fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16528 | 2003-12-31 | Bayern MIT | 2000-09-01 | GERMANY | 5381 | 2000-09-01 | Bavarian Office for Trade, Investment, Research and Technology | Am Messesee 2 D-81829 Munchen | ||||
16529 | 2003-12-31 | Conseil Regional de Bourgogne/Franche-Comte. Expn. | 2003-01-24 | FRANCE | 4739 | 1992-12-17 | Oliver A. Dulle, Jr. & Company, Inc. | 17 Boulevard de la Tremouille BP 1602 Dijon, Cedex | ||||
16530 | 2003-12-31 | Energy Financing Team LTD. (EFT) | 2003-06-13 | INTERNATIONAL | 5472 | 2002-02-14 | Public Strategies, Inc. | Cavendish Ct., 11-15 Wigmore London W1U 1PF UK | ||||
16531 | 2003-12-31 | Ethiopian Medhin Democratic Party | 2003-06-26 | ETHIOPIA | 5565 | 2003-06-26 | Ethiopian Medhin Democratic Association | 8115 Fenton Street Suite 305 Silver Spring 20910 | MD | |||
16532 | 2003-12-31 | European Travel Commission | 1960-07-29 | INTERNATIONAL | 1381 | 1960-07-29 | Donald N. Martin & Company, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
16533 | 2003-12-31 | Flanders Foreign Investment Office | 2000-05-09 | BELGIUM | 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | G. Vander Lindenstaat 9 3000 Leuven | ||||
16534 | 2003-12-31 | Government of the Northwest Territories | 2002-12-12 | CANADA | 5171 | 1997-04-11 | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips | P.O. Box 1320 4th Floor Scotia Centre Yellowknife NT T2P 3V3 | ||||
16535 | 2003-12-31 | Institute for Compliance and Quality Management | 2001-08-02 | LIECHTENSTEIN | 5404 | 2001-01-05 | Brian Bruh Associates LLC | Schaan | ||||
16536 | 2003-12-31 | Israel Ministry of Tourism | 2003-06-13 | ISRAEL | 5563 | 2003-06-13 | Geoffrey Weill Associates Inc. | 800 Second Avenue New York 10017 | NY | |||
16537 | 2003-12-31 | Ministry of Foreign Affairs and Cooperation Government of Morocco | 2003-06-09 | MOROCCO | 5365 | 2000-04-03 | Miller & Chevalier, Chartered | Avenue F. Roosevelt Rabat | ||||
16538 | 2003-12-31 | Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Republic of Bulgaria, Embassy | 2003-01-07 | BULGARIA | 5411 | 2001-02-13 | Downey McGrath Group, Inc. | 1621 22nd Street, N.W. 20008 | DC | |||
16539 | 2003-12-31 | Netherlands Foreign Investment Agency | 2002-08-12 | NETHERLANDS ANTILLES | 3856 | 1986-07-11 | GCI Group, Inc. | One Rockefeller Plaza 10020 | NY | |||
16540 | 2003-12-31 | Republic of Mozambique, Embassy | 2000-09-07 | MOZAMBIQUE | 5349 | 1999-12-17 | AfricaGlobal Partners, L.L.C. | 1990 M Street, N.W. Suite 570 20036 | DC | |||
16541 | 2003-12-31 | Republic of the Marshall Islands, Embassy | 2003-03-24 | MARSHALL ISLANDS | 5547 | 2003-03-24 | Baker & McKenzie, LLP | 2433 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. 20008 | DC | |||
16542 | 2003-12-31 | Russian Information Agency of the Russian Federation | 2003-05-29 | RUSSIA | 5574 | 2003-05-29 | Pepperwood International Corporation | 4 Zoubovskij Boul'var, G-21 Moscow, GSP, 103786 Russian Federation | ||||
16543 | 2003-12-31 | Russian Information Agency | 2003-08-20 | RUSSIA | 5402 | 2000-12-14 | BKSH & Associates | 4 Zoubovskij Boul'var G-21 Moscow GSP, 103786 Russian Federation | ||||
16544 | 2003-12-31 | Secretaria de Agricultura, Ganaderia y Desarrollo Rural | 1998-05-29 | MEXICO | 5171 | 1997-04-11 | Manatt, Phelps & Phillips | Cuauhtemoc | ||||
16545 | 2003-12-31 | TECRO, Taipei Economic & Cultural Representatives Office (formerly: CETRA, China External Trade Development Council) | 1993-12-21 | TAIWAN | 4880 | 1993-12-21 | Symms, Lehn & Associates, Inc. | Taipei | ||||
16546 | 2003-12-31 | Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office in the United States | 2003-07-29 | TAIWAN | 5402 | 2000-12-14 | BKSH & Associates | 4201 Wisconsin Avenue, N.W. | DC |