fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
42366 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-01-01 | Charlier Bissacot | Denise Talarico | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42367 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-01-01 | Cunillera | Cristina | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42368 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-01-01 | Di Domizio | Eliana | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42369 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-01-01 | Elias | Virginia | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42370 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-01-01 | Ezquerra | Maria Jose | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42371 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-01-01 | Soto | Lorraine | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42372 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-01-01 | de la Torriente | Diana | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42373 | 2021-12-31 | 2022-01-10 | Kling | Denise | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 111 North Canal Street | Suite 1100 | Chicago | IL | 60606 |
42374 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-01-30 | Cunillera | Cristina De Jesus | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42375 | 2021-12-31 | 2022-01-31 | Hlolland | Kent | 6839 | 2020-07-30 | Kivvit, LLC | 222 W. Merchandise Mart Plaza | Suite 2400 | Chicago | IL | 60654 |
42376 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-02-23 | Adams | David | 6927 | 2021-02-23 | Cogent Strategies LLC | 2550 M Street, NW | 2nd Floor | Washington | DC | 20037 |
42377 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-03-11 | McBrayer | Kaitlyn Jane | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 111 North Canal Street | Suite 1100 | Chicago | IL | 60606 |
42378 | 2021-12-31 | 2019-03-15 | Haber | Benjamin | 6650 | 2019-03-15 | Racepoint Global, Inc. | 46 Waltham Street | Boston | MA | 02118 | |
42379 | 2021-12-31 | 2019-03-15 | Kadioglu | Tara | 6650 | 2019-03-15 | Racepoint Global, Inc. | 46 Waltham Street | Boston | MA | 02118 | |
42380 | 2021-12-31 | 2019-03-15 | Weber | W. Lawrence | 6650 | 2019-03-15 | Racepoint Global, Inc. | 46 Waltham Street | Boston | MA | 02118 | |
42381 | 2021-12-31 | 2022-03-30 | Bole | Robert | 5870 | 2008-06-16 | Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP | 675 15th Street | Suite 2900 | Denver | CO | 80202-4432 |
42382 | 2021-12-31 | 2015-04-09 | Freiberg | Ronna | 6287 | 2015-04-09 | Legislative Strategies, Inc. | 2120 L Street, NW | Suite 850 | Washington | DC | 20037 |
42383 | 2021-12-31 | 2015-04-09 | Smith | Larry E. | 6287 | 2015-04-09 | Legislative Strategies, Inc. | 2120 L Street, NW | Suite 850 | Washington | DC | 20037 |
42384 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-04-09 | Butcher-Nesbitt | Robert A. | 6822 | 2020-05-08 | Proof Strategies Inc. | 1140 3rd Street, NE | Suite #317 | Washington | DC | 20002 |
42385 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-04-09 | Gianforti | Adrian | 6822 | 2020-05-08 | Proof Strategies Inc. | 1140 3rd Street, NE | Suite #317 | Washington | DC | 20002 |
42386 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-04-13 | Daleiden | Alicia | 6650 | 2019-03-15 | Racepoint Global, Inc. | 46 Waltham Street | Boston | MA | 02118 | |
42387 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-04-13 | Osmond | Bob | 6650 | 2019-03-15 | Racepoint Global, Inc. | 46 Waltham Street | Boston | MA | 02118 | |
42388 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-04-27 | Dienel | Robin | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42389 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-04-27 | Hauptman | James | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42390 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-04-27 | Hill | Eliza | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42391 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-05-28 | Dyer | Jacqueline | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42392 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-05-28 | Widing | Elsie | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42393 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-06-26 | Benitez Rojas | Felipe Carlos | 6566 | 2018-06-26 | Felipe Carlos Benitez Rojas | 1015 15th Street, NW | Suite 600 | Washington | DC | 20005 |
42394 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-06-26 | FitzGibbon | Blair | 6566 | 2018-06-26 | Felipe Carlos Benitez Rojas | 1015 15th Street, NW | Suite 600 | Washington | DC | 20005 |
42395 | 2021-12-31 | 2019-07-02 | Ortega | Enrique | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42396 | 2021-12-31 | 2016-07-08 | Hernandez | Richard | 6364 | 2016-07-08 | Gus West Government Affairs, Inc. | 615 G Street, SE | Washington | DC | 20003 | |
42397 | 2021-12-31 | 2016-07-08 | Sanchez | Leonel Eugenio Teller | 6364 | 2016-07-08 | Gus West Government Affairs, Inc. | 615 G Street, SE | Washington | DC | 20003 | |
42398 | 2021-12-31 | 2016-07-08 | West | Gus | 6364 | 2016-07-08 | Gus West Government Affairs, Inc. | 615 G Street, SE | Washington | DC | 20003 | |
42399 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-07-09 | Amador | Diana | 6621 | 2018-12-21 | Media Planning International Corporation | c/o Havas Creative Group | 200 Hudson Street | New York | NY | 10013 |
42400 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-07-25 | Trujillo | Carolina Sofia | 3911 | 1986-12-01 | IPG DXTRA, Inc | 909 Third Ave. | New York | NY | 10022 | |
42401 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-08-17 | Betancourt Silva | Luis Felipe | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 111 North Canal Street | Suite 1100 | Chicago | IL | 60606 |
42402 | 2021-12-31 | 2019-08-28 | Sue | Haruna | 769 | 1953-05-26 | Japan National Tourism Organization | 250 Park Avenue Suite. 1900 | New York | NY | 10177 | |
42403 | 2021-12-31 | 2018-09-18 | Maurer | Jennifer Richter | 3492 | 1983-06-24 | Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld, LLP | 2001 K Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20006 | |
42404 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-09-19 | Murray | Mark William | 7016 | 2021-09-19 | MWM Murray Consulting, LLC | 6511 Princeton Drive | Alexandria | VA | 22307 | |
42405 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-10-07 | Al Mahfoudi | Mehdi El Khatib | 6873 | 2020-10-07 | OCP North America, Inc. | 1370 Sixth Avenue | 32nd Floor | New York City | NY | 10019 |
42406 | 2021-12-31 | 2019-10-10 | Hepworth | Jamie Preto | 6651 | 2019-03-18 | Delegation of Catalonia to the United States of America | 1050 K Street, NW | Suite 325 | Washington | DC | 20001 |
42407 | 2021-12-31 | 2003-10-20 | Evich | Peter J. | 5401 | 2000-12-14 | Van Scoyoc Associates, Inc. | 800 Maine Avenue, SW | Suite 800 | Washington | DC | 20024 |
42408 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-10-25 | Hoz de Vila | Lorena | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 111 North Canal Street | Suite 1100 | Chicago | IL | 60606 |
42409 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-12 | Zaid | Mark | 6438 | 2017-06-09 | Ashcroft Law Firm, LLC | 1100 Main Street | Suite 2710 | Kansas City | MO | 64105 |
42410 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-11-13 | Dean | Brian | 6890 | 2020-11-13 | Invest El Salvador | 1629 K Street, NW | Suite 300 | Washington | DC | 20006 |
42411 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-11-13 | Merlo | Damian Matias | 6890 | 2020-11-13 | Invest El Salvador | 1629 K Street, NW | Suite 300 | Washington | DC | 20006 |
42412 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-11-13 | Metzner | David A. | 6890 | 2020-11-13 | Invest El Salvador | 1629 K Street, NW | Suite 300 | Washington | DC | 20006 |
42413 | 2021-12-31 | 1995-11-16 | Levinson | Lawrence E. | 3712 | 1985-08-05 | DLA Piper US LLP | 500 8th Street, NW | Washington | DC | 20004 | |
42414 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-11-23 | Willner | Sean Thomas | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 111 North Canal Street | Suite 1100 | Chicago | IL | 60606 |
42415 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-24 | Bole | Robert | 5870 | 2008-06-16 | Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP | 675 15th Street | Suite 2900 | Denver | CO | 80202-4432 |
42416 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-24 | Duffy | Mark | 5870 | 2008-06-16 | Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP | 675 15th Street | Suite 2900 | Denver | CO | 80202-4432 |
42417 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-24 | Roger Graham | Julian Sequoyah | 5870 | 2008-06-16 | Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP | 675 15th Street | Suite 2900 | Denver | CO | 80202-4432 |
42418 | 2021-12-31 | 2020-11-30 | Czerwinski | Christopher R. | 6895 | 2020-11-30 | Foreign Advisory Services, Inc. | 2501 M Street, NW | Unit 207 | Washington | DC | 20037 |
42419 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-30 | Berube | Melissa | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42420 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-30 | Cox | Claire | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42421 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-30 | Kayne | Kevin | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42422 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-11-30 | Kolben | Danielle | 6818 | 2020-04-27 | Blaze Partners, LLC | 106 Lafayette Street | Ste IB, | Yarmouth | ME | 04096 |
42423 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-12-07 | Dentinger | Kelsey | 6822 | 2020-05-08 | Proof Strategies Inc. | 1140 3rd Street, NE | Suite #317 | Washington | DC | 20002 |
42424 | 2021-12-31 | 2000-12-14 | Van Scoyoc | H. Stewart | 5401 | 2000-12-14 | Van Scoyoc Associates, Inc. | 800 Maine Avenue, SW | Suite 800 | Washington | DC | 20024 |
42425 | 2021-12-31 | 2021-12-16 | Masden | Danny R. | 7059 | 2021-12-16 | Potomac Radio Group, Inc. | 2890 Emma Lee Street | Suite 201 | Falls Church | VA | 22042 |