Greek Government Office of Information 449 | 1947-04-03 | Greek Government Office of Information | Athens | ||||
15631 | 15631 | 1964-12-31 | Industrial Development Corporation, S.A. | 1964-06-08 | GREECE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Athens | ||||
15897 | 15897 | 1983-12-31 | Greek National Tourist Organization | 1976-01-28 | GREECE | Hicks & Griest, Inc. 2656 | 1976-01-28 | Hicks & Griest, Inc. | Athens | ||||
16245 | 16245 | 1993-12-31 | Greek National Tourist Organization | 1991-01-08 | GREECE | Rowland Company, Inc. 4459 | 1991-01-08 | Rowland Company, Inc. | Athens | ||||
13963 | 13963 | 1967-11-15 | National Tourist Organization of Greece | 1966-02-10 | GREECE | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Athens, Greece | ||||
1203 | 1203 | 1956-01-11 | Consul Basil L. Tsamissis, Consul of Greece | 1955-05-03 | GREECE | Margold, Stella K. 864 | 1955-01-04 | Margold, Stella K. | Boston | MA | |||
1969 | 1969 | 1966-02-01 | H.R.H. Prince Peter of Greece & Denmark | 1965-09-22 | GREECE | Matsoukas, Nick John 1926 | 1965-09-22 | Matsoukas, Nick John | Copenhagen | ||||
12554 | 12554 | 1996-10-08 | Greek Shipping Cooperation Committee (GSCC) | 1991-05-22 | GREECE | Dyer, Ellis & Joseph, P.C. 4121 | 1988-03-21 | Dyer, Ellis & Joseph, P.C. | London | ||||
1466 | 1466 | 1992-01-22 | Heracles General Cement Company | 1991-04-04 | GREECE | Steptoe & Johnson, L.L.P. 3975 | 1987-05-08 | Steptoe & Johnson, L.L.P. | Lycovrissi | ||||
868 | 868 | 1984-01-01 | Hellenic Line/Hessa Line | 1983-06-17 | GREECE | Billig, Sher & Jones, P.C. 3279 | 1981-10-06 | Billig, Sher & Jones, P.C. | New York | NY | |||
1808 | 1808 | 1997-01-31 | Greek National Tourist Organization | 1996-07-31 | GREECE | Berk, Peggy 5124 | 1996-07-31 | Berk, Peggy | New York | NY | |||
2468 | 2468 | 1971-02-14 | German Information Center | 1963-02-12 | GREECE | Sterling Movies 1597 | 1963-02-12 | Sterling Movies | New York | NY | |||
3988 | 3988 | 1965-03-23 | Basil Vitsaxis | 1964-06-05 | GREECE | Stevason & Dukas 1753 | 1964-06-05 | Stevason & Dukas | New York | NY | |||
3989 | 3989 | 1965-03-23 | George Gavas | 1964-12-05 | GREECE | Stevason & Dukas 1753 | 1964-06-05 | Stevason & Dukas | New York | NY | |||
3990 | 3990 | 1965-03-23 | Royal Consulate General of Greece | 1964-06-05 | GREECE | Stevason & Dukas 1753 | 1964-06-05 | Stevason & Dukas | New York | NY | |||
5641 | 5641 | 1975-04-28 | Greek Line, Inc. | 1967-07-25 | GREECE | International Council of Cruise Lines 2036 | 1967-07-25 | International Council of Cruise Lines | New York | NY | |||
5793 | 5793 | 1970-04-30 | National Hellenic America Line, C/O Chandris Line | 1967-07-25 | GREECE | International Council of Cruise Lines 2036 | 1967-07-25 | International Council of Cruise Lines | New York | NY | |||
6535 | 6535 | 1947-05-15 | Greek Government Office of Information | 1946-12-12 | GREECE | Frary, William 408 | 1946-12-12 | Frary, William | New York | NY | |||
10751 | 10751 | 1947-08-26 | Permanent Representatives of Greece to the United Nations | 1947-10-14 | GREECE | John Lord O'Brian & John G. Laylin 442 | 1947-02-26 | John Lord O'Brian & John G. Laylin | New York | NY | |||
10948 | 10948 | 1981-08-31 | Olympic Airways | 1967-09-19 | GREECE | Association Films, Inc. 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | New York City | NY | |||
16514 | 16514 | 2002-12-31 | Council of Hellenes Abroad | 2003-07-09 | GREECE | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | North & South America region - 360 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 1109 Chicago 60601 (headquarters in T | IL | |||
1526 | 1526 | 1996-01-25 | Royal Olympic Cruises, Ltd. | 1996-02-23 | GREECE | International Council of Cruise Lines 2036 | 1967-07-25 | International Council of Cruise Lines | Piraeus | ||||
3284 | 3284 | 1987-03-01 | Union of Greek Shipowners | 1986-06-26 | GREECE | Manatos & Manatos 3522 | 1983-09-28 | Manatos & Manatos | Piraeus | ||||
3820 | 3820 | 1995-03-16 | Silver Carriers, S.A. | 1994-01-13 | GREECE | Evans Group, Ltd. 4222 | 1989-03-02 | Evans Group, Ltd. | Piraeus | ||||
10334 | 10334 | 1986-08-14 | Union of Greek Shipowners | 1982-07-12 | GREECE | Murden & Company, Inc. 2703 | 1976-06-26 | Murden & Company, Inc. | Piraeus | ||||
13373 | 13373 | 1997-10-31 | Union of Greek Shipowners | 1997-10-15 | GREECE | Welch, Edmund Burt 5216 | 1997-10-15 | Welch, Edmund Burt | Piraeus | ||||
13915 | 13915 | 1965-11-13 | Hellenic Lines, Ltd. | 1965-04-15 | GREECE | Prather, Seeger, Doolittle & Farmer 1815 | 1964-11-13 | Prather, Seeger, Doolittle & Farmer | Piraeus | ||||
8107 | 8107 | 1986-06-26 | Ceres Hellenic Shipping Enterprises, Ltd (See Union of Greek Shipowners - name change) | 1986-01-21 | GREECE | Manatos & Manatos 3522 | 1983-09-28 | Manatos & Manatos | Piraeus, Greece | ||||
1145 | 1145 | 1946-01-08 | Hellenic Lines, Ltd. | 1942-07-08 | GREECE | Garcia & Diaz 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Pireaus | ||||
7639 | 7639 | 1991-06-06 | Ceres Enterprises, Inc. | 1991-03-08 | GREECE | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge 2580 | 1975-02-21 | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge | Reston | VA | |||
11067 | 11067 | 2000-08-31 | Defense Analyses Institute | 1999-07-09 | GREECE | Hogan Lovells US LLP 2244 | 1971-02-18 | Hogan Lovells US LLP | Stadiou 2 Athens 10564 | ||||
944 | 944 | 1992-01-01 | Embassy of Greece | 1986-04-18 | GREECE | Manatos & Manatos 3522 | 1983-09-28 | Manatos & Manatos | Washington | DC | |||
1286 | 1286 | 1993-01-14 | Government of Greece | 1992-03-10 | GREECE | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey 3600 | 1984-06-14 | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey | Washington | DC | |||
5774 | 5774 | 1957-04-30 | Royal Greek Embassy Information Service | 1954-11-22 | GREECE | Charles, George J. 855 | 1954-11-22 | Charles, George J. | Washington | DC | |||
6764 | 6764 | 1979-05-24 | Ambassador Menelas Alexandrakis | 1975-03-04 | GREECE | Clifton, Chester V. 2561 | 1975-03-04 | Clifton, Chester V. | Washington | DC | |||
9319 | 9319 | 1950-07-17 | Greek Ambassador - Permanent Representatives of Greece to the United Nations | 1948-04-16 | GREECE | Covington & Burling 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
10749 | 10749 | 1947-08-26 | Paul Economou-Gouras, Greek Charge d'Affaires, Greek Embassy | 1947-02-26 | GREECE | John Lord O'Brian & John G. Laylin 442 | 1947-02-26 | John Lord O'Brian & John G. Laylin | Washington | DC | |||
11680 | 11680 | 1964-09-17 | Government of Greece | 1964-04-29 | GREECE | Covington & Burling 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
12374 | 12374 | 1992-10-01 | Government of the Republic of Greece - Subcontractor of Schmertz Company, Inc. | 1991-07-24 | GREECE | Warren & Company 4545 | 1991-07-24 | Warren & Company | Washington | DC | |||
15802 | 15802 | 1978-12-31 | Government of Greece (Through its Embassy in Washington, D.C.) | 1978-07-06 | GREECE | Compton Advertising, Inc. 2925 | 1978-07-06 | Compton Advertising, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
16200 | 16200 | 1991-12-31 | Government of the Republic of Greece | 1991-07-08 | GREECE | Schmertz Company, Inc. 4161 | 1988-07-26 | Schmertz Company, Inc. | Washington | DC |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );