fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4147 | 1952-03-30 | Chinese Air Force | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
4148 | 1952-03-30 | Chinese Navy | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
8102 | 1954-06-26 | Board of Supplies, Executive Yuan | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
8103 | 1954-06-26 | Republic of China (The following agencies are listed under this foreign principal.) | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
8215 | 1952-06-30 | Chinese Armored Force Command | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa | ||||
11907 | 1951-09-30 | Central Trust of China | 1951-06-26 | TAIWAN | 679 | 1951-06-26 | Commerce International China, Inc. | Taipeh, Formosa |