fara
Data source: The U.S. Department of Justice · About: https://github.com/simonw/fara-history
rowid | Foreign_Principal_Termination_Date | Foreign_Principal | Foreign_Principal_Registration_Date | Country/Location_Represented | Registration_Number | Registrant_Date | Registrant_Name | Address_1 | Address_2 | City | State | Zip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1562 | 1996-01-27 | Stelco, Inc. | 1984-01-27 | CANADA | 3555 | 1984-01-27 | Belch, Donald K. | Toronto | ||||
2188 | 1986-02-04 | Stelco, Inc. | 1986-08-11 | CANADA | 3601 | 1984-06-26 | Ernest Wittenberg Associates, Inc. | Toronto | ||||
2861 | 1987-02-26 | Lake Ontario Cement, Ltd. | 1986-07-07 | CANADA | 3851 | 1986-07-07 | Kirby, Gillick, Schwartz & Tuohey, P.C. | Toronto | ||||
4342 | 1971-03-31 | Trade & Industry Branch, Department of Ecomonics, Province of Ontario | 1966-02-28 | CANADA | 1966 | 1966-02-28 | R.J. Sullivan, Inc. | Toronto | ||||
4409 | 1983-03-31 | National Survival Institute (Canada) | 1984-10-25 | CANADA | 3282 | 1981-10-06 | Hansen, Paul W. | Toronto | ||||
6710 | 1984-05-22 | Committee on U.S. Business of the Canadian Life & Health Insurance Association | 1983-04-20 | CANADA | 3460 | 1983-04-20 | Kennedy, Cornelius B. | Toronto | ||||
6769 | 1988-05-24 | Noranda Sales Corporation, Ltd. | 1988-03-07 | CANADA | 3431 | 1982-12-22 | Counselors for Management, Inc. | Toronto | ||||
8474 | 1991-06-30 | Bank of Montreal, Public Affairs Office | 1988-03-23 | CANADA | 4103 | 1988-02-23 | Waters, David J. | Toronto | ||||
9155 | 1986-07-10 | Canadian Bank Note Company, Ltd. | 1985-11-22 | CANADA | 3758 | 1985-11-22 | Vinson & Elkins | Toronto | ||||
9156 | 1986-07-10 | Canadian Security Printers, Inc. | 1985-11-22 | CANADA | 3758 | 1985-11-22 | Vinson & Elkins | Toronto | ||||
9160 | 1988-07-10 | Manufacturers Life Insurance Company of Canada | 1987-03-23 | CANADA | 3428 | 1982-12-10 | Rogers & Wells, LLP | Toronto | ||||
9183 | 1988-07-11 | Manufacturers Life Insurance Company | 1983-06-24 | CANADA | 3490 | 1983-06-24 | Chadbourne & Parke | Toronto | ||||
11633 | 1988-09-15 | Cominco, Ltd. | 1988-03-07 | CANADA | 3431 | 1982-12-22 | Counselors for Management, Inc. | Toronto | ||||
12550 | 1985-10-08 | Lake Ontario Cement, Ltd. | 1983-10-03 | CANADA | 3525 | 1983-10-03 | Kirby, Gillick, Schwartz & Tuohey, P.C. | Toronto | ||||
13101 | 1993-10-28 | Government of Ontario | 1968-05-28 | CANADA | 2087 | 1968-04-11 | Government of Ontario, Canada | Toronto | ||||
13703 | 1978-11-04 | Toronto-Dominion Bank | 1971-11-04 | CANADA | 2288 | 1971-11-04 | Miller & Chevalier | Toronto | ||||
14093 | 1984-11-20 | Committee on U.S. Business of the Canadian Life & Health Insurance Association | 1983-04-20 | CANADA | 3461 | 1983-04-20 | Armstrong, Teasdale, Kramer & Vaughan | Toronto | ||||
14325 | 1960-11-30 | Province of Ontario | 1960-09-20 | CANADA | 785 | 1953-08-21 | Davis, Polk & Wardell | Toronto | ||||
15057 | 1944-12-13 | Abitibi Power & Paper Company, Ltd., Bondholders' Committee | 1942-10-05 | CANADA | 134 | 1942-10-05 | Doremus & Company | Toronto |