fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3392 | 1980-03-03 | Soviet Exhibition of Science, Technology & Culture (Alexander Shelnov, Deputy Director) | 1959-10-20 | USSR | 973 | 1956-08-28 | Lerman, Louis | NY | ||||
3743 | 1960-03-15 | IBUSZ | 1959-10-20 | HUNGARY | 1266 | 1959-09-08 | Rona Travel Bureau, Inc. | Budapest | ||||
6134 | 1960-05-01 | Hong Kong General Chamber of Commerce | 1959-10-20 | HONG KONG | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling |