fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4042 | 1989-03-25 | Canadian Pork Council | 1986-09-25 | CANADA | 3887 | 1986-09-25 | Cameron, Hornbostel & Butterman | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
5107 | 1994-04-08 | Government of Canada | 1993-04-29 | CANADA | 3567 | 1984-03-22 | Preston, Gates & Ellis, L.L.P. | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
5225 | 1993-04-12 | Brewers' Association of Canada | 1986-07-17 | CANADA | 3346 | 1982-03-12 | O'Melveny & Myers | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
6214 | 1994-05-01 | Grand Council of the Crees (of Quebec) | 1991-04-25 | CANADA | 4505 | 1991-04-25 | Goodman Group, Ltd. | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
6958 | 1989-05-30 | Frontec Logistics Corporation | 1988-11-18 | CANADA | 4170 | 1988-08-18 | Government Research Corporation | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
6971 | 1989-05-30 | Public Affairs International | 1988-08-18 | CANADA | 4170 | 1988-08-18 | Government Research Corporation | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
7616 | 2009-06-05 | National Film Board of Canada | 1944-04-21 | CANADA | 437 | 1944-04-21 | National Film Board of Canada | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
8055 | 1969-06-24 | Government of Canada (Department of Trade & Commerce) | 1962-11-14 | CANADA | 1581 | 1962-11-14 | Dawson, Donald Roy | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
8623 | 2002-06-30 | Grand Council of the Crees (of Quebec) | 1989-06-19 | CANADA | 4265 | 1989-06-19 | Law Office of James A. Dumont, P.C. | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
9801 | 1993-07-31 | Grand Council of the Crees (of Quebec) | 1991-07-25 | CANADA | 4547 | 1991-07-25 | E Cubed Company, Inc. (The E3 Company) | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
12071 | 1996-09-30 | Canadian Steel Producers' Association | 1995-09-11 | CANADA | 5063 | 1995-09-11 | Van Loon, Jean | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
12125 | 2001-09-30 | Natural Resources Canada | 2000-06-02 | CANADA | 5329 | 1999-09-24 | Troutman Sanders, LLP | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
12376 | 1993-10-01 | Dairy Farmers of Canada | 1993-06-15 | CANADA | 3942 | 1987-03-03 | Arter & Hadden | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
14298 | 1975-11-29 | Dr. Americo Cruz | 1966-09-28 | CANADA | 1961 | 1966-02-07 | Brauer, Robert R. | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
14311 | 1994-11-29 | Government of Canada, Department of External Affairs | 1991-07-10 | CANADA | 4371 | 1990-04-30 | Baker & Hostetler | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
15444 | 1994-12-29 | Government of Canada | 1991-09-27 | CANADA | 3317 | 1981-12-29 | Weil, Gotshal & Manges, L.L.P. | Ottawa, Ontario | ||||
16331 | 1995-12-31 | Grand Council of the Crees | 1995-06-20 | CANADA | 5026 | 1995-06-20 | Sierra Club Legal Defense Fund, Inc. | Ottawa, Ontario |