fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
41175 | 2000-12-31 | 1984-01-06 | Leong | Constance Cecilia | 2500 | 1974-03-04 | Cayman Islands Department of Tourism | 350 5th Avenue | Suite 4620 | New York | NY | 10118-1801 |
41176 | 2000-12-31 | 1994-01-06 | Duguid | Andrew A. | 4883 | 1994-01-06 | Lloyd's of London Market Representatives | One Lime Street | London | |||
41177 | 2000-12-31 | 1996-02-12 | Hagiwara | Hisayo | 3923 | 1987-01-06 | Michael Solomon Associates | 516 Fifth Avenue | Suite 801 | New York | NY | 10036 |
41178 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-02-23 | Palladino | Amy | 3856 | 1986-07-11 | GCI Group, Inc. | 825 Third Avenue | 24th Floor | New York | NY | 10022-7519 |
41179 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-02-27 | Taylor | John Maxwell Percy | 4883 | 1994-01-06 | Lloyd's of London Market Representatives | One Lime Street | London | |||
41180 | 2000-12-31 | 1973-03-02 | Barnard | Robert C. | 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | 2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW | Washington | DC | 20006-1801 | |
41181 | 2000-12-31 | 1995-03-02 | Tedeschi | Anthony M. | 4601 | 1991-12-06 | Trombone Associates, Inc. | 420 Madison Avenue | New York | NY | 10017 | |
41182 | 2000-12-31 | 2000-03-02 | Fodor-Gernaert | Odette M. | 4601 | 1991-12-06 | Trombone Associates, Inc. | 420 Madison Avenue | New York | NY | 10017 | |
41183 | 2000-12-31 | 1977-03-09 | Hurlock | James B. | 2759 | 1977-03-09 | White & Case, LLP | 1155 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10036-2787 | |
41184 | 2000-12-31 | 2000-04-06 | Legault | Alexandre | 5347 | 1999-12-09 | Carlington Sales Canada Corporation | 1260 Crescent, | Suite 201 | Montreal, Quebec | ||
41185 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-04-20 | Neuhold | Erich | 2052 | 1967-09-27 | Alpine Tourist Office | C/O Austrian Tourist Office, Inc. | 608 Fifth Avenue | New York | NY | 10020 |
41186 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-04-28 | Krasow | Cristina Louise | 3712 | 1985-08-05 | DLA Piper US LLP | 500 8th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20004 | |
41187 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-05-25 | Veress | Bulcsu | 5312 | 1999-05-25 | Information for Investment Decisions, Inc. (IID) | 818 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. | Suite 850 | Washington | DC | 20006 |
41188 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-06-15 | Behrends | Paul D. | 5147 | 1996-12-30 | Boland & Madigan, Inc. | 700 - 13th Street, N.W. | Suite 350 | Washington | DC | 20005 |
41189 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-06-15 | Mcknight | Steven G. | 5147 | 1996-12-30 | Boland & Madigan, Inc. | 700 - 13th Street, N.W. | Suite 350 | Washington | DC | 20005 |
41190 | 2000-12-31 | 1996-06-24 | Sise | Peyton | 5116 | 1996-06-24 | Dentsu America, Inc. | 32 Avenue of the Americas | 16th Floor | New York | NY | 10013 |
41191 | 2000-12-31 | 1989-06-26 | Grossman | Steven A. | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | 1111 19th Street NW | 3rd Floor | Washington | DC | 20036 |
41192 | 2000-12-31 | 1995-07-10 | Greenwood | George E. | 4584 | 1991-11-05 | International Group of P&I Clubs | Peek House | 20 Eastcheap | London | ||
41193 | 2000-12-31 | 2000-07-14 | Leibach | Dale W. | 5220 | 1997-12-17 | Shandwick Public Affairs, Inc. | 700 13th Street, N.W. | Suite 1000 | Washington | DC | 20005 |
41194 | 2000-12-31 | 2000-07-28 | Goupil | Stephane | 5347 | 1999-12-09 | Carlington Sales Canada Corporation | 1260 Crescent, | Suite 201 | Montreal, Quebec | ||
41195 | 2000-12-31 | 1994-08-01 | Devall | James L. | 4933 | 1994-08-01 | Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, L.L.P. | 888 - 17th Street, N.W. | Suite 700 | Washington | DC | 20006-3309 |
41196 | 2000-12-31 | 1982-10-08 | Erickson | John W. | 2759 | 1977-03-09 | White & Case, LLP | 1155 Avenue of the Americas | New York | NY | 10036-2787 | |
41197 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-10-19 | Adams | Ashley Ann | 5220 | 1997-12-17 | Shandwick Public Affairs, Inc. | 700 13th Street, N.W. | Suite 1000 | Washington | DC | 20005 |
41198 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-10-19 | Bernard | Michelle D. | 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | 2550 M Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20037-1350 | |
41199 | 2000-12-31 | 1981-11-10 | Hymel | Gary G. | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | 1111 19th Street NW | 3rd Floor | Washington | DC | 20036 |
41200 | 2000-12-31 | 1990-11-15 | Schule | Robert M. | 3301 | 1981-11-10 | Hill and Knowlton Strategies, LLC | 1111 19th Street NW | 3rd Floor | Washington | DC | 20036 |
41201 | 2000-12-31 | 2000-11-21 | Marubie | Kris | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 111 North Canal Street | Suite 1100 | Chicago | IL | 60606 |
41202 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-11-22 | Delage | Gisele | 1787 | 1964-09-02 | Quebec Government Office | One Rockefeller Plaza | Suite 2600 | New York | NY | 10020-2102 |
41203 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-11-24 | McCurdy-Mackey | Lisa | 4315 | 1989-11-09 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | 808 - 17th Street, N.W. | Suite 600 | Washington | DC | 20006 |
41204 | 2000-12-31 | 1983-12-02 | Mone | Larry | 1770 | 1964-07-10 | IDA Ireland | 345 Park Avenue | 17th Floor | New York | NY | 10154 |
41205 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-12-09 | Fraser | Herbert | 5347 | 1999-12-09 | Carlington Sales Canada Corporation | 1260 Crescent, | Suite 201 | Montreal, Quebec | ||
41206 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-12-16 | Ben-Menashe | Ari | 5347 | 1999-12-09 | Carlington Sales Canada Corporation | 1260 Crescent, | Suite 201 | Montreal, Quebec | ||
41207 | 2000-12-31 | 1999-12-16 | Damiron | Olivier Frederic | 5347 | 1999-12-09 | Carlington Sales Canada Corporation | 1260 Crescent, | Suite 201 | Montreal, Quebec | ||
41208 | 2000-12-31 | 1997-12-17 | Pollock | Richard | 5220 | 1997-12-17 | Shandwick Public Affairs, Inc. | 700 13th Street, N.W. | Suite 1000 | Washington | DC | 20005 |
41209 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-12-18 | Hines | Richard T. | 5293 | 1998-12-18 | Richard T. Hines Consulting, Inc. | 809 Princess Street | Alexandria | VA | 22314 | |
41210 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-12-29 | Allen | Thomas J., III | 5295 | 1998-12-29 | Southern Energy Resources, Inc. | 900 Ashwood Parkway | Suite 500 | Atlanta | GA | 30338 |
41211 | 2000-12-31 | 1998-12-29 | Hollifield | Ray B. | 5295 | 1998-12-29 | Southern Energy Resources, Inc. | 900 Ashwood Parkway | Suite 500 | Atlanta | GA | 30338 |
41212 | 2000-12-31 | 1996-12-30 | Madigan | Peter Thomas | 5147 | 1996-12-30 | Boland & Madigan, Inc. | 700 - 13th Street, N.W. | Suite 350 | Washington | DC | 20005 |