FARA_All_ShortForms
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
199 rows where Registrant_Name = "Singapore Economic Development Board" sorted by Short_Form_Date
This data as json, CSV (advanced)
Suggested facets: Registration_Date (date)
Short_Form_Termination_Date (date) >30 ✖
- 2006-02-28 5
- 2009-09-30 4
- 1968-10-01 3
- 2003-08-31 3
- 2008-07-31 3
- 2008-09-30 3
- 1993-04-27 2
- 1994-10-17 2
- 2000-08-31 2
- 2002-04-01 2
- 2010-03-31 2
- 2013-10-31 2
- 2014-12-31 2
- 2018-02-28 2
- 2018-09-30 2
- 2021-06-30 2
- 1968-05-01 1
- 1969-03-14 1
- 1971-02-24 1
- 1971-07-01 1
- 1971-09-12 1
- 1972-01-05 1
- 1972-07-26 1
- 1973-02-16 1
- 1974-12-31 1
- 1975-09-26 1
- 1976-07-08 1
- 1977-07-29 1
- 1978-08-01 1
- 1979-06-01 1
- …
State 1
- NY 199
Registration_Number 1
Registrant_Name 1
- Singapore Economic Development Board · 199 ✖
City 1
- New York 199
Link | rowid | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date ▼ | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
15311 | 15311 | 1968-05-01 | 1967-02-02 | Bourdrez | Joseph P. | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
9805 | 9805 | 1969-03-14 | 1968-03-26 | Cheong | Shum Kwai | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
31802 | 31802 | 1968-10-01 | 1968-03-26 | Buchwald | Elias | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
31803 | 31803 | 1968-10-01 | 1968-03-26 | Burson | Harold | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
31804 | 31804 | 1968-10-01 | 1968-03-26 | Hughes | Anthony D. | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
39960 | 39960 | 1974-12-31 | 1968-03-26 | Agnelli | Bernard F. | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
3218 | 3218 | 1972-01-05 | 1968-10-31 | Bock | Chan Chin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
7057 | 7057 | 1973-02-16 | 1969-10-16 | Yuen | Kum Chuen | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
7494 | 7494 | 1971-02-24 | 1969-10-16 | Choy | Robert Nam Chiu | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
22087 | 22087 | 1971-07-01 | 1969-10-16 | Wan | Shoung Fun | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
29608 | 29608 | 1971-09-12 | 1971-03-04 | Lin | Christopher Kok Chiew | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
22754 | 22754 | 1976-07-08 | 1972-05-31 | Leong | S.P. | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
24063 | 24063 | 1972-07-26 | 1972-05-31 | Chao | Vincent T. | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
30480 | 30480 | 1975-09-26 | 1972-11-01 | Wah | How Kum | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
25515 | 25515 | 1981-08-01 | 1973-03-06 | Ong | Choon-Hwa | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
24354 | 24354 | 1977-07-29 | 1974-12-03 | Lee | Ying-Cheun | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28906 | 28906 | 1994-09-01 | 1975-06-11 | Chan | Chin-Bock | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
18438 | 18438 | 1979-06-01 | 1975-10-24 | Goh | Eric Wai-Mun | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
25505 | 25505 | 1978-08-01 | 1976-05-18 | Chan | Wing-Kwok | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21102 | 21102 | 1988-06-30 | 1977-09-01 | Huat | How Peck | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
35421 | 35421 | 1982-11-08 | 1977-09-01 | Cheong | Wai-Chew | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5723 | 5723 | 1980-02-01 | 1979-05-14 | Meng-Tong | Foo | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28835 | 28835 | 1984-09-01 | 1979-10-19 | Liu | Shih Shin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
23227 | 23227 | 1983-07-15 | 1980-09-19 | Lee | Ying-Cheun | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
34892 | 34892 | 1984-11-01 | 1980-09-19 | Por | Khay-Ti | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21128 | 21128 | 1989-06-30 | 1983-10-03 | Khor | Peng-Soon | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
33070 | 33070 | 1994-10-17 | 1984-04-09 | Yuen | Jonathan | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5058 | 5058 | 1990-01-31 | 1984-09-05 | Chong | Eng-Wei | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
40586 | 40586 | 1989-12-31 | 1984-09-14 | Chun | Heng-Yuen | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28844 | 28844 | 1987-09-01 | 1985-03-07 | Yap | Cheng-Huat | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14196 | 14196 | 1993-04-27 | 1986-09-17 | Huat | Anthony Ang Meng | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
16419 | 16419 | 1991-05-15 | 1986-09-17 | Chan | Kwee-Kee | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28126 | 28126 | 1988-08-31 | 1986-09-17 | Thow | See-Kong | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28143 | 28143 | 1989-08-31 | 1986-09-17 | Chan | Jeremy | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
17725 | 17725 | 1989-05-31 | 1988-08-22 | Lam | Mark Choon-Heiy | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
19565 | 19565 | 1991-06-15 | 1988-08-22 | Lim | David T.E. | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
36266 | 36266 | 1992-11-23 | 1989-11-21 | Yeo | Aik-Khoon | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
15450 | 15450 | 1995-05-01 | 1991-05-07 | Natarajan | Suresh | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
33071 | 33071 | 1994-10-17 | 1991-05-07 | Loh | Wai-Kiew | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
13462 | 13462 | 1994-04-15 | 1992-04-16 | Lim | Swee-Say | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14048 | 14048 | 1995-04-24 | 1992-04-16 | Lim | Adelaine | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14194 | 14194 | 1993-04-27 | 1992-04-16 | Lam | Yen Chin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14670 | 14670 | 1995-04-30 | 1993-04-27 | Leng | James Ng Mun | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28264 | 28264 | 1995-08-31 | 1993-04-27 | Goh | Eng-Ghee | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8059 | 8059 | 1996-02-28 | 1993-08-30 | Yeow-Hin | Lai | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
17477 | 17477 | 1996-05-30 | 1993-08-30 | Quah | Hilary Lam-Seng | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28912 | 28912 | 1996-09-01 | 1993-08-30 | Lee | Yi Shyan | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
18514 | 18514 | 1999-06-01 | 1994-10-17 | Ng | Nam-Sin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14765 | 14765 | 1998-04-30 | 1995-04-24 | Seow | Wee-Seong | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
19353 | 19353 | 1997-06-13 | 1995-04-24 | Barry | Mong-Huat Sim | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
41021 | 41021 | 1997-12-31 | 1995-04-24 | Poh | Choon Lay | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21309 | 21309 | 1998-06-30 | 1995-09-18 | Aw | Kah-Peng | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
31173 | 31173 | 1997-09-30 | 1995-09-18 | Khuan | Lee Soon | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8088 | 8088 | 1998-02-28 | 1996-04-30 | Ko | Kheng-Hwa | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8501 | 8501 | 2000-02-29 | 1996-11-08 | Lim | Simon | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28375 | 28375 | 2000-08-31 | 1996-11-08 | Beh | Swan Gin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28376 | 28376 | 2000-08-31 | 1996-11-08 | Quek | Swee Kuan | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8204 | 8204 | 2006-02-28 | 1997-10-16 | Choo | Voon Yim | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
25636 | 25636 | 2002-08-01 | 1997-10-16 | Png | Cheong Boon | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5204 | 5204 | 1999-01-31 | 1998-06-03 | Wong | Constance Fung Lin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28345 | 28345 | 1999-08-31 | 1998-06-03 | Jek | Kian Jin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28431 | 28431 | 2003-08-31 | 1998-09-14 | Tan | Lee Sar | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28432 | 28432 | 2003-08-31 | 1998-09-14 | Yeoh | Keat Chuan | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
37466 | 37466 | 2000-12-01 | 1998-09-14 | Hean | Jonathan Kua Soo | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5304 | 5304 | 2004-01-31 | 1999-03-22 | Mok | Chee Liang | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14820 | 14820 | 2000-04-30 | 1999-03-22 | Khaw Hong Cher | Andrew | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
31344 | 31344 | 2005-09-30 | 1999-03-22 | Gong | Wee-Lik | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
36870 | 36870 | 1999-11-30 | 1999-03-22 | Yun | Kok Siong | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12515 | 12515 | 2002-04-01 | 1999-11-08 | Wong | Wee-Siong | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
24998 | 24998 | 2001-07-31 | 1999-11-08 | Tan Yi-Ping | Jacqueline | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
35307 | 35307 | 2001-11-05 | 1999-11-08 | Soon | Chin-Yang | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
11907 | 11907 | 2003-03-31 | 2000-05-11 | Kok | Ping Soon | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12514 | 12514 | 2002-04-01 | 2000-05-11 | Ti | Boon Wee | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
29958 | 29958 | 2001-09-16 | 2000-05-11 | Chia | Doreen Chin Ling | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
22299 | 22299 | 2002-07-01 | 2000-10-06 | Chan | Adrian | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14898 | 14898 | 2003-04-30 | 2001-05-18 | Kew | Hui-Chin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21433 | 21433 | 2002-06-30 | 2001-05-18 | Choo | Heng-Tong | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
34499 | 34499 | 2003-10-31 | 2001-05-18 | Goh | Chee Kiong | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28426 | 28426 | 2003-08-31 | 2002-01-30 | Chong | Aaron THAM Chee | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14913 | 14913 | 2004-04-30 | 2002-07-02 | Chik | Wai-Chiew | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8193 | 8193 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-01-10 | Ng | Joachim J. | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8194 | 8194 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-01-10 | Yan | Hon Meng | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14919 | 14919 | 2005-04-30 | 2003-01-10 | Seah | Keok Choon | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
25057 | 25057 | 2005-07-31 | 2003-01-10 | Lim | Jonathan | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8198 | 8198 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-07-24 | Lai | Kevin Jia-ven | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
25131 | 25131 | 2008-07-31 | 2003-07-24 | Goh | Jayson Swee Kang | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8206 | 8206 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-12-30 | Chan | Damian | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21515 | 21515 | 2004-06-30 | 2003-12-30 | Beh | Kian Teik | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
23135 | 23135 | 2006-07-14 | 2003-12-30 | Tan Kok Meng | Dennis | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28437 | 28437 | 2004-08-31 | 2003-12-30 | Low | Shien Ang | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
37484 | 37484 | 2004-12-01 | 2003-12-30 | Tan | Yew Hua Alvin | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
41379 | 41379 | 2004-12-31 | 2003-12-30 | Ho | Yew Weng | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
4281 | 4281 | 2005-01-22 | 2004-04-01 | Ho | Julian Wai-Kit | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
31406 | 31406 | 2008-09-30 | 2004-04-01 | Man | Liu Chung | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8226 | 8226 | 2007-02-28 | 2004-12-22 | Kua | Jonathan | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
11084 | 11084 | 2007-03-29 | 2004-12-22 | Chin | Lawrence | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
25139 | 25139 | 2008-07-31 | 2004-12-22 | Lee | Wee Khim | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28512 | 28512 | 2007-08-31 | 2004-12-22 | Heng | Teck Thai | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
31400 | 31400 | 2007-09-30 | 2004-12-22 | Woo | Pei-Wei | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
37802 | 37802 | 2006-12-05 | 2004-12-22 | Lee | Sze Ern Dawn | Singapore Economic Development Board 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
Advanced export
JSON shape: default, array, newline-delimited
CREATE TABLE [FARA_All_ShortForms] ( [Short_Form_Termination_Date] TEXT, [Short_Form_Date] TEXT, [Short_Form_Last_Name] TEXT, [Short_Form_First_Name] TEXT, [Registration_Number] INTEGER, [Registration_Date] TEXT, [Registrant_Name] TEXT, [Address_1] TEXT, [Address_2] TEXT, [City] TEXT, [State] TEXT, [Zip] TEXT, FOREIGN KEY([Registration_Number]) REFERENCES [FARA_All_Registrants]([Registration_Number]) );