FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
302 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "USSR" sorted by Country/Location_Represented
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_1, Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- Koenig, Harry D. 67
- Drucker, David 21
- Amtorg Trading Corporation 12
- Bell, Linda Jane 7
- Recht, Charles 5
- Siegel, Leah 5
- Smith, Edwin S. 5
- Black, Helen 4
- Lamken, Natalie 4
- Litoshko, Evgeni Vladimirovich 4
- Solov, Liuba 4
- Browder, Earl Russell 3
- Burson-Marsteller 3
- Kreisinger, Robert 3
- Kurdyumov, Nikolai V. 3
- Lerman, Louis 3
- Beliaev, Anatoli A. 2
- Bienstock, Natalie Anna 2
- Brockman Jr., Earle Wingo 2
- Compass Publications, Inc. 2
- Cosmos Parcels Express Corp./Rumanian Export Parcels Corp. 2
- Crosscurrents Press, Inc. 2
- Gleason, Stephen Bernard 2
- Globe Parcel Service, Inc. 2
- Kuznetsov, Georgi A. 2
- Laourintchioukas, Albertas 2
- Modern Education Services, Inc. 2
- NTS-Alliance of Russian Solidarists 2
- North American Precis Syndicate 2
- Package Express & Travel Agency, Inc. 2
- …
Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date) >30 ✖
- 1945-04-29 67
- 1947-02-26 21
- 1955-05-26 5
- 1989-10-31 5
- 1951-09-11 4
- 1964-06-01 4
- 1973-12-31 4
- 1988-06-21 4
- 1990-05-02 4
- 1990-11-30 4
- 1949-03-31 3
- 1960-03-30 3
- 1966-02-18 3
- 1952-12-08 2
- 1953-07-26 2
- 1960-03-01 2
- 1960-03-17 2
- 1960-03-25 2
- 1962-07-17 2
- 1964-10-19 2
- 1965-06-21 2
- 1965-09-03 2
- 1966-05-16 2
- 1974-12-01 2
- 1980-03-03 2
- 1985-04-09 2
- 1987-04-24 2
- 1991-12-31 2
- 1943-05-14 1
- 1943-10-01 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Intourist 21
- Embassy of the U.S.S.R. 10
- Pravda 10
- Novosti Press Agency 6
- Intourist, Ltd. 5
- Mezhdunarodnaya Kniga 5
- Soviet Embassy 5
- U.S.S.R. Information Bulletin 5
- Embassy of the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics 4
- Soviet Life 4
- Soviet Life Magazine 4
- Fotokhronika Tass 3
- Izvestia 3
- Radio Moscow 3
- Vneshposyltorg 3
- Amtorg Trading Corporation 2
- Artkino Pictures, Inc. 2
- Mezhdunarodnaja Kniga 2
- Newspaper Izvestia"" 2
- Soviet Culture"" 2
- Soviet Embassy, Information Department 2
- Trud"" 2
- U.S.S.R. Chamber of Commerce & Industry 2
- U.S.S.R. Illustrated Monthly 2
- Vneshtorgreklama 2
- A.S. Merilaid & Company 1
- Aeroflot 1
- Agricultural Cooperative Society LIETUKIS 1
- Alexandra Ivanovna Poliakoff 1
- All Union Chartering Company (Sovfracht) 1
- …
City 4
- - 296
- New York 4
- Moscow 1
- Washington 1
Country/Location_Represented 1
- USSR · 302 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented ▼ | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1057 | 1057 | 1949-01-03 | His Imperial Highness The Grand Duke Wladimir of Russia | 1942-07-07 | USSR | Pouschine, Ivan 11 | 1942-07-07 | Pouschine, Ivan | Madrid | ||||
1124 | 1124 | 1964-01-07 | Radio Moscow | 1960-07-07 | USSR | Kalugin, Oleg Danilovich 1375 | 1960-07-07 | Kalugin, Oleg Danilovich | Moscow | ||||
1282 | 1282 | 1975-01-14 | Embassy of the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics | 1967-07-18 | USSR | Compass Publications, Inc. 1981 | 1966-06-08 | Compass Publications, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
1318 | 1318 | 1980-01-15 | Mezhdunarodnaja Kniga | 1964-10-01 | USSR | Eastern News Distributors, Inc. 1796 | 1964-10-01 | Eastern News Distributors, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
1426 | 1426 | 1972-01-20 | Socialist Industry, U.S.S.R. | 1970-01-13 | USSR | Beliaev, Anatoli A. 2142 | 1969-06-11 | Beliaev, Anatoli A. | Moscow | ||||
1491 | 1491 | 1975-01-24 | Soviet Embassy | 1973-02-01 | USSR | Lamken, Natalie 2405 | 1973-02-01 | Lamken, Natalie | Washington | DC | |||
1531 | 1531 | 1953-01-26 | Mezhdunarodnaja Kniga | 1953-01-26 | USSR | Russky Kustar 754 | 1953-01-26 | Russky Kustar | Moscow | ||||
2000 | 2000 | 1980-02-01 | Soviet Life Magazine (Formerly: U.S.S.R. Illustrated Monthly) | 1973-10-18 | USSR | Lerman, Louis 973 | 1956-08-28 | Lerman, Louis | Washington | DC | |||
2316 | 2316 | 1971-02-09 | Komsomolskaja Pravda | 1968-12-02 | USSR | Shaposhnikov, Jury 2114 | 1968-12-02 | Shaposhnikov, Jury | Moscow | ||||
2375 | 2375 | 1974-02-11 | Moscow Newspaper | 1971-10-15 | USSR | Sinkevitchous, Apolinaras 2285 | 1971-10-15 | Sinkevitchous, Apolinaras | Moscow | ||||
2391 | 2391 | 1947-02-12 | Republic of Estonia | 1942-08-12 | USSR | Jaakson, Ernst Rudolf 91 | 1942-08-12 | Jaakson, Ernst Rudolf | New York | NY | |||
2396 | 2396 | 1974-02-12 | Mezhdunarodnaya Kniga | 1974-01-21 | USSR | Siegel, Leah 2488 | 1974-01-21 | Siegel, Leah | Moscow | ||||
2435 | 2435 | 1981-02-13 | Information Department - Soviet Embassy - Soviet Life | 1980-07-28 | USSR | Levine, Allen 3125 | 1980-07-28 | Levine, Allen | Washington | DC | |||
2479 | 2479 | 1975-02-14 | Embassy of the U.S.S.R. | 1974-06-06 | USSR | Bell, Linda Jane 2516 | 1974-06-06 | Bell, Linda Jane | Washington | DC | |||
2487 | 2487 | 1991-02-14 | Prime Minister of Ukranian SSR - Vitold P. Fokin | 1990-12-07 | USSR | U.S.A. Expo, Inc. 4445 | 1990-12-07 | U.S.A. Expo, Inc. | Kiev | ||||
2636 | 2636 | 1966-02-18 | Press Department, Embassy of the U.S.S.R. | 1952-11-06 | USSR | Kreisinger, Robert 641 | 1950-09-20 | Kreisinger, Robert | Washington | DC | |||
2637 | 2637 | 1966-02-18 | U.S.S.R. Information Bulletin | 1950-09-20 | USSR | Kreisinger, Robert 641 | 1950-09-20 | Kreisinger, Robert | Washington | DC | |||
2638 | 2638 | 1966-02-18 | U.S.S.R. Magazine (Published by the Embassy of the U.S.S.R.) | 1956-12-10 | USSR | Kreisinger, Robert 641 | 1950-09-20 | Kreisinger, Robert | Washington | DC | |||
2678 | 2678 | 1957-02-20 | Mezhdunarodnaia Kniga, The International Book, All-Union Association | 1956-08-20 | USSR | Slavia Book Company, Inc. 971 | 1956-08-20 | Slavia Book Company, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
2770 | 2770 | 1960-02-25 | Intourist, Russian National Travel Office | 1959-04-08 | USSR | Allegheny Travel Service 1122 | 1958-03-10 | Allegheny Travel Service | Moscow | ||||
2793 | 2793 | 1947-02-26 | Kasmu Laeva Omanikud (Kasmu Shipowners' Association) | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Tallnin, Estonia | ||||
2794 | 2794 | 1947-02-26 | A.S. Merilaid & Company | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Tallnin, Estonia | ||||
2795 | 2795 | 1947-02-26 | Agricultural Cooperative Society LIETUKIS | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Kaunas, Lithuania | ||||
2796 | 2796 | 1947-02-26 | All Union Chartering Company (Sovfracht) | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Moscow | ||||
2797 | 2797 | 1947-02-26 | Amtorg Trading Corporation | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | New York | NY | |||
2798 | 2798 | 1947-02-26 | Apvienota Kugniecibas A.K.S. Sab. | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Riga, Latvia | ||||
2799 | 2799 | 1947-02-26 | Artkino Pictures, Inc. | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | New York | NY | |||
2800 | 2800 | 1947-02-26 | Baltic State S.S. Company | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Leningrad | ||||
2801 | 2801 | 1947-02-26 | Black Sea & Baltic General Insurance Company | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | London, England | ||||
2802 | 2802 | 1947-02-26 | Black Sea State S.S. Company | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Odessa | ||||
2803 | 2803 | 1947-02-26 | Estonia State Steamship Line | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Tallnin, Estonia | ||||
2804 | 2804 | 1947-02-26 | F. Grauds | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Riga, Latvia | ||||
2805 | 2805 | 1947-02-26 | Flor N. Koritz | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Washington | DC | |||
2806 | 2806 | 1947-02-26 | Juri Silberberg | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Tallnin, Estonia | ||||
2807 | 2807 | 1947-02-26 | Karl Mitt & Company | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Tallnin, Estonia | ||||
2808 | 2808 | 1947-02-26 | Latvia State Steamship Line | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Riga, Latvia/Moscow | ||||
2809 | 2809 | 1947-02-26 | Latvyas Kugniecibas Sabiedriba (Latvian Shipping Company) | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Riga, Latvia | ||||
2810 | 2810 | 1947-02-26 | Lietuvas Baltyos Lloydos, Lithuanian Baltic Lloyd | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Kaunas, Lithuania | ||||
2811 | 2811 | 1947-02-26 | Oskar Tiedemann | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Tallnin, Estonia | ||||
2812 | 2812 | 1947-02-26 | Tallinna Laevahisis, A.S. (Tallnin Shipping Company, Ltd.) | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Tallnin, Estonia | ||||
2813 | 2813 | 1947-02-26 | Vassily Ratoushny | 1942-08-26 | USSR | Drucker, David 108 | 1942-08-26 | Drucker, David | Vladivostok | ||||
2819 | 2819 | 1960-02-26 | Intourist | 1959-08-17 | USSR | Ask Mr. Foster Travel Service, Inc. 1253 | 1959-08-17 | Ask Mr. Foster Travel Service, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
2853 | 2853 | 1965-02-26 | Licensingtorg, Moscow C/O Amtorg Trading Company | 1965-02-26 | USSR | Nadler, Ira 1861 | 1965-02-26 | Nadler, Ira | New York | NY | |||
3214 | 3214 | 1960-03-01 | International Book | 1959-08-11 | USSR | Rosell, Charles William 1138 | 1958-04-28 | Rosell, Charles William | |||||
3215 | 3215 | 1960-03-01 | Intourist | 1958-03-05 | USSR | Paul Tausig & Son, Inc. 1120 | 1958-03-05 | Paul Tausig & Son, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
3366 | 3366 | 1960-03-02 | Intourist, Ltd. | 1959-08-28 | USSR | Bennett Tours, Inc. 1260 | 1959-08-28 | Bennett Tours, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
3392 | 3392 | 1980-03-03 | Soviet Exhibition of Science, Technology & Culture (Alexander Shelnov, Deputy Director) | 1959-10-20 | USSR | Lerman, Louis 973 | 1956-08-28 | Lerman, Louis | NY | ||||
3393 | 3393 | 1980-03-03 | U.S.S.R. Illustrated Monthly | 1956-08-28 | USSR | Lerman, Louis 973 | 1956-08-28 | Lerman, Louis | Washington | DC | |||
3451 | 3451 | 1973-03-05 | Izvestia | 1969-04-17 | USSR | Sturua, Melor G. 2130 | 1969-04-17 | Sturua, Melor G. | Pushkin Place 5 | Moscow | |||
3494 | 3494 | 1960-03-07 | Intourist | 1959-11-16 | USSR | Poly Travel, Inc. 1297 | 1959-11-16 | Poly Travel, Inc. | |||||
3833 | 3833 | 1960-03-17 | Intourist | 1959-09-17 | USSR | National Travel Company, Inc. 1271 | 1959-09-17 | National Travel Company, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
3834 | 3834 | 1960-03-17 | Intourist, Moscow | 1959-03-11 | USSR | Allied Travel, Inc. 1209 | 1959-03-11 | Allied Travel, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
3907 | 3907 | 1969-03-20 | Ekonomicheskaya Gazeta (Economic Gazette) | 1966-06-06 | USSR | Gromeka, Vasily Ivanovich 1980 | 1966-06-06 | Gromeka, Vasily Ivanovich | Moscow | ||||
3987 | 3987 | 1960-03-23 | Intourist, Ltd. | 1948-02-16 | USSR | Globe Travel Service 512 | 1948-02-16 | Globe Travel Service | Moscow | ||||
4032 | 4032 | 1960-03-25 | Intourist | 1959-09-25 | USSR | Safaritours, Inc. 1274 | 1959-09-25 | Safaritours, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
4033 | 4033 | 1960-03-25 | Intourist | 1959-09-25 | USSR | Chase Travel Service 1275 | 1959-09-25 | Chase Travel Service | Moscow | ||||
4108 | 4108 | 1960-03-28 | Intourist | 1957-03-29 | USSR | Lanseair Travel Service, Inc. 1014 | 1957-03-29 | Lanseair Travel Service, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
4150 | 4150 | 1960-03-30 | Evgeni A. Zaostrovtsev | 1960-03-30 | USSR | Kulberg, Raoul F. 1346 | 1960-03-30 | Kulberg, Raoul F. | Washington | DC | |||
4151 | 4151 | 1960-03-30 | Giorghi (Employee for Soviet Embassy Superior of Third Secretary Gaorikov) | 1960-03-30 | USSR | Gleason, Stephen Bernard 1345 | 1960-03-30 | Gleason, Stephen Bernard | Washington | DC | |||
4152 | 4152 | 1960-03-30 | Third Secretary Gennody B. Gaorikov | 1960-03-30 | USSR | Gleason, Stephen Bernard 1345 | 1960-03-30 | Gleason, Stephen Bernard | Washington | DC | |||
4284 | 4284 | 1949-03-31 | Publishing House of the Central Council of Trade Unions (PROFIZDAT) | 1946-10-01 | USSR | Browder, Earl Russell 374 | 1946-10-01 | Browder, Earl Russell | Moscow | ||||
4285 | 4285 | 1949-03-31 | State Art Publishing House of the Committee on Art Affairs of the Council of Ministers of U.S.S.R. (ISKUSSTVO) | 1946-10-01 | USSR | Browder, Earl Russell 374 | 1946-10-01 | Browder, Earl Russell | Moscow | ||||
4286 | 4286 | 1949-03-31 | U.S. Publishing House of the Council of Ministers of the U.S.S.R. (OGIZ) | 1946-10-01 | USSR | Browder, Earl Russell 374 | 1946-10-01 | Browder, Earl Russell | Moscow | ||||
4289 | 4289 | 1952-03-31 | USSR Information Bulletin of the Embassy of the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics | 1951-01-16 | USSR | Resnikoff, Reuben 656 | 1951-01-16 | Resnikoff, Reuben | |||||
4864 | 4864 | 1978-04-01 | V/O Licensintorg | 1976-08-12 | USSR | Energo Vital Corporation 2715 | 1976-08-12 | Energo Vital Corporation | Moscow | ||||
5052 | 5052 | 1960-04-06 | U.S.S.R. Company for Foreign Travel (Intourist) | 1956-11-20 | USSR | American Express Company 981 | 1956-11-20 | American Express Company | Moscow | ||||
5077 | 5077 | 1980-04-07 | Byelorussian Democratic Republic, State Council in Dispersion, Byelorussian Patriarchate or Orth. Cath. Church | 1977-03-18 | USSR | Archbishop Uladyslau (Ryzy-Ryski) 2762 | 1977-03-18 | Archbishop Uladyslau (Ryzy-Ryski) | Shrub Oak | NY | |||
5088 | 5088 | 1963-04-08 | Newspaper Izvestia"" | 1960-04-08 | USSR | Barsukov, Jury V. 1352 | 1960-04-08 | Barsukov, Jury V. | Moscow | ||||
5116 | 5116 | 1985-04-09 | Intourist, Ltd. | 1958-02-24 | USSR | Package Express & Travel Agency, Inc. 1117 | 1958-02-24 | Package Express & Travel Agency, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
5117 | 5117 | 1985-04-09 | Vneshposyltorg | 1963-05-13 | USSR | Package Express & Travel Agency, Inc. 1117 | 1958-02-24 | Package Express & Travel Agency, Inc. | |||||
5208 | 5208 | 1986-04-12 | Embassy of the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics | 1985-04-25 | USSR | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | DC | ||||
5271 | 5271 | 1958-04-15 | Intourist | 1957-11-12 | USSR | Dundes & Frank, Inc. 1085 | 1957-11-12 | Dundes & Frank, Inc. | Moscow | ||||
5422 | 5422 | 1966-04-20 | Radio Moscow, State Committee for Radio & Television in the U.S.S.R. | 1965-12-15 | USSR | Dubovik, Vladlen M. 1834 | 1964-12-15 | Dubovik, Vladlen M. | Moscow | ||||
5446 | 5446 | 1958-04-21 | Nikolai I. Kurochkin | 1958-04-21 | USSR | Beaumet, Charles Theodore 1135 | 1958-04-21 | Beaumet, Charles Theodore | Washington | DC | |||
5474 | 5474 | 1965-04-22 | Honorable Jonas Budrys - Consul General of Lithuania at New York | 1964-08-24 | USSR | Alexis, Frank T. 1781 | 1964-08-24 | Alexis, Frank T. | |||||
5513 | 5513 | 1987-04-24 | Intourist | 1959-07-10 | USSR | Cosmos Parcels Express Corp./Rumanian Export Parcels Corp. 1246 | 1959-07-10 | Cosmos Parcels Express Corp./Rumanian Export Parcels Corp. | Moscow | ||||
5516 | 5516 | 1987-04-24 | Vneshposyltorg | 1964-03-06 | USSR | Cosmos Parcels Express Corp./Rumanian Export Parcels Corp. 1246 | 1959-07-10 | Cosmos Parcels Express Corp./Rumanian Export Parcels Corp. | Vneshposyltorg | ||||
5669 | 5669 | 1945-04-29 | Alexandra Ivanovna Poliakoff | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5670 | 5670 | 1945-04-29 | Andrew Grycink | 1945-05-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5671 | 5671 | 1945-04-29 | Basil Katinivic | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5672 | 5672 | 1945-04-29 | Benjamin Gashinsky | 1945-05-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5673 | 5673 | 1945-04-29 | Berel Jaffe | 1945-05-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5674 | 5674 | 1945-04-29 | Chae Hene Goldenberg | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5675 | 5675 | 1945-04-29 | Chai Drezar Karvorsky | 1944-11-03 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5676 | 5676 | 1945-04-29 | Chaika Botwinick | 1944-11-03 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5677 | 5677 | 1945-04-29 | Children of Schmeul Seidenknop | 1944-11-03 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5678 | 5678 | 1945-04-29 | David Greenberg | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5679 | 5679 | 1945-04-29 | Deborah Katz | 1943-11-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5680 | 5680 | 1945-04-29 | Dmitri Wakulchyk | 1945-05-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5681 | 5681 | 1945-04-29 | Dmitry Wasilievich Poliakoff | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5682 | 5682 | 1945-04-29 | Dorothy Herzog | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5683 | 5683 | 1945-04-29 | Emily Borgardt | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5684 | 5684 | 1945-04-29 | Esta Risha Seidenknop | 1944-11-03 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5685 | 5685 | 1945-04-29 | Etta (Yanta) Milner | 1943-11-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5686 | 5686 | 1945-04-29 | Fage Kaplan | 1945-05-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5687 | 5687 | 1945-04-29 | Gittel Ubogy | 1943-11-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5688 | 5688 | 1945-04-29 | Gregor Kashisky | 1942-10-29 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5689 | 5689 | 1945-04-29 | Haretina Wakulchyk | 1945-05-04 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5690 | 5690 | 1945-04-29 | Herschel Botwinick | 1944-11-03 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. | |||||
5691 | 5691 | 1945-04-29 | Itzick Seidenknop | 1944-11-03 | USSR | Koenig, Harry D. 151 | 1942-10-29 | Koenig, Harry D. |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );