fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7854 | 1969-02-28 | 1966-02-01 | Fugitt | Warren Graves | 969 | 1956-08-02 | Development & Resources Corporation | 44 Wall Street | New York | NY | ||
11401 | 1967-03-31 | 1966-02-01 | Harkens | Robert Cecil | 969 | 1956-08-02 | Development & Resources Corporation | 44 Wall Street | New York | NY | ||
13064 | 1967-04-10 | 1966-02-01 | Rogers | Gifford Eugene | 969 | 1956-08-02 | Development & Resources Corporation | 44 Wall Street | New York | NY | ||
18396 | 1969-06-01 | 1966-02-01 | Williams | Kenneth Ashton | 437 | 1944-04-21 | National Film Board of Canada | 1123 Broadway | Suite 307 | New York | NY | 10010 |
25514 | 1981-08-01 | 1966-02-01 | Chew | Jong-Yen | 282 | 1945-01-01 | Kuomintang of China | (Headquarters in America) | 844 Stockton Street | San Francisco | CA | 94108 |
30647 | 1973-09-28 | 1966-02-01 | McCulloch | Allan Walter | 969 | 1956-08-02 | Development & Resources Corporation | 44 Wall Street | New York | NY | ||
30891 | 1970-09-30 | 1966-02-01 | Fuller | William Arthur , Jr. | 969 | 1956-08-02 | Development & Resources Corporation | 44 Wall Street | New York | NY | ||
32619 | 1966-10-11 | 1966-02-01 | Cox | Elliott F. | 969 | 1956-08-02 | Development & Resources Corporation | 44 Wall Street | New York | NY |