fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
8977 | 1968-07-03 | A.P. Moller, as Managing Owner of Steamship Company Svendborg, Ltd. and Steamship Company of 1912, Ltd. | 1962-03-26 | DENMARK | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Copenhagen | ||||
5338 | 1965-04-17 | Ambassador of the Kingdom of Denmark | 1948-04-16 | DENMARK | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
4836 | 1963-04-01 | Axe-Templeton Growth Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
6616 | 1966-05-17 | Banco Agricola y Pecuario, Instituto Autonomo | 1965-01-28 | VENEZUELA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Caracas | ||||
8978 | 1968-07-03 | British Cycle & Motor Industries Association, Ltd. | 1961-06-13 | GREAT BRITAIN | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Coventry, England | ||||
2142 | 1966-02-03 | Caja de Credito Agrario, Industrial y Minero | 1965-01-15 | COLOMBIA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Bogota | ||||
4837 | 1963-04-01 | Canada General Fund, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
9320 | 1957-07-17 | Canada General Fund, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
4838 | 1963-04-01 | Canadian International Growth Fund, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Montreal, Quebec | ||||
11450 | 1957-09-09 | Canadian International Growth Fund, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Montreal, Quebec | ||||
12752 | 1956-10-16 | Canadian Pacific Railway Company | 1954-03-04 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Montreal, Quebec | ||||
14184 | 1965-11-23 | Cia Azucarera del Valle, S.A. | 1965-08-25 | COLOMBIA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Cali | ||||
12753 | 1956-10-16 | Distillers Corporation - Seagrams, Ltd. | 1954-03-04 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Montreal, Quebec | ||||
14185 | 1965-11-23 | Distribuidorade Azucares, S.A. | 1965-08-25 | COLOMBIA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Bogota | ||||
12754 | 1956-10-16 | Dome Mines, Ltd. | 1954-03-04 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | S.Porcupine, Ontario | ||||
2120 | 1955-02-03 | Dominion of Canada | 1952-11-21 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
6281 | 1966-05-03 | Embassy of the Republic of South Africa | 1965-09-27 | SOUTH AFRICA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
8979 | 1968-07-03 | Flota Mercante Grancolombiana, S.A. | 1964-06-24 | COLOMBIA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Bogota | ||||
8980 | 1968-07-03 | Government of Canada | 1962-06-19 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
14014 | 1977-11-16 | Government of Ecuador | 1960-07-13 | ECUADOR | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
11680 | 1964-09-17 | Government of Greece | 1964-04-29 | GREECE | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
1677 | 1961-01-31 | Government of Israel | 1960-12-07 | ISRAEL | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Asbury Park | NJ | |||
5340 | 1967-04-17 | Government of Lebanon | 1960-05-16 | LEBANON | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
8981 | 1968-07-03 | Government of Pakistan | 1948-12-17 | PAKISTAN | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | |||||
8982 | 1968-07-03 | Government of Venezuela | 1959-08-27 | VENEZUELA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
14934 | 1962-12-10 | Government of the Kingdom of Cambodia | 1961-01-10 | CAMBODIA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
5154 | 1957-04-11 | Government of the Netherlands | 1955-06-28 | NETHERLANDS | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | The Hague | ||||
9953 | 1961-08-01 | Government of the Republic of Korea | 1961-02-27 | KOREA, SOUTH | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
9319 | 1950-07-17 | Greek Ambassador - Permanent Representatives of Greece to the United Nations | 1948-04-16 | GREECE | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
12755 | 1956-10-16 | Hiram-Walker-Gooderham & Worts, Ltd. | 1954-03-04 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Walkerville, Ontario | ||||
14015 | 1977-11-16 | His Excellency, Senor Don Fernando Berckemeyer | 1950-08-17 | PERU | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
8983 | 1968-07-03 | His Excellency, the Colombian Ambassador Senor Dr. Don Gonzalo Restrepo-Jaramillo | 1948-07-08 | COLOMBIA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
818 | 1973-01-01 | Hong Kong General Chamber of Commerce | 1964-04-10 | HONG KONG | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | |||||
6134 | 1960-05-01 | Hong Kong General Chamber of Commerce | 1959-10-20 | HONG KONG | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | |||||
12756 | 1956-10-16 | Hudson Bay Mining & Smelting Company, Ltd. | 1954-03-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Winnipeg, Manitoba | ||||
14186 | 1965-11-23 | Ingenios Independientes, Ltda. | 1965-08-25 | COLOMBIA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Cali | ||||
8984 | 1968-07-03 | International Nickel Company of Canada, Ltd. | 1954-02-11 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
4839 | 1963-04-01 | Investors Group Canadian Fund, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
9951 | 1957-08-01 | Investors Group Canadian Fund, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Winnipeg, Manitoba | ||||
819 | 1973-01-01 | Iranian Ambassador | 1948-04-16 | IRAN | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
4840 | 1963-04-01 | Keystone Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Montreal, Quebec | ||||
9321 | 1957-07-17 | Keystone Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Montreal, Quebec | ||||
14016 | 1977-11-16 | Legation of Finland | 1949-07-08 | FINLAND | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
4841 | 1963-04-01 | Loomis-Sayles Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | |||||
12757 | 1956-10-16 | Massey-Harris-Ferguson, Ltd. | 1954-03-04 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
12758 | 1956-10-16 | Moore Corporation, Ltd. | 1954-03-04 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
10184 | 1957-08-07 | New York Capital Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
4842 | 1963-04-01 | New York Capital Fund, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
8300 | 1975-06-30 | Republic of Guinea | 1967-05-31 | GUINEA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Conakry | ||||
14017 | 1977-11-16 | Royal Government of the Kingdom of Sweden | 1950-02-20 | SWEDEN | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | |||||
12750 | 1955-10-16 | Royal Swedish Air Board | 1948-07-22 | SWEDEN | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Stockholm | ||||
4844 | 1963-04-01 | Scudder Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronot, Ontario | ||||
9174 | 1957-07-11 | Scudder Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
11451 | 1957-09-09 | Templeton Growth Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
4845 | 1963-04-01 | UBS Fund of Canada, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Montreal, Ontario | ||||
4846 | 1963-04-01 | United Funds Canada, Ltd. | 1961-06-23 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario | ||||
9322 | 1957-07-17 | United Funds Canada, Ltd. | 1957-04-12 | CANADA | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Toronto, Ontario |