fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Termination_Date | Name | Business_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
167 | 1943-01-01 | 1966-12-31 | French Chamber of Commerce of the U.S., Inc. | 1350 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
406 | 1946-12-06 | 1977-12-31 | Pan-American Coffee Bureau | 1350 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
1117 | 1958-02-24 | 1985-04-09 | Package Express & Travel Agency, Inc. | 1776 Broadway | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
1639 | 1963-06-12 | 1990-10-29 | Heyward Associates, Inc. | 205 West 57th Street | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
1867 | 1965-03-12 | 1993-03-12 | French Expositions in the U.S., Inc. | 810 Seventh Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2085 | 1968-04-02 | 1970-02-16 | Bronhill Associates, Inc. | 666 Fifth Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2258 | 1971-05-21 | 1972-03-13 | Partido Democrata Popular | 1674 Broadway | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2341 | 1972-05-05 | 1972-05-12 | Bob Perilla Associates, Inc. | 250 West 57th Street | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2396 | 1972-12-08 | 1976-12-27 | Partido Institucional Democratico | 1674 Broadway | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2605 | 1975-09-12 | 1976-03-31 | Manning, Selvage & Lee, Inc. | 666 Fifth Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2727 | 1976-10-18 | 1982-06-22 | Martin Ryan Haley & Associates, Inc. | 40 Central Park, South | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2743 | 1976-12-29 | 1980-08-15 | Nu-Line Advertising Service, Inc. | 200 West 58th Street | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2812 | 1977-07-20 | 1979-02-27 | Marschalk Company, Inc. | 1345 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
2892 | 1978-04-25 | 1980-08-04 | Richard Weiner, Inc. | 888 Seventh Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
3026 | 1979-05-22 | 1980-05-06 | Jurdem Thomas Associates | 3 West 57th Street | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
3172 | 1980-12-01 | 1985-03-15 | Inter-American News Services, Inc. | 720 Fifth Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
3291 | 1981-10-21 | 1988-07-11 | Santucci, Tedeschi & Scott | 36 West 5th Street | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
3647 | 1985-02-04 | 1990-12-31 | Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison | 1285 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
3679 | 1985-05-08 | 1987-12-09 | SABENA Belgian World Airlines | 720 Fifth Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
4086 | 1988-01-27 | 1989-07-13 | Haley, Kiss & Dowd, Inc. | 40 Central Park, South | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
4556 | 1991-08-14 | 1997-08-31 | Lord Group | 810 Seventh Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
4889 | 1994-02-02 | 1994-08-31 | Lord Day & Lord, Barrett Smith | 1675 Broadway | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
4893 | 1994-02-14 | 2000-02-28 | Heyward, Evelyn J. | Heyward Marketing | 205 West 57th Street, #7BA | New York | NY | 10019 | |
5506 | 2002-06-26 | 2003-02-11 | PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP | 1301 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
5605 | 2003-12-29 | 2005-12-31 | Mediaedge: CIA, LLC | 825 Seventh Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
5758 | 2006-05-09 | 2018-05-01 | Ketchum Inc. NY | 1285 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
6293 | 2015-05-12 | 2017-04-30 | Finsbury, LLC | 3 Columbus Circle, Floor 9 | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
6691 | 2019-06-14 | 2020-12-31 | Rubenstein Public Relations, Inc. | 1301 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
6863 | 2020-08-28 | 2021-02-17 | Kasowitz Benson Torres, LLP | 1633 Broadway | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
6957 | 2021-04-30 | 2021-04-30 | Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP | 787 Seventh Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
7047 | 2021-11-22 | Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP | 787 Seventh Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | |||
7096 | 2022-03-15 | 2022-10-01 | Ketchum, Inc. | 1285 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
7247 | 2023-03-21 | Rubenstein Associates, Inc. | 825 Eighth Avenue | New York | NY | 10019 | |||
7174 | 2022-10-04 | Liscovich, Andrey | Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati | 1301 Avenue of the Americas #40 | New York | NY | 10019 | ||
3105 | 1980-05-13 | 1985-03-12 | Ogilvie, Taylor & Associates, Inc. | C/O Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 1775 Broadway | New York | NY | 10019 | |
3478 | 1983-05-26 | 1983-11-26 | IRM (U.S.A.), Inc. | Plaza Hotel | 2 West 59th Street | New York | NY | 10019 | |
3880 | 1986-09-11 | 1997-03-11 | Hong Kong Economic & Trade Office | 680 Fifth Avenue | 22nd Floor | New York | NY | 10019 | |
6197 | 2013-11-19 | 2014-12-31 | Kasowitz, Benson, Torres and Friedman, LLP | 1633 Broadway Avenue | 22nd Floor | New York | NY | 10019 | |
5626 | 2004-06-07 | 2005-06-30 | Ogilvy Group, Inc. | Worldwide Plaza | 309 West 49th Street | New York | NY | 10019 | |
4658 | 1992-04-22 | 1992-12-30 | Committee to Support-Civic Democratic Pty. of Czechoslovakia | C/O HGI | 315 West 57th Street #214 | New York | NY | 10019 | |
6873 | 2020-10-07 | OCP North America, Inc. | 1370 Sixth Avenue | 32nd Floor | New York City | NY | 10019 | ||
4459 | 1991-01-08 | 1993-12-31 | Rowland Company, Inc. | 1675 Broadway | 33rd Floor | New York | NY | 10019 | |
1382 | 1960-08-03 | 1968-04-11 | Government of Ontario Department of Economics, Development, | Trade & Industry Branch | 680 Fifth Avenue, Suite 1302 | New York | NY | 10019 | |
5582 | 2003-10-29 | 2004-02-27 | Brown Lloyd James, Ltd. | 41 West 57th Street | 8th Floor | New York | NY | 10019 | |
1752 | 1964-06-04 | 1965-05-24 | Guyana Economic Progress Association | 1674 Broadway | Room 806 | New York | NY | 10019 | |
3481 | 1983-06-15 | 1984-09-14 | Haley, Kiss & Dowd, Inc. | 40 Central Park, South | Suite 16-F | New York | NY | 10019 | |
3627 | 1984-11-01 | 1985-12-31 | Woodrum, Robert L. | 75 Rockefeller Plaza | Suite 1809 | New York | NY | 10019 | |
5541 | 2003-03-10 | 2004-07-31 | Liss, Norman | 200 West 57th Street | Suite 708 | New York | NY | 10019 | |
5832 | 2007-10-17 | 2008-04-30 | Liss, Norman | 200 West 57th Street | Suite 708 | New York | NY | 10019 |