fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3855 | 2023-03-17 | Andrew Cowan | 2021-09-06 | AUSTRALIA | 7012 | 2021-09-06 | Wissler, John Eric | Level 14 NT House, 22 Mitchell Street, Darwin NT 08 | GPO Box 4396 Northern Territory | Darwin | ||
15456 | 2022-12-29 | South AustralianTourism Commission | 2022-12-28 | AUSTRALIA | 7179 | 2022-10-07 | Wagstaff Worldwide Public Relations, Inc. | 250 Victoria Square/Tamtanyangga, Level 9 Adelaide, SA | 250 Victoria Square/Tamtanyangga, Level 9 Adelaide, | |||
15457 | 2022-12-29 | Western Australian Tourism Commission | 2022-12-28 | AUSTRALIA | 7179 | 2022-10-07 | Wagstaff Worldwide Public Relations, Inc. | 2 Mill Street Perth | WA | |||
12654 | 2021-10-13 | Prime Minister of Australia | 2021-09-24 | AUSTRALIA | 7018 | 2021-09-24 | Winter, Donald Charles | Department of Prime Minister & Cabinet, PO Box 6500 | Canberra, ACT | |||
1930 | 2021-01-31 | Minderoo Foundation Pty Ltd | 2020-10-02 | AUSTRALIA | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | P.O. Box 3155 Broadway | Nedlands, Western Australia | |||
16889 | 2020-12-31 | Tourism Australia | 2018-04-30 | AUSTRALIA | 6549 | 2018-04-30 | Myriad International Marketing, LLC | 2029 Century Park E Ste 3150 | Los Angeles | CA | 90067 | |
13499 | 2019-10-31 | Minderoo Foundation Pty Ltd. | 2019-09-23 | AUSTRALIA | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 80 Birdwood Parade | Dalkeith WA 6009 Australia | |||
8762 | 2019-06-30 | Melbourne Convention & Visitors Bureau | 2018-04-30 | AUSTRALIA | 6549 | 2018-04-30 | Myriad International Marketing, LLC | Collins Square Tower Two, Level 28, 727 Collins St | Melbourne, Victoria 3008 | |||
8763 | 2019-06-30 | Minderoo Foundation | 2019-07-12 | AUSTRALIA | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | 80 Birdwood Parade, Dalkeith WA | 6009 | |||
8770 | 2019-06-30 | Tourism and Events Queensland | 2019-09-05 | AUSTRALIA | 5483 | 2002-03-06 | QORVIS LLC | 515 St Pauls Terrace, Fortitude Valley | QLD 4006 | |||
1917 | 2019-01-31 | Embassy of Australia | 2018-02-15 | AUSTRALIA | 6526 | 2018-02-15 | Hamilton Place Strategies, LLC | 1601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW | Washington | DC | 20036 | |
9926 | 2018-07-31 | Visit Victoria | 2018-12-18 | AUSTRALIA | 6549 | 2018-04-30 | Myriad International Marketing, LLC | |||||
12808 | 2017-10-17 | Government of Victoria, Australia | 2018-01-18 | AUSTRALIA | 6508 | 2018-01-18 | Crossroads Strategies LLC | 1 Spring Street | Melbourne VIC 3000 | |||
8740 | 2016-06-30 | Tourism Tasmania | 2001-12-07 | AUSTRALIA | 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | GPO Box 825 H Hobart 700 | ||||
1028 | 2016-01-01 | Tourism Australia | 2012-09-05 | AUSTRALIA | 5758 | 2006-05-09 | Ketchum Inc. NY | 6100 Center Drive, Suite 1150 | Los Angeles | CA | 90045 | |
10860 | 2015-08-30 | Defence SA/Government of South Australia thru Fletcher Rowley | 2013-07-10 | AUSTRALIA | 6174 | 2013-07-10 | Paramount Strategies | Level 4, 151 Pirie Street | Adelaide SA 5000 | |||
9904 | 2015-07-31 | Defence SA/Government of South Australia | 2013-07-09 | AUSTRALIA | 6173 | 2013-07-09 | Fletcher Rowley, Inc. | Level 4, 151 Pirie Street | Adelaide SA 5000 | |||
1900 | 2015-01-31 | Australian Wool Innovation Limited | 2014-08-20 | AUSTRALIA | 6244 | 2014-08-20 | Sandler, Travis & Rosenberg, P.A. | Level 30, 580 George Street, Sydney NSW 2000 | ||||
6241 | 2014-05-01 | Tourism Queensland | 1988-05-31 | AUSTRALIA | 4146 | 1988-05-31 | Tourism Queensland | Queensland | ||||
3110 | 2014-02-28 | Tourism & Events Queensland | 2013-10-31 | AUSTRALIA | 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | Level 10, 30 Markerston Street | Brisbane | Queensland 4000 | ||
7452 | 2011-06-01 | Australian Aerospace Composites Ltd. | 2011-06-29 | AUSTRALIA | 5962 | 2009-11-13 | Jackson Kelly, PLLC | 50 Schneider Rd | Trade Coast Central, Eagle Farm QLD 4009 | |||
8675 | 2008-06-30 | Tourism Victoria | 2008-06-30 | AUSTRALIA | 5872 | 2008-06-30 | Spring O'Brien & Company, Inc. | 6100 Center Drive | Los Angeles | CA | 90045 | |
12173 | 2007-09-30 | Commonwealth of Australia, Embassy | 2007-07-06 | AUSTRALIA | 5819 | 2007-07-06 | Bockorny Group, Inc. | 1601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW | Washington | DC | 20036 | |
7205 | 2006-05-31 | Commonwealth of Australia, Embassy | 2004-05-07 | AUSTRALIA | 5621 | 2004-05-07 | Covington & Burling, LLP | 1601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. 20036 | ||||
8645 | 2005-06-30 | Government of Australia, Embassy | 2004-01-30 | AUSTRALIA | 5534 | 2002-12-18 | Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP | 1601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. 20036 | DC | |||
1854 | 2005-01-31 | Commonwealth of Australia, Embassy | 2003-01-09 | AUSTRALIA | 5555 | 2003-01-09 | Bockorny, Petrizzo, Inc. | 1601 Massachusetts Avenue, 20036 | DC | |||
9850 | 2004-07-31 | Commonwealth of Australia, Embassy | 2003-01-02 | AUSTRALIA | 5535 | 2003-01-02 | Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw | 1601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W. | DC | |||
15359 | 2003-12-23 | Australian Dairy Industry | 1994-12-21 | AUSTRALIA | 3694 | 1985-06-24 | Collier Shannon Scott, PLLC | Victoria | ||||
8627 | 2003-06-30 | Australian Broadcasting Corporation | 1946-11-19 | AUSTRALIA | 394 | 1946-11-19 | Australian Broadcasting Corporation | Sydney | ||||
8626 | 2002-06-30 | South Australia | 2002-04-29 | AUSTRALIA | 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | Regus Tysons Corner 4th Floor 1750 Tysons Boulevard McLean 22102 | VA | |||
4605 | 2002-03-31 | Australian Dairy Corporation | 2000-10-05 | AUSTRALIA | 5390 | 2000-10-05 | Fazzone, Patrick Brock | Level 5, IBM Tower, 60 City Road Southbank, Victoria 3006 | ||||
5988 | 2000-04-30 | Queensland Travel & Tourist Corporation | 1994-03-08 | AUSTRALIA | 3752 | 1985-10-30 | Fontayne Group, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
3159 | 2000-02-29 | Australian Dairy Corporation | 1999-10-29 | AUSTRALIA | 5337 | 1999-10-15 | Lipstein, Jaffe & Lawson, L.L.P. | Southbank, Victoria | ||||
3169 | 2000-02-29 | State Government of Tasmania | 1999-10-29 | AUSTRALIA | 5337 | 1999-10-15 | Lipstein, Jaffe & Lawson, L.L.P. | Ulverston, Tasmania | ||||
3036 | 2000-02-28 | Government of Western Australia | 1999-11-18 | AUSTRALIA | 4777 | 1993-03-12 | Development Counsellors International | Box 7234 | ||||
11443 | 1999-09-08 | Pacific Dunlop, Ltd./Pacific Brands | 1995-06-29 | AUSTRALIA | 3988 | 1987-05-28 | Crowell & Moring International, LLC | Melbourne | ||||
16429 | 1998-12-31 | Australia-U.S. Business Council | 1996-01-24 | AUSTRALIA | 3694 | 1985-06-24 | Collier Shannon Scott, PLLC | Washington | DC | |||
8563 | 1998-06-30 | Australian Meat & Livestock Corporation | 1975-09-29 | AUSTRALIA | 2611 | 1975-09-29 | Australian Meat & Livestock Corporation | Sydney | ||||
5968 | 1998-04-30 | Meat Industry Council | 1997-04-21 | AUSTRALIA | 5175 | 1997-04-21 | Olsson, Frank & Weeda, P.C. | Sydney | ||||
16410 | 1997-12-31 | Australian Tourist Commission | 1995-06-23 | AUSTRALIA | 3682 | 1985-05-23 | Lou Hammond & Associates, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
16420 | 1997-12-31 | Meat Industry Council | 1997-06-05 | AUSTRALIA | 5184 | 1997-06-05 | Nichols - Dezenhall Communications Management Group, Ltd. | Sydney | ||||
12384 | 1997-10-01 | Australian Wheat Board | 1990-04-20 | AUSTRALIA | 3694 | 1985-06-24 | Collier Shannon Scott, PLLC | Victoria | ||||
12084 | 1997-09-30 | Australian Oat Exporters' Group | 1995-07-24 | AUSTRALIA | 3694 | 1985-06-24 | Collier Shannon Scott, PLLC | Perth | ||||
9594 | 1997-07-29 | Meat Industry Council | 1997-04-21 | AUSTRALIA | 5176 | 1997-04-21 | Gast, Luverne L. | Sydney | ||||
14465 | 1996-11-30 | Broken Hill Proprietary Company, Ltd. | 1996-03-18 | AUSTRALIA | 4259 | 1989-05-25 | Cassidy & Associates, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
5589 | 1996-04-25 | Australian Meat & Livestock Corporation | 1992-02-26 | AUSTRALIA | 4624 | 1992-02-26 | Howrey & Simon | Sydney | ||||
2505 | 1996-02-14 | CSR, Ltd. | 1991-03-13 | AUSTRALIA | 3869 | 1986-08-13 | Winston & Strawn | North Sydney | ||||
8530 | 1995-06-30 | Australian Meat & Livestock Corporation | 1993-06-18 | AUSTRALIA | 4819 | 1993-06-18 | Brouillard Communications | New York | NY | |||
8532 | 1995-06-30 | Brambles U.S.A., Inc. | 1989-09-08 | AUSTRALIA | 3076 | 1979-12-13 | Mayer, Brown & Platt | Chicago | IL | |||
6487 | 1995-05-12 | Government of Australia | 1994-09-29 | AUSTRALIA | 3657 | 1985-03-12 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | Canberra | ||||
1782 | 1995-01-31 | Australian Tourist Commission | 1989-02-22 | AUSTRALIA | 4220 | 1989-02-22 | Aviso, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
10664 | 1994-08-22 | Colonial Sugar Refining Company, Ltd. | 1961-07-31 | AUSTRALIA | 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | Sydney | ||||
9363 | 1994-07-19 | Australian Trade Commission (Austrade) | 1988-04-04 | AUSTRALIA | 4113 | 1988-04-04 | Australian-American Public Relations, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
9364 | 1994-07-19 | Queensland Government Representative Office | 1988-04-04 | AUSTRALIA | 4113 | 1988-04-04 | Australian-American Public Relations, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
9365 | 1994-07-19 | Victorian Tourism Commission | 1988-04-04 | AUSTRALIA | 4113 | 1988-04-04 | Australian-American Public Relations, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
9366 | 1994-07-19 | Western Australian Tourism Commission | 1988-04-04 | AUSTRALIA | 4113 | 1988-04-04 | Australian-American Public Relations, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
7654 | 1994-06-07 | CSR, Ltd., Sugar Division | 1992-04-28 | AUSTRALIA | 3694 | 1985-06-24 | Collier Shannon Scott, PLLC | Sydney | ||||
7420 | 1994-06-01 | Australian Trade Commission (Austrade) | 1993-10-19 | AUSTRALIA | 4862 | 1993-10-19 | Eisbrenner Public Relations, Inc. | San Francisco | CA | |||
5232 | 1994-04-12 | Broken Hill Proprietary Company, Ltd. | 1988-06-30 | AUSTRALIA | 3346 | 1982-03-12 | O'Melveny & Myers | Melbourne | ||||
3934 | 1994-03-21 | Australian Nuclear Science & Technology Organization (ANSTO) | 1992-10-19 | AUSTRALIA | 2580 | 1975-02-21 | Shaw, Pittman, Potts & Trowbridge | New South Wales | ||||
2490 | 1994-02-14 | Alliance for British Australian Tax Equity (ABATE) | 1992-07-17 | AUSTRALIA | 3694 | 1985-06-24 | Collier Shannon Scott, PLLC | Washington | DC | |||
11339 | 1993-09-02 | Australian Barley Board | 1991-02-28 | AUSTRALIA | 4477 | 1991-02-28 | Creative Response Concepts | Adelaide | ||||
9221 | 1993-07-13 | Pasminco, Inc. | 1992-04-03 | AUSTRALIA | 3320 | 1982-01-05 | Washington International Group, Inc. | Irvine | CA | |||
9103 | 1993-07-08 | Victorian Government of Australia | 1981-08-06 | AUSTRALIA | 3266 | 1981-08-06 | Victorian Government Business Office, Los Angeles | Victoria | ||||
6288 | 1993-05-03 | Glaxo Australia Party, Ltd. | 1992-09-28 | AUSTRALIA | 4711 | 1992-09-28 | Wilson, Scott A. | Victoria | ||||
3609 | 1993-03-11 | Australian Consulate General | 1976-10-22 | AUSTRALIA | 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
3610 | 1993-03-11 | Australian Tourist Commission | 1987-05-26 | AUSTRALIA | 2478 | 1973-11-23 | Keating Group, Inc. | NY | ||||
14874 | 1992-12-07 | Glaxo Australia Party, Ltd. (Glaxo")" | 1992-03-19 | AUSTRALIA | 4362 | 1990-04-11 | Hopkins & Sutter | Victoria | ||||
8496 | 1992-06-30 | Australian Trade Commission | 1989-01-24 | AUSTRALIA | 4209 | 1989-01-24 | Marston Webb & Associates, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
7414 | 1992-06-01 | Glaxo Australia Party, Ltd. | 1989-04-19 | AUSTRALIA | 4242 | 1989-04-19 | Maupin Taylor Ellis & Adams, P.C. | Victoria | ||||
5654 | 1992-04-28 | Pasminco, Inc. | 1991-09-03 | AUSTRALIA | 4561 | 1991-09-03 | APCO Worldwide, Inc. | Irvine | CA | |||
16214 | 1991-12-31 | Overseas Telecommunications Commission | 1987-04-15 | AUSTRALIA | 3959 | 1987-04-15 | Padilla, Speer, Burdick & Beardsley, Inc. | Sydney | ||||
16215 | 1991-12-31 | Qantas Airways, Ltd. | 1987-11-19 | AUSTRALIA | 4060 | 1987-11-19 | Cliff Madison Government Relations, Inc. | Sydney | ||||
14431 | 1991-11-30 | Australian Meat Board | 1975-11-19 | AUSTRALIA | 2564 | 1975-03-26 | Clifford & Warnke | Sidney | ||||
13586 | 1991-11-01 | Embassy of Australia | 1991-03-29 | AUSTRALIA | 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | Washington | DC | |||
11015 | 1991-08-31 | Pasminco, Inc. (EZ America, Ltd.) | 1989-05-24 | AUSTRALIA | 3597 | 1984-06-20 | APCO Associates | Irvine | CA | |||
8882 | 1991-07-01 | Alliance for British Australian Tax Equity (ABATE) | 1990-09-06 | AUSTRALIA | 3694 | 1985-06-24 | Collier Shannon Scott, PLLC | Washington | DC | |||
8885 | 1991-07-01 | Government of Australia, Business Migration Program | 1988-07-08 | AUSTRALIA | 4156 | 1988-07-08 | Gregory Company | Embassy, Washington | DC | |||
7676 | 1991-06-08 | Poppy Advisory & Control Board | 1989-12-06 | AUSTRALIA | 3989 | 1987-06-08 | Washington Resources & Strategy, Inc. | Hobart, Tasmania | ||||
6770 | 1991-05-24 | Department of Industry, Technology & Resources State of Victoria | 1989-08-14 | AUSTRALIA | 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | Melbourne | ||||
4497 | 1991-03-31 | Australian Wheat Board | 1987-10-14 | AUSTRALIA | 4050 | 1987-10-14 | Vickers, Eugene B. | Melbourne, Victoria | ||||
2687 | 1991-02-20 | State of New South Wales Australia | 1961-01-30 | AUSTRALIA | 1421 | 1961-01-30 | Development Counsellors International, Ltd. | NY | ||||
16143 | 1990-12-31 | Australian Barley Board | 1988-01-21 | AUSTRALIA | 3997 | 1987-06-19 | Keene, Shirley & Associates, Inc. | Adelaide | ||||
16166 | 1990-12-31 | Michels Warren Public Relations | 1988-01-21 | AUSTRALIA | 3997 | 1987-06-19 | Keene, Shirley & Associates, Inc. | Adelaide | ||||
13733 | 1990-11-05 | Embassy of Australia | 1990-08-13 | AUSTRALIA | 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | Washington | DC | |||
11278 | 1990-09-01 | CSR, Ltd. | 1980-04-23 | AUSTRALIA | 3050 | 1979-08-17 | Bishop, Cook, Purcell & Reynolds | |||||
10996 | 1990-08-31 | Commonwealth of Australia | 1985-10-02 | AUSTRALIA | 3743 | 1985-10-02 | Coudert Brothers | Barton | ||||
10192 | 1990-08-07 | Queensland State Government (Australia) | 1987-02-10 | AUSTRALIA | 3936 | 1987-02-10 | Queensland Government Representative Office | Queensland | ||||
16119 | 1989-12-31 | Government of New South Wales | 1959-09-25 | AUSTRALIA | 1276 | 1959-09-25 | New South Wales Government Office | |||||
5844 | 1989-04-30 | Energy Resources of Australia | 1987-11-30 | AUSTRALIA | 3431 | 1982-12-22 | Counselors for Management, Inc. | Sydney | ||||
4467 | 1989-03-31 | MLC Funds Management | 1988-11-16 | AUSTRALIA | 3810 | 1986-04-10 | Hill, Holliday, Connors, Cosmopulos, Inc. | Sydney | ||||
2704 | 1989-02-22 | Australian Embassy | 1989-02-22 | AUSTRALIA | 4220 | 1989-02-22 | Aviso, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
1732 | 1989-01-31 | National Farmers' Federation of Australia | 1987-06-19 | AUSTRALIA | 3997 | 1987-06-19 | Keene, Shirley & Associates, Inc. | Canberra | ||||
16056 | 1988-12-31 | Government of Australia, Overseas Information Service | 1987-08-03 | AUSTRALIA | 4020 | 1987-08-03 | CHACMA, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
13254 | 1988-10-31 | Westpac Banking Corporation | 1987-11-05 | AUSTRALIA | 3527 | 1983-10-05 | Debevoise & Plimpton | Sidney | ||||
9464 | 1988-07-25 | Australian Department of Immigration | 1988-07-07 | AUSTRALIA | 3463 | 1983-04-26 | Ernest Beyl Public Relations, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
8432 | 1988-06-30 | Tourism Australia | 1982-09-27 | AUSTRALIA | 3411 | 1982-09-27 | N.W. Ayer & Son, Inc. | |||||
8433 | 1988-06-30 | Victorian Tourist Commission | 1987-02-10 | AUSTRALIA | 3411 | 1982-09-27 | N.W. Ayer & Son, Inc. | Los Angeles | CA | |||
7062 | 1988-05-31 | CSR, Ltd. | 1988-01-21 | AUSTRALIA | 3997 | 1987-06-19 | Keene, Shirley & Associates, Inc. | Sydney | ||||
7063 | 1988-05-31 | Embassy of Australia | 1987-09-18 | AUSTRALIA | 3597 | 1984-06-20 | APCO Associates | Washington | DC | |||
5833 | 1988-04-30 | Australian Department of Trade | 1986-08-11 | AUSTRALIA | 3463 | 1983-04-26 | Ernest Beyl Public Relations, Inc. |