fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
28340 | 1999-08-31 | 1994-03-01 | Wakeman | Dennis J. | 4699 | 1992-07-31 | Sandler & Travis Trade Advisory Services, Inc. | 1300 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | Suite 400 | Washington | DC | 20004 |
28341 | 1999-08-31 | 1993-03-12 | Levine | Andrew T. | 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | 215 Park Avenue South | 14th Floor | New York | NY | 10003 |
28342 | 1999-08-31 | 1999-04-22 | Robertson | Mark J. | 5270 | 1998-08-17 | Merritt Group, Ltd. | 1133 21st Street, N.W. | Suite 700 | Washington | DC | 20036 |
28343 | 1999-08-31 | 1999-04-22 | Safavian | David H. | 5270 | 1998-08-17 | Merritt Group, Ltd. | 1133 21st Street, N.W. | Suite 700 | Washington | DC | 20036 |
28344 | 1999-08-31 | 1996-05-31 | Collinson | Nicole Bivens | 4699 | 1992-07-31 | Sandler & Travis Trade Advisory Services, Inc. | 1300 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | Suite 400 | Washington | DC | 20004 |
28345 | 1999-08-31 | 1998-06-03 | Jek | Kian Jin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
28346 | 1999-08-31 | 1994-06-30 | Ishikawa | Tetsuya | 4440 | 1990-11-21 | JFCC, Washington Office | 1120 Connecticut Avenue, NW | Suite 440 | Washington | DC | 20036 |
28347 | 1999-08-31 | 1971-07-07 | McGee | Michael Curtis | 2110 | 1968-10-29 | Hong Kong Tourism Board | 5901 W CENTURY BLVD. | SUITE 650 | Los Angeles | CA | 90045 |
28348 | 1999-08-31 | 1992-08-06 | Gerdes | Ronald W. | 4699 | 1992-07-31 | Sandler & Travis Trade Advisory Services, Inc. | 1300 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | Suite 400 | Washington | DC | 20004 |
28349 | 1999-08-31 | 1992-08-06 | Navarro-Bowman | Chandri | 4699 | 1992-07-31 | Sandler & Travis Trade Advisory Services, Inc. | 1300 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | Suite 400 | Washington | DC | 20004 |
28350 | 1999-08-31 | 1992-08-06 | Travis | Thomas G. | 4699 | 1992-07-31 | Sandler & Travis Trade Advisory Services, Inc. | 1300 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | Suite 400 | Washington | DC | 20004 |
28351 | 1999-08-31 | 1998-08-17 | Hoffman | Scott | 5270 | 1998-08-17 | Merritt Group, Ltd. | 1133 21st Street, N.W. | Suite 700 | Washington | DC | 20036 |
28352 | 1999-08-31 | 1998-10-05 | Bachar | Susan M. | 5269 | 1998-08-13 | DCS Group | 410 First Street, S.E. | 3rd Floor | Washington | DC | 20003 |
28353 | 1999-08-31 | 1998-10-09 | Cheung | Hui Hang | 2181 | 1970-01-19 | Hong Kong Trade Development Council, Inc. | 219 East 46th Street | New York | NY | 10017 | |
28354 | 1999-08-31 | 1998-12-08 | Baker | Linda Harrington | 5148 | 1996-12-30 | Powell Tate, Inc. | 700 - 13th Street, N.W. | Suite 1000 | Washington | DC | 20005 |