fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Short_Form_Termination_Date | Short_Form_Date | Short_Form_Last_Name | Short_Form_First_Name | Registration_Number | Registration_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
658 | 2021-03-26 | Hang | Tang Chung | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
722 | 2023-04-03 | Liew | Wei Qiang Danny | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
728 | 2022-04-05 | Chia | Qian Hui | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
729 | 2022-04-05 | Hui | Sarah Thiam Jia | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
730 | 2022-04-05 | Kwan | Siku On Ann | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
731 | 2022-04-05 | Lim | Songwei Joshua | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
732 | 2022-04-05 | Tay | Jun Long | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
733 | 2022-04-05 | Wong | Ji Inn | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
734 | 2022-04-05 | Zheng | Jingxin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
839 | 2020-04-20 | Chia | Min Xin Jeff | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
840 | 2020-04-20 | Lim | Xuan Hong | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
841 | 2020-04-20 | Wen | Ng Wei | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1861 | 2017-09-28 | Chew | Brandon Wei Yang | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1863 | 2017-09-28 | Kwok | Eugene Jin Liang | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1875 | 2019-09-30 | Cao | Shenghao Hansel | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1876 | 2019-09-30 | David | Ho Chui Keong | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1877 | 2019-09-30 | Ng | Chi Hou Kenny | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1880 | 2022-09-30 | Charmaine | Ng | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1881 | 2022-09-30 | Emblad | Eva Marianne | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1882 | 2022-09-30 | Jared | Koh Pang Ming | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
1884 | 2022-09-30 | Kristie | LAi Yuen Ying | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 | |
3218 | 1972-01-05 | 1968-10-31 | Bock | Chan Chin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
4281 | 2005-01-22 | 2004-04-01 | Ho | Julian Wai-Kit | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5058 | 1990-01-31 | 1984-09-05 | Chong | Eng-Wei | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5204 | 1999-01-31 | 1998-06-03 | Wong | Constance Fung Lin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5304 | 2004-01-31 | 1999-03-22 | Mok | Chee Liang | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5495 | 2015-01-31 | 2012-09-17 | Yu | Hui Min Karen | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5557 | 2019-01-31 | 2016-09-23 | Ahmed | Sidra Sehar | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
5723 | 1980-02-01 | 1979-05-14 | Meng-Tong | Foo | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
7057 | 1973-02-16 | 1969-10-16 | Yuen | Kum Chuen | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
7494 | 1971-02-24 | 1969-10-16 | Choy | Robert Nam Chiu | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8059 | 1996-02-28 | 1993-08-30 | Yeow-Hin | Lai | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8088 | 1998-02-28 | 1996-04-30 | Ko | Kheng-Hwa | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8193 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-01-10 | Ng | Joachim J. | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8194 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-01-10 | Yan | Hon Meng | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8198 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-07-24 | Lai | Kevin Jia-ven | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8204 | 2006-02-28 | 1997-10-16 | Choo | Voon Yim | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8206 | 2006-02-28 | 2003-12-30 | Chan | Damian | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8226 | 2007-02-28 | 2004-12-22 | Kua | Jonathan | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8294 | 2015-02-28 | 2013-10-23 | Lim | Wey-Len | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8345 | 2018-02-28 | 2014-09-19 | Chen | Ming Stephanie | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8346 | 2018-02-28 | 2014-09-19 | Tan | Shu Ying Glenda | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
8501 | 2000-02-29 | 1996-11-08 | Lim | Simon | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
9795 | 2017-03-13 | 2014-03-28 | Heng | Shu Xian Gina | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
9805 | 1969-03-14 | 1968-03-26 | Cheong | Shum Kwai | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
10634 | 2020-03-23 | 2016-09-23 | Tee | Renhao Joel | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
11084 | 2007-03-29 | 2004-12-22 | Chin | Lawrence | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
11227 | 2013-03-30 | 2010-05-13 | Seo | Jia Han | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
11907 | 2003-03-31 | 2000-05-11 | Kok | Ping Soon | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12065 | 2010-03-31 | 2009-01-31 | Lee | Sar Tan | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12066 | 2010-03-31 | 2009-01-31 | Yeoh | Keat Chuan | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12076 | 2011-03-31 | 2009-01-31 | Chong | Joonwoon | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12107 | 2012-03-31 | 2010-11-09 | Oo | Olivia | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12230 | 2018-03-31 | 2014-09-19 | Tan | LI-Wen Melanie | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12514 | 2002-04-01 | 2000-05-11 | Ti | Boon Wee | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12515 | 2002-04-01 | 1999-11-08 | Wong | Wee-Siong | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12551 | 2012-04-01 | 2009-11-19 | Ho | Weng-Si | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12566 | 2015-04-01 | 2012-09-17 | Lin | John Zhihong | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12588 | 2019-04-01 | 2015-04-21 | Teo | Jian Ming Kenneth | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
12660 | 2018-04-02 | 2015-04-21 | Khoo | Shi Min Lynn | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
13199 | 2021-04-11 | 2018-10-03 | Zin | Kelvin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
13462 | 1994-04-15 | 1992-04-16 | Lim | Swee-Say | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14048 | 1995-04-24 | 1992-04-16 | Lim | Adelaine | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14194 | 1993-04-27 | 1992-04-16 | Lam | Yen Chin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14196 | 1993-04-27 | 1986-09-17 | Huat | Anthony Ang Meng | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14670 | 1995-04-30 | 1993-04-27 | Leng | James Ng Mun | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14765 | 1998-04-30 | 1995-04-24 | Seow | Wee-Seong | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14820 | 2000-04-30 | 1999-03-22 | Khaw Hong Cher | Andrew | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14898 | 2003-04-30 | 2001-05-18 | Kew | Hui-Chin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14913 | 2004-04-30 | 2002-07-02 | Chik | Wai-Chiew | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14919 | 2005-04-30 | 2003-01-10 | Seah | Keok Choon | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
14988 | 2009-04-30 | 2008-02-04 | Wong | Yau-Chung | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
15057 | 2013-04-30 | 2008-07-28 | Chan | Ih Ming | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
15311 | 1968-05-01 | 1967-02-02 | Bourdrez | Joseph P. | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
15450 | 1995-05-01 | 1991-05-07 | Natarajan | Suresh | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
16419 | 1991-05-15 | 1986-09-17 | Chan | Kwee-Kee | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
17477 | 1996-05-30 | 1993-08-30 | Quah | Hilary Lam-Seng | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
17725 | 1989-05-31 | 1988-08-22 | Lam | Mark Choon-Heiy | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
18078 | 2010-05-31 | 2007-05-30 | Gan | Chin Kiong Terence | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
18092 | 2011-05-31 | 2009-11-19 | Kumar | Kiren M. | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
18239 | 2021-05-31 | 2018-10-02 | Sy Chan | Samuel Christian | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
18438 | 1979-06-01 | 1975-10-24 | Goh | Eric Wai-Mun | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
18514 | 1999-06-01 | 1994-10-17 | Ng | Nam-Sin | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
19353 | 1997-06-13 | 1995-04-24 | Barry | Mong-Huat Sim | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
19460 | 2017-06-14 | 2014-03-28 | Yap | Jonathan Marc | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
19565 | 1991-06-15 | 1988-08-22 | Lim | David T.E. | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
19782 | 2022-06-17 | 2018-04-03 | Ayyalaasomayajula | Arvind | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
19833 | 2021-06-18 | 2018-04-03 | Yeo | Aaron | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
20058 | 2018-06-22 | 2015-11-09 | Gian | Yi Hsen | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21102 | 1988-06-30 | 1977-09-01 | Huat | How Peck | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21128 | 1989-06-30 | 1983-10-03 | Khor | Peng-Soon | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21309 | 1998-06-30 | 1995-09-18 | Aw | Kah-Peng | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21433 | 2002-06-30 | 2001-05-18 | Choo | Heng-Tong | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21515 | 2004-06-30 | 2003-12-30 | Beh | Kian Teik | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21615 | 2009-06-30 | 2008-02-04 | Tham | Aaron Chee-Chong | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21678 | 2011-06-30 | 2009-01-31 | Tung | Meng Fai | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21721 | 2013-06-30 | 2009-01-31 | Lee | Weisheng | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21813 | 2014-06-30 | 2011-09-22 | Goh | Chuan Ling Geraldine | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21977 | 2021-06-30 | 2019-04-01 | Wen Hao Lui | Joshua | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
21993 | 2021-06-30 | 2019-09-30 | Loh Mui San | Michelle | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |
22087 | 1971-07-01 | 1969-10-16 | Wan | Shoung Fun | 2003 | 1967-02-02 | Singapore Economic Development Board | 55 East 59th Street | Suite 21 B, 21st Floor | New York | NY | 10022 |