fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
37252 | 1964-12-01 | 1956-03-02 | Feltus | Anne Winter | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37253 | 1964-12-01 | 1962-05-15 | Dalal | Ranes Prasad | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37254 | 1964-12-01 | 1962-05-15 | Mohan | Ram Tirath | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37255 | 1964-12-01 | 1962-05-15 | Morris | Pelis Andrew | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37256 | 1964-12-01 | 1962-05-15 | Sharma | Shri Narain | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37257 | 1964-12-01 | 1962-07-09 | Bhatt | Nalinkant Prataprai | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37258 | 1964-12-01 | 1956-07-11 | Kurikoti | S.G. | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37259 | 1964-12-01 | 1956-07-11 | Oza | Manyukumar Jayantilal | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37260 | 1964-12-01 | 1958-08-29 | Gor | Shirishchandra Nandvadan | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37261 | 1964-12-01 | 1958-08-29 | Phillips | Manoroma | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37262 | 1964-12-01 | 1962-08-29 | Cummings | Felix | 1568 | 1962-08-29 | Guyana Public Relations & Information Office | 114 East 40th Street | New York | NY | ||
37263 | 1964-12-01 | 1959-09-04 | Dalal | Vasantkumar Dwarkadas | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37264 | 1964-12-01 | 1959-09-04 | Shah | Rasiklal Ujamshi | 923 | 1955-12-01 | Government of India Trade Centre, New York | 19 East 49th Street | New York | NY | ||
37265 | 1964-12-01 | 1961-10-11 | Ball | Robert Markham | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | 888 - 16th Street, N.W. | Washington | DC | 20006 |