fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52 | Association for the Promotion of the Autonomous Region of Madeira | 2021-11-29 | PORTUGAL | 6549 | 2018-04-30 | Myriad International Marketing, LLC | ||||||
9419 | 1945-07-22 | Portuguese Government | 1943-07-22 | PORTUGAL | 199 | 1943-07-22 | Goetz, Carlos Cudell | |||||
15619 | 1962-12-31 | Secretariado Nacional de Informacao, Cultura Popular e Turismo | 1953-05-26 | PORTUGAL | 768 | 1953-05-26 | George Peabody & Associates, Inc. | Lisbon | ||||
5783 | 1964-04-30 | Overseas Companies of Portugal | 1963-01-04 | PORTUGAL | 1588 | 1963-01-04 | Portuguese-American Committee on Foreign Affairs | Lisbon | ||||
5784 | 1964-04-30 | Overseas Companies of Portugal | 1961-05-29 | PORTUGAL | 1454 | 1961-05-29 | Selvage & Lee, Inc. | Lisbon | ||||
14762 | 1965-12-03 | Portugal | 1964-03-06 | PORTUGAL | 1698 | 1964-03-06 | J.B. Rundle, Inc., Advertising | New York | NY | |||
7999 | 1967-06-22 | Companhia Mineira do Lobito | 1965-09-08 | PORTUGAL | 1785 | 1964-09-01 | Barken, Aaron H. | Lisbon | ||||
8000 | 1967-06-22 | Companhia Portuguesa de Algodoes, Lda. | 1966-04-05 | PORTUGAL | 1785 | 1964-09-01 | Barken, Aaron H. | Lisboa | ||||
6143 | 1969-05-01 | Overseas Companies of Portugal | 1964-05-11 | PORTUGAL | 1726 | 1964-05-11 | Downs & Roosevelt, Inc. | Lisbon | ||||
7039 | 1970-05-31 | Association of Overseas Companies of Portugal | 1969-12-10 | PORTUGAL | 2177 | 1969-12-10 | Educational & Professional Resources, Inc. | Lisbon | ||||
15689 | 1972-12-31 | Overseas Companies of Portugal | 1971-04-07 | PORTUGAL | 2252 | 1971-04-07 | Downs & Roosevelt, Inc. | Lisbon | ||||
10582 | 1974-08-17 | Overseas Companies of Portugal | 1973-05-14 | PORTUGAL | 2429 | 1973-05-14 | Potomac International Corporation | Lisbon | ||||
5377 | 1978-04-18 | Partido Social Democratico (Formerly: Partido Popular Democratico) | 1975-02-19 | PORTUGAL | 2560 | 1975-02-19 | Partido Social Democratico | Lisbon | ||||
14659 | 1979-12-01 | Banco Espirito Santo e Commericial de Lisboa | 1975-08-20 | PORTUGAL | 1839 | 1965-01-11 | Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy | Lisbon | ||||
11958 | 1981-09-30 | Portuguese Government Trade Office | 1980-08-05 | PORTUGAL | 3135 | 1980-08-05 | Thomsen Enterprises, Ltd. | NY | ||||
850 | 1982-01-01 | Portuguese Government Trade Office | 1981-10-21 | PORTUGAL | 3292 | 1981-11-21 | Harshe-Rotman & Druck, Inc. | NY | ||||
8340 | 1982-06-30 | Armazens Jose Luis da Costa & C.A., LDA | 1980-03-11 | PORTUGAL | 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | Lisbon | ||||
8341 | 1982-06-30 | Associacao dos Armadores da Pesca Longinqua (ADAPLA) | 1980-12-22 | PORTUGAL | 2165 | 1969-10-09 | Squire Patton Boggs, LLP | Lisbon | ||||
11431 | 1982-09-08 | Gabinete da Area de Sines | 1982-04-21 | PORTUGAL | 3358 | 1982-04-21 | Gray & Rogers, Inc. | Lisboa | ||||
13815 | 1982-11-08 | Centrala Wynajmu Filmow | 1952-04-29 | PORTUGAL | 103 | 1942-08-22 | Artkino Pictures, Inc. | Warsaw | ||||
15902 | 1983-12-31 | Portuguese Government Trade Office | 1982-03-31 | PORTUGAL | 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | |||||
5056 | 1984-04-06 | Fundo de Fomento de Exportacao | 1972-07-10 | PORTUGAL | 2353 | 1972-07-10 | Portuguese Government Trade Office | |||||
8091 | 1986-06-25 | Centro Cultural Reconquista | 1985-03-10 | PORTUGAL | 3662 | 1985-03-19 | Representation of Societies for Defense of Tradition, Family | |||||
12363 | 1987-10-01 | Luso American Foundation for International Relations | 1987-04-03 | PORTUGAL | 3600 | 1984-06-14 | Black, Kelly, Scruggs & Healey | Lisbon | ||||
2028 | 1988-02-01 | Luso American Development Foundation | 1987-07-01 | PORTUGAL | 4001 | 1987-07-01 | Loiello Associates International, Ltd. | Lisbon | ||||
7650 | 1989-06-07 | TAP Air Portugal | 1989-04-03 | PORTUGAL | 3752 | 1985-10-30 | Fontayne Group, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
16106 | 1989-12-31 | Direccao Geral do Turismo | 1968-06-12 | PORTUGAL | 1639 | 1963-06-12 | Heyward Associates, Inc. | Lisbon | ||||
7766 | 1990-06-12 | Portuguese National Tourist Office | 1974-12-31 | PORTUGAL | 1803 | 1964-10-19 | Modern Education Services, Inc. | |||||
13741 | 1990-11-05 | Portuguese National Tourist Office | 1990-10-01 | PORTUGAL | 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | New York | NY | |||
16172 | 1990-12-31 | Portuguese Trade Commission | 1990-08-07 | PORTUGAL | 4431 | 1990-08-07 | Harron & Associates | New York | NY | |||
9788 | 1991-07-31 | Government of Portugal | 1989-09-28 | PORTUGAL | 3777 | 1986-02-12 | Sawyer Miller Group | Lisboa | ||||
13597 | 1991-11-01 | Portugese National Tourist Office | 1991-10-10 | PORTUGAL | 2836 | 1977-10-12 | North American Precis Syndicate | New York | NY | |||
16236 | 1992-12-31 | Government of Portugal, Ministry for Foreign Affairs | 1943-01-23 | PORTUGAL | 172 | 1943-01-23 | Portuguese National Tourist Office | Lisbon | ||||
3671 | 1993-03-12 | Foreign Investment Institute of Portugal | 1988-03-09 | PORTUGAL | 3590 | 1984-05-31 | J. Woodman Associates, Inc. | |||||
10238 | 1993-08-09 | Portuguese National Tourist Office | 1990-06-06 | PORTUGAL | 4384 | 1990-06-06 | Davisworks | New York | NY | |||
10530 | 1994-08-15 | Luso-American Development Foundation | 1990-10-03 | PORTUGAL | 4417 | 1990-10-03 | Gowran International, Ltd. | Lisbon | ||||
1543 | 1995-01-26 | Portuguese Trade Commission | 1993-08-16 | PORTUGAL | 4209 | 1989-01-24 | Marston Webb & Associates, Inc. | New York, NY | ||||
5947 | 1995-04-30 | Investimentos Comercio e Turismo de Portugal (ICEP) Formerly: Govt. of Portugal/Portuguese Natl. Tourist Office | 1994-10-21 | PORTUGAL | 4431 | 1990-08-07 | Harron & Associates | New York | NY | |||
8014 | 1995-06-22 | Madeira Development Company | 1995-06-22 | PORTUGAL | 5027 | 1995-06-22 | Kuett Communications, Inc. | Madeira | ||||
16329 | 1995-12-31 | Government of Portugal (Foreign Ministry) | 1994-08-25 | PORTUGAL | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | Lisboa | ||||
6832 | 1996-05-25 | Lisbon Stock Exchange Association | 1996-05-10 | PORTUGAL | 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | Lisbon | ||||
16459 | 1999-12-31 | Government of Portugal, Embassy | 1997-02-18 | PORTUGAL | 4043 | 1987-09-28 | Cameron, Bruce P. | Washington | DC | |||
16463 | 1999-12-31 | ICEP - Investimentos Comercio e Turismo (Portuguese National Tourist Office) | 1994-02-14 | PORTUGAL | 4893 | 1994-02-14 | Heyward, Evelyn J. | Lisbon | ||||
3163 | 2000-02-29 | Gulbenkian Foundation | 1999-10-28 | PORTUGAL | 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Lisbon | ||||
11076 | 2001-08-31 | Portuguese National Tourist Office | 2001-01-05 | PORTUGAL | 1381 | 1960-07-29 | Donald N. Martin & Company, Inc. | 590 Fifth Avenue New York 10036 | NY | |||
1837 | 2002-01-31 | Government of Portugal (Trade Commission) | 1994-11-15 | PORTUGAL | 3634 | 1984-11-15 | Daniel J. Edelman, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
14314 | 2002-11-29 | ICEP/Portugal | 2002-05-29 | PORTUGAL | 5499 | 2002-05-29 | Levin Public Relations & Marketing, Inc. | 1900 L Street, N.W. Suite 310 20036 | DC | |||
14508 | 2003-11-30 | Portuguese National Tourist Office | 2002-10-01 | PORTUGAL | 3131 | 1980-07-15 | M. Silver Associates, Inc. | 590 Fifth Avenue, 4th Floor New York 10036-4785 | NY | |||
11100 | 2006-08-31 | Instituto Nacional de Aviacao Civil (INAC) | 2003-08-20 | PORTUGAL | 4933 | 1994-08-01 | Zuckert, Scoutt & Rasenberger, L.L.P. | Rua B. Edificio 4, 5, 6, Aeroporta da Portela 1749-034 Lisbon | ||||
13484 | 2017-10-31 | Portuguese National Tourist Office | 2018-06-01 | PORTUGAL | 6549 | 2018-04-30 | Myriad International Marketing, LLC | 866 Second Avenue, 8th Floor | New York | NY | 10017 | |
6919 | 2019-05-29 | Turismo de Portugal | 2019-11-26 | PORTUGAL | 6549 | 2018-04-30 | Myriad International Marketing, LLC | |||||
13191 | 2019-10-30 | Turismo de Portugal | 2019-10-27 | PORTUGAL | 6745 | 2019-10-27 | Herrick, Feinstein LLP | Rua Ivone Silva, Lote 6 | Lisboa 1050-124 | |||
14761 | 2022-12-02 | Terra Peregrin, S.A. | 2019-12-23 | PORTUGAL | 6399 | 2016-12-11 | Sonoran Policy Group, LLC D/B/A Stryk Global Diplomacy | |||||
16927 | 2022-12-31 | Lisboa Tourism Association | 2022-08-05 | PORTUGAL | 6212 | 2014-03-10 | Finn Partners, Inc. | Rua do Arsenal 15 | Lisboa |