FARA_All_ShortForms
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
75 rows where State = "CA" and Zip = 94104
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Address_1, Short_Form_Termination_Date (date), Short_Form_Date (date), Registration_Date (date)
Registration_Number 17
- Kearns International 16
- Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 9
- Osaka University, San Francisco Office 8
- British Columbia House 7
- Scottish Development Agency 6
- Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 6
- Neeson Company 5
- Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade 5
- Kearns International 3
- Graham, James & Rolph 2
- Neptune Orient Lines, Ltd. 2
- James, Leonard Gage 1
- B.M. Lawrence & Company 1
- German-American Chamber of Commerce of Pacific Coast, Inc. 1
- J.R. Bechtle & Company 1
- TransPacific Communications & Research Company 1
- Farella, Braun & Martel 1
Registrant_Name 16
- Kearns International 19
- Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 9
- Osaka University, San Francisco Office 8
- British Columbia House 7
- Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 6
- Scottish Development Agency 6
- Neeson Company 5
- Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade 5
- Graham, James & Rolph 2
- Neptune Orient Lines, Ltd. 2
- B.M. Lawrence & Company 1
- Farella, Braun & Martel 1
- German-American Chamber of Commerce of Pacific Coast, Inc. 1
- J.R. Bechtle & Company 1
- James, Leonard Gage 1
- TransPacific Communications & Research Company 1
State 1
- CA · 75 ✖
City 1
Link | rowid ▼ | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2627 | 2627 | 1985-01-01 | 1979-06-01 | Green | Marjorie | British Columbia House 1782 | 1964-09-01 | British Columbia House | 100 Bush Street | Suite 400 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
3479 | 3479 | 1973-01-09 | 1964-09-01 | MacKay | Frederick Cameron | British Columbia House 1782 | 1964-09-01 | British Columbia House | 100 Bush Street | Suite 400 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
3630 | 3630 | 2006-01-12 | 2003-05-29 | Eino | Masao | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
6806 | 6806 | 1984-02-14 | 1982-03-12 | Tiong | Koh Poh | Neptune Orient Lines, Ltd. 3345 | 1982-03-12 | Neptune Orient Lines, Ltd. | 300 Montgomery Street | Suite 540 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
7800 | 7800 | 2003-02-27 | 2002-05-31 | Shigetome | Masayo | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
8450 | 8450 | 1976-02-29 | 1975-01-31 | Carlson | Jack Jay | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
8821 | 8821 | 2000-03-01 | 1997-04-21 | Fujimura | Narumi | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
8832 | 8832 | 2003-03-01 | 2000-05-18 | Hara | Shigeo | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
8967 | 8967 | 1990-03-02 | 1988-12-22 | Conley | Lyle Hayden | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 3421 | 1982-11-18 | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) | 130 Montgomery Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
9628 | 9628 | 1987-03-11 | 1982-11-18 | Ashworth | Robert A. | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 3421 | 1982-11-18 | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) | 130 Montgomery Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
10224 | 10224 | 1988-03-18 | 1937-01-01 | Dawson | John H. | British Columbia House 1782 | 1964-09-01 | British Columbia House | 100 Bush Street | Suite 400 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
11181 | 11181 | 1999-03-30 | 1988-10-13 | Hamilton | Robert K. | TransPacific Communications & Research Company 4173 | 1988-08-26 | TransPacific Communications & Research Company | 582 Market Street | Suite 602 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
12022 | 12022 | 2007-03-31 | 2004-08-16 | Murooka | Yoshikatsu | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
12030 | 12030 | 2008-03-31 | 2003-08-01 | Kaneshima | Hideto | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
12031 | 12031 | 2008-03-31 | 2003-09-16 | Mitani | Hideki | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
12032 | 12032 | 2008-03-31 | 2004-12-09 | Ujiie | Yutaka | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
12070 | 12070 | 2010-03-31 | 2007-05-02 | Tanimoto | Chikaosa | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
12161 | 12161 | 2014-03-31 | 2010-10-20 | Kuboi | Ryoichi | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
12447 | 12447 | 1984-04-01 | 1981-06-18 | Yates | Geoffrey Galloway | Scottish Development Agency 3249 | 1981-06-18 | Scottish Development Agency | 465 California Street | Suite 1220 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
13144 | 13144 | 1969-04-11 | 1962-07-03 | Sebald | William Joseph | James, Leonard Gage 1554 | 1962-07-03 | James, Leonard Gage | 310 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
13623 | 13623 | 1985-04-17 | 1984-04-13 | Tay | William | Neptune Orient Lines, Ltd. 3345 | 1982-03-12 | Neptune Orient Lines, Ltd. | 300 Montgomery Street | Suite 540 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
14256 | 14256 | 1991-04-28 | 1988-11-18 | Fletcher | Donald M. | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 3421 | 1982-11-18 | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) | 130 Montgomery Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
16366 | 16366 | 1972-05-15 | 1972-04-25 | Terra | Frank Stanley | Neeson Company 2015 | 1967-03-14 | Neeson Company | 704 Russ Building | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
16667 | 16667 | 1997-05-18 | 1990-05-18 | Won | Robin N. | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 3421 | 1982-11-18 | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) | 130 Montgomery Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
16668 | 16668 | 1997-05-18 | 1992-09-16 | Chung | Patrick | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 3421 | 1982-11-18 | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) | 130 Montgomery Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
16669 | 16669 | 1997-05-18 | 1988-12-15 | Minney | Yuemei | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) 3421 | 1982-11-18 | Hong Kong Government (Industry Department) | 130 Montgomery Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
18412 | 18412 | 1973-06-01 | 1969-07-29 | Fraser | Roderick John | British Columbia House 1782 | 1964-09-01 | British Columbia House | 100 Bush Street | Suite 400 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
18437 | 18437 | 1979-06-01 | 1964-09-01 | Harrod | Harry | British Columbia House 1782 | 1964-09-01 | British Columbia House | 100 Bush Street | Suite 400 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
19311 | 19311 | 2005-06-12 | 2004-08-16 | Mukai | Hiroshi | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
22098 | 22098 | 1972-07-01 | 1970-10-06 | Lawrence | B.M. | B.M. Lawrence & Company 2211 | 1970-10-06 | B.M. Lawrence & Company | 351 California Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
22518 | 22518 | 1978-07-03 | 1977-01-21 | Cooper | Walter F. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
22673 | 22673 | 1969-07-07 | 1964-09-01 | Steacy | Newton Phillips | British Columbia House 1782 | 1964-09-01 | British Columbia House | 100 Bush Street | Suite 400 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
24356 | 24356 | 1980-07-29 | 1979-10-23 | Ostafin | Leszek | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade 2550 | 1974-12-06 | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 626 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
24692 | 24692 | 1978-07-31 | 1976-02-27 | Young | Earl B. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
24697 | 24697 | 1978-07-31 | 1975-10-30 | Oakes | Eugene E. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
25119 | 25119 | 2007-07-31 | 2006-11-27 | Ichiki | Tomoko | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
25287 | 25287 | 2016-07-31 | 2014-07-24 | Kabasawa | Satoshi | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
29703 | 29703 | 1972-09-14 | 1967-03-14 | Diespecker | Richard A. | Neeson Company 2015 | 1967-03-14 | Neeson Company | 704 Russ Building | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
29704 | 29704 | 1972-09-14 | 1967-03-14 | Neeson | John V. | Neeson Company 2015 | 1967-03-14 | Neeson Company | 704 Russ Building | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
29707 | 29707 | 1972-09-14 | 1967-12-12 | Zimmerman | Gabriel A. | Neeson Company 2015 | 1967-03-14 | Neeson Company | 704 Russ Building | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
30117 | 30117 | 1984-09-20 | 1984-05-30 | Burns | R. | Scottish Development Agency 3249 | 1981-06-18 | Scottish Development Agency | 465 California Street | Suite 1220 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30118 | 30118 | 1984-09-20 | 1984-05-30 | Harrison | Donald | Scottish Development Agency 3249 | 1981-06-18 | Scottish Development Agency | 465 California Street | Suite 1220 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30119 | 30119 | 1984-09-20 | 1981-06-18 | Reid | James | Scottish Development Agency 3249 | 1981-06-18 | Scottish Development Agency | 465 California Street | Suite 1220 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30120 | 30120 | 1984-09-20 | 1984-07-19 | Gow | Frank | Scottish Development Agency 3249 | 1981-06-18 | Scottish Development Agency | 465 California Street | Suite 1220 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30121 | 30121 | 1984-09-20 | 1984-07-19 | McPhail | Cameron Ian | Scottish Development Agency 3249 | 1981-06-18 | Scottish Development Agency | 465 California Street | Suite 1220 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30364 | 30364 | 1981-09-24 | 1980-08-26 | Tekielski | Maciej | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade 2550 | 1974-12-06 | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 626 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30365 | 30365 | 1981-09-24 | 1981-08-27 | Krzemirski | Andrzej | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade 2550 | 1974-12-06 | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 626 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30367 | 30367 | 1981-09-24 | 1974-12-06 | Hys | Janusz | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade 2550 | 1974-12-06 | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 626 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30368 | 30368 | 1981-09-24 | 1974-12-06 | Parlewicz | Bohdan | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade 2550 | 1974-12-06 | Polish Chamber of Foreign Trade | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 626 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
30455 | 30455 | 2009-09-25 | 2007-11-08 | Tanaka | Chie | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
31324 | 31324 | 2004-09-30 | 2003-08-01 | Chao | Sidney C. | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
31366 | 31366 | 2006-09-30 | 2006-08-25 | Tsuji | Toshihiko | Osaka University, San Francisco Office 5631 | 2004-07-12 | Osaka University, San Francisco Office | 44 Montgomery Street | Suite 3580 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
33052 | 33052 | 1974-10-17 | 1974-08-27 | Kearns | Henry | Kearns International 2531 | 1974-08-27 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
33053 | 33053 | 1974-10-17 | 1974-08-27 | Ladd | Robert D. | Kearns International 2531 | 1974-08-27 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
33054 | 33054 | 1974-10-17 | 1974-08-27 | Malick | Dell M. | Kearns International 2531 | 1974-08-27 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
34573 | 34573 | 2008-10-31 | 2006-05-30 | Ninomiya | Yoshinori | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office 5174 | 1997-04-21 | Osaka Prefectural Government, California Office | 332 Pine Street | Suite 610 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
35086 | 35086 | 1966-11-02 | 1964-12-03 | Calhoun | Alexander Dewey , Jr. | Graham, James & Rolph 1825 | 1964-12-03 | Graham, James & Rolph | 310 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35087 | 35087 | 1966-11-02 | 1964-12-03 | Fleischmann | Roger J. | Graham, James & Rolph 1825 | 1964-12-03 | Graham, James & Rolph | 310 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35272 | 35272 | 1979-11-05 | 1976-04-18 | Searby | Daniel M. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35273 | 35273 | 1979-11-05 | 1976-04-30 | Carlson | Jack Jay | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35274 | 35274 | 1979-11-05 | 1975-05-14 | Emerson | Claudius Lee | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35275 | 35275 | 1979-11-05 | 1978-09-12 | Murphy | Betty S. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35276 | 35276 | 1979-11-05 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns | Henry | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35277 | 35277 | 1979-11-05 | 1974-10-24 | Ladd | Robert D. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35278 | 35278 | 1979-11-05 | 1974-10-24 | Malick | Dell M. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35279 | 35279 | 1979-11-05 | 1974-10-24 | Southard | Frank A. , Jr. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35280 | 35280 | 1979-11-05 | 1975-10-30 | Drewes | Fred J. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35281 | 35281 | 1979-11-05 | 1975-10-30 | Goldhar | Laura K. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35282 | 35282 | 1979-11-05 | 1975-10-30 | Gomory | Paul Louis , Jr. | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35283 | 35283 | 1979-11-05 | 1975-11-03 | Rand | Joseph | Kearns International 2542 | 1974-10-24 | Kearns International | 155 Sansome Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
35996 | 35996 | 1992-11-17 | 1973-06-12 | Heidenreich | Adam J. | German-American Chamber of Commerce of Pacific Coast, Inc. 2433 | 1973-06-12 | German-American Chamber of Commerce of Pacific Coast, Inc. | 465 California Street | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
39066 | 39066 | 1994-12-24 | 1987-11-12 | Bechtle | Joachim R. | J.R. Bechtle & Company 4057 | 1987-11-12 | J.R. Bechtle & Company | 456 Montgomery Street | Suite 1010 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
39895 | 39895 | 1971-12-31 | 1971-04-27 | Scholl | Edgar H. | Neeson Company 2015 | 1967-03-14 | Neeson Company | 704 Russ Building | San Francisco | CA | 94104 | |
39910 | 39910 | 1972-12-31 | 1971-01-31 | Turbis | Steve C. | British Columbia House 1782 | 1964-09-01 | British Columbia House | 100 Bush Street | Suite 400 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
40728 | 40728 | 1991-12-31 | 1990-12-03 | Farella | Frank E. | Farella, Braun & Martel 4443 | 1990-12-03 | Farella, Braun & Martel | 235 Montgomery Street | Suite 3000 | San Francisco | CA | 94104 |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ShortForms] ( [Short_Form_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Short_Form_Date] TEXT, [Short_Form_Last_Name] TEXT, [Short_Form_First_Name] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registration_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );