fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
927 | 1991-01-01 | Office Vaudois Pour le Developpement du Commere et de l'Industrie (OVCI) | 1988-08-25 | SWITZERLAND | 4172 | 1988-08-25 | California Group/Translingua | Lausanne | ||||
928 | 1991-01-01 | Asean Federation of Textile Industries (AFTEX) | 1987-10-09 | THAILAND | 3765 | 1985-12-26 | Willkie, Farr & Gallagher | |||||
929 | 1991-01-01 | Canon Europa | 1990-08-03 | SWITZERLAND | 3856 | 1986-07-11 | GCI Group, Inc. | Zurich | ||||
930 | 1991-01-01 | Canon Europa | 1989-09-07 | NETHERLANDS | 3856 | 1986-07-11 | GCI Group, Inc. | Amstelveen | ||||
931 | 1991-01-01 | Companhia Siderurgica Paulista (COSIPA) | 1986-06-25 | BRAZIL | 3765 | 1985-12-26 | Willkie, Farr & Gallagher | Sao Paulo | ||||
932 | 1991-01-01 | Embassy of Benin | 1991-01-25 | BENIN | 3466 | 1983-05-09 | van Kloberg & Associates, Ltd. | Washington | DC | |||
933 | 1991-01-01 | Embassy of the Republic of Niger | 1990-05-03 | NIGER | 3466 | 1983-05-09 | van Kloberg & Associates, Ltd. | Washington | DC | |||
934 | 1991-01-01 | Government of Aruba | 1987-02-13 | ARUBA | 1750 | 1964-06-04 | Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP | Oranjestad | ||||
935 | 1991-01-01 | Government of Romania Ministry of Mass Media | 1990-08-08 | ROMANIA | 4404 | 1990-08-08 | Transworld Insurance Brokers | Bucharest | ||||
936 | 1991-01-01 | Grand Council of the Crees (of Quebec) | 1989-06-16 | CANADA | 2988 | 1979-01-17 | Pierson, Semmes & Bemis | Quebec | ||||
937 | 1991-01-01 | IFINT, S.A. | 1990-09-19 | LUXEMBOURG | 4414 | 1990-09-19 | Hooper, Hooper, Owen & Gould | |||||
938 | 1991-01-01 | Kuwaiti Emergency Relief Fund | 1990-11-13 | KUWAIT | 4432 | 1990-11-13 | Kennedy, William R. | Washington | DC | |||
939 | 1991-01-01 | Marcos Martinez Mendieta, Ambassador of Paraguay | 1990-09-12 | PARAGUAY | 4366 | 1990-04-16 | Amerisphere Group, Ltd. | Washington | DC | |||
940 | 1991-01-01 | Republic of Gabon, Office of the President | 1990-04-25 | GABON | 2850 | 1977-11-29 | Hannaford Company, Inc. | Libreville |