fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
787 | 1962-01-01 | Eduardo Martelino (Press Counsel) | 1961-10-13 | PHILIPPINES | 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | |||||
3217 | 1962-03-01 | Commissioner Melecio B. Domingo (Chairman of the Tobacco Board) | 1961-10-13 | PHILIPPINES | 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | |||||
6661 | 1962-05-20 | Commissioner Benedicto Padilla | 1961-10-13 | PHILIPPINES | 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | Manila | ||||
7030 | 1964-05-31 | Raoul S.V. Bonnevie (Director) | 1963-06-12 | PHILIPPINES | 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | |||||
7031 | 1964-05-31 | Republic of the Philippines, Department of Agriculture & Natural Resources, ABACA Development Board | 1963-06-12 | PHILIPPINES | 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | Manila | ||||
7032 | 1964-05-31 | Teodoro P. De Vera (Chairman of the Board) | 1963-06-12 | PHILIPPINES | 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | |||||
12641 | 1964-10-13 | Commissioner Jose Lingad (Chairman of the Tobacco Board - Bureau of Internal Revenue | 1962-11-14 | PHILIPPINES | 1487 | 1961-10-13 | Co-Ordinated Marketing Agency, Inc. | Manila |