FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
71 rows where Country/Location_Represented = "COSTA RICA" sorted by Zip
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_1, Address_2, Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date (date), Registrant_Date (date)
Registrant_Name >30
- M. Silver Associates, Inc. 4
- Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 3
- Burson-Marsteller 2
- Costa Rican Board of Trade 2
- Dellale, Dina 2
- Development Counsellors International 2
- Hawthorn Group, L.C. 2
- International Development Systems, Inc. 2
- Lejarza Mora, Salvador 2
- Lever, Michael 2
- Manchester Associates, Ltd. 2
- Pan-American Coffee Bureau 2
- White & Case, LLP 2
- William Cook Agency, Inc. 2
- APCO Worldwide, Inc. 1
- Agribusiness Corporation of America 1
- Arent Fox, LLP 1
- Bill Kofoed, Inc. 1
- Cabrera, Henry 1
- Caribbean Tourism Organization, USA Inc. 1
- Central American Sugar Council 1
- Chasey, William C. 1
- Comite de Ayuda Pro Liberacion de Nicaragua 1
- Compton Advertising, Inc. 1
- Costa Rica Board of Trade 1
- Cox, Oscar S. 1
- DMS, Inc. 1
- Fontayne Group, Inc. 1
- Greenberg, Traurig, Hoffman, Lipoff, Rosen & Quentel, P.A. 1
- Heller & Rosenblatt 1
- …
Foreign_Principal >30
- Government of Costa Rica 9
- Instituto Costarricense de Turismo 4
- Republic of Costa Rica 4
- Camara de Azucareros de Costa Rica 3
- Costa Rica Tourist Board 3
- Costa Rican Tourist Board 2
- Embassy of Costa Rica 2
- Enrique Lacayo Farfan 2
- Government of the Republic of Costa Rica 2
- ACEPT (Asociacion Costarricense de Exportadores de Productos Textiles) 1
- BOS Antigua Limited 1
- Camara de Azucareros 1
- Central American & Caribbean Textile & Apparel Council 1
- Central American Tourist Association 1
- Central Bank of Costa Rica 1
- Centreport, S.A. 1
- Centro Para la Promocion de las Exportaciones y de las Inversiones 1
- Coalition for the Promotion of Costa Rica 1
- Costa Rica 1
- Costa Rica Export-Investment Promotion Center 1
- Costa Rica Investment Promotion Authority 1
- Costa Rica National Tourist Board 1
- Costa Rica Private Shirt Industry 1
- Costa Rica Quota Counsel 1
- Costa Rica Tourism Board 1
- Costa Rica Tourism Institute 1
- Costa Rican Association of Businessmen and Entrepreneurs 1
- Costa Rican Investment & Development Board (CINDE) 1
- Costa Rican Investment and Trade Development Board 1
- Costa Rican Tourism Institute 1
- …
City 3
- - 67
- San Jose 3
- Escazu San Jose 1
Country/Location_Represented 1
- COSTA RICA · 71 ✖
Link | rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip ▼ |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
130 | 130 | Costa Rica Investment Promotion Authority | 2021-05-07 | COSTA RICA | Development Counsellors International 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | Plaza Roble/ Los Balcunes | 4th FLoor | Escazu San Jose | |||
131 | 131 | Costa Rica Tourism Board | 2018-06-29 | COSTA RICA | MMGY Global, LLC 6492 | 2017-11-27 | MMGY Global, LLC | Costado Este del Puente Juan Pablo II | Sobre la Autopista General Canas San Jose, 777-1000 | ||||
1221 | 1221 | 1993-01-11 | Centreport, S.A. | 1990-03-07 | COSTA RICA | J. Royal Parker Associates 4348 | 1990-03-07 | J. Royal Parker Associates | Limon | ||||
1337 | 1337 | 1992-01-15 | Instituto Costarricense de Turismo | 1990-10-02 | COSTA RICA | M. Silver Associates, Inc. 3131 | 1980-07-15 | M. Silver Associates, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
2711 | 2711 | 1999-02-22 | Textile Association of Costa Rica (ASFAMEX) | 1972-08-21 | COSTA RICA | Costa Rican Board of Trade 2370 | 1972-08-21 | Costa Rican Board of Trade | San Jose | ||||
2910 | 2910 | 1971-02-28 | Costa Rica Tourism Institute | 1969-05-02 | COSTA RICA | Compton Advertising, Inc. 2095 | 1968-07-01 | Compton Advertising, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
2915 | 2915 | 1972-02-28 | Centro Para la Promocion de las Exportaciones y de las Inversiones | 1970-11-20 | COSTA RICA | Costa Rica Board of Trade 2219 | 1970-11-20 | Costa Rica Board of Trade | San Jose | ||||
3088 | 3088 | 2010-02-28 | Camara de Azucareros | 1972-08-21 | COSTA RICA | Costa Rican Board of Trade 2370 | 1972-08-21 | Costa Rican Board of Trade | San Jose | ||||
3230 | 3230 | 1972-03-01 | Camara de Azucareros de Costa Rica | 1962-12-28 | COSTA RICA | Central American Sugar Council 1585 | 1962-12-28 | Central American Sugar Council | San Jose | ||||
3550 | 3550 | 1991-03-09 | Central Bank of Costa Rica | 1981-10-13 | COSTA RICA | White & Case, LLP 2759 | 1977-03-09 | White & Case, LLP | San Jose | ||||
3771 | 3771 | 1989-03-15 | Costa Rican Tourist Board | 1977-11-15 | COSTA RICA | William Cook Agency, Inc. 2567 | 1975-03-28 | William Cook Agency, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
4050 | 4050 | 1979-03-26 | Costa Rica | 1979-06-27 | COSTA RICA | North American Precis Syndicate 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | NY | ||||
4162 | 4162 | 1986-03-30 | Costa Rica Tourist Board | 1982-01-12 | COSTA RICA | M. Silver Associates, Inc. 3131 | 1980-07-15 | M. Silver Associates, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
4163 | 4163 | 1986-03-30 | Instituto Costarricense de Turismo | 1986-04-04 | COSTA RICA | M. Silver Associates, Inc. 3131 | 1980-07-15 | M. Silver Associates, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
4422 | 4422 | 1985-03-31 | Instituto Costarricense de Turismo | 1981-01-26 | COSTA RICA | Caribbean Tourism Organization, USA Inc. 991 | 1956-12-31 | Caribbean Tourism Organization, USA Inc. | San Jose | ||||
4451 | 4451 | 1988-03-31 | Private Pants Industry of Costa Rica | 1987-09-30 | COSTA RICA | Manchester Associates, Ltd. 3046 | 1979-08-09 | Manchester Associates, Ltd. | |||||
4452 | 4452 | 1988-03-31 | Private Shirt Industry of Costa Rica | 1987-05-13 | COSTA RICA | Manchester Associates, Ltd. 3046 | 1979-08-09 | Manchester Associates, Ltd. | |||||
4660 | 4660 | 2006-03-31 | Republic of Costa Rica | 2005-11-01 | COSTA RICA | White & Case, LLP 2759 | 1977-03-09 | White & Case, LLP | Avenida 3a Calle 40 | Apartado 1278-1007 | San Jose | ||
4919 | 4919 | 1989-04-01 | Government of the Republic of Costa Rica | 1986-09-12 | COSTA RICA | Public Affairs Analysts, Inc. 3558 | 1984-02-07 | Public Affairs Analysts, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
5112 | 5112 | 1978-04-09 | Government of Costa Rica | 1978-04-04 | COSTA RICA | Burson-Marsteller 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | San Jose | ||||
5492 | 5492 | 1992-04-23 | Fundacion de Defensa del Comercio Exterior | 1988-02-11 | COSTA RICA | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | San Jose | ||||
5494 | 5494 | 1992-04-23 | Olympic Fibers, S.A. | 1989-02-09 | COSTA RICA | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | San Jose | ||||
6163 | 6163 | 1978-05-01 | Refinadora Costarricense de Petroleo, S.A. | 1978-03-28 | COSTA RICA | J. Royal Parker Associates, Inc. 2828 | 1977-08-29 | J. Royal Parker Associates, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
6389 | 6389 | 1985-05-08 | Costa Rica Tourist Board | 1984-10-19 | COSTA RICA | Bill Kofoed, Inc. 3622 | 1984-10-19 | Bill Kofoed, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
6563 | 6563 | 1989-05-15 | ACEPT (Asociacion Costarricense de Exportadores de Productos Textiles) | 1988-09-16 | COSTA RICA | Manchester Trade, Inc. 4149 | 1988-06-22 | Manchester Trade, Inc. | San Pedro de Montes | ||||
7172 | 7172 | 1999-05-31 | Ministry of Foreign Trade, c/o Embassy of Costa Rica, (formerly) Corporacion Bananera Nacional | 1998-09-29 | COSTA RICA | Michael Lewan Company 5276 | 1998-09-29 | Michael Lewan Company | 2114 S Street, N.W. | DC | |||
7441 | 7441 | 2006-06-01 | BOS Antigua Limited | 2003-10-28 | COSTA RICA | Ruder Finn, Inc. 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | 9 Piso, Mall San Pedro San Pedro, San Jose | ||||
7476 | 7476 | 1961-06-02 | Directorio Revolucionario Nicaraguense | 1959-12-02 | COSTA RICA | Lejarza Mora, Salvador 1301 | 1959-12-02 | Lejarza Mora, Salvador | |||||
7477 | 7477 | 1961-06-02 | Enrique Lacayo Farfan | 1959-12-02 | COSTA RICA | Lejarza Mora, Salvador 1301 | 1959-12-02 | Lejarza Mora, Salvador | |||||
7805 | 7805 | 1996-06-14 | Embassy of the Republic of Costa Rica | 1995-11-16 | COSTA RICA | DMS, Inc. 5077 | 1995-11-16 | DMS, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
7820 | 7820 | 1982-06-15 | Costa Rican Association of Businessmen and Entrepreneurs | 1981-10-20 | COSTA RICA | Hemisphere Associates, Inc. 3290 | 1981-10-20 | Hemisphere Associates, Inc. | |||||
8822 | 8822 | 1964-07-01 | Republic of Costa Rica | 1964-06-17 | COSTA RICA | Parco Company 1762 | 1964-06-17 | Parco Company | San Jose | ||||
9060 | 9060 | 1967-07-07 | Camara de Azucareros de Costa Rica | 1963-01-08 | COSTA RICA | Dellale, Dina 1326 | 1960-02-04 | Dellale, Dina | San Jose | ||||
9062 | 9062 | 1967-07-07 | Government of Costa Rica | 1960-02-04 | COSTA RICA | Dellale, Dina 1326 | 1960-02-04 | Dellale, Dina | San Jose | ||||
9213 | 9213 | 1993-07-13 | Costa Rica Quota Counsel | 1992-02-14 | COSTA RICA | International Development Systems, Inc. 4012 | 1987-07-13 | International Development Systems, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
9557 | 9557 | 1952-07-28 | Government of Costa Rica | 1947-03-03 | COSTA RICA | Cox, Oscar S. 341 | 1946-01-28 | Cox, Oscar S. | Washington | DC | |||
9662 | 9662 | 1964-07-31 | Central American Tourist Association | 1964-11-16 | COSTA RICA | James C. Seix Company, Inc. 1064 | 1957-09-09 | James C. Seix Company, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
9760 | 9760 | 1989-07-31 | Grupo Pipasa, S.A. | 1989-05-08 | COSTA RICA | Agribusiness Corporation of America 4250 | 1989-05-08 | Agribusiness Corporation of America | Heredia | ||||
10219 | 10219 | 1998-08-08 | Republic of Costa Rica | 1998-04-15 | COSTA RICA | Holland & Knight 3718 | 1985-08-07 | Holland & Knight | |||||
10554 | 10554 | 1960-08-16 | Dr. Enrique Lacayo Farfan | 1960-07-14 | COSTA RICA | Cabrera, Henry 1376 | 1960-07-14 | Cabrera, Henry | San Jose | ||||
10555 | 10555 | 1960-08-16 | Enrique Lacayo Farfan | 1960-07-14 | COSTA RICA | Comite de Ayuda Pro Liberacion de Nicaragua 1377 | 1960-07-14 | Comite de Ayuda Pro Liberacion de Nicaragua | San Jose | ||||
10856 | 10856 | 1998-08-30 | Costa Rican Investment and Trade Development Board | 1999-01-08 | COSTA RICA | Development Counsellors International 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | New York | NY | |||
11717 | 11717 | 1991-09-19 | Liga Agricola Industrial de la Cana de Azucar | 1986-02-26 | COSTA RICA | Rogers & Wells, LLP 3428 | 1982-12-10 | Rogers & Wells, LLP | San Jose | ||||
11897 | 11897 | 1995-09-29 | Costa Rican Investment & Development Board (CINDE) | 1994-08-31 | COSTA RICA | APCO Worldwide, Inc. 4561 | 1991-09-03 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
12301 | 12301 | 1956-10-01 | Embassy of Costa Rica | 1954-11-15 | COSTA RICA | Lever, Michael 851 | 1954-11-15 | Lever, Michael | Washington | DC | |||
12302 | 12302 | 1956-10-01 | Government of Costa Rica | 1954-11-15 | COSTA RICA | Lever, Michael 851 | 1954-11-15 | Lever, Michael | San Jose | ||||
12368 | 12368 | 1990-10-01 | Instituto Costarricense de Turismo | 1990-03-13 | COSTA RICA | M. Silver Associates, Inc. 3131 | 1980-07-15 | M. Silver Associates, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
12445 | 12445 | 1989-10-02 | Costa Rica National Tourist Board | 1989-12-21 | COSTA RICA | Fontayne Group, Inc. 3752 | 1985-10-30 | Fontayne Group, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
12454 | 12454 | 1986-10-03 | Coalition for the Promotion of Costa Rica | 1986-04-09 | COSTA RICA | Chasey, William C. 3809 | 1986-04-09 | Chasey, William C. | San Jose | ||||
12851 | 12851 | 1982-10-19 | Costa Rica Export-Investment Promotion Center | 1982-01-06 | COSTA RICA | Montoya-Curbelo, Rolando 3321 | 1982-01-06 | Montoya-Curbelo, Rolando | San Jose | ||||
12963 | 12963 | 2009-10-23 | Laura Chinchilla Miranda, nominee of Partido Liberacion Nacional (National Liberation Party) for President of the Republic of Costa Rica | 2009-10-05 | COSTA RICA | Arent Fox, LLP 5882 | 2008-09-22 | Arent Fox, LLP | P.O. Box 1141 | 1250 Escazu | |||
12986 | 12986 | 1994-10-24 | Government of Costa Rica | 1993-11-01 | COSTA RICA | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips 3736 | 1985-09-20 | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips | Washington | DC | |||
13225 | 13225 | 1980-10-31 | Tourism British Columbia, Ministry of the Provincial Secretary & Travel Industry | 1979-12-28 | COSTA RICA | Modern Education Services, Inc. 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
13262 | 13262 | 1989-10-31 | Lacsa Airlines | 1977-12-06 | COSTA RICA | William Cook Agency, Inc. 2567 | 1975-03-28 | William Cook Agency, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
13460 | 13460 | 2012-10-31 | Costa Rican Tourism Institute | 2007-10-01 | COSTA RICA | Burson-Marsteller 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | Costado Este del Puente Juan Pablo II | Sobre Autopista General Canas P.O. Box 777-1000 | San Jose | ||
13695 | 13695 | 1963-11-04 | R.A. Calderon Guardia | 1961-05-04 | COSTA RICA | Perez, H. Hugo 1447 | 1961-05-04 | Perez, H. Hugo | San Jose | ||||
13874 | 13874 | 1993-11-10 | Embassy of Costa Rica | 1993-11-26 | COSTA RICA | Heller & Rosenblatt 4870 | 1993-11-26 | Heller & Rosenblatt | Washington | DC | |||
14294 | 14294 | 1994-11-28 | Mr. Jose Maria Figueres, President-Elect Republic of Costa Rica | 1994-04-28 | COSTA RICA | Hawthorn Group, L.C. 4910 | 1994-04-28 | Hawthorn Group, L.C. | San Jose | ||||
14297 | 14297 | 1971-11-29 | Government of Costa Rica | 1965-08-16 | COSTA RICA | Pan-American Coffee Bureau 406 | 1946-12-06 | Pan-American Coffee Bureau | San Jose | ||||
14789 | 14789 | 1982-12-04 | Costa Rican Tourist Board | 1980-07-08 | COSTA RICA | Robinsons, Inc. 3110 | 1980-06-03 | Robinsons, Inc. | Miami | FL | |||
14844 | 14844 | 1995-12-06 | Jose Maria Figueres | 1993-03-17 | COSTA RICA | Hobbs, Anthony-Scott 4780 | 1993-03-17 | Hobbs, Anthony-Scott | San Jose | ||||
14847 | 14847 | 2006-12-06 | Government of Costa Rica | 2007-01-10 | COSTA RICA | Quinn Gillespie & Associates, LLC 5753 | 2006-06-01 | Quinn Gillespie & Associates, LLC | Office of the President of Costa Rica | San Jose | |||
14865 | 14865 | 1981-12-07 | Government of Costa Rica | 1978-06-27 | COSTA RICA | Mora, Jorge Humberto 2922 | 1978-06-27 | Mora, Jorge Humberto | San Jose | ||||
14942 | 14942 | 1987-12-10 | Government of Costa Rica | 1986-08-01 | COSTA RICA | Jones Day 3427 | 1982-12-10 | Jones Day | San Jose | ||||
15637 | 15637 | 1965-12-31 | Camara de Azucareros de Costa Rica | 1965-02-12 | COSTA RICA | Kaplan, Sheldon Z. 1344 | 1960-03-28 | Kaplan, Sheldon Z. | San Jose | ||||
15750 | 15750 | 1976-12-31 | Instituto de Defesa del Cafe' | 1946-12-06 | COSTA RICA | Pan-American Coffee Bureau 406 | 1946-12-06 | Pan-American Coffee Bureau | San Jose | ||||
15910 | 15910 | 1984-12-31 | Costa Rica Tourist Board | 1984-04-17 | COSTA RICA | Tromson Monroe Advertising, Inc. 2403 | 1973-01-09 | Tromson Monroe Advertising, Inc. | |||||
16003 | 16003 | 1987-12-31 | Costa Rica Private Shirt Industry | 1987-07-13 | COSTA RICA | International Development Systems, Inc. 4012 | 1987-07-13 | International Development Systems, Inc. | San Jose | ||||
16260 | 16260 | 1994-12-31 | Government of the Republic of Costa Rica | 1994-06-02 | COSTA RICA | Hawthorn Group, L.C. 4910 | 1994-04-28 | Hawthorn Group, L.C. | San Jose | ||||
16300 | 16300 | 1995-12-31 | Central American & Caribbean Textile & Apparel Council | 1993-06-14 | COSTA RICA | Greenberg, Traurig, Hoffman, Lipoff, Rosen & Quentel, P.A. 4817 | 1993-06-14 | Greenberg, Traurig, Hoffman, Lipoff, Rosen & Quentel, P.A. | San Jose | ||||
16524 | 16524 | 2002-12-31 | Republic of Costa Rica | 2001-10-02 | COSTA RICA | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | San Jose |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ForeignPrincipals] ( [Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal] TEXT, [Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date] TEXT, [Country/Location_Represented] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registrant_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );