fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6889 | 1993-05-28 | Country of Zaire - Ambassador Mokolo W'A Mpombo | 1993-05-28 | ZAIRE | 4811 | 1993-05-28 | Dunn, Floyd | Paris | ||||
6890 | 1993-05-28 | Guam Uranao Development Company, Ltd. | 1989-09-01 | JAPAN | 4284 | 1989-09-01 | Schiappa, Gerard F. | Toyko | ||||
6891 | 1993-05-28 | Methanex, Inc. | 1993-03-26 | CANADA | 4783 | 1993-03-26 | McClure, Trotter & Mentz | Houston | TX | |||
6892 | 1993-05-28 | Mobutu Sese Seko | 1994-07-27 | ZAIRE | 4811 | 1993-05-28 | Dunn, Floyd | |||||
6893 | 1993-05-28 | Royal Trustco, Ltd. | 1989-04-17 | CANADA | 4239 | 1989-04-17 | Royal Trustco, Ltd. | Ontario |