fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5338 | 1965-04-17 | Ambassador of the Kingdom of Denmark | 1948-04-16 | DENMARK | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Washington | DC | |||
8977 | 1968-07-03 | A.P. Moller, as Managing Owner of Steamship Company Svendborg, Ltd. and Steamship Company of 1912, Ltd. | 1962-03-26 | DENMARK | 523 | 1948-04-16 | Covington & Burling | Copenhagen |