fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
101 | Catalan National Assembly in the United States of America Association | 2022-04-30 | SPAIN | 7111 | 2022-04-30 | Catalan National Assembly in the United States of America Association | 1717 Hazelwood Dr | Norman | OK | 73071 | ||
102 | Catalan National Assembly in the United States of America Association | 2022-11-29 | SPAIN | 7197 | 2022-11-29 | Miquel Fernandez Barros | ||||||
277 | Government of Catalonia | 2019-03-18 | SPAIN | 6651 | 2019-03-18 | Delegation of Catalonia to the United States of America | Placa Sant Jaume, 4 | 08002 Barcelona Catalunya | ||||
454 | Melia Hotels International | 2022-07-16 | SPAIN | 7140 | 2022-07-16 | The Raben Group LLC | Calle Gremi de Boters, 2 | Palma de Mallorca | ||||
724 | Turespana Tourist Office of Spain | 2020-12-16 | SPAIN | 6492 | 2017-11-27 | MMGY Global, LLC | 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 5300 | New York | NY | 10165 | ||
9113 | 1942-07-09 | Vicesecretaria de Educacion Popular | 1942-07-09 | SPAIN | 28 | 1942-07-09 | Spanish Library of Information | Madrid | ||||
10084 | 1942-08-03 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-08-03 | SPAIN | 80 | 1942-08-03 | Larcegui, Francisco de S. | New York | NY | |||
11446 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | 115 | 1942-09-09 | Mendez, Cristina | New York | NY | |||
11447 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | 116 | 1942-09-09 | Mezquita, Teresa | New York | NY | |||
11448 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | 117 | 1942-09-09 | Orta, Pilar | New York | NY | |||
11449 | 1942-09-09 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-09-09 | SPAIN | 118 | 1942-09-09 | Mezquita, Manuel | New York | NY | |||
9473 | 1943-07-26 | Spanish Library of Information | 1942-07-09 | SPAIN | 29 | 1942-07-09 | Carpenter, Charles M. | New York | NY | |||
15517 | 1944-12-31 | Alfonso El Alcazar, XI | 1943-01-01 | SPAIN | 168 | 1943-01-01 | Aladren, Jose M. | Madrid | ||||
4073 | 1945-03-27 | Juan Pujol | 1945-03-27 | SPAIN | 298 | 1945-03-27 | Casares Sanchez, Manuel | Madrid | ||||
8795 | 1945-07-01 | Direccion General del Turismo (Direction General of Tourism) | 1942-07-03 | SPAIN | 2 | 1942-07-03 | Garcia-Rubiera, Marcelino | Madrid | ||||
12991 | 1945-10-25 | Henri Kirschen | 1945-02-16 | SPAIN | 290 | 1945-02-16 | Law Office of George E. Tolman | Madrid | ||||
15518 | 1945-12-31 | Agencia Logos (Logos News Agency) | 1945-02-26 | SPAIN | 293 | 1945-02-26 | Aladren del Perojo, Jose Maria | Madrid | ||||
1137 | 1946-01-08 | Antonio Menchaca y Compania | 1944-08-04 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Bilbao | ||||
1138 | 1946-01-08 | Auxiliar Maritima | 1944-08-04 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Bilbao | ||||
1139 | 1946-01-08 | Compania Espanola de Navegacion Maritima, S.A. | 1942-07-08 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Barcelona | ||||
1140 | 1946-01-08 | Compania Naviera Espanola | 1944-08-04 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Madrid | ||||
1141 | 1946-01-08 | Compania Naviera Vascongada | 1944-08-04 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | |||||
1142 | 1946-01-08 | Compania Trasatlantica, Administrada por el Estado-Apartado | 1942-07-08 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Madrid | ||||
1143 | 1946-01-08 | Compania Trasmediterranea | 1942-07-08 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Madrid | ||||
1146 | 1946-01-08 | Hijo de Ramon Ramos | 1944-08-04 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Barcelona | ||||
1147 | 1946-01-08 | Islena Maritima, S.A. | 1943-03-09 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Madrid | ||||
1148 | 1946-01-08 | Jose Navas Escuder | 1944-08-04 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Barcelona | ||||
1149 | 1946-01-08 | Orion Compania Naviera | 1944-08-04 | SPAIN | 16 | 1942-07-08 | Garcia & Diaz | Madrid | ||||
2368 | 1946-02-11 | Asociacion Monarquica Espanola | 1942-07-15 | SPAIN | 47 | 1942-07-15 | De Agustin, Don Manuel | |||||
15458 | 1946-12-30 | Agencia Efe, S.A. | 1943-12-30 | SPAIN | 166 | 1943-12-30 | Lucientes, Francisco J. | Madrid | ||||
1550 | 1947-01-27 | Jose Giral y Pereira | 1946-08-20 | SPAIN | 368 | 1946-08-20 | Spanish Information | Paris | ||||
9166 | 1947-07-11 | Jose Antonio de Aguiree (Only name listed as foreign principal/regarding the Basque Government) | 1944-07-11 | SPAIN | 270 | 1944-07-11 | De Aguirre, Jose Antonio | New York | NY | |||
2234 | 1948-02-06 | Spanish Embassy | 1942-07-09 | SPAIN | 27 | 1942-07-09 | LeRoy & Denslow | Washington | DC | |||
8118 | 1949-06-27 | Spanish Republican Government | 1945-12-27 | SPAIN | 334 | 1945-12-27 | Meana, Juan A. | |||||
9948 | 1949-08-01 | Spanish Republican Government In Exile | 1946-09-03 | SPAIN | 368 | 1946-08-20 | Spanish Information | Paris | ||||
5269 | 1950-04-15 | Spanish Tourist Office | 1950-02-07 | SPAIN | 610 | 1950-02-07 | Kelly-Kramer, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
12295 | 1950-10-01 | Embassy of Spain | 1950-06-05 | SPAIN | 626 | 1950-06-05 | Banda, Francisco C. | Washington | DC | |||
13839 | 1950-11-09 | Lucio del Alamo Urrutia (Pyresa)(Prensa y Radio Espanola Sociedad Anonima-Madrid) | 1949-05-09 | SPAIN | 569 | 1949-05-09 | Garza, Lorenzo (Melon) | Madrid | ||||
15119 | 1951-12-15 | Government of the Republic of Spain (In Exile) | 1949-12-15 | SPAIN | 602 | 1949-12-15 | Asensio, General Jose' | Paris | ||||
1624 | 1952-01-30 | Spanish Confederated Societies of New York | 1947-01-31 | SPAIN | 273 | 1944-07-31 | Junta de Cultura Espanola | NY | ||||
11810 | 1952-09-25 | Spanish State Tourist Office | 1951-09-24 | SPAIN | 684 | 1951-09-24 | Calvosa, Ulrich | Madrid | ||||
3472 | 1953-03-06 | Spanish State Tourist Department | 1953-03-06 | SPAIN | 760 | 1953-03-06 | Carney, William Parke | Madrid | ||||
1064 | 1955-01-04 | Commercial Office of the Embassy of Spain in the U.S. | 1954-12-01 | SPAIN | 858 | 1954-12-01 | McDonnell, Joseph Thomas | Washington | DC | |||
1409 | 1955-01-19 | Spanish Government | 1954-06-19 | SPAIN | 837 | 1954-06-19 | Armesto, Felipe Fernandez G. | Madrid | ||||
14610 | 1955-12-01 | Agencia Efe, S.A. | 1948-04-08 | SPAIN | 425 | 1947-01-10 | Casares Sanchez, Manuel | Madrid | ||||
14611 | 1955-12-01 | Commercial Office of the Embassy of Spain in the U.S. | 1955-01-13 | SPAIN | 866 | 1955-01-13 | McDonnell & Slattery | Washington | DC | |||
1601 | 1956-01-29 | Drina - Official Herald of Croatian National Resistence | 1955-03-09 | SPAIN | 878 | 1955-03-09 | Circle of the Croatian Knights | Madrid | ||||
2815 | 1956-02-26 | H.E. Jose Maria de Areilza, the Count of Motrico Ambassador of Spain | 1955-08-26 | SPAIN | 906 | 1955-08-26 | Cochran, Gosselin & Associates | Washington | DC | |||
15574 | 1957-12-31 | His Excellency Senor D. Jose M. de Areilza, Conde de Motrico, Spanish Ambassador to the U.S. | 1957-01-28 | SPAIN | 995 | 1957-01-28 | Tex McCrary, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
11705 | 1960-09-19 | Juan & Pedro Pujol (Newspaper Madrid")" | 1948-04-08 | SPAIN | 425 | 1947-01-10 | Casares Sanchez, Manuel | Madrid | ||||
12304 | 1960-10-01 | Government of the Republic of Spain (In Exile) | 1955-04-01 | SPAIN | 884 | 1955-04-01 | Asensio, General Jose' | Paris | ||||
13529 | 1960-11-01 | Government of Spain | 1949-02-08 | SPAIN | 420 | 1947-01-09 | Cummings, Sellers, Reeves & Conner | Washington | DC | |||
1679 | 1963-01-31 | Iberia Airlines of Spain | 1957-09-09 | SPAIN | 1064 | 1957-09-09 | James C. Seix Company, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
792 | 1964-01-01 | Centro de Cultura por Correspondencia (CCC) | 1964-09-01 | SPAIN | 1786 | 1964-09-01 | Leiser, Henri | |||||
794 | 1964-01-01 | Hotel Los Monteros | 1964-09-01 | SPAIN | 1786 | 1964-09-01 | Leiser, Henri | |||||
795 | 1964-01-01 | Iberia Airlines | 1964-09-01 | SPAIN | 1786 | 1964-09-01 | Leiser, Henri | |||||
796 | 1964-01-01 | Ministerio de Informacion y Turismo (Spanish Government) | 1964-09-01 | SPAIN | 1786 | 1964-09-01 | Leiser, Henri | |||||
797 | 1964-01-01 | Muebles Darro (Furniture Company) | 1964-09-01 | SPAIN | 1786 | 1964-09-01 | Leiser, Henri | |||||
9657 | 1964-07-31 | Autotransporte Touristico Espanol, S.A. | 1956-04-13 | SPAIN | 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | Madrid | ||||
9673 | 1964-07-31 | Iberia Airlines of Spain | 1957-01-28 | SPAIN | 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | Madrid | ||||
9693 | 1964-07-31 | Spanish State Tourist Department | 1950-03-24 | SPAIN | 71 | 1942-07-30 | Kelly, Nason, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
10262 | 1964-08-11 | Division of Cultural Affairs of the Spanish Embassy | 1949-02-11 | SPAIN | 562 | 1949-02-11 | Clark, Charles Patrick | Washington | DC | |||
10263 | 1964-08-11 | Government of Spain | 1955-10-12 | SPAIN | 562 | 1949-02-11 | Clark, Charles Patrick | Madrid | ||||
15642 | 1965-12-31 | Ministry of Information & Tourism, Government of Spain | 1965-05-27 | SPAIN | 1896 | 1965-05-27 | Conant & Company Public Relations, Inc. | Madrid | ||||
4008 | 1966-03-24 | Ministry of Information & Tourism | 1964-12-17 | SPAIN | 1836 | 1964-12-17 | Spanish National Tourist Office, Dallas | Madrid | ||||
15121 | 1966-12-15 | Miguel Garcia de Saez, Commissioner General for Spain, New York World's Fair | 1964-06-04 | SPAIN | 1751 | 1964-06-04 | Camche, Joel T. | New York | NY | |||
4331 | 1969-03-31 | Hoteles Turisticas, S.A. | 1963-05-23 | SPAIN | 1630 | 1963-05-23 | John A. Tetley Company, Inc. | Madrid | ||||
15672 | 1969-12-31 | Spain Government | 1964-07-10 | SPAIN | 1743 | 1964-05-28 | Pendleton & McLaughlin | Madrid | ||||
12697 | 1970-10-15 | Aceitunas de Mesa, S.A. | 1970-06-25 | SPAIN | 508 | 1948-01-19 | Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton, LLP | Seville | ||||
1504 | 1972-01-25 | Comite Para Desarrollo y Defensa de Calzado Espanol en Mercados Extranjeros (Comm. for Dev./Def. of Span. Footwear) | 1970-12-21 | SPAIN | 2229 | 1970-12-21 | Egge, George V., Jr. | Madrid | ||||
3653 | 1974-03-12 | Cooperative Espanola de Comercializacion de Productos del Campo (COES) | 1964-10-06 | SPAIN | 1470 | 1961-08-03 | Brown, Charles H. | Madrid | ||||
3654 | 1974-03-12 | J.M. Barturen | 1964-02-25 | SPAIN | 1470 | 1961-08-03 | Brown, Charles H. | New York | NY | |||
11762 | 1975-09-22 | Nicolas Franco | 1975-08-07 | SPAIN | 2600 | 1975-08-07 | Don Braman & Associates, Inc. | |||||
15739 | 1975-12-31 | Ministry of Tourism & Information (General Direction of Tourist Planning) (Spanish National Tourist Office) | 1974-10-01 | SPAIN | 2536 | 1974-10-01 | Robert L. Bliss, Inc. | Madrid | ||||
2543 | 1977-02-15 | Agrupacion Nacional de Exportadores de Calzado (National Group of Footwear Exporters) | 1972-01-31 | SPAIN | 2229 | 1970-12-21 | Egge, George V., Jr. | Madrid | ||||
3253 | 1977-03-01 | Movimiento Nacional Progresista (L. Rhadames Trujillo-Martinez) | 1977-07-08 | SPAIN | 2804 | 1977-07-08 | Martinez, Antonio C. | New York | NY | |||
6159 | 1977-05-01 | Government of Spain | 1976-05-13 | SPAIN | 2469 | 1973-10-23 | Burson-Marsteller | Madrid | ||||
7366 | 1977-06-01 | Ministry of Foreign Affairs | 1976-05-10 | SPAIN | 2691 | 1976-05-10 | O'Connor & Hannan | Madrid | ||||
8316 | 1977-06-30 | Ministry of Information & Tourism | 1964-12-11 | SPAIN | 1830 | 1964-12-11 | Spanish National Tourist Office, Chicago | Madrid | ||||
15789 | 1977-12-31 | Government of Spain, Foreign Ministry | 1977-02-04 | SPAIN | 1481 | 1961-09-27 | Ruder Finn, Inc. | Madrid | ||||
1988 | 1978-02-01 | Commercial Counselor of Spain | 1977-06-06 | SPAIN | 810 | 1954-01-05 | Charles von Loewenfeldt, Inc. | San Francisco | CA | |||
10730 | 1978-08-25 | Ministerio De Commercio Y Turismo | 1977-11-17 | SPAIN | 2321 | 1972-02-29 | Spanish National Tourist Office, Miami | Madrid | ||||
10731 | 1978-08-25 | Ministry of Information & Tourism of Spain | 1972-02-29 | SPAIN | 2321 | 1972-02-29 | Spanish National Tourist Office, Miami | Madrid | ||||
15804 | 1978-12-31 | Hispanica de Petroleos, S.A. | 1971-08-13 | SPAIN | 1839 | 1965-01-11 | Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy | Madrid | ||||
15810 | 1978-12-31 | Spanish National Tourist Office | 1976-08-05 | SPAIN | 2714 | 1976-08-05 | Dentsu Corporation of America | New York | NY | |||
6166 | 1979-05-01 | Costa del Sol Tourist Promotion Board | 1979-02-04 | SPAIN | 2617 | 1975-10-15 | Celliers, Peter J. | Costa del Sol | ||||
6170 | 1979-05-01 | Patronato de Turismo de Andalucia | 1979-02-04 | SPAIN | 2617 | 1975-10-15 | Celliers, Peter J. | Costa del Sol | ||||
14304 | 1979-11-29 | Aceitunas de Mesa, S.A. (ACEMESA) | 1970-12-21 | SPAIN | 2229 | 1970-12-21 | Egge, George V., Jr. | Seville | ||||
14305 | 1979-11-29 | Union de Empresas y Entidades Siderurgicas (UNESID) (Spanish Steel Industries Association) | 1978-04-28 | SPAIN | 2229 | 1970-12-21 | Egge, George V., Jr. | Madrid | ||||
9302 | 1980-07-16 | Banco Exterior de Espana | 1979-11-19 | SPAIN | 3070 | 1979-11-19 | Barnett, Yingling & Shay, P.C. | Madrid | ||||
15471 | 1980-12-30 | Ministerio de Informacion y Turismo | 1965-08-11 | SPAIN | 1914 | 1965-08-11 | Spanish National Tourist Office, San Francisco | Madrid | ||||
15472 | 1980-12-30 | Ministry of Commerce & Tourism | 1977-10-27 | SPAIN | 1914 | 1965-08-11 | Spanish National Tourist Office, San Francisco | Madrid | ||||
15473 | 1980-12-30 | Ministry of Commerce & Tourism | 1977-11-22 | SPAIN | 1830 | 1964-12-11 | Spanish National Tourist Office, Chicago | Madrid | ||||
15474 | 1980-12-30 | Ministry of Information & Tourism | 1973-10-12 | SPAIN | 1914 | 1965-08-11 | Spanish National Tourist Office, San Francisco | Madrid | ||||
15475 | 1980-12-30 | Ministry of Information & Tourism | 1973-11-26 | SPAIN | 538 | 1948-09-14 | Spanish National Tourist Office, New York | Madrid | ||||
15476 | 1980-12-30 | Spanish State Tourist Department | 1948-09-14 | SPAIN | 538 | 1948-09-14 | Spanish National Tourist Office, New York | Madrid | ||||
6623 | 1981-05-17 | His Excellency Jose Llado Ambassador of Spain | 1981-01-30 | SPAIN | 2740 | 1976-12-17 | Hill & Knowlton, Inc. | Washington | DC | |||
6885 | 1981-05-28 | Government of Spain | 1981-05-28 | SPAIN | 3245 | 1981-05-28 | Frankel, Marvin D. | New York | NY | |||
10930 | 1981-08-31 | Iberia Air Lines of Spain | 1970-05-18 | SPAIN | 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | New York | NY | |||
10958 | 1981-08-31 | Spanish National Tourist Office | 1967-10-03 | SPAIN | 1814 | 1964-11-06 | Association Films, Inc. | San Francisco | CA | |||
14767 | 1981-12-03 | Ministry of Information & Tourism | 1972-06-05 | SPAIN | 2344 | 1972-06-05 | Spanish National Tourist Office, Puerto Rico | Madrid |